LOVE v. DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: |
LEMONT LOVE |
Defendant: |
DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, NORTHERN STATE PRISON, PAUL LAGANA, MCGEE and JOHN DOE 1-10 |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv01050 |
Filed: |
February 21, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of New Jersey |
Office: |
Newark Office |
County: |
Essex |
Presiding Judge: |
Madeline C. Arleo |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan D. Wigenton |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 17, 2017 |
Filing
55
OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 3/17/17. (sr, )(N/M)
|
April 4, 2016 |
Filing
29
LETTER OPINION & ORDER DENYING Pltf's 27 Notice/Motion to Disqualify Gregory Bueno as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/4/16. (sr, ) (NM)
|
July 8, 2014 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM ORDER REOPENING CASE in order for this Court to screen the Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint SHALL PROCEED at this time as against the sole remaining named Defendant Paul Lagana. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and serve a copy of the Amended Complaint, summons, and this Order upon Defendant Paul Lagana, by certified mail,return receipt requested, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d), with all costs of service advanced by the United States. Defendant Paul Lagana shal l file and serve a responsive pleading within the time specified in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2);that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1) and § 4(a) of Appendix H of the Local Civil Rules, the Clerk shall notify Plaintiff of the opportunity to apply in writing to the assigned judge for the appointment of pro bono counsel in accordance with the factors set forth in Tabron v. Grace, 6 F.3d 454 (3d Cir. 1993), cert. denied, 510 U.S. 1196 (19 94), which sets forth the requirements for eligibility for appointment of pro bono counsel (in this regard, Plaintiff is advised that such appointment is not automatic). The Clerk shall enclose with such notice a copy of Appendix H and a form A pplication for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order and accompanying Opinion on Plaintiff by first class mail, and upon Defendants counsel of record electronically; etc. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 7/8/14. (sr, )
|
January 6, 2014 |
Filing
7
OPINION fld. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 1/6/14. (sr, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?