LIQUID ALUMINUM SULFATE ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, CITY OF FERGUS FALLS, MINNESOTA, INTERSTATE CHEMICAL CO., INC., BEAVER WATER DISTRICT, HOPE WATER AND LIGHT COMMISSION, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, City of Shreveport, BAY COUNTY FLORIDA, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, County Of Henrico, DETROIT WATER AND SEWERAGE DEPARTMENT, Jefferson County, Alabama, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, EAST VALLEY WATER DISTRICT, Lake Restoration, Inc., ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH AND DESIGN, INC., METROPOLITAN COUNCIL, City of Norfolk, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA, SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., City of Richmond, AMERICAN EAGLE PAPER MILLS, INC., South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, TEEMARK CORPORATION, CITY OF SILOAM SPRINGS, ARKANSAS, AMREX CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC., Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, CLARKSVILLE LIGHT & WATER CO., CITY OF ALEXANDRIA, THE BRICK TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL UTILITIES AUTHORITY, CITY OF COLUMBIA, SOUTH CAROLINA, South Carolina Public Service Authority, CITY OF TACOMA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF EAST MOLINE, City of Newport News, City of Milwaukee, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, BOROUGH OF PHOENIXVILLE, CITY OF MINNEAPOLIS, MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY, CITY OF NEWARK, Phoenix, City of, KEY LARGO WASTEWATER TREATMENT DISTRICT, City of Scottsdale, CHESTER WATER AUTHORITY, CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC, SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, INDIANA, CITY OF ST. CLOUD, MINNESOTA, County of Chesterfield, HACKETTSTOWN MUNICIPAL UTILITIES AUTHORITY, City of Rochester, Minnesota, CITY OF MATTOON, OAKLAND COUNTY, MICHIGAN, SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC., CITY OF FRESNO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA, City of Stockton, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF GRAND MARAIS, CITY OF SPOKANE, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, THE CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS, AQUA PENNSYLVANIA, INC., BOARD OF WATER COMMISIONERS OF THE CITY OF SAINT PAUL, MINNESOTA, HAZELTON CITY AUTHORITY, SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC., CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, City of Winston-Salem, City of Moulton, Alabama, Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF WINTER PARK, SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, STATE OF FLORIDA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF LEGAL AFFAIRS, SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., CITY OF DULUTH, MINNESOTA, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, TOWN OF TONAWANDA, NEW YORK, SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC., CITY OF AKRON, City of Springfield, THE CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, CITY OF SPRINGDALE, ARKANSAS, AQUA OHIO, INC., CITY OF LORAIN, City of Mesa, CITY OF PHENIX CITY, Water, Light, Power and Building Commission of the City of East Grand Forks, Minnesota, Fairfax County Water Authority, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, City of Everett, The City of Greenville, LITTLE RIVER COUNTY R.D.A. WATER SYSTEM, THE CITY OF CINCINNATI, OTTAWA COUNTY, OHIO, City of Spartanburg, City of Lynchburg, THE CITY OF CHARLOTTE, SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY and CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO
Defendant: VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., Delta Chemical Corporation, AMITA GUPTA, FRANK A REICHL, MATTHEW LEBARON, BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, SCOTT WOLFF, GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., RGM Chemical, LLC, THATCHER GROUP, INC., Kenneth A. Ghazey, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, BRIAN C. STEPPIG, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, ALEX AVRAAMIDES, AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, C&S CHEMICALS, INC, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC., GENTEK, INC. and RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD
Intervenor: US Department of Justice and Lawrence McShane
Special Master: DENNIS M. CAVANAUGH and JUDGE FAITH S. HOCHBERG
In Re: LIQUID ALUMINUM SULFATE ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 2:2016md02687
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 1357 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Southern Ionics Incorporated only, by CITY OF AKRON. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1355 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DERITIS, FRED)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 STIPULATION AND ORDER that among the IPPs, USALCO, LLC, American Securities LLC, C&S Chemicals, Inc., and the Direct Action Plaintiffs listed below(the "Ballard DAPs")', by and through their undersigned counsel, that, if and to the extent any of the Ballard DAPs is a member of the Indirect Purchaser Settlement Class in connection with the IPP/USALCO Settlement, the IPP/American Securities Settlement, and/or the IPP/C&S Settlement, each such Ballard DAP shall be excluded therefrom. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/29/2019. (ld, )
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 ORDER that the Direct Action Plaintiffs, and each defendant set of affiliated defendants who have not settled with the Direct Action Plaintiffs, shall submit ex parte letters to the Court by September 6, 2019 regarding the status of their settlement discussions and whether they request a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Falk, Hammer, or Wettre. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on September 12, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. to address the parties' ex parte letters and discuss scheduling. The Direct Action Plaintiffs represented by Ballard Spahr LLP shall initiate the call.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/29/2019. (ld, )
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS; Unless otherwise defined herein, all terms that are capitalized herein shall have the meanings ascribed to those terms in the Settlement Agreements. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action (and all actions and proceedings consolidated in the Action), and over Indirect Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, the Indirect Purchaser Settlement Class, and Defendants USALCO, American Securities, and C&S. The Court sets the following schedule for further proceedings, which shall relate to these USALCO, American Securities, C&S settlements and shall also relate to the IPPs' settlements with the Chemtrade, Kemira, and Southern Ionics Defendants for which U.S. District Court Judge Jose L. Linares previously granted preliminary approval but for which Judge Linares did not enter a schedule (see ECF No. 1294):etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/26/2019. (ld, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 1351 Letter from Jason A. Leckerman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(DERITIS, FRED)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1350 STIPULATION by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (DERITIS, FRED)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: telephone status conference held on 7/23/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Charles McGuire.) (aa, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 1349 Letter from Abigail G. Corbett re #1316 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CORBETT, ABIGAIL)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1348 Letter from Delta Chemical in Response to Letter from Direct Action Plaintiffs. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to General Chemical Corporation: General Chemical Performance Products, LLC; General Chemical LLC; GenTek Inc.; Chemtrade Logistics Income Fund; Chemtrade Chemicals Corporation; Chemtrade Logistics Inc.; Chemtrade Chemicals US LLC; Chemtrade Solutions, LLC; Chemtrade Holding Partnership; Frank A. Reichl; Vincent J. Opalewski; Alex Avraamides; and Amita Gupta only.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/19/2019. (ld, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Southern Ionics Incorporation only re Docket No. #1343 , pursuant to Rule 41(a)(I)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/19/2019. (ld, ).
July 18, 2019 Filing 1345 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. Amendment to #1344 Stipulation of Dismissal,, . (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1344 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to General Chemical Corporation; General Chemical Performance Products, LLC; General Chemical LLC; GenTek Inc.; Chemtrade Logistics Income Fund; Chemtrade Chemicals Corporation; Chemtrade Logistics Inc.; Chemtrade Chemicals US LLC; Chemtrade Solutions, LLC and Chemtrade Holding Partnership by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1343 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Southern Ionics Incorporation only by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to USALCO, LLC only. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/9/2019. (ld, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 MDL TEXT ORDER, scheduling a telephone status conference for 7/23/2019 at 12:30 PM before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. The Direct Action plaintiffs shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/11/19. (aa, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1340 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority re #1296 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by the South Carolina Direct Action Plaintiffs in Maryland (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(LECKERMAN, JASON)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 10, 2019 Filing 1339 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority re #1295 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by the South Carolina Direct Action Plaintiffs in Maryland (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 - to Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, Esq.)(DERITIS, FRED)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Delta Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Amend Briefing Schedule; The time for South Carolina Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to USALCO's Motion to Dismiss extended by an additional two (2) days. South Carolina Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Wednesday. July 10. 2019. USALCO shall file a Reply to the South Carolina Plaintiffs' Opposition by Friday, August 9, 2019.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/8/2019. (ld, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to USALCO, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and to Amend Briefing Schedule; The time for South Carolina Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to USALCO's Motionto Dismiss extended by an additional two (2) days. South Carolina Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Wednesday. July 10. 2019. USALCO shall file a Reply to the South Carolina Plaintiffs Opposition by Friday, August 9, 2019.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/8/2019. (ld, )
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 STIPULATION and Order Further Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Delta Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Amend Briefing Schedule by City of Spartanburg, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority. (DERITIS, FRED)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 STIPULATION and Order Further Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to USALCO, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and to Amend Briefing Schedule by City of Spartanburg, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority. (DERITIS, FRED)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1334 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to USALCO, LLC only by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1333 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney MATTHEW J. PEREZ terminated. (HIMES, JAY)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1332 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney KARIN E. GARVEY terminated. (HIMES, JAY)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1331 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney GREGORY S. ASCIOLLA terminated. (HIMES, JAY)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1330 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JAY L. HIMES terminated. (HIMES, JAY)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 ORDER granting #1324 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JAMES M. LOCKHART terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/1/2019. (ld, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Southern Ionics Incorporated and Milton Sundbeck with prejudice. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/28/2019. (ld, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1327 Exhibit to #1326 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, City of Shreveport, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 1, 2019 Filing 1326 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Settlement with C&S Chemicals by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, City of Shreveport, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Brief (Settlement Agreement), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order (Long Form Notice), #5 Exhibit 2 to Proposed Order (Claim Form), #6 Exhibit 3 to Proposed Order (Short Form Notice))(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1325 NOTICE by CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA Notice of Change of Firm Name (SHIMON, ROY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1324 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James M. Lockhart by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (LOCKHART, JAMES)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 1320 as to Kemira Chemicals, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/27/2019. (ld, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 1319 Kemira Chemicals, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/27/2019. (ld, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 ORDER WITHDRAWING HUGH SANDLER AS COUNSEL FOR THE DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/25/2019. (ld, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1320 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Kemira Chemicals, Inc. only by CITY OF AKRON. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1319 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Kemira Chemicals, Inc. only by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 ORDER that the Direct Action Plaintiffs listed below are deemed to have opted out of the proposed Direct Purchaser Plaintiff ("DPP") settlement class in connection with the settlements entered into: (1) between the DPPsand USALCO, LLC, which was preliminarily approved by Order of the Court dated April 24, 2019 (ECF 1292), (2) between the DPPs and Southern Ionics, Incorporated, which was preliminarily approved by Order of the Court dated April 24, 2019 (ECF 1282), and (3) between the DPPs and American Securities LLC, which was preliminarily approved by Order of the Court dated May 13, 2019 (ECF 1293).. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/21/2019. (ld, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1317 DECLARATION of Jay Shapiro and Marvin A. Miller re #1316 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements with USALCO, LLC, American Securities LLC, and C&S Chemicals, Inc., Approval of Proposed Notices of Settlement and Notice Plan, and Appointment of Settlement Administrator by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MILLER, MARVIN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1316 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion)(MILLER, MARVIN)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1315 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Southern Ionics Incorporated and Milton Sundbeck by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (DERITIS, FRED)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1314 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #1235 Order from Special Master. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR APPROVAL OF USALCO, SII AND AMERICAN SECURITIES SETTLEMENTS WITH DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS; that The Court sets the following deadlines in advance of the Fairness Hearing, etc.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/7/2019. (ld, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING SOUTH CAROLINA PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO DELTA DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE; The time for South Carolina Plaintiffs to file their Opposition to Delta Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended by thirty (30) days. South Carolina Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss by Monday, July 8, 2019. Delta Defendants shall file any Reply to South Carolina Plaintiffs' Opposition by Wednesday, August 7, 2019.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/10/2019. (ld, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 STIPULATION AND ORDER that among the IPPs and the Direct Action Plaintiffs listed below (the "Ballard DAPs"), by and through their undersigned counsel, that, if and to the extent any of the Ballard DAPs is a member of the Indirect Purchaser Settlement Class in connection with the IPP/Chemtrade Settlement, the IPP/Southern Ionics Settlement, and/or the IPP/Kemira Settlement, each such Ballard DAP shall be excluded therefrom. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/10/2019. (ld, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BALLARD SPAHR PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE; that the South Carolina Plaintiffs' deadline to Oppose USALCO, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Maryland Complaint is extended by 30 days to July 8, 2019; that USALCO, LLC's reply will bc due on August 7, 2019.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/10/2019. (ld, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 1309 NOTICE by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, The City of Greenville, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #1308 Letter from Jay N. Fastow (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1308 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 MDL TEXT ORDER, by or before 6/14/19 each party is to deliver to the Court a letter via mail or fax not to exceed 5 pages, summarizing the relevant facts, the respective legal positions, status of the case, and the client's position on settlement and whether a status/settlement conference is presently needed. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 6/6/19. (aa, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1306 STIPULATION by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (DERITIS, FRED)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 STIPULATION and Order Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to USALCO, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and to Set Briefing Schedule by City of Spartanburg, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority. (DERITIS, FRED)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 STIPULATION and Order Modifying South Carolina Plaintiffs' Time to Respond to Delta Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Set Briefing Schedule by City of Spartanburg, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority. (LECKERMAN, JASON)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 ORDER granting #1302 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ROBERT FERRI terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/4/2019. (ld, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1302 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert Ferri by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., Milton Sundbeck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CURTIN, KELLY)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 ORDER granting #1300 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ELIZABETH ANNE FEGAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/3/2019. (ld, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 1300 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan by CITY OF COLUMBIA, SOUTH CAROLINA, CITY OF NEWARK. (FEGAN, ELIZABETH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1299 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK NEWELL on behalf of Lawrence McShane (NEWELL, FRANK)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1298 Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Order Regarding Schedule For Approval of Settlements re #1282 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #1293 Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1297 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against GCC and Proposed Order by STATE OF FLORIDA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF LEGAL AFFAIRS. (FRASER, COLIN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1296 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by the South Carolina Direct Action Plaintiffs in Maryland by Delta Chemical Corporation. Responses due by 6/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1295 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by the South Carolina Direct Action Plaintiffs in Maryland by USALCO, LLC.. Responses due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit 1 to Memo of Law, #4 Exhibit 2 to Memo of Law)(RYAN, WILLIAM)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS; For purposes of effectuating the Settlements only, the Court certifies the following Indirect Purchaser Settlement Class pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(a) and (b)(3); All persons or entities in Alabama, Arkansas, Arizona, California, Colorado, District of Columbia, Florida, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Kansas, Maine, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Mississippi, Nebraska, Nevada, New Hampshire, New Mexico, New York, North Carolina, North Dakota, Oregon, Puerto Rico, Rhode Island, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, Vermont, West Virginia, and Wisconsin, who indirectly purchased liquid aluminum sulfate, not for resale, which was manufactured, produced or supplied by Defendants or their unnamed coconspirators from January 1, 1997 through February 28, 2011.; The Court approves the appointment of A.B. Data. Ltd. as the Settlement Administrator for the Settlements, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/13/2019. (ld, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINITFFS AND AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE OF THE SETTLEMENT, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT; The Court approves the appointment of Angeion Group, LLC as Settlement Administrator for the American Securities Settlement. Within thirty (30) days of the Execution Date, American Securities shall supply to Interim DPP Lead Counsel, at American Securities' expense and in such form as kept in the regular course of business (electronic format if available), the names and addresses of Direct Purchasers that purchased Alum during the Settlement Class Period, or confirm that they have provided suchinformation previously;etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/13/2019. (ld, )
May 12, 2019 Filing 1292 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Greenville by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
May 12, 2019 Filing 1291 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Charleston Plaintiffs by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
May 12, 2019 Filing 1290 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Spartanburg Plaintiffs by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1289 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint filed by THE COMMISSION OF PUBLIC WORKS OF THE CITY OF GREENVILLE, SC by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1288 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint filed by COMMISSIONERS OF PUBLIC WORKS OF THE CITY OF CHARLESTON AND GRAND STRAND WATER & SEWER AUTHORITY by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1287 ANSWER to Complaint filed by COMMISSION OF PUBLIC WORKS OF THE CITY OF SPARTANBURG, CITY OF WINSTON-SALEM AND THE SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC SERVICE AUTHORITY by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1286 ANSWER to Complaint filed by THE COMMISSION OF PUBLIC WORKS OF THE CITY OF GREENVILLE, SC by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 ORDER that the deadlines for providing notice of the Proposed Settlements are suspended until the Court sets a date for the final approval hearing for the Proposed Settlements; that the Court will issue a further order setting forth a schedule or schedules for deadlines for providing notice to the proposed classes for the Proposed Settlements and for deadlines relating to the approval process for those proposed settlements.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/1/2019. (ld, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 1284 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Greenville by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC..(MURPHY, DAVID)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1283 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC..(MURPHY, DAVID)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ORDER granting #1273 Motion Preliminary Approval of Settlement re #1250 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINITFFS AND USALCO, LLC AND SOUTHERN IONICS, INCORPORATED, AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE OF THE SETTLEMENTS, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENTS. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/24/2019. (ld, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 ORDER granting #1247 Motion Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, Award of Case Participation Awards. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 4/22/2019. (ld, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINTS; that USALCO, Delta, and Besson shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints by May 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/22/2019. (ld, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 1279 NOTICE of Appearance by FRED GAETANO DERITIS on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (DERITIS, FRED)
April 20, 2019 Filing 1278 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hugh Sandler by BAY COUNTY FLORIDA, CITY OF WINTER PARK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(NUSSBAUM, LINDA)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1277 DECLARATION re #1276 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements Joint Declaration of Jay B. Shapiro and Marvin A. Miller in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlements with the Chemtrade Defendants, the Southern Ionics Defendants, and Kemira, Approval of Proposed Notices of Settlement and Notice Plan, and Appointment of Settlement Administrator by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(MILLER, MARVIN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1276 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion)(MILLER, MARVIN)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1275 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by USALCO, LLC.. (RYAN, WILLIAM)
April 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Fred DeRitis, Esq., receipt number TRE101684 (mps)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1274 Exhibit to #1273 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
April 18, 2019 Filing 1273 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Settlement re #1250 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1272 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares: Miscellaneous/Fairness Hearing held on 4/17/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 MDL TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Lawrence McShane's motion to set a briefing schedule. (ECF No. 1267). Mr. McShane's motion is hereby terminated, as it is unnecessary. The Court's motion calendar can be found online at this link: Https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/2019motioncalendar.pdf. For other information regarding the filing and timing of motions, the Court directs Mr. McShane to Local Civil Rule 7.1.. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 04/17/2019. (lr, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 1269 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding McShane Motion For Motion Schedule re #1268 Notice (Other), #1267 MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule . (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1268 NOTICE by Lawrence McShane (SAVITS, GLEN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1267 MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Lawrence McShane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(SAVITS, GLEN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1266 DECLARATION of Andy Morrison re #1264 Reply to Response to Motion,,,, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1265 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC. re #1257 MOTION to Intervene (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1264 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC. re #1247 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, Award of Case Participation Awards re #1205 Order,,,, #1179 Order on Motion for Settlement, (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Andy Morrison, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1263 Letter from Frank Newell, Counsel for Lawrence McShane. (SAVITS, GLEN)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1262 Letter from Justin W. Lamson to Special Master Hochberg re #1259 Letter. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1261 RESPONSE re #1256 Notice (Other). (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1260 Letter from Frank Newell, Counsel for Objector Lawrence McShane re #1256 Notice (Other). (SAVITS, GLEN)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1259 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1258 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, The City of Greenville, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #1213 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Shreveport, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1257 MOTION to Intervene by Lawrence McShane. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Service)(SAVITS, GLEN)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1256 NOTICE by Lawrence McShane Intention to Appear (Attachments: #1 Objection of Lawrence McShane to Proposed Settlement, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(SAVITS, GLEN)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1254 NOTICE of Appearance by DENISE L. PLUNKETT on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (PLUNKETT, DENISE)
March 28, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 150.00 received as to Denise L. Plunkett, receipt number TRE101034. (km)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' APPEAL OF SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 12; that Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file their Reply on or beyond Thursday, April 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/26/2019. (ld, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1252 Letter from Charles O. Monk II to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3/12/19 Hearing Rough Trasncript Excerpts)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1251 Exhibit to #1250 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Confidential Side Agreements Regarding Termination of Proposed Settlements by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, City of Shreveport, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 25, 2019 Filing 1250 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlements by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, City of Shreveport, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1249 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. LOCKHART on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (LOCKHART, JAMES)
March 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to James M. Lockhart. Receipt number TRE100936 (in-jdb, )
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPEAL OF SPECIAL MASTER ORDER NO. 12 by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, The City of Greenville, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1247 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, Award of Case Participation Awards re #1205 Order,,,, #1179 Order on Motion for Settlement, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, City of Shreveport, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC., THE CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, THE CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #3 Declaration of Andy Morrision, #4 Declaration of Arthur Bailey, #5 Declaration of Barbary Hart, #6 Declaration of Bruce Greenberg, #7 Declaration of Eric Fastiff, #8 Declaration of Erin Burns, #9 Declaration of Garrett Blanchflield, #10 Declaration of Howard Sedran, #11 Declaration of Janet Evens, #12 Declaration of Jason Zweig, #13 Declaration of Jeffrey Corrigan, #14 Declaration of Jennifer Scullion, #15 Declaration of John Emerson, #16 Declaration of Jon Exelrod, #17 Declaration of Joseph Meltzer, #18 Declaration of Linda Nussbaum, #19 Declaration of Lisa Rodriguez, #20 Declaration of Lynn Lincoln Sarko, #21 Declaration of M. Stephen Dampier, #22 Declaration of Manuel John Dominguez, #23 Declaration of Mark Dearman, #24 Declaration of Matt Keil, #25 Declaration of Michael Critchley, #26 Declaration of Michael Plachy, #27 Declaration of Mike Roberts, #28 Declaration of Robert Kitchenoff, #29 Declaration of Ruthanne Gordon, #30 Declaration of Sami Rashid, #31 Declaration of Sanford Dumain, #32 Declaration of Scott Gail, #33 Declaration of Thomas Theado, #34 Declaration of Vincent Esades, #35 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner, #36 Declaration of Whitney Street)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRENNTAG DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINTS; that Brenntag Defendants shall file their answers to the Complaints by April 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/22/2019. (ld, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1245 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Brenntag Defendants' Time to Answer Charleston Plaintiffs and Greenville Complaints by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC.. (MURPHY, DAVID)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1243 NOTICE of Appearance by ROY SHIMON on behalf of CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974) (SHIMON, ROY)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1241 BRIEF in Opposition (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 ORDER granting #1238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney TERRIANNE BENEDETTO terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/18/2019. (ld, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 1239 BRIEF in Opposition filed by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., USALCO, LLC. re #1213 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Shreveport, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of (CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
March 15, 2019 Filing 1238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney TerriAnne Benedetto by SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
March 15, 2019 Filing 1237 Letter from Edward D. Rogers to Special Master Hochberg re #1236 Letter. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
March 15, 2019 Filing 1236 Letter from Charles O Monk II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(GAMBLE, GEOFFREY)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 ORDER denying #1100 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #1116 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #1117 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #1143 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; denying #1143 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #1144 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #1145 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #1146 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/11/2019. (ld, )
March 11, 2019 Filing 1233 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/11/2019. (ld, )
March 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW038847 (ld, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 1231 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 8, 2019 Filing 1230 Letter from Justin Lamson to Special Master Hochberg. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 ORDER granting #1228 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ALEXANDER PETER KOMMATAS terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/7/2019. (ld, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 1229 Letter from Justin W. Lamson to Special Master Hochberg. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1228 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander P. Kommatas by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, The City of Greenville, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (KOMMATAS, ALEXANDER)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1227 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Discovery Scheduling Issues re #1226 Letter, #1212 Letter,, #1225 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1226 Letter from Abigail Corbett to Special Master Hochberg. (CORBETT, ABIGAIL)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1225 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #1222 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1224 RESPONSE to Motion filed by USALCO, LLC. re #1220 Emergency MOTION to Compel Askew Deposition (RYAN, WILLIAM)
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW038904 for ROY SHIMON, ESQ. (ld, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 1223 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1222 Letter from Justin W. Lamson to Special Master Hochberg. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1221 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #1218 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 28, 2019 Filing 1220 Emergency MOTION to Compel Askew Deposition by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(CORBETT, ABIGAIL)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' recent filings. (ECF Nos. 1212, 1214, 1215, and 1216). The parties shall direct the discovery/case management issues described therein to the Special Master. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/28/19. (jbb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1218 Letter from Justin W. Lamson to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1217 NOTICE of Appearance by KAYLEIGH TOTH KEILTY on behalf of Delta Chemical Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KEILTY, KAYLEIGH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1216 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #1212 Letter,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1215 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1214 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to SPECIAL MASTER HOCHBERG re #1212 Letter,,. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1213 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Shreveport, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, The City of Greenville, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #1206 Order from Special Master (Attachments: #1 Brief)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1212 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 13, 2019 Filing 1210 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #1202 Letter. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1209 REDACTION Letter re Motion to Seal (ECF No. 1177) per Court Order (ECF No. 1196) by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1133, #2 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1133-2)(NICHOLS, AARON)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER that the Direct Action Plaintiffs listed below are deemed to have opted out of the proposed Direct Purchaser Plaintiff ("DPP") settlement class in connection with the settlements entered into between the DPPs and Chemtrade Logistics Income Fund, General Chemical Corporation, General Chemical LLC, General Chemical Performance Products, LLC, Chemtrade Chemicals Corporation, Chemtrade Chemicals US LLC, Chemtrade Solutions, LLC, Matthew LeBaron, Scott Wolff, Alex Avraamides, Frank Reichl, Amita Gupta, and Vincent Opalewski, and between the DPPs and Kemira Chemicals, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/11/2019. (ld, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1208 NOTICE of Appearance by LOHR A. BECK-KEMP on behalf of KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC. (BECK-KEMP, LOHR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1207 NOTICE of Appearance by MELANIE C. PAPADOPOULOS on behalf of KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC. (PAPADOPOULOS, MELANIE)
February 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINITFFS AND CHEMIRADE, AUTHORIZING DISSEMINATION OF NOTICE OF THE SETTLEMENT, AND SCHEDULING A HEARING FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT; Within thirty (30) days of the Execution Date, Chemtrade shall supply to Interim DPP Lead Counsel at Chemtrade's expense and in such form as kept in the regular course of business (electronic format if available) the names and addresses of Direct Purchasers that purchased Alum during the Settlement Class Period. or confirm that it has provided such information previously. A hearing on final approval of the Settlement ("Fairness Hearing") shall be held before this Court on April 17, 2019, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5D assigned to the Honorable Jose L. Linares. U.S.D.J., at the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, Martin Luther King, Jr. Building & U.S. Courthouse, 50 Walnut Street. Newark. N.J07101. At the Fairness Hearing, the Court will, among other things, consider; etc.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/6/2019. (ld, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 1204 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to SPECIAL MASTER HOCHBERG re #1202 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number NEW038637 for MELANIE C. PAPADOPOULOS, ESQ., and LOHR A. BECK-KEMP, ESQ. (ld, )
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 ORDER granting #1199 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney PATRICIA LYNN JANNACO terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/29/2019. (ld, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 1202 Letter from Jay Shapiro to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1201 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to SPECIAL MASTER HOCHBERG re #1191 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1200 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1199 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(JANNACO, PATRICIA)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1198 REDACTION Ltr re Sealing Order (ECF No. 1181) by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1147, #2 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1148, #3 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1147-3, #4 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1147-4, #5 Exhibit Redacted ECF No. 1147-5)(NICHOLS, AARON)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1197 NOTICE of Change of Address by JEFFREY J. CORRIGAN (CORRIGAN, JEFFREY)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER granting #1177 Motion to Seal; that the Court shall maintain the unredacted versions of the filings in question, (ECF No. 1133 and all attachments thereto), under seal; that On or before February 12, 2019, USALCO shall publicly file redacted versions of those documents in which only the confidential information contained therein (as set forth in USALCO's "Index of Confidential Materials To Be Sealed" - ECF No. 1177-3) has been redacted, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/24/2019. (ld, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 1195 NOTICE by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD re #1191 Letter of C&S' Withdrawal from Motion for Protective Order as to Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (DALBEY, JOHN)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1194 Exhibit to #1193 Letter by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (SZOT, ANDREW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 24, 2019 Filing 1193 Letter from Andrew Szot to Special Master Hochberg re #1191 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(SZOT, ANDREW)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1192 Letter from Lindsey H. Taylor Enclosing Corrected Exhibits To Proposed Preliminary Approval Order re #1189 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Settlement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 1, #2 Redline Corrected Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 2, #4 Redline Corrected Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Corrected Ex. 3, #6 Redline Corrected Ex. 3)(TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1191 Letter from R. Epstein to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1190 Exhibit to #1189 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Confidential Side Agreement Regarding Termination of Proposed Settlement by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 14, 2019 Filing 1189 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Settlement by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A (settlement agreement), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Long Form Notice), #5 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Claim Form), #6 Exhibit 3 (Porposed Short Form Notice))(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1188 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against GEO Specialty by ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against GEO with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/11/2019. (ld, )
January 10, 2019 Filing 1186 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against GEO and Proposed Order by STATE OF FLORIDA, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, DEPARTMENT OF LEGAL AFFAIRS. (FRASER, COLIN)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Geo Specialty Chemicals Inc., Kenneth A. Ghazey, and Brian C. Steppig only. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/8/2019. (ld, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 1183 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against Geo Specialty Chemicals Inc., Kenneth A. Ghazey, and Brian C. Steppig and Proposed Order by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER GRANTING CKONSOLIDATED MOTION TO SEAL; that the Clerk of the Court shall maintain the following docket entry permanently under seal: ECF 1151: Special Master Order No. 11: Reagarding Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Application to Compel Production of Steppig Documents. The Clerk of the Court shall publicly file the parties' proposed redacted version of Special Master No. 11, (ECF NO. 1176-7), under a separate docket entry titled "Special Master Order No. 11 (Redacted).". Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/7/2018. (ld, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 ORDER granting #1165 Motion to Seal; that the Clerk shall maintain the unredacted versions of the filings in question, (ECF Nos. 1147 and 1148 and all attachments, under seal; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/7/2019. (ld, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1184 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/14/2018, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis Lewis (732-735-4522). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 1/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2019. (mfr)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 MDL ORDER amending #1171 Order to include a Case Contribution Award in $15,000 to the City of Shreveport, Louisiana, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/20/2018. (sm)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 ORDER granting Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement between direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs and Kemira, authorizing dissemination of notice of the settlement and scheduling a hearing for final approval of the proposed settlement #1161 , etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/20/2018. (sm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1178 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Case Contribution Award for Shreveport, Louisiana re #1171 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1177 MOTION to Seal by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Casagrande Aff., #3 Exhibit 2 - Index of Confidential Material, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Redactions - 1133, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Redactions - 1133-2, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(RYAN, WILLIAM)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1176 MOTION to Seal by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief in Support of the Consolidated Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1175 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #1133 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenvi (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #1133 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenvi (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER granting #1077 Motion Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses re #985 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, ) (Main Document 1173 replaced on 12/4/2018) (ld).
December 3, 2018 Filing 1172 JUDGMENT APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS AND GEO SETTLING PARTIES. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES AND PAYMENT OF CASE CONTRIBUTION AWARDS. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION Of THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND FOR THE GEO DIRECT PURCHASER SETTLEMENT; that the Court has jurisdiction to enter this Order and over the subject matter of the Action, as well as personal jurisdiction over all of; etc.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER denying #1091 Motion to Intervene; that Mr. McShane's objection to the settlements of the GEO Settling Parties with the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and with the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs is DENIED.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice re #931 MOTION to Set Aside Portion of Settlement Funds; that DPPs may renew their motion for entry of a set-aside at a later date.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/3/2018. (ld, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 1167 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN J. BARLIEB on behalf of CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES (BARLIEB, ETHAN)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 TEXT ORDER - By letter dated 11/7/18, counsel advised that the relevant parties agreed that certain submissions, previously filed under temporary seal, may be unsealed. (ECF No. 1141). In the interim, no party has suggested otherwise. The Clerk of the Court shall therefore unseal docket entries 1118 and 1120.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/28/18. (nm, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 1165 MOTION to Seal by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Aaron L. Casagrande, #4 Exhibit 1 (Index), #5 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Redacted Brief), #6 Exhibit 3 (Proposed Redacted Brief))(RYAN, WILLIAM)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Plaintiff shall file their reply on or before Wednesday, 12/5/2018, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/26/2018. (JB, )
November 23, 2018 Filing 1163 STIPULATION re #1133 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenvi by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Spartanburg, City of Springfield, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, The City of Greenville. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1162 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #1161 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Kemira Chemicals, Inc.. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 20, 2018 Filing 1161 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Kemira Chemicals, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1160 BRIEF of Southern Ionics Incorporated, Milton Sundbeck, Kemira Chemicals, Inc., USALCO LLC, C&S Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals (of Georgia), Inc., RGM Chemical, LLC, and RGM of Georgia, Ltd., and Delta Chemical Corporation In Opposition To Moving Plaintiffs' Appeal Of Special Master Order No. 9 Regarding Moving Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion To Compel Production For 2014-2016 Timeframe (MAIRO, JOHN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1159 BRIEF of the GCC Defendants in Opposition to the Direct Action Plaintiffs' Appeal [D.E. 1133] of Special Master Order No. 9 [D.E. 1102] (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
November 14, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Frank Newell, Esq., $ 150, receipt number NEW037937 (JB, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 MDL ORDER, counsel shall meet confer regarding the content of "Special Master Order No. 11" and on or before 12/14/2018 shall file either (1) a joint letter indicating that all concerned parties consent to unsealing the Order or (2) a motion to maintain that Order under seal that complies with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 5.3 any such motion must include a proposed redacted version of the Order as an exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/14/2018. (JB, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 1157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares: Miscellaneous (Fairness) Hearing held on 11/14/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 1156 REDACTION to D.E. 1001, Pursuant to Court Order (D.E. 1130) by USALCO, LLC.. (NICHOLS, AARON)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1155 REDACTION to #1000 Letter,,, Pursuant to Court's Order (D.E. 1130) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1154 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. OLSON on behalf of CHESTER WATER AUTHORITY, HAZELTON CITY AUTHORITY (OLSON, WILLIAM)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1153 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN D. SAVITS on behalf of Lawrence McShane (SAVITS, GLEN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1152 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Delta Chemical Corporation re #1144 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, #1145 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC for lack of personal jursidiction and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, #1146 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, and the South Carolina Public Service Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and for failure to state a claim upon which reli (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 9, 2018 Filing 1150 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1149 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by USALCO, LLC. re #1143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the South Carolina Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement of Facts (NICHOLS, AARON)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1148 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority re #1144 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, #1145 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC for lack of personal jursidiction and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, #1146 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, and the South Carolina Public Service Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and for failure to state a claim upon which reli (KOMMATAS, ALEXANDER)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 9, 2018 Filing 1147 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, South Carolina Public Service Authority re #1143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the South Carolina Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) MOTION for More Definite Statement of Facts (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kommatas Decl. In Support Of MTD Opp., #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 To Kommatas Decl. In Support Of MTD Opp., #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 To Kommatas Decl. In Support Of MTD Opp., #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 To Kommatas Decl. In Support Of MTD Opp., #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 To Kommatas Decl. In Support Of MTD Opp.)(KOMMATAS, ALEXANDER)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 9, 2018 Filing 1146 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem, and the South Carolina Public Service Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Charleston Amended Complaint and Spartanburg and Greenville Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1145 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC for lack of personal jursidiction and for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Charleston Amended Complaint and Spartanburg and Greenville Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1144 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority for lack of personal jurisdicition and failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Charleston Amended Complaint and Spartanburg and Greenville Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the South Carolina Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2), MOTION for More Definite Statement of Facts by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G)(NICHOLS, AARON)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1142 Certification on behalf of Lawrence McShane. (SAVITS, GLEN)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1141 Letter from Thomas J. Gallagher. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1140 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of IPP Settlement With GEO Settling Parties by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Marvin A. Miller and Jay B. Shapiro, #3 Declaration of Eric J. Miller, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1139 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC. re #1077 MOTION Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses re #985 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Charles E. Ferrara, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment Approving Settlement, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding Approval of Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses and Payment of Case Contribution Awards, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Plan of Distribution)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 6, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of William J. Olson $ 150, receipt number NEW037891 (JB, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 1138 Letter from Counsel for Lawrence McShane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corrected Reply Brief)(SAVITS, GLEN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1137 BRIEF Reply Brief to Direct and Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs in Support of Objection and Motion to Intervene of Lawrence McShane to Proposed Settlements Between Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs and the GEO Settling Parties and Between the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the GEO Settling Parties (D.E.s 1111 and 1125) (SAVITS, GLEN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1136 BRIEF Reply Brief to Virginia Direct Action Plaintiffs in Support of Objection and Motion to Intervene of Lawrence McShane to Proposed Settlements Between Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs and the GEO Settling Parties and Between the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the GEO Settling Parties (D.E. 1128) (SAVITS, GLEN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1135 NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN D. SAVITS on behalf of Lawrence McShane (SAVITS, GLEN)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 STIPULATION AND DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/2018. (JB, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1133 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Appomattox River Water Authority, CITY OF AKRON, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, City of Spartanburg, City of Winston-Salem re #1102 Order from Special Master (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Kommatas, #2 Exhibit 1)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 MDL ORDER Granting #1127 Letter from Mike Kanovitz, Esq. and Glen D. Savits, Esq. to The Honorable Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. Mr. McShane shall file his Reply on or before Monday 11/5/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/30/2018. (JB, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 ORDER Granting #1067 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Memo of Law in Opposition to DPPs Motion for Set-Aside [ECF 1034] by USALCO, LLC. DKT Nos. 1034-4,5 shall maintain permanently under seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/2018. (JB, )
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER Granting #1048 MOTION to Seal Confidential Materials by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., USALCO, LLC. that DKT Nos. 966,3,5,6,7,20,21 and 1000 and 1000-6, 1001 shall maintain permanently under seal., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/30/2018. (JB, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 1129 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority re #1091 MOTION to Intervene and Object (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1128 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority re #1091 MOTION to Intervene and Object (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1127 Letter from Mike Kanovitz, Esq. and Glen D. Savits, Esq. to The Honorable Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. (SAVITS, GLEN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1126 Letter from Mike Kanovitz, Esq. and Glen D. Savits, Esq. to The Honorable Jose L. Linares, U.S.D.J. (SAVITS, GLEN)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1125 RESPONSE to Motion filed by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA re #1091 MOTION to Intervene Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion of Lawrence McShane to Intervene and Object (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MILLER, MARVIN)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 ORDER, that Delta Defendants' motions to dismiss Plaintiffs Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore's Amended Complaints are hereby Administratively terminated #899 Motion to Dismiss ; terminating #900 Motion to Dismiss are this motions were denied by the Court's August 16, 2018 Opinion and Order, (ECF Nos 1030-31). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/29/2018. (JB, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 1123 STIPULATION and Proposed Deposition Protocol Order by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 MDL STIPULATION AND ORDER, it is hereby stipulated and agreed that USALCO, Delta and Besson shall serve their reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss on or before 11/9/2018, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/25/2018. (JB, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by USALCO, LLC.. (NICHOLS, AARON) Modified on 12/7/2018 (ld).
October 24, 2018 Filing 1120 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC. re #1116 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority with Prejudice, #1117 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Plaintiff the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville (d.b.a. Greenville Water) with Prejudice (MURPHY, DAVID)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 24, 2018 Filing 1119 NOTICE by Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority re #1118 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1118 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority re #1117 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Plaintiff the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville (d.b.a. Greenville Water) with Prejudice, #1116 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority with Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas J. Gallagher, IV, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23)(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 24, 2018 Filing 1117 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Plaintiff the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville (d.b.a. Greenville Water) with Prejudice by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(MURPHY, DAVID)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1116 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority with Prejudice by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(MURPHY, DAVID)
October 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Michael Kanovitz, Esq., $ 150, receipt number NEW037768 (JB, )
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 MDL ORDER withdrawing, Attorney EMILY MCLOGAN GURSKIS as counsel for Brian Stepping in the above captioned matter is Granted. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to remove Ms. Gurskis' name from the docket for this case. Counsel terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/23/2018. (JB, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1114 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM JENNINGS SHERIDAN on behalf of BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC. (SHERIDAN, WILLIAM)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 MDL ORDER, it is hereby Stipulated and agreed. subject to approval by the Court by the Court, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the indirect purchaser Plaintiff shall file their Response on or before Monday, October 29, 2018 and that McShane shall file his Reply on or before Monday, November 5. 2018.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/23/2018. (JB, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1112 NOTICE of Appearance by CONOR MICHAEL SHAFFER on behalf of BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC. (SHAFFER, CONOR)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1111 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC. re #1091 MOTION to Intervene (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1110 Letter from Glen D. Savits, Esq. to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael Kanovitz, Esq. for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(SAVITS, GLEN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BRIAN C. STEPPIG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GURSKIS, EMILY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1108 STIPULATION re #1092 Notice (Other),,,, Stipulation and Order Extending Time to File Response to Objection of Lawrence McShane to Proposed IPP Settlement by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (MILLER, MARVIN)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 MDL STIPULATION AND ORDER, It is hereby stipulated and agreed, subject to approval by the Court, by and among the Virginia Plaintiffs and Lawrence McShane, by and through their undersigned counsel, that the Virginia Direct Action Plaintiff shall file their response on or before Monday, 10/29/2018 and that McShane shall file his Reply on or before Monday 11/5/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/18/2018. (JB, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 1106 STIPULATION re #1092 Notice (Other),,,, by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Richmond, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1105 DECLARATION of Charles E. Ferrera re #1077 MOTION Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses re #985 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, Regarding Requests for Exclusion by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1104 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by USALCO, LLC. re #1100 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (RYAN, WILLIAM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1101 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CITY OF AKRON re #1100 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim (URIS, JASON)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1100 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A - to Memo of Law, #4 Exhibit B - to Memo of Law)(RYAN, WILLIAM)
October 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to William J. Sheridan, Esq. and Conor M. Shaffer, Esq., receipt number TRE096225 (mps)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1099 ANSWER to Complaint by Appomattox River Water Authority, County of Chesterfield, County of Henrico, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, and City of Springfield by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1098 ANSWER to Complaint by Fairfax County Water Authority by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS; It is hereby stipulated and agreed, by and among the South Carolina Plaintiff's and USALCO, Delta, and Besson, that USALCO, Delta and Besson shall serve their reply briefs in support of their motions to dismiss on or before Friday, October 26, 2018; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/11/2018. (sms)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1096 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USALCO, LLC.. (NICHOLS, AARON)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER Granting #1032 Motion MOTION Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses and for Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/9/2018. (JB, )
October 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1093 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney William Alden McDaniel, Jr terminated. Attorney TIMOTHY FRANCIS MCCORMACK for MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE added.. (MCCORMACK, TIMOTHY)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1092 NOTICE by Lawrence McShane Intention to Appear to Object with Certification of Service (Attachments: #1 Objection of Lawrence McShane, #2 Exhibit 1 - Chicago Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Chicago Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2-1 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 2-2 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 2-3 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 2-4 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit 2-5 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit 2-6 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #10 Exhibit 2-7 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit 2-8 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 2-9 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 2-10 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #14 Exhibit 2-11 is exhibit to Chicago Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit 3 - Illinois Complaint, #16 Exhibit 4 - Illinois Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit 5 - Virginia Complaint)(SAVITS, GLEN)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1091 MOTION to Intervene by Lawrence McShane. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Glen Savits in support of motion to intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAVITS, GLEN)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1089 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master Hochberg. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1088 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1087 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #1054 Letter, #1050 Letter, #1079 Letter, #1085 Letter,,. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1086 Letter from Andrew Szot to Special Master Hochberg re #1050 Letter. (SZOT, ANDREW)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1085 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master Hochberg re #1079 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 21, 2018 Filing 1084 Letter from Southern Ionics Incorporated, Milton Sundbeck, Kemira Chemicals, Inc., USALCO LLC, C&S Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals (of Georgia), Inc., RGM Chemical, LLC, and RGM of Georgia, Ltd. and Delta Chemical Corporation re #1078 Letter, #966 Letter,,,. (MAIRO, JOHN)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1083 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN [Corrected] re #1078 Letter, #966 Letter,,,. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1082 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #918 Letter, #1046 Letter, #1060 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1081 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #1078 Letter, #966 Letter,,,. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1080 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1079 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg re #1054 Letter, #1050 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1078 Letter from Jay Fastow to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1077 MOTION Final Approval of Settlement and Payment of Attorney's Fees and Expenses re #985 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Charles E. Ferrera, #3 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #4 Declaration of Eric Fastiff, #5 Declaration of Jennifer Scullion, #6 Declaration of Kimberrly Justice, #7 Declaration of Linda P. Nussbaum, #8 Declaration of Mark J. Dearman, #9 Declaration of Sami H. Rashid, #10 Declaration of Michael Critchley, #11 Plan of Distribution)(CECCHI, JAMES)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1076 NOTICE by Delta Chemical Corporation re #895 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Motions to Dismiss Complaints Filed by Fairfax County Water Authority, Appomattox River Water Authority, County of Chesterfield, County of Henrico, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority, and City of Springfield, Missouri (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1075 Letter from Irma Espino MacLean re #1062 Letter. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1074 Letter from RICHARD EPSTEIN to Special Master Hochberg. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1073 ANSWER to Complaint by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1072 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by the City of Richmond by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1071 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by City of Baltimore by Delta Chemical Corporation.(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1070 Letter from Aaron L. Casagrande re USALCO, LLC's Recent Document Production. (NICHOLS, AARON)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1069 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #1064 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1068 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #1063 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1067 MOTION to Seal Exhibits to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Memo of Law in Opposition to DPPs Motion for Set-Aside [ECF 1034] by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement Statement in Lieu of Brief in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron L. Casagrande in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit Index of Confidential Materia, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Facts)(NICHOLS, AARON)
September 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGE ONLY!!! FAIRNESS HEARING set for 11/14/2018 09:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. (lr, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 1066 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master Hochberg. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1065 Letter from Jason A. Leckerman to Special Master Hochberg re #1062 Letter. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1064 Letter from Jay N. Fastow to Special Master Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1063 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master Hochberg. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1062 Letter from Aaron L. Casagrande (USALCO, LLC) re Discovery Updates. (NICHOLS, AARON)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1061 Letter from James E. Cecchi in further support of motion to compel documents. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1060 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Judge Hochberg re #918 Letter, #1046 Letter, #1052 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1059 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #1057 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 STIPULATION AND ORDER, it is hereby stipulated and agreed subject to approval by the court and among the south Carolina Plaintiffs and the Fairfax and Appomattox Plaintiffs on the one side, and USALCO, Delta and Benson on the other, that the South Carolina Plaintiff and the Fairfax and Appomattox Plaintiffs and USALCO, Delta and Besson have agreed to extend the time Plaintiffs have to serve, but not file their responses to the motion to dismiss from 9/10/2018 to 9/17/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/5/2018. (JB, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 1057 Letter from Jay N. Fastow re #1053 Brief. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1055 STIPULATION re #909 Stipulation and Order, modifying deadlines (re: South Carolina, Fairfax and Appomattox Complaints) by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Springfield, Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville SC, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Fairfax County Water Authority, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority. (KOMMATAS, ALEXANDER)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1054 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Judge Hochberg re #1050 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1053 BRIEF in Reply to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Memoranda of Law in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1052 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master Hochberg. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 MDL STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Delta defendants shall answer the Amended Complaints by 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/30/2018. (JB, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 1050 Letter from James E. Cecchi dated 8/27/18 re #1047 Letter,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1049 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Amended Complaints by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, and City of Richmond by Delta Chemical Corporation. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1048 MOTION to Seal Confidential Materials by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Adam C. Hemlock, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Aaron L. Casagrande, #4 Exhibit 3 - Index of Confidential Materials to Be Sealed, #5 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Redactions to ECF 966, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Redactions to ECF 1000, #7 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Redactions to ECF 1001, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1047 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master Hochberg. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 24, 2018 Filing 1046 Letter from RICHARD H. EPSTEIN to Special Master re #918 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1045 ANSWER to Complaint of the Commissioner of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1044 ANSWER to Complaint of the Commissioner of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1043 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Answer to the Complaint of the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenvile, SC by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1042 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1041 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff City of Greenville by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1040 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC (d.b.a. Greenville Water) (18-cv-11027)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1039 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint of Commision of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC (D.B.A. Greenville Water) by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1038 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (to Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, South Carolina's Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD.(DALBEY, JOHN)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1037 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1036 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND of Greenville Water by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1035 BRIEF in Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert A. Kaplan in Support of American Water and City of Akron, Ohio's Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Scott Summy in Support of American Water and City of Akron, Ohio's Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1034 BRIEF In Opposition To Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of A Set-Aside Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 17, 2018 Filing 1033 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER KAIM BUSSEY on behalf of AMITA GUPTA (BUSSEY, ALEXANDER)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1032 MOTION Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Reimbursement of Expenses and for Award of Incentive Payments to Class Representatives by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MILLER, MARVIN)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 ORDER denying #901 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/2018. (ld, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 1030 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/14/2018. (ld, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 1029 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER PETER KOMMATAS on behalf of City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE (KOMMATAS, ALEXANDER)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1028 Letter from Jay N. Fastow [Second Corrected] re #966 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 15, 2018 Filing 1027 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA ELLEN SEDLAK on behalf of CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC. (SEDLAK, LAURA)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1026 Letter from Jay N. Fastow [Corrected] re #966 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 14, 2018 Filing 1025 Letter from Jay N. Fastow re #966 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 6, 2018 Filing 1024 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HOPE WATER AND LIGHT COMMISSION, LITTLE RIVER COUNTY R.D.A. WATER SYSTEM, MUNICIPAL AUTHORITY OF WESTMORELAND COUNTY (ASCIOLLA, GREGORY)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1023 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 MDL ORDER, that the Direct Action Plaintiffs listed below are deemed to have opted out of the proposed DPP settlement class in connection with the settlement entered into between the DPPs and GEO Specialty Chemicals Inc., Kenneth A. Ghazey and Brian C. Stepping, which was preliminarily approved by Order of the Courted dated 7/19/2018 (D.E. 986). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/3/2018. (JB, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 1021 ANSWER to Complaint - Greenville Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1020 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES J. DIGIULIO on behalf of VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI (DIGIULIO, JAMES)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 MDL ORDER: STIPULATION AND ORDER MOFIDYING BRENNTAG DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINTS AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Brenntag Defendants' deadline to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Greenville Complaint is 8/10/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/2/2018. (sm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1018 NOTICE by USALCO, LLC. re Service of Motions to Dismiss (South Carolina Plaintiffs and City of Akron, OH) (NICHOLS, AARON)
August 1, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 22 attached to docket entry number #1015 filed by the Clerk's office on 08/01/2018 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (ek)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRENNTAG DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINTS AND TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC.. (MURPHY, DAVID)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1016 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. MURPHY on behalf of BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC. (MURPHY, DAVID)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.22. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 07/30/2018. (ek)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1014 ANSWER to Complaint of City of Akron, Ohio by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1013 ANSWER to Complaint to City of Akron, Ohio's Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1012 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Akron, Ohio's Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1011 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of City of Akron, Ohio (18-cv-9781)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1010 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to the City of Akron, Ohio by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1009 NOTICE by City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #902 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, Notice of Supplemental Information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1008 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Akron, Ohio's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1007 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (to City of Akron, Ohio's Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1006 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND of City of Akron, Ohio by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1003 NOTICE by Delta Chemical Corporation of Service of Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority and the Complaints of Plaintiffs the Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, the City Of Winston-Salem, the South Carolina Public Service Authority, and the Commission of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1002 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #899 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #900 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, #901 MOTION to Dismiss - REDACTED (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1001 Letter from Southern Ionics Incorporated, Milton Sundbeck, Kemira Chemicals, Inc., USALCO LLC, C&S Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals (of Georgia), Inc., RGM Chemical, LLC, and RGM of Georgia, Ltd. and Delta Chemical Corporation to Special Master re #966 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(MAIRO, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 27, 2018 Filing 1000 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master re #966 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 25, 2018 Filing 999 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 998 MDL ORDER Granting #996 Letter motion of the United States to withdraw appeals ECF Nos. 929 and 933 and ECF No. 988.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/24/2018. (JB, )
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 997 MDL CONSENT ORDER Vacating #987 Order on Motion to Set Aside, etc and Direct Action Plaintiffs shall file any opposition papers by 8/17/2018. DDPs shall file their reply brief by 8/31/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/23/2018. (JB, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 996 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JANNACO, PATRICIA)
July 23, 2018 Filing 995 Letter from William J. Pinilis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 994 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Set-Aside Order and Opt-Outs re #985 Order,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, #987 Order on Motion to Set Aside,,,,, #989 Letter, #992 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER Denying #988 Emergency MOTION to Stay by US Department of Justice. It is further Ordered that the parties shall comply with the deadlines set forth by the Special Master. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/20/2018. (JB, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 992 Letter from William J. Pinilis. (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 20, 2018 Filing 991 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. PINILIS on behalf of ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY (PINILIS, WILLIAM)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 990 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 20, 2018 Filing 989 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
July 19, 2018 Filing 988 ***WITHDRAW *** Emergency MOTION to Stay by US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief Emergency Stay and Appeal, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order Emergency Stay Order, #7 Text of Proposed Order Consolidation Order, #8 Text of Proposed Order Appeal Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(JANNACO, PATRICIA) Modified on 7/24/2018 (JB, ). (As per ECF No. 998 Oder)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ***VACATED**** ORDER Granting #931 MOTION to Set Aside Portion of Settlement Funds by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(Plaintiff in 17-6674), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC... Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/19/2018. (JB, ) Modified on 7/24/2018 (JB, ).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 986 MDL ORDER OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT Granting #935 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. Fairness Hearing set for 11/14/2018 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares.), Motions terminated:. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/19/2018. (JB, )
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MDL ORDER Granting #911 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC., CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC., CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC., City of Rochester, Minnesota, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA, MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER Fairness Hearing set for 11/14/2018 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares., Motions terminated:. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/19/2018. (JB, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 984 NOTICE by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA re #935 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement (PATMORE, SAMUEL)
July 18, 2018 Filing 983 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA re #969 MOTION to Stay Order No. 3 of Special Master (CORBETT, ABIGAIL)
July 17, 2018 Filing 982 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #931 MOTION to Set Aside Portion of Settlement Funds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Revised))(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee:or the admission of Daniel Seltz $ 150, receipt number NEW036949 (JB, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 981 Letter from Marvin Miller re #935 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MILLER, MARVIN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 980 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. (18-cv-9231)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
July 16, 2018 Filing 979 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Milton Sundbeck in Response to Complaint by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 978 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Southern Ionics Incorporated in Response to Complaint by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 977 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
July 16, 2018 Filing 976 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, et al. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2018 Filing 975 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
July 16, 2018 Filing 973 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND re: Complaint of Commissioner of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, et al., by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2018 Filing 972 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND of Spartanburg, et al. by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
July 16, 2018 Filing 971 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Answer to Commission of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg, et al.'s Complaint by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD.(DALBEY, JOHN)
July 16, 2018 Filing 970 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Answer to Spartanburg Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
July 15, 2018 Filing 969 MOTION to Stay by US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(JANNACO, PATRICIA)
July 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 968 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MDL ORDER, that Kimberly A. Justice of Kessler, Topaz Melzer Check LLp, 280 King of Prusia Road, Radnor, Pennsylvania, Kjustice@Kmc.com, counsel for City of Texarkana Arkansas and the City of Texarkana, Texas d/b/a Texarkana water utilities, is hereby added as a member of the PSC, subject to the terms and conditions of the Appointment Order.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/13/2018. (JB, )
July 13, 2018 Filing 967 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL EDWARD SELTZ on behalf of CITY OF FRESNO, CALIFORNIA (SELTZ, DANIEL)
July 12, 2018 Filing 966 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin W. Lamson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 965 ORDER granting #952 MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents by Delta Chemical Corporation., that the Clerk of Court shall maintain the following docket entries permanently under seal, (DKT Nos. 902,903-17,903-19-24. that within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiffs shall publicly file a redacted version of Dkt No. 902, substantially the smae to the proposed redacted version to the parties's motion to seal, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/12/2018. (JB, )
July 12, 2018 Filing 964 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. URIS on behalf of CITY OF AKRON (URIS, JASON)
July 12, 2018 Filing 963 NOTICE of Appearance by HAE SUNG NAM on behalf of CITY OF AKRON (NAM, HAE)
July 12, 2018 Filing 962 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT N. KAPLAN on behalf of CITY OF AKRON (KAPLAN, ROBERT)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 961 MDL CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED PETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER approving the Report and Recommendation regarding Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order, Fact Discovery is to remain open through seven days after service of the DPP and IPP 2018, etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/11/2018. (JB, )
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 960 MDL ORDER Granting #957 Letter from James E. Cecchi, requesting Pro Hac Vice admission of Arthur L. Shingler III, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/11/2018. (JB, )
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 10, 2018 Filing 958 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 10, 2018 Filing 957 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Certification of Arthur L. Shingler III, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
July 10, 2018 Filing 956 USALCO, LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 955 MDL ORDER approving the Report and Recommendation regarding Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order, Fact Discovery is to remain open through seven days after service of the DPP and IPP 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/10/2018. (JB, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 954 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to the Appomattox River Water Authority's Amended Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
July 10, 2018 Filing 953 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Appomattox Water Authority, et al.'s Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2018 Filing 952 MOTION to Seal Confidential Documents by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Aaron L. Casagrande, #3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Adam C. Hemlock, #4 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Douglas A. Sampson, #5 Index of Confidential Materials, #6 Proposed Redactions to ECF 902, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
July 9, 2018 Filing 951 REPORT and RECOMMENDATION of Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
July 9, 2018 Filing 950 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Defenses of Southern Ionics Incorporated in Response to Amended Complaint by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
July 9, 2018 Filing 949 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Defenses of Milton Sundbeck in Response to Amended Complaint by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
July 9, 2018 Filing 948 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority et al. (Doc. 923) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD.(DALBEY, JOHN)
July 9, 2018 Filing 947 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
July 9, 2018 Filing 946 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Corrected Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
July 9, 2018 Filing 945 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to [Corrected] Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority et al. (18-cv-8159)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
July 9, 2018 Filing 944 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Appomattox River Water Authority et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
July 9, 2018 Filing 943 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Norfolk, County of Chesterfield, South Central Wastewater Authority, City of Newport News, County Of Henrico, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, and City of Lynchburg by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 942 MDL STIPULATION AND ORDER, extending time to defendants to the above captioned action and are parties to the stipulation to answer within twenty (45) days from the entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/5/2018. (JB, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 941 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Complaint of Greenville Water by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
July 2, 2018 Filing 940 Letter from R. Epstein to Special Master, Enclosing [Proposed] Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
July 2, 2018 Filing 939 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER DONALD POMEROY on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Springfield, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority (POMEROY, CHRISTOPHER)
July 2, 2018 Filing 938 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK PAUL CALAMITA, III on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Springfield, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority (CALAMITA, FRANK)
July 2, 2018 Filing 937 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL THOMAS NYFFELER on behalf of Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Newport News, City of Norfolk, City of Springfield, Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, County Of Henrico, County of Chesterfield, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority (NYFFELER, PAUL)
June 29, 2018 Filing 936 Exhibit to #935 Motion for Settlement,, by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (MILLER, MARVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 29, 2018 Filing 935 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class, #3 Declaration Joint Declaration of Marvin A. Miller and Jay Shapiro, #4 Declaration Declaration of Linda V. Young, #5 Text of Proposed Order Preliminary Approval Order)(MILLER, MARVIN)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 934 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by July 16, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/29/2018. (ld, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 933 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by US Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(CAVANAGH, FRANCIS)
June 28, 2018 Filing 932 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of Comm'n of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 28, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Appeal of Magistrate Decision and its supporting documents submitted by P. Jannaco on 6/27/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by th (JB, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 931 MOTION to Set Aside Portion of Settlement Funds by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(Plaintiff in 17-6674), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 27, 2018 Filing 930 STIPULATION re #922 Stipulation and Order to Further Extend Time to File Motion to Seal by Delta Chemical Corporation. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 27, 2018 Filing 929 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by US Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(JANNACO, PATRICIA)
June 27, 2018 Filing 928 Letter from Richard H. Epstein regarding Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Proposed Second Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Dkt. No. 400 Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit C - Dkt. No. 579 Consent Order Extending Certain Deadlines in Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 27, 2018 Filing 927 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - APTSO, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Order, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Proposal)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 27, 2018 Filing 926 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master, Hon. Faith S. Hochberg re #907 Letter, #917 Response (NOT Motion),,. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 27, 2018 Filing 925 Letter from R. Epstein re #918 Letter, #921 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 26, 2018 Filing 924 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master Regarding Inventory of Disputes for June 28 Conference. (Attachments: #1 Enclosure - May 11, 2018 Letter)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 26, 2018 Filing 923 AMENDED COMPLAINT [CORRECTED] against AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, ALEX AVRAAMIDES, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, Delta Chemical Corporation, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., AMITA GUPTA, Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., MATTHEW LEBARON, VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, FRANK A REICHL, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., BRIAN C. STEPPIG, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., SCOTT WOLFF, filed by Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, South Central Wastewater Authority.(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 922 STIPULATION AND ORDER, accordingly, the plaintiff and the Delta Defendants have agreed to extend the time to file their motion to seal from 6/25/2018 to 6/29/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/26/2018. (JB, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 921 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master, Hon. Faith S. Hochberg re #918 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
June 25, 2018 Filing 920 STIPULATION re #903 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #902 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion,,, #904 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,, Extending Time to File Motion to Seal by Delta Chemical Corporation. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 25, 2018 Filing 919 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, ALEX AVRAAMIDES, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, Delta Chemical Corporation, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., AMITA GUPTA, Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., MATTHEW LEBARON, VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, FRANK A REICHL, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., BRIAN C. STEPPIG, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., SCOTT WOLFF, filed by Appomattox River Water Authority, City of Norfolk, County of Chesterfield, South Central Wastewater Authority, City of Newport News, County Of Henrico, Rivanna Water & Sewer Authority, City of Lynchburg, City of Springfield.(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
June 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: For the admission of Alexander Kaim BusseY $ 150, receipt number NEW036764 (JB, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 918 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to the Hon. Faith S. Hochberg, U.S.D.J., Special Master. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 22, 2018 Filing 917 RESPONSE re #907 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(ANDREWS, PAUL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 22, 2018 Filing 916 Letter from Abigail G. Corbett re #915 Letter. (CORBETT, ABIGAIL)
June 20, 2018 Filing 915 Letter from USDOJ (corrected). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CAVANAGH, FRANCIS)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 914 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Brenntag Defendants agreed to waive service of the Charleston Amended Complaint and their deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Charleston Amended Complaint 7/13/2018.,etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/18/2018. (JB, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 912 Exhibit to #911 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,, by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(Plaintiff in 17-), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 15, 2018 Filing 911 MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(Plaintiff in 17-), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER MANAGEMENT & SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC., SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, #3 Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit 3)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 913 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that upon entry of this Order, undersigned counsel agree on behalf of their respective clients that are Defendants to the above captioned action and are parties to the Stipulation (the defendants) to accept service of the Complaint and the summons, and for those defendants already served, stipulate that service of process was proper under Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Except as to service of process, Defendants expressly reserve the right to challenge the Complaint on any all grounds, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/13/2018. (JB, ) (JB, ) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 910 Order from Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 12, 2018 Jannaco Letter to Hochberg)(HOCHBERG, FAITH)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 909 STIPULATION AND ORDER, that USALCO, Delta, and Besson shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the South Carolina Complaints within 30 days of the transfer ofthe Greenville Complaint to this Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/12/2018. (JB, )
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 908 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING BRENNTAG DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO FILE INITIAL DISCLOSURES by BRENNTAG MID-SOUTH, INC., BRENNTAG NORTH AMERICA, INC., BRENNTAG SOUTHEAST, INC.. (MURPHY, DAVID)
June 12, 2018 Filing 907 Letter from James E. Cecchi to Special Master, Honorable Faith S. Hochberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 906 TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed the 5/29/18 letter from Plaintiffs Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. (ECF No. 856). The Clerk of the Court shall hereby unseal Docket Entry No. 839.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/11/18. (nm, )
June 11, 2018 Filing 905 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of City of Akron by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 11, 2018 Filing 904 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Delta Chemical Corporation re #899 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #900 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, #901 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 11, 2018 Filing 903 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition filed by City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #899 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #900 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, #901 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the City of Richmond (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 11, 2018 Filing 902 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission re #899 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #900 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission, #901 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the City of Richmond (LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 11, 2018 Filing 901 MOTION to Dismiss by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Baltimore, WSSC, and Richmond Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 11, 2018 Filing 900 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Baltimore, WSSC, and Richmond Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 11, 2018 Filing 899 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by Delta Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief Consolidated Memorandum in Support of Motions to Dismiss Baltimore, WSSC, and Richmond Complaints, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 11, 2018 Filing 898 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (as filed with JPML). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action -- Comm'n of Public Works of the City of Greenville, SC (as filed with JPML))(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 897 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaints filed by City of Charleston, City of Spartanburg, and City of Greenville, and setting briefing schedule for motions to dismiss Fairfax and Appomattox Complaints by Delta by Delta Chemical Corporation, USALCO, LLC.. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 896 MDL STIPULATION AND ORDER, that Defendant Brian C. Steppig by and through their counsel shall mvove or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by 6/19/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/6/2018. (JB, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 895 NOTICE by Delta Chemical Corporation of Service of Motions to Dismiss (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
June 6, 2018 Filing 894 Corrected Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fairax County Water Authority's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
June 6, 2018 Filing 893 Corrected Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Appomattox Water Authority, et al.'s Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
June 6, 2018 Filing 892 Letter from James E. Cecchi Regarding Addition of Kimberly Justice to PSC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 891 MDL ORDER, that to the extent the Delta Defendants intend on filing motions to dismiss the Fairdax Complaint and the Appomattox Complaint, the Delta Defendants shall serve, bu not file, any such motions on or before 6/4/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/5/2018. (JB, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 890 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig regarding Fairfax County Water Authority. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order of Stay)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
June 5, 2018 Filing 889 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig regarding Appomattox River Water Authority. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order of Stay)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
June 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, HUGH DANIEL SANDLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (JB, )
June 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Hugh Daniel Sandler $ 150, receipt number 5/15/2018 (JB, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 888 ANSWER to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
June 5, 2018 Filing 887 ANSWER to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
June 5, 2018 Filing 886 ANSWER to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Authority by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
June 5, 2018 Filing 885 ANSWER to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Authority by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
June 4, 2018 Filing 884 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority et al. (18-cv-8159)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 4, 2018 Filing 883 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Authority (18-cv-8163)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
June 4, 2018 Filing 882 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE FAIRFAX COUNTY WATER AUTHORITYS COMPLAINT by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 881 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE APPOMATTOX RIVER WATER AUTHORITYS COMPLAINT by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 880 ANSWER to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, et al. by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
June 4, 2018 Filing 879 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to the Virginia Plaintiffs' Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 878 USALCO, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Authority by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
June 4, 2018 Filing 877 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff Fairfax County Water Authority's Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 876 ANSWER to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Association by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2018 Filing 875 ANSWER to Complaint of Virginia Plaintiffs by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
June 4, 2018 Filing 874 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (Answer to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority et al.'s Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(DALBEY, JOHN)
June 4, 2018 Filing 873 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (Answer to Fairfax County Water Authority's Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(DALBEY, JOHN)
June 4, 2018 Filing 872 Virginia Plaintiffs ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
June 4, 2018 Filing 871 Fairfax County Water Authority ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
June 4, 2018 Filing 870 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Fairfax County Water Association by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 869 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
June 4, 2018 Filing 868 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs Appomattox River Water Authority et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
June 4, 2018 Filing 867 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to Fairfax County Water Authority's Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 866 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority, Et Al. by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 865 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fairfax County Water Authority ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 864 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Appomattox Water Authority, et al's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
June 4, 2018 Filing 863 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (ANSWER TO FAIRFAX COUNTY WATER AUTHORITYS COMPLAINT) by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(ROOSEVELT, THERESA)
June 4, 2018 Filing 862 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (ANSWER TO APPOMATTOX RIVER WATER AUTHORITY, ET AL COMPLAINT) by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(ROOSEVELT, THERESA)
May 29, 2018 Filing 861 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
May 29, 2018 Filing 860 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
May 29, 2018 Filing 859 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
May 29, 2018 Filing 858 ANSWER to Complaint to the Amended Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
May 29, 2018 Filing 857 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to The City of Charleston and Grand Strand's Amended Complaint by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
May 29, 2018 Filing 856 Letter from Justin W. Lamson re #839 Amended Document,,. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
May 29, 2018 Filing 855 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority (18-cv-3440) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 29, 2018 Filing 854 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
May 29, 2018 Filing 853 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND of Charleston and Grand Stand Water and Sewer Authority by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
May 29, 2018 Filing 852 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
May 29, 2018 Filing 851 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to the Amended Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority (Dkt No. 839) by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
May 29, 2018 Filing 850 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to the Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston's Amended Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
May 29, 2018 Filing 849 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Commissioners of the Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority's Amended Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
May 25, 2018 Filing 848 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Commissioners of Public Works of The City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority's Amended Complaint by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
May 22, 2018 Filing 847 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hugh Daniel Sandler, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 22, 2018 Filing 846 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dorothy P. Antullis to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-8757770.) (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 18, 2018 Filing 844 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig re #772 Letter. (SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER granting #841 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JAMES ROSS SMART terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/17/2018. (ld, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 843 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #772 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 842 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to respond to the complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 05/16/2018. (ek)
May 16, 2018 Filing 841 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI. (SMART, JAMES)
May 15, 2018 Filing 840 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of Comm'n of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to F. Paul Calamita, Esq., Christopher D. Pomeroy, Esq. and Paul T. Nyffeler, Esq., receipt number TRE091727 (mps)
May 14, 2018 Filing 839 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston, Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority. AMENDED COMPLAINT. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 838 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
May 11, 2018 Filing 837 Letter from Danielle Chattin. (CHATTIN, DANIELLE)
May 11, 2018 Filing 836 Letter from R. Epstein re: Outstanding Disputes. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
May 9, 2018 Filing 834 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (as filed with JPML). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action -- City of Akron, Ohio (as filed with JPML))(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW036323 for TERRY W. POSEY, JR., ESQ. (dam, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 832 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master re #828 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 833 LETTER ORDER GRANTING the IPPs' informal application to compel. Mr.Ghazey shall produce an unredacted version of the presentation document on or before May 11,2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/4/18. (cm, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 831 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER Granting #825 Motion to Withdraw and terminating #814 Motion to Set Aside, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/4/2018. (JB, )
May 4, 2018 Filing 829 NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY W. POSEY, JR on behalf of GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC. (POSEY, TERRY)
May 3, 2018 Filing 828 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master Regarding Remaining Disputes under Issue 1 in 4/17/18 Inventory Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
May 3, 2018 Filing 827 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CAVANAGH, FRANCIS)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 826 Order from Special Master re #823 Order from Special Master Related document: #823 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
May 3, 2018 Filing 825 MOTION to Withdraw #814 MOTION to Set Aside by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., THE CITY OF CHARLOTTE. (CECCHI, JAMES)
May 3, 2018 Filing 824 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 823 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
May 2, 2018 Filing 822 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #821 Letter. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
May 2, 2018 Filing 821 Letter from US Department of Justice. (CAVANAGH, FRANCIS)
April 30, 2018 Filing 820 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kenneth A. Ghazey. Amendment to #817 Answer to Amended Complaint Kenneth A. Ghazey's Amended Answer to the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore's Amended Complaint. (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
April 30, 2018 Filing 819 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Plaintiff City of Richmond by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
April 30, 2018 Filing 818 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
April 30, 2018 Filing 817 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Kenneth A. Ghazey's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Baltimore's Amended Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
April 30, 2018 Filing 816 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Kenneth A. Ghazey's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Richmond's Amended Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
April 30, 2018 Filing 815 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #722 Letter, #799 Order from Special Master, #782 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Requests for Production), #2 Exhibit B (Email Chain With Counsel)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 27, 2018 Filing 814 MOTION to Set Aside by CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(Plaintiff in 15-7827), CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, CITY AND COUNTY OF DENVER, COLORADO, CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF GREENSBORO, CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(Plaintiff in 17-), CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, CALIFORNIA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(Plaintiff in 16-737), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WAER PENNSYLVANIA INC., SUEZ WATER ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., THE CITY OF CHARLOTTE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER granting #808 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for GEO Specialty Chemicals, Inc. Attorney CORMAC T. CONNOR terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/27/2018. (sms, )
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting #778 Motion to Intervene, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/27/2018. (sms)
April 26, 2018 Filing 811 ANSWER to Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
April 26, 2018 Filing 810 ANSWER to Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
April 26, 2018 Filing 809 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority (18-cv-3440) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 26, 2018 Filing 808 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Cormac T. Connor as Counsel for Defendant by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONNOR, CORMAC)
April 26, 2018 Filing 807 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND of Charleston and Grand Stand Water and Sewer Authority by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
April 26, 2018 Filing 806 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Plaintiffs CWS and GSWSA's Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
April 26, 2018 Filing 805 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of City of Charleston and GSWSA by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
April 25, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #804 Stipulation and Order, submitted by Delta Chemical Corporation, USALCO, LLC, and John D. Besson has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 06/09/2018. (sms, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 804 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Time to Respond to Complaint as to USALCO, LLC, Delta Chemical Corporation, and John D. Besson, shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 9, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/25/2018. (sms, )
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 803 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaints filed by City of Charleston and City of Spartanaburg by Delta Chemical Corporation, USALCO, LLC.. (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
April 24, 2018 Filing 802 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Commissioners of Public Works of The City of Charleston and Grand Strand Water & Sewer Authority's Complaint by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
April 24, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by BRIAN C. STEPPIG has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 05/23/2018. (ek)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 801 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's Brian C. Steppig time to respond to the complaint by May 23, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/23/2018. (ek)
April 23, 2018 Filing 800 AMENDED DOCUMENT by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC.. Amended Answer to The City of Charleston and Grand Strand's Complaint. (WARE, ROBERT)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Order from Special Master (HOCHBERG, FAITH)
April 23, 2018 Filing 798 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (City of Richmond) by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
April 23, 2018 Filing 797 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
April 23, 2018 Filing 796 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
April 23, 2018 Filing 795 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Kenneth A. Ghazey's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Commissioners of Public Works of the City of Charleston's Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
April 20, 2018 Filing 794 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by BRIAN C. STEPPIG. (SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
April 20, 2018 Filing 793 Letter from Justin W. Lamson re 781 Order,. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
April 20, 2018 Filing 792 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action (as filed with JPML). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action -- Comm'n of Public Works of the City of Spartanburg et al. (as filed with JPML))(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 20, 2018 Filing 791 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re 781 Order,. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 20, 2018 Filing 790 Letter from Colin G. Fraser, Esq. re 781 Order,. (FRASER, COLIN)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 789 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Fairfax County Water Authority's time to respond to the complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/19/2018. (ek)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 788 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/19/2018. (ek)
April 19, 2018 Filing 787 Letter from James E. Cecchi, Esq. re 781 Order,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 18, 2018 Filing 786 Letter from Nicholas C. Theodorou re #776 Letter. (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
April 18, 2018 Filing 785 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of Appomattox River Water Authority et al. by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 18, 2018 Filing 784 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of Fairfax County Water Authority by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Order of the MDL Panel (CTO #14) transferring actions from the Eastern District of Virginia to this Court (gh, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 782 Letter from Richard H. Epstein to Special Master Regarding Inventory of Open Disputes. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 781 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the United States Department of Justice's motion to intervene. (ECF No. 778). On or before 4/20/18, the parties shall advise the Court whether they intend on opposing the intervention request. The Court stresses that it is not seeking further explanation of the parties' positions on the underlying application to compel at this time.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/17/18. (nm, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 780 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY ANNE FLORENTINA CARNIVAL on behalf of US Department of Justice (CARNIVAL, MARY ANNE)
April 17, 2018 Filing 779 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS ADAM CAVANAGH on behalf of US Department of Justice (CAVANAGH, FRANCIS)
April 16, 2018 Filing 778 MOTION to Intervene by US Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(JANNACO, PATRICIA)
April 16, 2018 Filing 777 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LYNN JANNACO on behalf of US Department of Justice (JANNACO, PATRICIA)
April 13, 2018 Filing 776 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #735 Order,. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 11, 2018 Filing 775 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff City of Homestead, Florida by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
April 10, 2018 Filing 774 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #773 Letter. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 9, 2018 Filing 773 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig re #772 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
April 6, 2018 Filing 772 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER granting #769 Letter requesting an extension of time for the IPPs to file a one-page statement of the objections to the redacted slides presented to the Department of Justice by Mr. Ghazey's counsel (Dkt. No 735) until April 13, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/06/2018. (ek)
April 6, 2018 Filing 770 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Notices of Potential Tag-Along Actions (as filed with JPML). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag Along Action -- Fairfax County Water Authority (as filed with JMPL), #2 Notice of Potential Tag Along Action -- Appomattox River Water Authority et al. (as filed with JMPL))(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
April 6, 2018 Filing 769 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 768 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Plaintiff's time to respond to Motion to Dismiss, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/5/2018. (ek)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER granting #763 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney SCOTT JEFFREY CHAFIN, JR. and JULIE ELIZABETH PAYNE JOHNSON terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 04/05/2018. (ek)
April 4, 2018 Filing 766 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond To Motion To Dismiss by City of Richmond, MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE, Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER that the Honorable Dennis M. Cavanaugh (Ret.) is no longer appointed as special master in this matter. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Honorable Faith Hochberg (Ret.) is hereby appointed as special master, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares.(ek).
April 2, 2018 Filing 764 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff City of Homestead, Florida by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
April 2, 2018 Filing 763 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Scott J. Chafin, Jr., and Julie Payne Johnson by City of Shreveport. (JOHNSON, JULIE)
March 30, 2018 Filing 762 Letter from Richard H. Epstein Regarding Custodians re #735 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 30, 2018 Filing 761 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Honorable Joseph A Dickson, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER granting #759 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs. Attorney MICHAEL J. BONI terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/28/2018. (ek)
March 27, 2018 Filing 759 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael J. Boni as Counsel for Plaintiffs by AQUA OHIO, INC., AQUA PENNSYLVANIA, INC., BOROUGH OF PHOENIXVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SNYDER, JOSHUA)
March 27, 2018 Filing 758 NOTICE by AQUA OHIO, INC., AQUA PENNSYLVANIA, INC., BOROUGH OF PHOENIXVILLE of Firm Name Change (SNYDER, JOSHUA)
March 27, 2018 Filing 757 NOTICE of Appearance by CURTIS RAY JOSEPH, JR on behalf of City of Shreveport (JOSEPH, CURTIS)
March 23, 2018 Filing 756 Letter from R. Epstein re #735 Order,. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 23, 2018 Filing 755 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 23, 2018 Filing 754 DEFENDANT VINCENT OPALEWSKIS ANSWER to Amended Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER granting #749 Letter requesting a two-week extension for the IPP's to file any objections to the redacted slides presented to the Department of Justice by Mr. Ghazey's counsel, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/23/2018. (ek)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #748 Letter/Application for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Hugh Daniel Sandler, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/23/2018. (ek)
March 22, 2018 Filing 751 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
March 22, 2018 Filing 750 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
March 22, 2018 Filing 749 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
March 20, 2018 Filing 748 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Declaration of Hugh Daniel Sandler, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 20, 2018 Filing 747 Transcript of Proceedings of a Status Conference held on 3/15/2018, before Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Court Reporter/Transcriber KLJ Transcription Service, Holly Tisseyre (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (sm, )
March 20, 2018 Filing 746 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Complaint (Dckt. 705) by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
March 20, 2018 Filing 745 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
March 19, 2018 Filing 744 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
March 19, 2018 Filing 743 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 19, 2018 Filing 742 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 19, 2018 Filing 741 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
March 19, 2018 Filing 740 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
March 19, 2018 Filing 739 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD.(DALBEY, JOHN)
March 19, 2018 Filing 738 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
March 19, 2018 Filing 737 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
March 19, 2018 Filing 736 ANSWER to Amended Complaint - GCC Defendants' Answer & Affirmative Defenses to IPPs' Amended Complaint by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 735 ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' #570 Letter/Request to compel discovery; Denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' #557 Letter/Application for an order regarding the commencement of fact depositions, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/16/2018. (ek)
March 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Kayleigh Golish, Esq. : $ 150, receipt number NWE035891. (ek)
March 15, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Curtis Joseph, Jr., receipt number TRE089860 (mps)
March 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 3/15/2018. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 734 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #721 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER admitting Dorothy P. Antullis, Esq., as a Pro Hac Vice Attorney on behalf of Plaintiffs, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/17/2018. (ek)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER granting Defendant's #727 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ALEXANDER P WENTWORTH-PING terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/14/2018. (ek)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER granting #724 Application/Petition for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kayleigh Golish, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/14/2018. (ek)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 730 TEXT ORDER - The parties shall be prepared to discuss the Special Master's letter dated 3/13/18, (ECF No. 729), at the 3/15/18 conference.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/14/18. (nm, )
March 14, 2018 Filing 729 Letter from SPECIAL MASTER. (ek)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 728 TEXT ORDER - Counsel are advised that the conference scheduled for 3/15/18 will now begin at 2:30 p.m. Counsel are further advised that the conference will end no later than 4:30 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/14/18. (nm, )
March 13, 2018 Filing 727 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Amita Gupta by AMITA GUPTA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WENTWORTH-PING, ALEXANDER)
March 13, 2018 Filing 726 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Certification of Dorothy P. Antullis, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
March 13, 2018 Filing 725 Letter from Richard H. Epstein Regarding Agenda for March 15 Conference. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 13, 2018 Filing 724 APPLICATION/PETITION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kayleigh Golish, Esq. for by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard H. Epstein in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kayleigh Golish, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER that the Honorable Dennis M. Cavanaugh is hereby appointed as a special master, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 03/12/2018. (ek)
March 12, 2018 Filing 722 Letter from Nicholas C. Theodorou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(THEODOROU, NICHOLAS)
March 12, 2018 Filing 721 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #706 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Correspondence)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 720 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/09/2018. (ek)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 719 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' SII time to respond to the Baltimore Amended Complaint by March 8, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/09/2018. (ek)
March 9, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #711 Stipulation filed by Milton Sundbeck, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC. submitted by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 03/08/2018. (ek)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 718 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' SII time to respond to the Richmond Amended Complaint by March 8, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/09/2018. (ek)
March 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to DOUGLAS ALAN SAMPSON, Esq. : $ 150, receipt number NEW035829. (ek)
March 8, 2018 Filing 717 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of City of Richmond by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 8, 2018 Filing 716 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of City of Richmond by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 8, 2018 Filing 715 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of The Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 8, 2018 Filing 714 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of The Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
March 8, 2018 Filing 713 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint of Charleston Water System by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 712 TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of Defendant Kemira Chemicals, Inc.'s letter dated 3/2/18. (ECF No. 701). The discovery conference scheduled for 3/15/18 will proceed as scheduled. The Court will not, however, address Plaintiffs' informal application to compel Kemira to produce certain discovery, (ECF Nos 649, 659, 692, 708), at that conference. That application will be addressed at a later date.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/8/18. (nm, )
March 8, 2018 Filing 711 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint of City of Richmond by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., Milton Sundbeck. (MAIRO, JOHN)
March 8, 2018 Filing 710 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., Milton Sundbeck. (MAIRO, JOHN)
March 7, 2018 Filing 709 Letter from Kemira Chemicals, Inc. (Corrected) re #649 Letter, #692 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 7, 2018 Filing 708 Letter from Kemira Chemicals, Inc. re #649 Letter, #692 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 6, 2018 Filing 707 NOTICE of Appearance by DOUGLAS ALAN SAMPSON on behalf of Delta Chemical Corporation (SAMPSON, DOUGLAS)
March 6, 2018 Filing 706 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 5, 2018 Filing 705 AMENDED COMPLAINT OF THE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS against ALEX AVRAAMIDES, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., AMITA GUPTA, Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, FRANK A REICHL, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., BRIAN C. STEPPIG, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., filed by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA.(PATMORE, SAMUEL)
March 5, 2018 Filing 704 Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint (Docket No. 242) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 703 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/02/2018. (ek)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER granting #694 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney AMANDA PAIGE WEBSTER terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/02/2018. (ek)
March 2, 2018 Filing 701 Letter from Jeffrey S. Cashdan to the Court Regarding Conference on Discovery Disputes. (CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 700 TEXT ORDER - The Court will conduct an in-person conference regarding the parties' outstanding discovery disputes on 3/15/18 at 3:00 p.m. Any counsel who either take no position on the disputes at issue, or who will rely entirely on the arguments presented by others, may participate by telephone. Counsel who wish to participate by telephone shall confer and coordinate a single conference call.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/1/18. (nm, )
March 1, 2018 Filing 699 Letter from Charles O. Monk, II. (MONK, CHARLES)
March 1, 2018 Filing 698 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of the city of Richmond by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
March 1, 2018 Filing 697 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of The Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
March 1, 2018 Filing 696 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
March 1, 2018 Filing 695 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of the City of Richmond, Virginia by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
February 28, 2018 Filing 694 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Amanda Paige Webster by Delta Chemical Corporation. (WEBSTER, AMANDA)
February 28, 2018 Filing 693 Exhibit to #692 Letter by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (MILLER, MARVIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 28, 2018 Filing 692 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re #659 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MILLER, MARVIN)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #667 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney D. SCOTT MACRAE terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/26/2018. (ek)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #665 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney ALLAN STEYER terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/26/2018. (ek)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #666 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JILL M. MANNING terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/26/2018. (ek)
February 26, 2018 Filing 688 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2018 Filing 687 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2018 Filing 686 Answer and Affimative Defenses to the Complaint of Illinois-American Water Company, et al ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2018 Filing 685 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint (Docket No. 220) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2018 Filing 684 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Shreverport's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 26, 2018 Filing 683 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Richmond's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FRANK A REICHL.(KAPLAN, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2018 Filing 682 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of the City of Richmond, with Affirmative Defenses by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2018 Filing 681 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, with Affirmative Defenses by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2018 Filing 680 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
February 23, 2018 Filing 679 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
February 23, 2018 Filing 678 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
February 23, 2018 Filing 677 ANSWER to Amended Complaint - Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint of Mayor & City of Baltimore (No. 17-cv-4659) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 23, 2018 Filing 676 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to City of Richmond's Amended Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(KRZASTEK, WALTER)
February 23, 2018 Filing 675 ANSWER to Amended Complaint - Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint of City of Richmond (No. 17-cv-4656) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 23, 2018 Filing 674 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to City of Baltimore's Amended Complaint by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(KRZASTEK, WALTER)
February 23, 2018 Filing 673 ANSWER to Complaint - Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (No. 17-cv-11416) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 23, 2018 Filing 672 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2018 Filing 671 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Notice of Potential Tag-Along (as filed with JPML). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along (as filed with JPML), #2 Schedule of Action (as filed with JPML), #3 Proof of Service (as filed with JPML), #4 Exhibit - Docket Sheet and Complaint (as filed with JPML))(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 23, 2018 Filing 670 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
February 23, 2018 Filing 669 Mayor and City Council of Baltimore ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
February 23, 2018 Filing 668 City of Richmond ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
February 22, 2018 Filing 667 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AMREX CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MACRAE, D.)
February 22, 2018 Filing 666 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AMREX CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNING, JILL)
February 22, 2018 Filing 665 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AMREX CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEYER, ALLAN)
February 22, 2018 Filing 664 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, MATTHEW LEBARON, SCOTT WOLFF.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
February 21, 2018 Filing 663 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (RE: City of Richmond v. Frank Reichl, et al) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
February 21, 2018 Filing 662 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (RE: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Frank Reichl, et al) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
February 20, 2018 Filing 661 Letter from Richard H. Epstein Re: Date for Next Discovery Conference. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 20, 2018 Filing 660 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #560 Letter,,, #645 Letter,, #650 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 20, 2018 Filing 659 Letter from Kemira Chemicals, Inc. re #649 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 658 LETTER ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to unseal WSSC's Amended Complaint (ECF. No. 555), etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/16/2018. (ek)
February 19, 2018 Filing 657 Letter from Colin G. Fraser re #656 Letter. (FRASER, COLIN)
February 16, 2018 Filing 656 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan 19 Hr'ing Tr., #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
February 16, 2018 Filing 655 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re: Proposed Order Concerning Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
February 16, 2018 Filing 654 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Kenneth Ghazey's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
February 15, 2018 Filing 653 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, ALEX AVRAAMIDES, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, Delta Chemical Corporation, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., AMITA GUPTA, Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., Matthew Lebaron, VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, FRANK A REICHL, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., BRIAN C. STEPPIG, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., Scott Wolff, filed by City of Richmond.(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 15, 2018 Filing 652 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, ALEX AVRAAMIDES, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, CHEMTRADE US, LLC, Delta Chemical Corporation, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC., GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC., AMITA GUPTA, Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., Matthew Lebaron, VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI, FRANK A REICHL, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., BRIAN C. STEPPIG, Milton Sundbeck, USALCO, LLC., Scott Wolff, filed by MAYOR AND CITY COUNCIL OF BALTIMORE.(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 15, 2018 Filing 651 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff City of Greensboro by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff.(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
February 14, 2018 Filing 650 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 13, 2018 Filing 649 Letter from Marvin A. Miller. (MILLER, MARVIN)
February 13, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by Kenneth A. Ghazey has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 02/23/2018. (ek)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 648 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Mr. Ghazey's time to move, answer or otherwise respond to the WSSC's Amended Complaint to February 23, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/09/2018. (ek)
February 12, 2018 Filing 647 Letter from Justin W. Lamson. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
February 9, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #642 Stipulation, filed by RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, RGM Chemical, LLC, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC submitted by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., RGM Chemical, LLC, C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 02/23/2018. (ek)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 646 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the Defendants' C&S Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals (of Georgia), Inc., RGM Chemicals, LLC. and RGM of Georgia, Ltd., time to answer Plaintiffs' amended complaint to February 23, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/08/2018. (ek)
February 8, 2018 Filing 645 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #560 Letter,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 8, 2018 Filing 644 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by Kenneth A. Ghazey. (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
February 8, 2018 Filing 643 Letter from Nicholas C. Theodorou re #641 Letter. (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
February 8, 2018 Filing 642 STIPULATION to Set Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Amended Complaints (RE: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation v. Frank A. Reichl, et al. and City of Richmond v. Frank A. Reichl, et al.) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
February 7, 2018 Filing 641 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro Regarding Kenneth A. Ghazey's In Camera Submission re #640 Notice (Other). (SHAPIRO, JAY)
February 6, 2018 Filing 640 NOTICE by Kenneth A. Ghazey of Submission for In Camera Review (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 639 LETTER ORDER regarding Kemira's use of Technology Assisted Review in its document review and production, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/05/2018. (ek)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER denying without prejudice WSSC's #567 Motion to Seal Document; On or before February 23, 2018, WSSC shall file a new motion to seal that fully complies with Local Rule 5.3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/05/2018. (ek)
February 2, 2018 Filing 637 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER denying Defendants' #635 Letter request for withdrawal of this Court's Order and Opinion; Defendants are hereby granted leave to Move for Reconsideration; Should Defendants choose to file a Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants may raise any additional arguments therein which they sought to include in their reply. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 02/02/2018. (ek)
February 1, 2018 Filing 635 Letter from Aaron Rubinstein re #633 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #634 Opinion. (RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
February 1, 2018 Filing 634 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/18. (sr, )
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER denying #551 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/18. (sr, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 632 Letter from Defendant Kemira Chemicals Regarding TAR Status Update. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER granting #630 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney JASON PETER HERNANDEZ terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/31/2018. (ek)
January 30, 2018 Filing 630 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , Jason P.Hernandez, by CITY OF CRESTON WATER WORKS DEPARTMENT, CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HERNANDEZ, JASON)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 629 TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of the parties' stipulation concerning certain Defendants' responses to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint, as well as the forthcoming amended pleadings to be filed by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore and the City of Richmond. (ECF No. 628). To the extent those Defendants plan on answering those pleadings, they shall file their answers on or before 2/23/18. To the extent those Defendants intend on filing motions to dismiss those pleadings, Defendants shall serve, but not file, any such motion on or before 2/23/18. Plaintiffs shall serve, but not file, any opposition submissions on or before 4/10/18. On 5/10/18, the parties shall electronically file any motions to dismiss these amended pleadings, along with all opposition and reply submissions.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/30/18. (nm, )
January 29, 2018 Filing 628 STIPULATION to extend Defendants' Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' (WSSC, Baltimore and Richmond) Amended Complaints by USALCO, LLC.. (RYAN, WILLIAM)
January 29, 2018 Filing 627 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #616 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 26, 2018 Filing 626 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Illinois-American Water Company, et al. ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 625 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to DPP Consolidated Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 624 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to IPP Consolidated Class Action Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 623 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the City of Shreveport's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 622 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 621 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 620 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of the City of Richmond ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI.(DEVINS, MICHAEL)
January 26, 2018 Filing 619 Letter from Justin W. Lamson. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
January 26, 2018 Filing 618 Letter from Gregory S. Slemp re 608 Order,. (SLEMP, GREGORY)
January 26, 2018 Filing 617 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re 608 Order,. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
January 26, 2018 Filing 616 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #605 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 615 STIPULATION AND ORDER Concerning Collection of Materials from Personal Accounts of GEO and GCC Custodians, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/25/2018. (ek)
January 25, 2018 Filing 614 Transcript of Proceedings of a Status Conference held on 1/19/2018, before Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Court Reporter/Transcriber KLJ Transcription Service/Holly Tisseyre (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 2/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (sm, )
January 25, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #612 Stipulation filed by CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, etc., submitted by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/26/2018. (ek)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant Vincent J. Opalewski shall move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs' complaint on or before January 26, 2018; Defendant Vincent J. Opalewski shall serve initial disclosure on or before January 31, 2018; All stays as to Defendant Vincent J. Opalewski are lifted in all respects, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/24/2018. (ek)
January 24, 2018 Filing 612 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Concerning Collection of Materials from Personal Accounts of GEO and GCC Custodians by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER)
January 23, 2018 Filing 611 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint. by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
January 23, 2018 Filing 610 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint. by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 609 STIPULATION and Order to Answer by VINCENT J. OPALEWSKI. (KRZASTEK, WALTER)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 608 TEXT ORDER - The Court is in receipt of counsel for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' letter dated 1/22/18. (ECF No. 605). All other parties (with the exception of those to whom the case has been stayed) shall file responses to that letter by 3:00 p.m. on 1/26/18.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/23/18. (nm, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 607 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint. by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
January 22, 2018 Filing 606 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint. by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
January 22, 2018 Filing 605 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 1/19/2018. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending American Securities Defendants' time to respond to the WSSC amended complaint no later than 21 days following the entry of a decision by the Court on the Motion to Dismiss filed by American Securities in the City of Greensboro action, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/19/2018. (ek)
January 19, 2018 Filing 603 STIPULATION (Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint ) by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff. (RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting Defendant's #600 Letter request withdrawing #159 Motion for a stay, etc. Motions terminated: #519 MOTION to Stay the Civil Proceedings as to Defendant Frank A. Reichl filed by FRANK A REICHL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/18/2018. (ek)
January 17, 2018 Filing 601 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re #591 MOTION for Discovery . (MILLER, MARVIN)
January 17, 2018 Filing 600 Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. regarding Reichl's pending motion to stay. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
January 16, 2018 Filing 599 RESPONSE to Motion filed by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC. re #591 MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
January 16, 2018 Filing 598 Letter from Jay N. Fastow re: Motion for Leave to File Reply re #570 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Letter re: D.E. 570, #2 Certificate of Service)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #595 Letter/Application for a Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bradley J. Demuth, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/11/2018. (ek)
January 11, 2018 Filing 596 NOTICE by CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address For Milberg LLP (TAYLOR, LINDSEY)
January 10, 2018 Filing 595 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James E. Cecchi, #2 Certification of Bradley J. Demuth, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 10, 2018 Filing 594 DECLARATION of Karl Lomberk re #588 Response (NOT Motion),, by CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of GCC Defendants Opposition to Baltimore and Richmond Application to Compel)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
January 9, 2018 Filing 593 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re #570 Letter,,. (MILLER, MARVIN)
January 9, 2018 Filing 592 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
January 8, 2018 Filing 591 MOTION for Discovery by CITY OF HOMESTEAD, FLORIDA. (MILLER, MARVIN)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 590 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying time to respond to Amended Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/08/2018. (ek)
January 5, 2018 Filing 589 Letter from Southern Ionics Incorporated, Milton Sundbeck, Kemira Chemicals, Inc., USALCO LLC, GEO Specialty Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals, Inc., C&S Chemicals (of Georgia), Inc., RGM Chemical, LLC, and RGM of Georgia, Ltd. and Delta Chemical Corporation in Opposition re #570 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GEO's Revised Responses to DPPs First Request, #2 Exhibit B - GCC Defendants' Second Revised Responses to DPPs First Request, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Kelly D. Curtin, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Natalie Day, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of John Tucker, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Aaron L. Casagrande, #7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Terry W. Posey, Jr., #8 Certificate of Service)(MAIRO, JOHN)
January 5, 2018 Filing 588 RESPONSE re #570 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 5, 2018 Filing 587 STIPULATION re #555 Amended Document,, (Stipulation and Proposed Order Modifying Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
January 5, 2018 Filing 586 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #570 Letter,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER granting Defendant's #583 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint from January 9, 2018 to January 31, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/05/2018. (ek)
January 4, 2018 Filing 584 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA(plaintiff in 17-5974) re #551 MOTION to Dismiss re: City of Greenboro North Carolina v. American Securities LLC et al. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 3, 2018 Filing 583 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation between Parties by USALCO, LLC.. (RYAN, WILLIAM)
January 3, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by Delta Chemical Corporation, John D. Besson and Rebecca L. Besson been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/31/2018. (ek)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 582 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying the Delta Defendants' time to respond to WSSC amended complaint by January 31, 2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 01/02/2018. (ek)
January 2, 2018 Filing 581 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #571 Letter,, #559 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 2, 2018 Filing 580 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 CONSENT ORDER extending certain Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order: Fact Discovery due by 11/26/2018. Class Certification Motions due by 7/23/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/28/2017. (ek)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 578 TEXT ORDER - The Court will conduct an in-person conference regarding the parties' outstanding discovery disputes on 1/19/18 at 2:00 p.m. Any counsel who either take no position on the disputes at issue, or who will rely entirely on the arguments presented by others, may participate by telephone. Counsel who wish to participate by telephone shall confer and coordinate a single conference call.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/28/17. (nm, )
December 28, 2017 Filing 577 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response to Amended Complaint filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by Delta Chemical Corporation. (WEBSTER, AMANDA)
December 28, 2017 Filing 576 Letter from Richard H. Epstein enclosing [Proposed] Consent Order Extending Certain Deadlines in Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Consent Order Extending Certain Deadlines in Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 27, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #563 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., RGM Chemical, LLC, C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2018. (ek)
December 27, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #569 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by ALEX AVRAAMIDES submitted by ALEX AVRAAMIDES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2018. (ek)
December 27, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #568 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response to Amended Complaint filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission filed by Delta Chemical Corporation submitted by Delta Chemical Corporation has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2018. (ek)
December 27, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #566 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #555 Amended Document,, Motion for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Respond Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(B) filed by AMITA GUPTA submitted by AMITA GUPTA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2018. (ek)
December 27, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #562 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to WSSC Amended Complaint filed by USALCO, LLC. submitted by USALCO, LLC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/09/2018. (ek)
December 26, 2017 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #573 Stipulation filed by Milton Sundbeck, SOUTHERN IONICS, INC. submitted by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., Milton Sundbeck has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 01/22/2018. (ek)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 STIPULATINO AND ORDER Extending Southern lonics Incorporated, Milton Sundbeck, Defendants' time to respond to amended TO Complaint by January 22, 2018, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/26/2017. (ek)
December 22, 2017 Filing 574 ANSWER to Complaint of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's Amended Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
December 22, 2017 Filing 573 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint of Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC., Milton Sundbeck. (MAIRO, JOHN)
December 22, 2017 Filing 572 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission's First Amended Complaint by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
December 21, 2017 Filing 571 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re Reply Letter Requesting Court Order re: DPPs' Discovery Deficiencies re #560 Letter,,, #565 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 21, 2017 Filing 570 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 20, 2017 Filing 569 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALEX AVRAAMIDES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SMITH, DENNIS)
December 20, 2017 Filing 568 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Response to Amended Complaint filed by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission by Delta Chemical Corporation. (WEBSTER, AMANDA)
December 19, 2017 Filing 567 MOTION to Seal Document #555 Amended Document,, by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. (Attachments: #1 Statement In Lieu of Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(LAMSON, JUSTIN)
December 19, 2017 Filing 566 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #555 Amended Document,, Motion for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Respond Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(B) by AMITA GUPTA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
December 15, 2017 Filing 565 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #560 Letter,,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 15, 2017 Filing 564 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #561 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 15, 2017 Filing 563 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Response to to the Amended Complaint filed [D.E. 555] in the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission v. Reichl, et al., 17-cv-11416 (JLL)(JAD).. (DALBEY, JOHN)
December 15, 2017 Filing 562 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to WSSC Amended Complaint by USALCO, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RYAN, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2017 Filing 561 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re Depositions / re #557 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 13, 2017 Filing 560 Letter from Richard H. Epstein Requesting Court Order re: DPPs' Discovery Deficiencies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 13, 2017 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #556 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENTEK, INC., CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/9/18. (sr, )
December 12, 2017 Filing 559 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(CECCHI, JAMES)
December 8, 2017 Filing 558 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #553 Letter. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
December 8, 2017 Filing 557 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES)
December 8, 2017 Filing 556 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to General Chemical Corporation, General Chemical Performance Products, LLC, General Chemical LLC, GenTek Inc., Chemtrade Logistics Income Fund, Chemtrade Logistics Inc., Chemtrade Chemicals Corporation, Chemtrade Chemicals US, LLC, and Chemtrade Solutions, LLC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
December 5, 2017 Filing 555 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission. Amended Complaint. (LAMSON, JUSTIN) USEALED per #658 Order. Modified on 2/20/2018 (ek). NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. Modified on 12/13/2017 (jr).
November 22, 2017 Filing 554 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #547 Letter, #542 Order, #548 Letter. (CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 21, 2017 Filing 553 Letter from Nicholas C. Theodorou re #545 Letter. (FINSTERWALD, MARK)
November 20, 2017 Filing 552 BRIEF in Support filed by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff re #551 MOTION to Dismiss re: City of Greenboro North Carolina v. American Securities LLC et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Rubinstein in Support of the Defendants Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A to Rubinstein Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Rubinstein Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Rubinstein Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Rubinstein Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Rubinstein Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Rubinstein Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Rubinstein Declaration)(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 20, 2017 Filing 551 MOTION to Dismiss re: City of Greenboro North Carolina v. American Securities LLC et al. by AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
November 20, 2017 Filing 550 Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq. Revised letter to The Honorable Judge Joseph A. Dickson to reflect missing portion of footnote 2 filed today at Dckt. No. 549. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
November 20, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee for GEOFRREY M. GAMBLE, ESQ.: $ 150, receipt number NEW035003 (dam)
November 20, 2017 Filing 549 Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. as a reply to the opposition filed by only the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs to Reichl's Motion to Stay. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
November 17, 2017 Filing 548 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #542 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
November 17, 2017 Filing 547 Letter from Discovery Letter re #542 Order. (WARE, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 17, 2017 Filing 546 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro re #519 MOTION to Stay the Civil Proceedings as to Defendant Frank A. Reichl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
November 17, 2017 Filing 545 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
November 17, 2017 Filing 544 Amended ANSWER to Complaint of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
November 17, 2017 Filing 543 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY MAURICE GAMBLE on behalf of Delta Chemical Corporation (GAMBLE, GEOFFREY)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #539 Letter request regarding findings of the Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/13/2017. (ek)
November 14, 2017 Filing 541 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (DPPs' Consolidated Amended Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS, INC.(DALBEY, JOHN)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 STIPULATION AND ORDER of stay of civil proceedings as to Defendants Brian Steppig and Vincent Opalewski, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/13/2017. (ek)
November 10, 2017 Filing 539 Letter from James E. Cecchi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/08/2017. (ek)
November 8, 2017 Filing 537 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig and Vincent Opalewski. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
November 7, 2017 Filing 536 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Complaint by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INC., CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC.. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
November 7, 2017 Filing 535 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 3, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Transcriber: KLJ Transcription Services, LLC (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2018. (mfr)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Order of MDL Panel (CTO #12) transferring a certain action from the District of Maryland; Case# 1:17-03060 to this court. (gh, )
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 533 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/03/2017. (ek)
November 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 11/3/2017. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
November 3, 2017 Filing 532 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. HUGHES, JR on behalf of SOUTHERN IONICS, INC. (HUGHES, WILLIAM)
November 2, 2017 Filing 531 Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. regarding briefing schedule. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2017 Filing 530 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY D. CURTIN on behalf of SOUTHERN IONICS, INC. (CURTIN, KELLY)
November 1, 2017 Filing 529 Letter from Jay N. Fastow. (LAMSON, JUSTIN)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 MDL TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that the TIME of the in person status conference scheduled for 11/3/17 has been moved to 1:30 p.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/31/17. (nm, )
October 31, 2017 Filing 527 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed Defendant Reichl's Motion to Stay Civil Proceedings, (ECF No. 519), and the parties' subsequent letters. (ECF Nos. 524, 525). The parties shall meet and confer regarding the preparation of a stipulated order resolving Mr. Reichl's stay request. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement on Mr. Reichl's request, they shall submit a briefing schedule for Mr. Reichl's motion for the Court's consideration. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/18/17. (nm, )
October 17, 2017 Filing 525 Letter from Michael B. Himmel, Esq. on behalf of Frank A. Reichl. (HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
October 17, 2017 Filing 524 Letter from Marvin A. Miller in Response to October 13, 2017 letter filed by Defendant Frank A. Reichl (Dkt. 519-1) re #519 MOTION to Stay the Civil Proceedings as to Defendant Frank A. Reichl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MILLER, MARVIN)
October 17, 2017 Filing 523 ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 TEXT ORDER - The Court will conduct an in-person conference regarding the parties' outstanding discovery disputes, (ECF Nos. 421, 424, 425, 428, 431, 436, 454, 466, 467, 478 and 484), at 10:00 a.m. on 11/3/17 in Courtroom 2D of the MLK Building and U.S. Courthouse.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/17. (nm, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 521 Letter from James E. Cecchi re #424 Letter, #466 Brief,, #436 Letter,, #428 Letter, #421 Letter, #425 Letter, #478 Letter,, #467 Letter,,. (CECCHI, JAMES)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #517 Letter request for an extension of time until November 2, 2017 for Baltimore and Richmond to move to strike certain affirmative defenses asserted by Defendants in their respective responsive pleadings to the Complaints filed by Baltimore and Richmond, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/16/2017. (ek)
October 13, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee for IRMA ESPINO, ESQ. $ 150, receipt number NEW034688 (dam)
October 13, 2017 Filing 519 MOTION to Stay the Civil Proceedings as to Defendant Frank A. Reichl by FRANK A REICHL. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(HIMMEL, MICHAEL)
October 13, 2017 Filing 518 NOTICE of Appearance by IRMA ESPINO on behalf of ILLINOIS-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, INDIANA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, IOWA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, MISSOURI-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, NEW JERSEY-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, PENNSYLVANIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY, VIRGINIA-AMERICAN WATER COMPANY (ESPINO, IRMA)
October 13, 2017 Filing 517 Letter from Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation and City of Richmond re: 491, 492, 493, 494, 496, 497, 498, 499, 500, 501, 502, 503, 504, 505, 507, 508, 510, 511. (GALLAGHER, THOMAS)
October 10, 2017 Filing 516 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Defendant Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint (Docket No. 220) by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer to the Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/05/2017. (ek)
October 4, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee as to AARON RUBINSTEIN, ESQ. C. SCOTT LENT, ESQ. AND PAUL Q. ANDREWS, ESQ: $ 450., receipt number NEW034578 (DD, )
October 4, 2017 Filing 514 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL Q. ANDREWS on behalf of AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff (ANDREWS, PAUL)
October 4, 2017 Filing 513 NOTICE of Appearance by C. SCOTT LENT on behalf of AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff (LENT, C.)
October 4, 2017 Filing 512 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON RUBINSTEIN on behalf of AMERICAN SECURITIES LLC, Matthew Lebaron, Scott Wolff (RUBINSTEIN, AARON)
October 2, 2017 Filing 511 ANSWER to Complaint (to The Mayor And City Council of Baltimore Complaint) by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
October 2, 2017 Filing 510 ANSWER to Complaint (to City of Richmond Complaint) by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
September 29, 2017 Filing 509 Letter from Counsel for Brian Steppig and Vincent Opalewski. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(SPRINZEN, NICOLE)
September 29, 2017 Filing 508 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (to City of Richmond Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC., C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
September 29, 2017 Filing 507 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation's Complaint)) by C&S CHEMICALS, INC, RGM Chemical, LLC, RGM OF GEORGIA, LTD, C&S CHEMICALS (OF GEORGIA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #495 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, etc. Attorney ELIZABETH R. ODETTE; RACHEL A. KITZE COLLINS and CHARLES N. NAUEN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 09/26/2017. (ek)
September 25, 2017 Filing 505 ANSWER to Complaint City of Richmond by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
September 25, 2017 Filing 504 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore's Complaint (17-cv-4659)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 25, 2017 Filing 503 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Richmond's Complaint (17-cv-4656)) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS, INC, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 25, 2017 Filing 502 ANSWER to Complaint Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, A Municipal Corporation by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
September 25, 2017 Filing 501 ANSWER to Complaint of the City of Richmond, Virginia by Delta Chemical Corporation.(WEBSTER, AMANDA)
September 25, 2017 Filing 500 ANSWER to Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Maryland by Delta Chemical Corporation.(WEBSTER, AMANDA)
September 25, 2017 Filing 499 ANSWER to Complaint of the City of Richmond by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
September 25, 2017 Filing 498 ANSWER to Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
September 25, 2017 Filing 497 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to City of Richmond's Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2017 Filing 496 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore's Complaint by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2017 Filing 495 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Charles N. Nauen, Elizabeth R. Odette and Rachel A. Kitze Collins by CITY OF DULUTH, MINNESOTA, CITY OF FERGUS FALLS, MINNESOTA, CITY OF MINNEAPOLIS, CITY OF ROCHESTER, MINNESOTA(plaintiff in 17-5974), CITY OF ST. CLOUD, MINNESOTA, City of Milwaukee, City of Rochester, Minnesota(Plaintiff in 16-733), Lake Restoration, Inc., METROPOLITAN COUNCIL, TEEMARK CORPORATION, Water, Light, Power and Building Commission of the City of East Grand Forks, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BRUCKNER, W.)
September 25, 2017 Filing 494 Mayor and City Council of Baltimore ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
September 25, 2017 Filing 493 City of Richmond ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
September 25, 2017 Filing 492 ANSWER to Complaint of the City of Richmond, Virginia by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
September 25, 2017 Filing 491 ANSWER to Complaint of the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, a Municipal Corporation by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER permitting the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs a 7-day extension of time to move to strike certain affirmative defenses asserted by defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/22/17. (sr, )
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER permitting Southern Ionics Incorporated an extension of time until 10/2/7 to file answers to the complaints. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/22/17. (sr, )
September 22, 2017 Filing 488 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re Second Request for Seven Day Extension of Time to Move to Strike Certain of Defendants' Affirmative Defenses. (MILLER, MARVIN)
September 21, 2017 Filing 487 Letter from from John S. Mairo (counsel for Southern Ionics Incorporated), Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaints of City of Richmond v. Reichl, et al. and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Reichl, et al.. (MAIRO, JOHN)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 MDL ORDER Granting #482 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re 455, 456, 459, 460, 461, 462, 463, 464, 465., requesting Seven day extension of time until 9/25/2017 for the IPPs to move to strike certain affirmative defenses, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/14/2017. (JB, )
September 14, 2017 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #485 Order, submitted by C&S CHEMICALS, INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/2/2017. (JB, )
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MDL ORDER Granting #483 Letter from John D. Dalbey (counsel for C&S), requesting one week extension of time to respond to the Complaints of City of Richmond v. Reichl, et al. and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Reichl, et al., until Monday 10/2/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/14/2017. (JB, )
September 14, 2017 Filing 484 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #425 Letter. (EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 14, 2017 Filing 483 Letter from John D. Dalbey (counsel for C&S), requesting extension of time to respond to the Complaints of City of Richmond v. Reichl, et al. and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Reichl, et al.. (DALBEY, JOHN)
September 13, 2017 Filing 482 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re 455, 456, 459, 460, 461, 462, 463, 464, 465. (MILLER, MARVIN)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER permitting C&S Chemicals, Inc. a 2-week extension of time to serve its responses to the IPP's First Set of Documents Requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/13/17. (sr, )
September 12, 2017 Filing 480 Letter from John D. Dalbey (counsel for C&S Chemicals, Inc. to The Honorable Jose L. Linares) (requesting a two-week extension of time for C&S to serve its responses to the IPP's First Set of Document Requests to C&S). (DALBEY, JOHN)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER permitting Indirect purchaser Plaintiffs a 14-day extension of time to move to strike affirmative defenses asserted by Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/12/17. (sr, )
September 11, 2017 Filing 478 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J re #466 Brief,, #467 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(CECCHI, JAMES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
September 11, 2017 Filing 477 Letter from Marvin A. Miller re #442 Answer to Complaint,. (MILLER, MARVIN)
September 7, 2017 Filing 476 ANSWER to Complaint of Illinois-American Water Company, et al. by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
September 7, 2017 Filing 475 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to American Water Company Plaintiffs' Complaint (17-cv-2752) by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
September 7, 2017 Filing 474 ANSWER to Complaint by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
September 7, 2017 Filing 473 ANSWER to Complaint (American Water Company Plaintiffs' Complaint) by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
September 7, 2017 Filing 472 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint of Illinois-American Water Company, et al., 17-cv-2752) by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS US, LLC, CHEMTRADE LOGISTICS INCOME FUND, CHEMTRADE SOLUTIONS LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION, GENERAL CHEMICAL PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, LLC, GENERAL CHEMICAL, LLC., GENTEK, INC..(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)
September 7, 2017 Filing 471 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
September 7, 2017 Filing 470 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Illinois-Water Company, et al. Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
September 7, 2017 Filing 469 ANSWER to Complaint of American Water Plaintiffs by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER that IPPs' letter motion for central enforcement of subpoenas is GRANTED; this Court will centrally enforce all subpoenas issued out of the MDL; any objections or motions to quash subpoenas issued out of the MDL shall be filed directly in the MDL. Attys. are permitted to make a limited appearance to contest a subpoena w/out being deemed to otherwise consent to the jurisdiction of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/5/17. (DD, )
August 31, 2017 Filing 467 Letter from Richard H. Epstein re #436 Letter,, #454 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(EPSTEIN, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 31, 2017 Filing 466 BRIEF /Response Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute (WARE, ROBERT)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
August 28, 2017 Filing 465 ANSWER to Complaint Answer of Geo Specialty Chemicals, Inc. to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by GEO SPECIALTY CHEMICALS, INC..(WARE, ROBERT)
August 28, 2017 Filing 464 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Milton Sundbeck in Response to the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Milton Sundbeck.(MAIRO, JOHN)
August 28, 2017 Filing 463 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Defenses of Southern Ionics Incorporated in Response to the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by SOUTHERN IONICS, INC..(MAIRO, JOHN)
August 28, 2017 Filing 462 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Kenneth A. Ghazey.(FINSTERWALD, MARK)
August 28, 2017 Filing 461 ANSWER to Complaint Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC..(CASHDAN, JEFFREY)
August 28, 2017 Filing 460 ANSWER to Complaint Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM)
August 28, 2017 Filing 459 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALEX AVRAAMIDES.(SMITH, DENNIS)
August 28, 2017 Filing 458 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (ECF #220) by USALCO, LLC..(RYAN, WILLIAM) Modified on 8/28/2017 (gh).
August 28, 2017 Filing 457 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JOSHUA S. BAUCHNER terminated. (BAUCHNER, JOSHUA)
August 28, 2017 Filing 456 ANSWER to Complaint Amita Gupta's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Docket #242) by AMITA GUPTA.(FELDBERG, MICHAEL)
August 28, 2017 Filing 455 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to IPPs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by C&S CHEMICALS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DALBEY, JOHN)
August 25, 2017 Filing 454 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro to Judge Dickson re #436 Letter,,. (SHAPIRO, JAY)
August 24, 2017 Filing 453 NOTICE of Appearance by AARON ANDREW NICHOLS on behalf of USALCO, LLC. (NICHOLS, AARON)
August 24, 2017 Filing 452 Letter from Jay B. Shapiro. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order On Central Enforcement of Subpoenas)(SHAPIRO, JAY)
August 24, 2017 Filing 451 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenneth A. Ghazey, KEMIRA CHEMICALS, INC., filed by FLAMBEAU RIVER PAPERS, LLC(plaintiff in 17-5974), CENTRAL ARKANSAS WATER(plaintiff in 17-5974), SUEZ WATER NEW JERSEY INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), MOBILE AREA WATER AND SEWER SYSTEM(Plaintiff in 16-843), CITY OF GREENSBORO, NORTH CAROLINA, City of Rochester, Minnesota(Plaintiff in 16-733), SUEZ WATER ENVIORNMENTAL SERVICES INC., SUEZ WATER NEW YORK INC.(Plaintiff in 15-8697), SUEZ WATER PENNSYLVANIA INC., CITY OF CHARLOTTE, NORTH CAROLINA, CITY OF TEXARKANA, ARKANSAS, CITY OF TEXARKANA, TEXAS D/B/A TEXARKANA WATER UTILITIES, CITY OF SACRAMENTO, SUEZ WATER PRINCETON MEADOWS INC..(CECCHI, JAMES)