ZUNIGA v. AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE
Plaintiff: ISABEL DASSINGER, MONTELL LOCEY, JILL BROWNING, WENDY WICKS, SANFORD SKOLNIK, MIGUEL MERCADO, ANTHONY MCCULLOUGH, GERALD SCIASCIA, PRESTON MONAHAN, HOA NGUYEN, EDWIN BOYD, ARNETTA PAYLINGS, TROY DOWNTAIN, MICHAEL TAYLOR, ANNA NGUYEN, CECILIA BARO, DIANE ROWDEN, CECIL HOSKINSON, MYNOR PADILLA, MASELE KIBASSA, ANTOINETTA RODRIGUES, JEFFREY WILSON, MITZIE N. VAZ, WILLIAM TRIMBLE, CLARISSE FRIAS, BILLY ALEXANDER, EUGENE BROWN, EDWIN ESCAMILLA, ANGELA JONES, BRIGITTE BROWN, MICHELLE BECKMAN, CLIFFORD WILSON, RICHARD MURPHY, ARNOLD ALDOS, KIMBERLY LONG, MICHAEL SCRIBNER, STEPHEN FURMAN, PEDRO ZUNIGA, RICHARD CORRIGAN, MOHAMMAD K. NASEEM, LAWRENCE SHOMBERT, ALLEN ECKER, CARLTON MCCLEASE, ELIZABETH MCNABB, DONALD HACKETT, MICHAEL EARLEY, KIRK MUELLER, CRISTOBAL CORREA, JR., HOANG NGUYEN, TRACY SPENCE, DOLORES SLINSKI, MARK MAGUIRE, CHRISTOPHER CALLAHAN, KRISTINE EUBANKS, GARY LIGHTBOURNE, RUBEN GUANGA, JANE SFORZA, GERONIMO RODRIGUEZ, ALMA AMES, SABRINA L. BARNES, MICHAEL MAIONE, ANGELETTE WHITE/GREEN, ERICA ALEXANDER, DANIEL GARCIA, CAROL HARDIN, STEPHEN RYDER, SHEILA SMITH, MILLICENT JONES, MICHAEL SANDERS, UMA JOTHY, DELROY MORRIS, JESSICA MCKEEVER, JODI RICHARDSON, MARCUS COLLINS, AINSWORTH HENRY, CRAIG MILLER, JOHN MARTINS, GEORGE DASSINGER, JACK KELLAM, MIGUEL OCHOA, JAMES OWUSU, DAVID HUBBARD, BETTY HAWTHORNE, NICHOLAS DOURA, JOHN WOZNIAK, RACHELE PALMENTIERO, LAWRENCE CAMERANO and CLAUD C. SCARBOROUGH, JR.
Defendant: DOES 1-100, KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION, ONE WEST BANK, INDYMAC BANK, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC, OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, INC., WACHOVIA BANK, LOAN CARE, GMAC, SLS, JP MORGAN CHASE, STATEBRIGE COMPANY, SAXON, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, SOVERIGN, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICE, AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE, SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC, CITI FINANCIAL, ASC, WEICHERT FINANCIAL, CITI BANK, REGIONS MORTGAGE, U.S. BANK, GREENTREE MORTGAGE, FLAGSTAR, SETERUS MORTGAGE, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, VERICREST, AURORA, BB&T, FIFTH THIRD BANK, CHASE, BAYVIEW, CITI MORTGAGE, FIRST MARINER, HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES, EVERHOME, HSBC BANK USA, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, OCWEN and CENLAR
Case Number: 2:2014cv02973
Filed: May 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #140 Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint; granting #143 Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint; The second amended complaint (ECF no. 139) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/8/2016. (ld, )
November 8, 2016 Filing 150 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/8/2016. (ld, )
October 21, 2016 Filing 149 Letter TO JUDGE MCNULTY from ISABEL AND GEORGE DASSINGER dated 10/17/16. (nic, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 148 Letter TO JUDGE MCNULTY from ISABEL AND GEORGE DASSINGER. (ld, )
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER that the action against defendant Mortgage Access Corp. d/b/a Weichert Financial Services is DISMISSED because there are no claims asserted against it. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/26/2016. (ld, )
July 25, 2016 Filing 146 Letter from Michael T Millar Esq. (MILLAR, MICHAEL)
July 7, 2016 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL TERRANCE MILLAR on behalf of WEICHERT FINANCIAL (MILLAR, MICHAEL)
June 27, 2016 Filing 144 Letter TO JUDGE MCNULTY from ISABEL AND GEORGE DASSINGER. (ld, )
May 2, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #143 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs George W. Dassinger and Isabel Dassinger. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 2, 2016 Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs George W. Dassinger and Isabel Dassinger by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 5/23/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LAVERY, KELLIE)
April 22, 2016 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #141 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/2/2016. (JB, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 141 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (LAVERY, KELLIE)
April 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #140 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs George and Isabel Dassinger. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs George and Isabel Dassinger by AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 5/23/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Loly G. Tor, #3 Exhibit A to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #4 Exhibit B to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #5 Exhibit C to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #6 Exhibit D to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #7 Exhibit E to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #8 Exhibit F to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #9 Exhibit G to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #10 Exhibit H to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #11 Exhibit I to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #12 Exhibit J to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #13 Exhibit K to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #14 Exhibit L to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #15 Exhibit M to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #16 Exhibit N to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #17 Exhibit O to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #18 Exhibit P to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #19 Exhibit Q to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #20 Exhibit R to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #21 Exhibit S to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #22 Exhibit T to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #23 Exhibit U to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #24 Exhibit V to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #25 Exhibit W to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #26 Exhibit X to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #27 Exhibit Y to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #28 Exhibit Z to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #29 Exhibit AA to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #30 Exhibit BB to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #31 Exhibit CC to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #32 Exhibit DD to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #33 Exhibit EE to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #34 Exhibit FF to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #35 Exhibit GG to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #36 Exhibit HH to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #37 Exhibit II to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #38 Exhibit JJ to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #39 Exhibit KK to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #40 Exhibit LL to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #41 Exhibit MM to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #42 Exhibit NN to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #43 Exhibit OO to the Certification of Loly G. Tor, #44 Text of Proposed Order, #45 Certificate of Service)(TOR, LOLY)
April 21, 2016 Filing 142 Letter to Judge McNulty from GEORGE & ISABEL DASSINGER. (ld, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 139 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE, OCWEN, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., filed by ISABEL DASSINGER, GEORGE DASSINGER.(nr, )
April 4, 2016 Filing 138 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JEFFREY WILSON (ld, )
March 29, 2016 Filing 137 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ARNOLD ALDOS (ld, )
March 24, 2016 Filing 135 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to EUGENE BROWN (ld, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 136 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DONALD HACKETT (ld, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 134 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to SANFORD SKOLNIK (ld, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 133 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to CECIL HOSKINSON (ld, )
March 22, 2016 Filing 130 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MICHELLE BECKMAN (ld, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 132 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MICHAEL MAIONE (ld, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 131 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to BETTY HAWTHORNE (ld, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 129 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to NICHOLAS DOURA (ld, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 128 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MARK MAGUIRE (ld, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 127 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAVID HUBBARD (ld, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 126 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MOHAMMAD K. NASEEM (ld, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 125 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to JACK KELLAM (ld, )
March 17, 2016 Filing 124 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MYNOR PADILLA (ld, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 123 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTOPHER A. BARBARISI terminated. (BARBARISI, CHRISTOPHER)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting Defendants #98 Motion to Dismiss ; granting Defendants #101 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to the Plaintiffs' submission, within 30 days of a second amended complaint that meets the standards rule 8, Fed. R. Civ. P.. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 03/07/2016. (JB, )
March 7, 2016 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 03/07/2016. (JB, )
February 26, 2016 Filing 120 Letter from GEORGE DASSINGER, ISABEL DASSINGER. (ld, )
February 22, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by LOLY G. TOR on behalf of AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE, OCWEN, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (TOR, LOLY)
February 19, 2016 Filing 118 Letter from Christopher A. Barbarisi removing Mark D. Marino from ecf notices/case. (BARBARISI, CHRISTOPHER)
February 19, 2016 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER A. BARBARISI on behalf of AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE (BARBARISI, CHRISTOPHER)
February 17, 2016 Filing 116 Letter from GEORGE DASSINGER, ISABEL DASSINGER to Judge McNulty. (ld, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 115 Letter to Judge McNulty from GEORGE & ISABEL DASSINGER. (ld, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 114 Letter to Judge Mannion from GEORGE & ISABEL DASSINGER. (ld, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 113 Letter in re - Motion to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT doc. #101 from GEORGE DASSINGER, ISABEL DASSINGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit1, #2 Exhibit2, #3 Exhibit3, #4 Exhibit4, #5 Exhibit5)(ld, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 112 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ISABEL DASSINGER (ld, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 111 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by GEORGE DASSINGER (ld, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 110 Letter from Counsel for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to Hon. Kevin McNulty, U.S.D.J. re: Request for Dismissal re #101 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS GEORGE W. DASSINGER AND ISABEL DASSINGER. (LAVERY, KELLIE)
October 12, 2015 Filing 109 Letter from Counsel for Defendants to Hon. Kevin McNulty, U.S.D.J. re: Request for Dismissal re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs George and Isabel Dassinger. (MARINO, MARK)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice against defendants Nationstar, Aurora and Cenlar because there are no claims asserted against them. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/8/2015. (ld, )
October 7, 2015 Filing 107 Letter from Bradley Mitchell requesting dismissal of Defendants Nationstar, Aurora and Cenlar. (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
October 7, 2015 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by BRADLEY L. MITCHELL on behalf of AURORA, CENLAR, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE (MITCHELL, BRADLEY)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDERED that the action against defendant Regions Mortgage is DISMISSED because there are no claims asserted against it. This dismissal is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/1/2015. (ld, )
September 30, 2015 Filing 104 Letter from Dwayne F. Stanley on behalf of Regions Bank. (STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 30, 2015 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by DWAYNE FRANKLIN STANLEY on behalf of REGIONS MORTGAGE (STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED that the action as against defendant OFC is DISMISSED because there are no claims asserted against it; that the claims against OLS and HRI are dismissed, except for the claims of plaintiff Dassinger, which are not dismissed. This dismissal is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/4/2015. (ld, )
August 24, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #101 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS GEORGE W. DASSINGER AND ISABEL DASSINGER. Motion set for 9/21/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (cm )
August 24, 2015 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFFS GEORGE W. DASSINGER AND ISABEL DASSINGER by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LAVERY, KELLIE)
August 19, 2015 Filing 100 Letter from ISABEL DASSINGER,GEORGE DASSINGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ld, )
August 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #98 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs George and Isabel Dassinger. Motion set for 9/8/2015 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (ld, )
August 10, 2015 Filing 99 Letter from Mark D. Marino, Esq. Requesting that the Court Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. (MARINO, MARK)
August 10, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs George and Isabel Dassinger by AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE, OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 8/25/2015 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Mark D. Marino, Esq., in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #4 Exhibit B to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #5 Exhibit C to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #6 Exhibit D to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #7 Exhibit E to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #8 Exhibit F to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #9 Exhibit G to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #10 Exhibit H to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #11 Exhibit I to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #12 Exhibit J to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #13 Exhibit K to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #14 Exhibit L to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #15 Exhibit M to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #16 Exhibit N to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #17 Exhibit O to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #18 Exhibit P to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #19 Exhibit Q to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #20 Exhibit R to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #21 Exhibit S to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #22 Exhibit T to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #23 Exhibit U to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #24 Exhibit V to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #25 Exhibit W to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #26 Exhibit X to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #27 Exhibit Y to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #28 Exhibit Z to Certification of Mark D. Marino, Esq., #29 Text of Proposed Order)(MARINO, MARK)
August 10, 2015 Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MARINO, MARK)
August 10, 2015 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC identifying Ocwen Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MARINO, MARK)
August 10, 2015 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #95 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/24/2015. (ld, )
August 7, 2015 Filing 95 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Attorney KELLIE A. LAVERY for WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. added. (LAVERY, KELLIE)
June 15, 2015 Filing 94 Letter from Arnetta Paylings requesting the case to not be dismissed. (cm )
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDERED that the action as against defendant JPMC is DISMISSED, ORDERED that the action as against defendant Wells Fargo is DISMISSED IN PART. The claims asserted by Dassinger are NOT DISMISSED; The dismissals are without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/12/2015. (ld, )
June 2, 2015 Case Reassignment to Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion no longer assigned to the case. (in-tk, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 92 Letter. (VASSALLO, JOHN)
May 26, 2015 Filing 91 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL as to CRAIG MILLER; ORDERED that Craig Miller is terminated as plaintiff in this action, and his claims in this action are voluntarily DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/20/2015. (ld, )
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SERVICE; ORDERED that, the informal motion by plaintiffs George Dassinger and Isabel Dassinger for an extension of time to serve their amended complaint upon defendants is granted. The Dassinger plaintiffs have 90 days from today to serve each defendant; that, the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to the plaintiffs at the addresses listed below,etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 5/15/2015. (ld, )
May 15, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion: Status Conference held on 5/15/2015. Amended scheduling order to be filed (spc, )
May 13, 2015 Filing 88 Certification of Diane A. Bettino on behalf of WACHOVIA BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER -- An in person conference before Magistrate Judge Mannion is scheduled for 5/15/2015 at 4 pm in Courtroom 3C - Newark. All parties are required to attend. Defendant, Wells Fargo Bank, shall provide, by certified and regular mail, a copy of this text order to all plaintiffs remaining in this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/17/2015. (spc, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED that the action as against defendants U.S. Bank, N.A., Vericrest Financial, and Flagstar Bank is DISMISSED because there appear to be no claims asserted against those entities. This dismissal is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/15/2015. (ld, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 85 Letter from Jonathan E. Samon Re: Dismissal of Flagstar Bank. (SAMON, JONATHAN)
April 9, 2015 Filing 84 Letter from Joseph N. Froehlich requesting dismissal of U.S. Bank, N.A. and Vericrest Financial. (FROEHLICH, JOSEPH)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDERED that the action as against defendants Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Green Tree Mortgage, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, and Select PortfolioServicing, Inc. is DISMISSED because there appear to be no claims asserted against those entities. This dismissal is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/2/2015. (ld, )
March 25, 2015 Filing 82 Letter from Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
March 24, 2015 Filing 81 Letter from Daniel A. Schleifstein, Esq. re: dismissal of Green Tree defendants. (SCHLEIFSTEIN, DANIEL)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED that the action as against defendants Bank of America, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., and HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. is DISMISSED because there appear to be no claims asserted against those entities. This dismissal is without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 3/20/2015. (ld, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 79 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq.. (BETTINO, DIANE)
March 5, 2015 Filing 78 Letter from Joshua N. Howley re request for dismissal. (HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
February 27, 2015 Filing 77 Letter from Scott H. Kaiser re #67 Order,,,. (KAISER, SCOTT)
January 16, 2015 Filing 73 Letter from Arnetta Paylings. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anr)
January 15, 2015 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by GEORGE DASSINGER, ISABEL DASSINGER.(sr, )
January 14, 2015 Filing 72 Letter from Craig and Sharon Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(anr)
January 6, 2015 Filing 74 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jeanne Lahiff, Esq. (ld, )
December 31, 2014 Filing 75 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eugene Brown (ld, )
December 23, 2014 Filing 71 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sheila Smith (nr, )
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER. The Order to Show Cause is hereby withdrawn without prejudice. The Dec. 23, 2014 hearing is adjourned. ORDERED BY Judge Madeline C. Arleo on Dec. 19, 2014. (Arleo, Madeline)
December 17, 2014 Filing 69 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to Sharon Miller (gmd, )
December 9, 2014 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion. Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that each Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by 1/15/15, or, if they so choose, Plaintiffs must send a letter by that date requesting that he or she may proceed under the original Complaint. That if neither an amended complaint nor a letter requesting to proceed under the original Complaint is filed by 1/15/15, the Court will consider dismissal of the case without prejudice.1 That Jeanne Lahiff's appearance as local counsel is stricken. That if Ms. Lahiff wishes to appear for any Plaintiff in this case, she must make a written application to the Court. That the order to show cause against Ms. Lahiff is carried until 12/23/14 at 12:00 p.m. Ms. Lahiff is ordered to attend the hearing in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 11/24/14. (gmd, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 68 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to MYNOR PADILLA (gmd, )
November 24, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: RASHEEDAH RAYAH TERRY, does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (sea, ) Modified on 11/24/2014 (sea).
November 18, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Status Conference held on 11/18/2014. (aa, )
November 18, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by RASHEEDAH RAYAH TERRY on behalf of BILLY ALEXANDER (gmd, )
November 17, 2014 Filing 65 Letter from Jeanne Lahiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-doctor's note)(LAHIFF, JEANNE)
November 12, 2014 Filing 64 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to CLIFFORD WILSON, PEDRO ZUNIGA (gmd, )
November 12, 2014 Filing 62 Letter re: needing additional time to obtain legal counsel from Clifford J. Wilson. (gmd, )
November 10, 2014 Filing 61 Letter from Jeanne Lahiff. (LAHIFF, JEANNE)
November 7, 2014 Filing 60 Letter to Judge Arleo from Arnetta Paylings. (gmd, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 59 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to DAVID HUBBARD, MICHAEL SCRIBNER (gmd, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 63 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to JILL BROWNING, ARNETTA PAYLINGS, MICHAEL SCRIBNER, DANIEL GARCIA (gmd, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 58 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to BILLY ALEXANDER, CECILIA BARO, MICHELLE BECKMAN, GEORGE DASSINGER, KRISTINE EUBANKS, RUBEN GUANGA, AINSWORTH HENRY, MILLICENT JONES, MONTELL LOCEY, RICHARD MURPHY, ANNA NGUYEN, HOA NGUYEN, MYNOR PADILLA, LAWRENCE SHOMBERT, TRACY SPENCE, ANGELETTE WHITE/GREEN (gmd, )
October 31, 2014 Filing 57 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to JOHN MARTINS, CARLTON MCCLEASE, ANNA NGUYEN, RACHELE PALMENTIERO, JODI RICHARDSON (gmd, )
October 30, 2014 Filing 56 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to SABRINA L. BARNES, CHRISTOPHER CALLAHAN, TROY DOWNTAIN, MICHAEL EARLEY, MICHAEL MAIONE, ELIZABETH MCNABB, JAMES OWUSU, MICHAEL SANDERS, CLAUD C. SCARBOROUGH, JR, JANE SFORZA, SANFORD SKOLNIK, MICHAEL TAYLOR (gmd, )
October 29, 2014 Filing 54 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to EDWIN BOYD, ALLEN ECKER, ANTHONY MCCULLOUGH, MIGUEL MERCADO, CRAIG MILLER, GERONIMO RODRIGUEZ, STEPHEN RYDER, MITZIE N. VAZ (gmd, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 55 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to DOLORES SLINSKI (gmd, )
October 21, 2014 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by CLIFFORD WILSON (sr, )
October 20, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo: Status Conference held on 10/20/2014. (aa, )
October 20, 2014 Filing 52 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to ANGELETTE WHITE/GREEN (sr, )
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this complt. should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute, and for failure to attend the Court's status conference on 10/20/2014 Show Cause Hearing set for 11/18/2014 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/20/2014. (nr, ) Modified on 10/21/2014 (nr). (Order mail to all pltfs. by chambers)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to attend the Court's 10/20/2014 status conference; Show Cause Hearing set for 11/18/2014 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/20/2014. (nr, )
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER, per the reasons set forth on the record administratively terminating #20 Motion to Remand; granting #25 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 10/20/14. (aa, )
October 17, 2014 Filing 53 Letter from Ruben Guanga requesting an adjournment for the hrg. that was scheduled on 10/20/2014 (nr, )
October 17, 2014 Filing 47 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to CLARISSE FRIAS, GERONIMO RODRIGUEZ (gmd, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 46 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to BILLY ALEXANDER, DAVID HUBBARD, KIRK MUELLER, ARNETTA PAYLINGS, JODI RICHARDSON, MICHAEL SCRIBNER, LAWRENCE SHOMBERT, SHEILA SMITH, TRACY SPENCE, CLIFFORD WILSON (gmd, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 45 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to GEORGE DASSINGER (gmd, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 44 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to SABRINA L. BARNES, EDWIN BOYD, EUGENE BROWN, JILL BROWNING, CHRISTOPHER CALLAHAN, MARCUS COLLINS, MICHAEL EARLEY, ALLEN ECKER, KRISTINE EUBANKS, RUBEN GUANGA, AINSWORTH HENRY, UMA JOTHY, MASELE KIBASSA, MONTELL LOCEY, MICHAEL MAIONE, JOHN MARTINS, CARLTON MCCLEASE, JESSICA MCKEEVER, ELIZABETH MCNABB, CRAIG MILLER, PRESTON MONAHAN, HOA NGUYEN, RACHELE PALMENTIERO, DIANE ROWDEN, STEPHEN RYDER, MICHAEL SANDERS, SANFORD SKOLNIK, MICHAEL TALOR, MITZIE N. VAZ, JOHN WOZNIAK (gmd, )
October 2, 2014 Filing 43 Certified Mail Receipt Returned sent to DOLORES SLINSKI. (gmd, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER. Jeanne Lahiff, Esq.,counsel of record for the plaintiffs, is hereby ordered to attend the hearing on Oct. 20, 2014 at noon. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on Oct. 3, 2014. (Arleo, Madeline)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER ORDER that The Resolution Law Group, PC is hereby stricken as counsel of record, etc. A Hearing is set for 10/20/2014 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/29/14. (gmd, )
September 18, 2014 Filing 40 Letter from Jeanne Lahiff re #39 Order. (LAHIFF, JEANNE)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER ORDER that Jeanne Lahiff, Esq. is to provide the Court contact information and last know addresses of all plaintiffs in this action by or before 9/19/14, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/10/14. (gmd, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER, the hearing scheduled for 9/11/14 before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 9/10/14. (aa, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER please disregard the previous TEXT ORDER this case is still assigned to Magistrate Judge Arleo. So Ordered Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10 September 2014. (spc )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER - The In-person hearing scheduled for 9/11/2014 at 11:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo will now be before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion in Newark-Courtroom 3C. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/10/2014. (ma)
September 5, 2014 Filing 36 Letter from S. Skovron, Esq. re #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Stephen E. Skovron, Esq., 34 Order,. (SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
August 27, 2014 Filing 35 Letter from Lahiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LAHIFF, JEANNE)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER. An in person hearing is scheduled for Thursday, September 11, 2014 at 11:00 a.m. on Mr. Skovron's motion to be relieved as counsel and Bank of America's letter dated August 13, 2014. All counsel shall attend. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo on 8/20/14. (Miller, S)
August 13, 2014 Filing 33 Letter from Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KAISER, SCOTT)
July 15, 2014 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ARNOLD ALDOS, BILLY ALEXANDER, ERICA ALEXANDER, ALMA AMES, SABRINA L. BARNES, CECILIA BARO, MICHELLE BECKMAN, EDWIN BOYD, BRIGITTE BROWN, EUGENE BROWN, JILL BROWNING, CHRISTOPHER CALLAHAN, LAWRENCE CAMERANO, MARCUS COLLINS, CRISTOBAL CORREA, JR, RICHARD CORRIGAN, GEORGE DASSINGER, NICHOLAS DOURA, TROY DOWNTAIN, MICHAEL EARLEY, ALLEN ECKER, EDWIN ESCAMILLA, KRISTINE EUBANKS, CLARISSE FRIAS, STEPHEN FURMAN, DANIEL GARCIA, RUBEN GUANGA, DONALD HACKETT, CAROL HARDIN, BETTY HAWTHORNE, AINSWORTH HENRY, CECIL HOSKINSON, DAVID HUBBARD, ANGELA JONES, MILLICENT JONES, UMA JOTHY, JACK KELLAM, MASELE KIBASSA, GARY LIGHTBOURNE, MONTELL LOCEY, KIMBERLY LONG, MICHAEL MAIONE, MARK MAQUIRE, JOHN MARTINS, CARLTON MCCLEASE, ANTHONY MCCULLOUGH, JESSICA MCKEEVER, ELIZABETH MCNABB, MIGUEL MERCADO, CRAIG MILLER, PRESTON MONAHAN, DELROY MORRIS, KIRK MUELLER, RICHARD MURPHY, MOHAMMAD K. NASEEM, ANNA NGUYEN, HOA NGUYEN, HOANG NGUYEN, MIGUEL OCHOA, JAMES OWUSU, MYNOR PADILLA, RACHELE PALMENTIERO, ARNETTA PAYLINGS, JODI RICHARDSON, ANTOINETTA RODRIGUES, GERONIMO RODRIGUEZ, DIANE ROWDEN, STEPHEN RYDER, MICHAEL SANDERS, CLAUD C. SCARBOROUGH, JR, GERALD SCIASCIA, MICHAEL SCRIBNER, JANE SFORZA, LAWRENCE SHOMBERT, SANFORD SKOLNIK, DOLORES SLINSKI, SHEILA SMITH, TRACY SPENCE, MICHAEL TALOR, WILLIAM TRIMBLE, MITZIE N. VAZ, ANGELETTE WHITE/GREEN, WENDY WICKS, CLIFFORD WILSON, JEFFREY WILSON, JOHN WOZNIAK, PEDRO ZUNIGA re #20 MOTION to Remand obo All Plaintiffs (LAHIFF, JEANNE)
July 8, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. in Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by BAYVIEW, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICE. (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
July 8, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE by WACHOVIA BANK, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. re #27 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Joinder in Opposition to Motion for Remand (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
July 7, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE by HSBC BANK USA, N.A., HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES re #27 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion /Joinder of Defendants HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc. in Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
July 7, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE by GREENTREE MORTGAGE, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC re #27 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion to remand this action to the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Essex County (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FALZONE, JOHN)
July 7, 2014 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BANK OF AMERICA re #20 MOTION to Remand obo All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
June 25, 2014 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion filed by ARNOLD ALDOS, BILLY ALEXANDER, ERICA ALEXANDER, ALMA AMES re #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Stephen E. Skovron, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-email chain)(LAHIFF, JEANNE)
June 18, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Stephen E. Skovron, Esq.. Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gmd, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 25 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Stephen E. Skovron, Esq. by PEDRO ZUNIGA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s #10 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint is administratively terminated pending the resolution of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #20 without prejudice to refiling in the event Plaintiffs' Motion is denied. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/11/14. (gmd, )
June 11, 2014 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC BANK USA, N.A., HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES identifying HSBC Holdings plc and HSBC North America Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
June 11, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Remand obo All Plaintiffs. Motion set for 7/21/2014 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gmd, )
June 10, 2014 Filing 22 Letter from Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Recent Similar Order)(SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
June 10, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE by PEDRO ZUNIGA re #20 MOTION to Remand obo All Plaintiffs (SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
June 10, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand obo All Plaintiffs by PEDRO ZUNIGA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
June 10, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN E. SKOVRON on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SKOVRON, STEPHEN)
June 3, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice. Motion set for 7/7/2014 before Judge Kevin McNulty. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gmd, )
June 2, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL SCHLEIFSTEIN on behalf of GREENTREE MORTGAGE, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIFSTEIN, DANIEL)
June 2, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE by GREENTREE MORTGAGE, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FALZONE, JOHN)
June 2, 2014 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREENTREE MORTGAGE, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC identifying Walter Investment Management Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FALZONE, JOHN)
June 2, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN M. FALZONE, III on behalf of GREENTREE MORTGAGE, GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FALZONE, JOHN)
May 30, 2014 Filing 14 Letter from Diane A. Bettino, Esq. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Joinder of Co-Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.)(BETTINO, DIANE)
May 30, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN C. RAKOWSKI on behalf of BAYVIEW, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICE (RAKOWSKI, KEVIN)
May 30, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI on behalf of BAYVIEW, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICE (IANNUCCI, MICHAEL)
May 30, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA N. HOWLEY on behalf of HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES, HSBC BANK USA, N.A. (HOWLEY, JOSHUA)
May 30, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Prejudice by BANK OF AMERICA. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Scott Kaiser, Esquire, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
May 19, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., WACHOVIA BANK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/30/14. (gmd, )
May 19, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/30/14. (gmd, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT HARRIS KAISER on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (KAISER, SCOTT)
May 14, 2014 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), #2 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
May 14, 2014 Filing 6 Letter from Diane A. Bettino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BETTINO, DIANE)
May 14, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
May 14, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. MELODIA on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (MELODIA, MARK)
May 14, 2014 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Bank of America, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure (Re Complaint only), #2 Certificate of Service)(BETTINO, DIANE)
May 14, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANE A. BETTINO on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (BETTINO, DIANE)
May 14, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. MELODIA on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (MELODIA, MARK)
May 9, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ld, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. from NJ SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION: ESSEX COUNTY, case number ESX-L-2429-14. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5681539), filed by BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/8/2015) (nic).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZUNIGA v. AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONDAUR CAPITAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE WEST BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDYMAC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENTREE SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: JOHN M. FALZONE, III
Represented By: DANIEL SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN FINANCIAL CORPORATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WACHOVIA BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOAN CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATEBRIGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Represented By: MARK S. MELODIA
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Represented By: KELLIE A. LAVERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOVERIGN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICE
Represented By: KEVIN C. RAKOWSKI
Represented By: MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN HOME MORTGAGE
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BARBARISI
Represented By: MARK D. MARINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI FINANCIAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEICHERT FINANCIAL
Represented By: MICHAEL TERRANCE MILLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS MORTGAGE
Represented By: DWAYNE FRANKLIN STANLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENTREE MORTGAGE
Represented By: JOHN M. FALZONE, III
Represented By: DANIEL SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSTAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETERUS MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERICREST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BB&T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIFTH THIRD BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVIEW
Represented By: KEVIN C. RAKOWSKI
Represented By: MICHAEL ANTHONY IANNUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST MARINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES
Represented By: JOSHUA N. HOWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERHOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.
Represented By: JOSHUA N. HOWLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Represented By: DIANE A. BETTINO
Represented By: MARK S. MELODIA
Represented By: SCOTT HARRIS KAISER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN
Represented By: LOLY G. TOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENLAR
Represented By: BRADLEY L. MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISABEL DASSINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTELL LOCEY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JILL BROWNING
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY WICKS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANFORD SKOLNIK
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL MERCADO
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MCCULLOUGH
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD SCIASCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRESTON MONAHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOA NGUYEN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN BOYD
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNETTA PAYLINGS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY DOWNTAIN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TAYLOR
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA NGUYEN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILIA BARO
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE ROWDEN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECIL HOSKINSON
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYNOR PADILLA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MASELE KIBASSA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTOINETTA RODRIGUES
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY WILSON
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITZIE N. VAZ
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM TRIMBLE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLARISSE FRIAS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLY ALEXANDER
Represented By: RASHEEDAH RAYAH TERRY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EUGENE BROWN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN ESCAMILLA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA JONES
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIGITTE BROWN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE BECKMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLIFFORD WILSON
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MURPHY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARNOLD ALDOS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY LONG
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SCRIBNER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN FURMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO ZUNIGA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CORRIGAN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMMAD K. NASEEM
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE SHOMBERT
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN ECKER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLTON MCCLEASE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH MCNABB
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD HACKETT
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL EARLEY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIRK MUELLER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTOBAL CORREA, JR.
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOANG NGUYEN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY SPENCE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLORES SLINSKI
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK MAGUIRE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CALLAHAN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINE EUBANKS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY LIGHTBOURNE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN GUANGA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANE SFORZA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERONIMO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA AMES
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRINA L. BARNES
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MAIONE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELETTE WHITE/GREEN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERICA ALEXANDER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL GARCIA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL HARDIN
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN RYDER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA SMITH
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILLICENT JONES
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SANDERS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMA JOTHY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELROY MORRIS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MCKEEVER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODI RICHARDSON
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS COLLINS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AINSWORTH HENRY
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG MILLER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARTINS
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE DASSINGER
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK KELLAM
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL OCHOA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES OWUSU
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID HUBBARD
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY HAWTHORNE
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS DOURA
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WOZNIAK
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHELE PALMENTIERO
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE CAMERANO
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUD C. SCARBOROUGH, JR.
Represented By: STEPHEN E. SKOVRON
Represented By: JEANNE LAHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?