Pushkin v. Nussbaum et al
Plaintiff: DAVID B. PUSHKIN
Defendant: Beth R. Nussbaum, RHI Entertainment Inc., Timothy J. Quinlivan, Esq, MERITAIN HEALTH, Kevin L. Bremer, Esq., Aronsohn Weiner and Salerno, LLC, GEICO, Premier Prizm Solutions, Lisa Ardron, Gina Fuge, Dominic Spaventa and PAUL FELDMAN
Cross_claimant: RHI Entertainment Inc.
Cross_defendant: Lisa Ardron, Aronsohn Weiner and Salerno, LLC, Kevin L. Bremer, Esq., PAUL FELDMAN, Gina Fuge, GEICO, MERITAIN HEALTH, Beth R. Nussbaum, Premier Prizm Solutions, Timothy J. Quinlivan, Esq and Dominic Spaventa
Case Number: 2:2012cv00324
Filed: January 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/28/17. (DD, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 Letter Opinion-Order denying w/out prejudice 322 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono filed by DAVID B. PUSHKIN. Plaintiff is directed to file his reply brief in support of his Motion to File a Fourth Amended Complaint, D.E. 288, by June 17, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/4/16. (DD, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/11/14. (DD, )
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM/ORDER that w/in (30) days, Defts. shall respond to 275 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by DAVID B. PUSHKIN. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/22/14. (DD, )
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/15/14. (DD, )
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 OPINION/ORDER DENYING re 258 Application/Petition for Recusal filed by DAVID B. PUSHKIN. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/18/13. (DD, )
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 4/24/13. (DD, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pushkin v. Nussbaum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID B. PUSHKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth R. Nussbaum
Represented By: PETER J. KURSHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHI Entertainment Inc.
Represented By: GIL D. MESSINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Quinlivan, Esq
Represented By: JOHN A. PISKORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERITAIN HEALTH
Represented By: JOHN A. PISKORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin L. Bremer, Esq.
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aronsohn Weiner and Salerno, LLC
Represented By: PETER THOMAS SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Prizm Solutions
Represented By: FARDENE E. BLANCHARD
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH KARCICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ardron
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Fuge
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Spaventa
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL FELDMAN
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: RHI Entertainment Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Lisa Ardron
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aronsohn Weiner and Salerno, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Kevin L. Bremer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PAUL FELDMAN
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gina Fuge
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GEICO
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MERITAIN HEALTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Beth R. Nussbaum
Represented By: PETER J. KURSHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Premier Prizm Solutions
Represented By: FARDENE E. BLANCHARD
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH KARCICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Timothy J. Quinlivan, Esq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dominic Spaventa
Represented By: RANDALL K. ROONAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?