LAMPON-PAZ v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: MANUEL LAMPON-PAZ
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS
Case Number: 2:2016cv09071
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: James B. Clark
Presiding Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/14/2019. (sms)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER, denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of denial of an injunction ; denying 124 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Plaintiff having been previously granted in forma pauperis status, the U.S. Marshals shall serve the Amended Complaint (DE 106) and Summons (DE 120) on the State of New Jersey; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/22/2018. (sms)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying docket entry 117 and 118 Motion for Default Judgment as to the State of New Jersey, because there is no indication that the State of New Jersey has been properly served in accordance with the Federal Rules of civil procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/18/2018. (sms)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/19/17. (sr, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMPON-PAZ v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL LAMPON-PAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?