OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC. et al

Plaintiff: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Defendant: LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., TEXTRON INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., ATLAS REFINERY INC., SETON COMPANY INC., CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FORT JAMES LLC, ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., RTC PROPERTIES INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ZENECA INC., THE NEWARK GROUP INC., CANNING GUMM LLC, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, DII INDUSTRIES LLC, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV INC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, 3M COMPANY, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., HEXION INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, GOODRICH CORPORATION, BEROL CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, ARKEMA INC., GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, MALLINCKRODT LLC, QUALITY CARRIERS INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., NEWELL BRANDS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PHARMACIA LLC, RECKITT BENCKISER, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INGREDION INCORPORATED, ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, AVENTISUB LLC, BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, MARATHON OIL CORPORATION, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., ASHLAND LLC, ALDEN LEEDS INC., BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, HEXCEL CORPORATION, SEQUA CORPORATION, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, BASF CORPORATION, COATS & CLARK INC., NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., CRODA INC., SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., NOVARTIS CORPORATION, PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C., TIFFANY AND COMPANY, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, APOLAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, STWB INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CONOPCO INC., NOVELIS CORPORATION, PHV THADDEUS H. DRISCOLL and PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: PMC GLOBAL INC.
3Rd Party Defendant: BIBBS AUTO RECYCLING, INC., ALEXANDRIA PLASTIC MOLDING AND MANUFACTURING, INC., STOVER AVENUE CORPORATION, ACE AUTO SALVAGE, JOHN DOES 1-100 and ACE AUTOMATIC CORP
Special Master: THOMAS P. SCRIVO
Case Number: 2:2018cv11273
Filed: June 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Newark Office
County: Essex
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Joseph A Dickson
2 Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9613
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 739 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC.(HOLSINGER, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 738 Royce Associates, a Limited Partnership's ANSWER to Complaint and Certification of Service, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP.(GAFFREY, MARC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 737 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by HARRIS CORPORATION.(PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 736 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC.(PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 735 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to Counterclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Counterclaim , ANSWER to Counterclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC.(DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
August 14, 2019 Filing 734 Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Complaint , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , Covanta Essex Company ANSWER to Crossclaim , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by COVANTA ESSEX CO..(KELLY, BARBARA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 733 National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Complaint , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , National-Standard LLC ANSWER to Crossclaim , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC.(KELLY, BARBARA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 732 Novartis Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by NOVARTIS CORPORATION.(GANNON, KATHLEEN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 731 ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC.(DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
August 14, 2019 Filing 730 BASF Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by BASF CORPORATION.(GANNON, KATHLEEN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 729 ANSWER to Complaint of Occidental Chemical Corporation, ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CANNING GUMM LLC.(DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
August 14, 2019 Filing 728 BASF Catalysts LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by BASF CATALYSTS LLC.(GANNON, KATHLEEN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 727 Croda, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CRODA INC..(PALMERSON, JACLYN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 726 Otis Elevator Company ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY.(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 725 Kalama Specialty Chemicals, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims by KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC..(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 724 Emerald Kalama Chemical LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims by EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC.(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 723 Noveon Hilton Davis, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims by NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC..(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 722 Goodrich Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and defenses to complaint and counterclaims by GOODRICH CORPORATION.(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 721 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by NEWELL BRANDS INC..(RIAZ, AHMED)
August 14, 2019 Filing 720 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by SEQUA CORPORATION.(BROWN, KEGAN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 719 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by BEROL CORPORATION.(RIAZ, AHMED)
August 14, 2019 Filing 718 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PPG INDUSTRIES INC..(BROWN, KEGAN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 717 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC..(MOSHANG, NICOLE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 716 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(BROWN, KEGAN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 715 US Steel Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM CounterClaim against All Plaintiffs by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service to Answer)(MONDORA, CHARLES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 714 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by MALLINCKRODT LLC.(HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 713 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION.(HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 712 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by ASHLAND LLC, ISP CHEMICALS LLC.(HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
August 14, 2019 Filing 711 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims and, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by COATS & CLARK INC..(GRACER, JEFFREY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 710 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC..(LAMBERT, REYNOLD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 709 Cooper Industries, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(SOMMER, MAURA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 708 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC..(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 707 CORRECTED ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by RTC PROPERTIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HUDSON CAMPBELL, ANDREA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 706 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC..(MUSCATO, ANDREW)
August 14, 2019 Filing 705 ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC..(SKEELE, KATHERINE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 704 ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC..(MCSTRAVICK, PATRICK)
August 14, 2019 Filing 703 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P..(DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 702 Enpro Industries Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC..(BOWER, PHILLIP)
August 14, 2019 Filing 701 Public Service Electric and Gas Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY.(GARDNER, KEVIN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 700 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION.(MACK, KENNETH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 699 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to CROSSCLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by THE OKONITE COMPANY INC..(MONTANO, JAMES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 698 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses, Answer to Cross-Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY.(HARRIS, GLENN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 697 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses and Answer to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION.(MARRA, RALPH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 696 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC..(GOTTLIEB, IRA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 695 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY.(HARRIS, GLENN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 694 Safety-Kleen Envirosystems Company ANSWER to Complaint Amended Answer with Certificate of Service, Answer to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY.(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 693 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by HEXCEL CORPORATION.(HARPER, RICHARD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 692 McKesson Corporation ANSWER to Complaint Amended Answer with Certificate of Service, Answers to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 691 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by DII INDUSTRIES LLC.(HARPER, RICHARD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 690 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses, Answer to Cross-Claims and, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY.(HARRIS, GLENN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 689 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CONOPCO INC..(HARPER, RICHARD)
August 14, 2019 Filing 688 Corrected Copy ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(BENNETT, HERBERT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 687 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC..(KAZAN, BARRY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 686 ANSWER to Complaint with Defenses, Answer to Cross-Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by ARKEMA INC..(HARRIS, GLENN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 685 PHARMACIA LLC'S ANSWER to Crossclaim with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM (CORRECTED COPY) against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PHARMACIA LLC.(GULLACE, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 684 ANSWER to Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by BENJAMIN MOORE & CO..(ARONSON, ERIC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 683 ANSWER to Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC..(ARONSON, ERIC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 682 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by STWB INC..(DUFFY, TIMOTHY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 681 ANSWER to Complaint Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by ALDEN LEEDS INC..(WILDE, CANDEE)
August 14, 2019 Filing 680 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CBS CORPORATION.(FELEZZOLA, MARC)
August 14, 2019 Filing 679 Revere Smelting & Refining Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION.(MCDONALD, SHANNON)
August 14, 2019 Filing 678 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by RTC PROPERTIES INC..(HUDSON CAMPBELL, ANDREA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 677 Sun Chemical Corporation ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DONOVAN, MARTHA)
August 14, 2019 Filing 676 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC..(STEWART, JAMES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 675 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION.(STEWART, JAMES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 674 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CNA HOLDINGS LLC.(DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
August 14, 2019 Filing 673 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC..(KLOCK, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 672 Safety-Kleen Envirosystems Company ANSWER to Complaint And Defenses and Answer to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY.(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 671 McKesson Corp. ANSWER to Complaint And Defenses and Answer to Cross Claims, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MCKESSON CORPORATION.(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 670 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by TIFFANY AND COMPANY.(KLOCK, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 669 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by LEGACY VULCAN LLC.(RICH, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 668 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , ANSWER to CROSSCLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by THE OKONITE COMPANY INC..(MONTANO, JAMES)
August 14, 2019 Filing 667 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses, ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by THE NEWARK GROUP INC..(BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 666 ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by NOVELIS CORPORATION.(KALLER, EMILY)
August 14, 2019 Filing 665 ANSWER to Complaint DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC.(HOLSINGER, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 664 ANSWER to Complaint , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , ANSWER to Crossclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION.(MICHAEL, CURTIS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 663 PHARMACIA LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PHARMACIA LLC.(GULLACE, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 662 The Sherwin-Williams Company ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(BENNETT, HERBERT)
August 14, 2019 Filing 661 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by MI HOLDINGS INC..(KLOCK, JOHN)
August 14, 2019 Filing 660 Textron, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ASHLAND LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by TEXTRON INC..(BUERMANN, GEORGE)
August 13, 2019 Filing 659 Letter from Special Master Thomas P. Scrivo re #646 Order Referring Case to Special Master. (SCRIVO, THOMAS)
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Change of Address #658 filed by John Holsinger on on 8/12/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (sm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 658 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOHN RALPH HOLSINGER (HOLSINGER, JOHN)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 657 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of counsels letter seeking clarification on attendance at the 8/27/19 in-person status conference. (ECF No. 655). Defendants liaison counsel and Plaintiffs counsel must attend in person. Due to the number of parties in this matter, coupled with the often full agenda presented at each status conference, all non-liaison counsel who wish to be heard on a matter must also attend in person. Non-liaison counsel who do not wish to be heard on a matter may either forgo attendance and rely on the representation of their liaison counsel; attend the conference by phone for listening purposes only; or attend in person. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 08/12/19. (TJD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 656 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM CHARLES ARNOLD on behalf of ASHLAND LLC, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC (ARNOLD, ADAM)
August 8, 2019 Filing 655 Letter from Liaison Counsel re 8/27 conf. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 654 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Cole Schotz P.C.'s Motion for Leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Seton Company, Inc., (ECF No. 634). The Court will address the Motion at the 8/27/19 in-person Status Conference. Cole Schotz P.C. and a representative from Seton Company, Inc. are required to attend. Cole Schotz P.C. shall promptly notify Seton Company, Inc. of the date, time, and location of the in-person Status Conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/7/19. (jbb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 653 NOTICE of Appearance by RALPH JOSEPH MARRA, JR on behalf of BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION (MARRA, RALPH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 652 Substitution of Attorney -. (BROWN, RUSSELL)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 651 TEXT ORDER: Per counsel's request, and with consent, (ECF No. 650), the in-person Conference scheduled for 8/20/19 is adjourned to 11:00 a.m. on 8/27/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/5/19. (jbb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 650 Letter from Liaison Counsel re 649 Order,. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 649 TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that an in-person Status Conference is scheduled for 8/20/19 at 11:00 a.m in Newark-Courtroom 2D with Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson and Special Master Thomas. P. Scrivo. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/2/19. (jbb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 648 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #647 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #475 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part #477 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part #479 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part #493 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/31/2019. etc. (dam, )
July 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #644 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission for Michael D. Goodstein, Esq., and Anne E. Lynch, Esq.. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. THOMAS P. SCRIVO appointed.. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 7/30/2019. (ld, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 645 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARRIS CORPORATION. (PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
July 26, 2019 Filing 644 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission for Michael D. Goodstein, Esq., and Anne E. Lynch, Esq. by RTC PROPERTIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(HUDSON CAMPBELL, ANDREA)
July 26, 2019 Filing 643 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS; JOSEPH H. BLUM and DAVID W. FIELD terminated.. (HUDSON CAMPBELL, ANDREA)
July 26, 2019 Filing 642 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA LYNNE HUDSON CAMPBELL on behalf of RTC PROPERTIES INC. (HUDSON CAMPBELL, ANDREA)
July 17, 2019 Filing 641 NOTICE by HEXION INC. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
July 9, 2019 Filing 640 Letter from Small Parties Group re #638 Letter, #633 Order,,,,, #636 Letter, #635 Letter. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 639 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., 3M COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AVENTISUB LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL INC., PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC. re #632 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 638 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. and Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. re #633 Order,,,,, #636 Letter, #635 Letter. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
June 28, 2019 Filing 637 NOTICE of Change of Address by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR (WALSH, WILLIAM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 636 Letter from Small Parties Group re #633 Order,,,,,. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 635 Letter from Defendants to Magistrate Judge Dickson. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
June 24, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #634 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 634 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by SETON COMPANY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KLEIN, WENDY)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 633 TEXT ORDER: As the Court advised the parties at the May 21, 2019 telephonic status conference, the Court intends to appoint Thomas P. Scrivo, Esq., of the firm O'Toole Scrivo as the special master in the underlying action. The special master's hourly rate is $550.00. His responsibilities are as follows: The special master shall oversee the schedule for completion of discovery and all discovery disputes and motions related thereto pursuant to procedures for practice that the special master may establish and modify as necessary. The authority of the special master hereunder shall be coextensive with those of a Magistrate Judge in the District of New Jersey pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.1, and as such, any appeal of an action or decision made by the special master shall be filed with the Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.1(c)(1). The special master shall also conduct all settlement conferences at such time and manner as he deems appropriate. The parties may review the full proposed Order attached to this Text Order. Any party that wishes to object to the appointment of Thomas P. Scrivo, Esq., as special master shall file their objection no later than 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/21/2019. (jqb, )
June 19, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #632 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 632 MOTION for Protective Order by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 631 RESPONSE to Motion filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re #624 MOTION to Compel Brief in Support (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
June 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Timothy J. Bryant: $ 150, receipt number NEW039814 (sm)
June 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Benjamin S. Piper: $ 150, receipt number NEW039813 (sm)
June 14, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Jeffrey D. Talbert: $ 150, receipt number NEW039812 (sm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 630 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey D. Talbert, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 629 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Benjamin S. Piper, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 628 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Timothy J. Bryant, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 627 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANNON MARY MCDONALD on behalf of REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION (MCDONALD, SHANNON)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Jeffrey D. Talbert, Esq., Timothy J. Bryant, Esq. and Benjamin S. Piper, Esq. #625 ; they shall pay the annual fee to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection within 20 days from the date of entry of this Order; and shall each make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 6/10/2019. (sm)
June 10, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #625 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 7, 2019 Filing 625 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of admission pro hac vice, #2 Certification of Timothy J. Bryant in support of pro hac vice admission, #3 Certification of Benjamin S. Piper in support of pro hac vice admission, #4 Certification of Jeffrey D. Talbert in support of pro hac vice admission, #5 Text of Proposed Order for admission pro hac vice)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 6, 2019 SetDeadlines as to #622 MOTION to Compel Production of Occidental Chemical Corporation's Sampling Data, #624 MOTION to Compel Brief in Support. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 624 MOTION to Compel Brief in Support by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., 3M COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AVENTISUB LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL INC., PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 623 Letter from David H. Altman, Esq.. (ALTMAN, DAVID)
June 5, 2019 Filing 622 MOTION to Compel Production of Occidental Chemical Corporation's Sampling Data by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., 3M COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, AVENTISUB LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL INC., PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Compliance, #2 Certification of Joseph Blum, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion to Compel Production, #18 Certificate of Service)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 621 Letter from Steven M. Richman re #620 Letter, #619 Notice (Other). (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
June 4, 2019 Filing 620 Letter from from Small Parties Group to Judge Dickson re list of counsel that attended May 21st Status Conference. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
June 4, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Steven D. Soden, Esq. and Robert G. Rooney, Esq.: $ 300, receipt number NEW039726 (sm,
June 4, 2019 Filing 619 NOTICE by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION of May 21, 2019 Status Conference participants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 23, 2019 Filing 618 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on May 21, 2019, before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Transcriber: KLJ Trancription Service, LLC (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2019. (mfr)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 617 TEXT ORDER: Docket entries 599 and 613 appear to be duplicate motions for leave to appear pro hac vice. As the motion filed under docket entry 613 has been granted, (see ECF No. 615), docket entry 599 shall be denied as moot. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/23/19. (jbb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 616 Letter from Lanny S. Kurzweil. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting #613 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven D. Soden and Robert G. Rooney, Esq.; each shall pay the annual fee to the new Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection and each shall make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/22/2019. (sm)
May 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #613 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER PERMITTING THE PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NANCY M. WILMS; shall pay the fees required by New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2(a) and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, U.S.D.C., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/21/2019. (sm)
May 21, 2019 Filing 613 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Blum in Support of Admissions of Soden & Rooney, #2 Certification of Steven D. Soden in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Certification of Robert G. Rooney in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 612 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's statements at the 5/21/19 telephone conference, Defendants shall file their motion to compel discovery by 6/5/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/21/19. (jbb)
May 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/21/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR) (jbb)
May 21, 2019 Filing 611 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jane C. Luxton to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PAPA, MICHAEL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 610 RESPONSE. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 609 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY REGARDING CHARGEURS, INC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/20/2019. (sm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 608 RESPONSE re #606 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #599 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Soden and Robert Rooney. Motion set for 6/3/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 607 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Nancy M. Wilms, Esq by MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
May 17, 2019 Filing 606 Letter from Defendants re May 21, 2019 Status Conference Submission. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 605 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re 601 Order, #604 Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 17, 2019 Filing 604 STATUS REPORT Joint by Plaintiff and by All Defendants. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
May 17, 2019 Filing 603 Letter from STEVEN RICHMAN re 598 Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery)(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 602 NOTICE by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re 601 Order, Notice of Telephonic Status Conference (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 601 TEXT ORDER: Per Plaintiff's informal request, and with consent, the in-person status conference set for 5/21/19 at 2:00 p.m., (ECF No. 550), has been converted to a TELEPHONE status conference. Plaintiff shall kindly circulate a dial-in number or otherwise coordinate the call to Chambers at 973-645-2580. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/13/19. (jbb)
May 10, 2019 Filing 600 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOANN NEEDLEMAN and STEVEN M. RICHMAN terminated. Attorney MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION,MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III for REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION added.. (PAPA, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 599 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Steven Soden and Robert Rooney by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 598 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant Chargeurs, Inc.'s letter dated 3/14/19, (ECF No. 573), and Plaintiff's response dated 3/20/19, (ECF No. 574). Plaintiff and Defendant Chargeurs, Inc. shall meet and confer and either propose a schedule for limited discovery on personal jurisdiction, or file a letter setting forth their respective positions on or objections to taking limited discovery on personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff and Defendant Chargeurs, Inc. shall file the proposed schedule or their position letters by 5/17/19. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/7/19. (jbb)
April 24, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BRIAN C. FREEMAN, ESQ and JAMES P. RAY, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. re #454 and #455 docket entries. (sms)
April 18, 2019 Filing 597 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #550 Order,. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 596 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIBBS AUTO RECYCLING, INC.. (PARISI, JAMES)
April 16, 2019 Filing 595 ANSWER to Third Party Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ACE AUTO SALVAGE, ACE AUTOMATIC CORP, ALEXANDRIA PLASTIC MOLDING AND MANUFACTURING, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, STOVER AVENUE CORPORATION by BIBBS AUTO RECYCLING, INC..(PARISI, JAMES)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER/NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; that the above-captioned action has been automatically stayed as against the Debtor-defendant(s).. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/11/2019. (ld, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 593 NOTICE by HEXION INC. of stay (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER that Charles E. Merrill, Esq., admitted pro hac vice, is withdrawn from the list of ECR recipients in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/10/2019. (sm)
April 9, 2019 Filing 591 NOTICE by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. of Withdrawal of Charles E. Merrill as counsel (BOWER, PHILLIP)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER withdrawing Thaddeus H. Driscoll as Aventisub's pro hac counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/4/2019. (sm)
April 3, 2019 Filing 589 Letter from William T. Walsh, Jr. to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. re: withdrawal of Thaddeus H. Driscoll as Aventisub's pro hac vice counsel re #511 Order,. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 588 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Noah Perch-Ahern, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9533756.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 587 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sherry E. Jackman, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9533737.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 586 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter A. Nyquist, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9533707.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 27, 2019 Filing 581 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACE AUTO SALVAGE, ACE AUTOMATIC CORP, ALEXANDRIA PLASTIC MOLDING AND MANUFACTURING, INC., BIBBS AUTO RECYCLING, INC., STOVER AVENUE CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 585 JOINT SAMPLING PROTOCOL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/25/2019. (sm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SHERRY E. JACKMAN, shall pay the annual fee required by the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/25/2019. (sm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NOAH PERCH-AHERN; shall pay the annual fee required by the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/25/2019. (sm)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF PETER A. NYQUIST; shall pay the annual fee required by the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/25/2019. (sm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 580 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against STOVER AVENUE CORPORATION, ACE AUTOMATIC CORP, ACE AUTO SALVAGE, BIBBS AUTO RECYCLING, INC., ALEXANDRIA PLASTIC MOLDING AND MANUFACTURING, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, filed by PMC GLOBAL INC.(jr)
March 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement #579 filed by C. Craig Provorny on 3/22/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Third Party Complaint. (sm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 579 First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF PMC GLOBAL, INC. against BIBBS, JOHN DOES 1-100, STOVER AVENUE CORPORATION, ACE AUTO, ALEXANDRIA, filed by PMC GLOBAL INC..(PROVORNY, CRAIG)
March 22, 2019 Filing 578 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Peter A. Nyquist, Esq., #2 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Nyquist, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter A. Nyquist, Esq., #4 Certification of Noah Perch-Ahern, Esq., #5 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noah Perch-Ahern, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Noah Perch-Ahern, Esq., #7 Certification of Sherry E. Jackman, Esq., #8 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sherry E. Jackman, Esq., #9 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sherry E. Jackman, Esq.)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE of STALEY HOLDINGS LLC and A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY only. STALEY HOLDINGS LLC and A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY terminated. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 3/14/2019. (sm)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 576 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's letter notifying the Court that the parties have reached an agreement on the joint sampling protocol, (ECF No. 575), the hearing set for 3/28/19 is hereby adjourned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/21/19. (jbb)
March 20, 2019 Filing 575 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #569 Letter, #568 Letter, #570 Letter, #572 Letter, #571 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from David R. Erickson, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 20, 2019 Filing 574 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #573 Letter. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 14, 2019 Filing 573 Letter re #566 Order. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
March 14, 2019 Filing 572 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #569 Letter, #568 Letter, #570 Letter, #571 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 13, 2019 Filing 571 Letter from Small Parties Group with attachment re 555 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
March 13, 2019 Filing 570 Letter from W. Hatfield, Esq. re #568 Letter. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
March 13, 2019 Filing 569 Letter from Diana L. Buongiorno, Esq. re #568 Letter. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
March 13, 2019 Filing 568 Letter from Small Parties Group re 555 Order,. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
March 13, 2019 Filing 567 Letter. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER that Defendant's informal application for leave to file a motion for summary judgment tis Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/12/2019. (sm)
March 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 as to Stephen Swedlow, Matthew Robson, and Athena Dalton. Receipt number TRE100660 (in-jdb, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 565 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID H. ALTMAN on behalf of CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY (ALTMAN, DAVID)
March 11, 2019 Filing 564 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re 555 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 8, 2019 Filing 563 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEWARK GROUP INC. identifying Greif, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
March 7, 2019 Filing 562 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER that Scott M. Press, Esq. and Timothy E. Corriston, Esq. are withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Campbell Foundry Company and from the list of ECF recipients. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/7/2019. (sm)
March 5, 2019 Filing 559 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney SCOTT MICHAEL PRESS terminated. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
March 5, 2019 Filing 558 NOTICE of Appearance by AGNIESZKA ANTONIAN on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY (ANTONIAN, AGNIESZKA)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER denying without prejudice SPG's #370 and #371 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/4/2019. (sm)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 556 TEXT ORDER: The hearing on the sampling protocol issues originally scheduled for 3/27/19 has been RESCHEDULED to 3/28/19 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark-Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/4/19. (jbb)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 555 TEXT ORDER: The parties are advised that a hearing on the sampling protocol issues, as set forth in ECF Nos. 531 and 532, is scheduled for 3/27/19 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark-Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Plaintiff and Defendants shall each file a letter to the Court on or before 3/13/19 setting forth their respective positions on whether the EPA should be invited to attend the hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/1/19. (jbb)
February 28, 2019 Filing 560 Letter from Wiliam A. Baker, Esq. re: objections to Occidental Subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 554 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick and John J. McDermott re #545 Letter. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
February 27, 2019 Filing 553 Letter. (VOS, JOANNE)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER that Jeffer, Hopkinson & Vogel is counsel for Defended Campbell Foundry Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/25/2019. (sm)
February 25, 2019 Filing 551 Letter from Lee Henig-Elona objecting to sampling subpoens served by Plaintiff. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 SECOND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery is to remain open through 2/3/2020; the parties shall appear for the next in-person status conference on 5/21/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2D, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/25/2019. (sm)
February 22, 2019 Filing 549 Letter from Diana L. Buongiorno, Esq. re #546 Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
February 21, 2019 Filing 548 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON terminated. Attorney DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, DAVID H. ALTMAN for CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, added.. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 547 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall file a revised Second Pretrial Scheduling Order on or before 2/26/2019 in accordance with the 2/15/2019 Letter Order, #546 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/19/2019. (jqb, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 546 LETTER ORDER re: the parties' proposed Second Pretrial Scheduling Order filed on 2/7/2019 [542-1] and interrogatories, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/15/2019. (sm)
February 18, 2019 Filing 545 Letter re #395 Order. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 544 JOINT PROTOCOL FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTROINICALLY-STORED INFORMATION ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/8/2019. (sm)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 543 PROTECTIVE ORDER, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/8/2019. (sm)
February 7, 2019 Filing 542 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Joint Protocol for Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information, #3 Protective Order)(BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
February 7, 2019 Filing 541 Letter from Small Parties Group to Judge Dickson re list of counsel that attended January 28 Status Conference. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission of Stephen Swedlow, Matthew Robson and Athena Dalton; they shall each make annual payments to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and each pay the sum of $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/1/2019. (sm)
January 31, 2019 Filing 540 Transcript of Status Conference held on January 28, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Court Reporter: KLJ Transcription Service, LLC (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 2/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2019. (jml, )
January 31, 2019 Filing 538 Letter from Jaclyn Palmerson. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jaclyn Palmerson In Support of Pro Hac Vice Applications, #2 Certification of Stephen Swedlow, #3 Certification of Matthew Robson, #4 Certification of Athena Dalton, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(PALMERSON, JACLYN)
January 31, 2019 Filing 537 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney YELENA SHVARTS FERREIRA terminated. (FERREIRA, YELENA)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission of Adam P. Pearse #533 ; shall pay the fees required by New Jersey Court Rule 1:28-2(a) and make a payment of $150 to the Clerk, U.S.D.C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/29/2019. (sm)
January 29, 2019 Filing 535 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
January 29, 2019 Filing 534 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Marshal J. Hoda, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9343502.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
January 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #533 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Pearse. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 533 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Pearse by MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Courtesy Copy Cover, #2 Certification A Pearse, #3 Certification M McThomas, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
January 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: In-Person Status Conference held on 1/28/2019 (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (jbb)
January 25, 2019 Filing 532 Letter from SPG to Judge Dickson re party agreements and disputes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Defendant's Discovery Plan, #3 Exhibit Draft Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
January 25, 2019 Filing 531 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
January 23, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to John J. McAleese III, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number NEW038496 (sm)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER FOR THE ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MARSHAL J. HODA, ESQ.; shall pay the annual fee required by the New Jersey lawyers' Fund for Client Protection; shall make a payment of $150 for admission payable to the Clerk, United States District Court, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/22/2019. (sm)
January 18, 2019 Filing 529 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. re Pro Hac Vice application of Marshal J. Hoda, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marshal J. Hoda, Esq., #2 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice of Marshal J. Hoda, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Marshal J. Hoda, Esq.)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
January 18, 2019 Filing 528 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John J. McAleese, III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting #526 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney MARGARET ANNE SCHMIDT terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/14/2019. (sm)
January 11, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #526 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Margaret Schmidt. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
January 11, 2019 Filing 526 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Margaret Schmidt by CRODA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SCHMIDT, MARGARET)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #496 Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/7/2019. (sm)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting #486 the SPG Defendants' Motion to Seal Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/7/2019. (sm)
January 7, 2019 Filing 523 NOTICE of Appearance by JACLYN MARIE PALMERSON on behalf of CRODA INC. (PALMERSON, JACLYN)
January 3, 2019 Filing 522 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney JAMES M. MCCLAMMER terminated. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification)(MCCLAMMER, JAMES)
December 21, 2018 Filing 521 NOTICE of Appearance by GEOFFREY HUNTER COLL on behalf of EDEN WOOD CORPORATION (COLL, GEOFFREY)
December 21, 2018 Filing 520 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Thaddeus H. Driscoll to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9260679.) (WALSH, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 519 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea M. Salimbene to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9260669.) (WALSH, WILLIAM)
December 21, 2018 Filing 518 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher S. Habel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9260664.) (WALSH, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Clerk's Letter attached to docket entry #517 filed by the Clerk's office on 12/20/2018 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (sm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 517 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (sm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 516 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ARONSON, ERIC)
December 19, 2018 Filing 515 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALDEN LEEDS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WILDE, CANDEE)
December 19, 2018 Filing 514 NOTICE by ALDEN LEEDS INC. of Withdrawal of Common Counsel and Substitution of Liaison Counsel (BLUM, JOSEPH)
December 19, 2018 Filing 513 Letter from Eric S. Aronson to the Honorable Madeline Cox Arleo for Clean Earth of North Jersey to join the Motion to Dismiss filed by Small Parties Group; Honeywell International, Inc., and the Gibbons Defendants. Additionally, Clean Earth designates the Small Parties Group Counsel as its liaison counsel for this matter.. (ARONSON, ERIC)
December 18, 2018 Filing 512 Letter from SPG to Hon. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson requesting oral argument on protective order. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christopher S. Habel, Andrea M. Salimbene and Thaddeus H. Driscoll (ECF No. 509); each to make annual payments to the New Jersey Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection and shall each pay $150 to the Clerk of the United States District Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/18/2018. (sm)
December 17, 2018 Filing 510 NOTICE of Appearance by NORMAN W. SPINDEL on behalf of FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC. (SPINDEL, NORMAN)
December 17, 2018 Filing 509 Letter from William T. Walsh, Jr. to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. encl. Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Christopher S. Habel, #2 Certification of Andrea M. Salimbene, #3 Certification of Thaddeus H. Driscoll, #4 Certification of William T. Walsh, Jr., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2018 Filing 508 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDEE WILDE on behalf of ALDEN LEEDS INC. (WILDE, CANDEE)
December 13, 2018 Filing 507 NOTICE of Appearance by LORI G. SINGER on behalf of CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC. (SINGER, LORI)
December 13, 2018 Filing 506 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. ARONSON on behalf of CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC. (ARONSON, ERIC)
December 13, 2018 Filing 505 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDEE WILDE on behalf of CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC. (WILDE, CANDEE)
December 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Daniel Riesel: $ 150, receipt number NEW038171 (sm)
December 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MARK K. DAUSCH, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dam, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 504 BRIEF in Support filed by AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION re #370 MOTION for Protective Order for the EPA Allocation and Mediated Settlement Process (BLUM, JOSEPH)
December 5, 2018 Filing 503 RESPONSE to Motion filed by AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION re #494 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Motion to Dismiss Record to Complete an Exhibit Submitted with the SPG Defendants' Reply (BLUM, JOSEPH)
December 5, 2018 Filing 502 Letter from John H. Klock, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. re: application to join Honeywell's Reply Brief to OCC's Opposition to Honeywell's Motion to Dismiss. (KLOCK, JOHN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 501 Proposed Pretrial Order granting Motion to Seal Materials by AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 500 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christian W. Habersaat to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GRIPPO, JONATHAN)
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the Notice attached to docket entry #451 submitted by Jonathan Grippo on 11/15/2018. If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (sm)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 499 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Small Parties Group (SPG) Defendants motion to seal, (DE 486). By or on 12/18/18, the SPG Defendants shall supplement their motion with a proposed Order that includes proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, as required by L. Civ. R. 5.3(c)(3) and 5.3(c)(6).. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/3/18. (nm, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 498 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP RICHARD BOWER on behalf of ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. (BOWER, PHILLIP)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting Defendant's #416 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John J. McAleese, III, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/3/2018. (sm)
December 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #475 MOTION to Dismiss , #479 MOTION to Dismiss , #496 MOTION to Seal Document #495 Exhibit (to Document),, , #493 MOTION to Dismiss and Statement That No Brief Is Necessary Under L.Civ.R. 7.1(D)(4), #494 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Motion to Dismiss Record to Complete an Exhibit Submitted with the SPG Defendants' Reply, #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #486 MOTION to Seal Document #485 Exhibit (to Document),,,,,,,,, . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 496 MOTION to Seal Document #495 Exhibit (to Document),, by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, #2 Index in Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 495 Exhibit to #494 Motion for Leave to File, Supplement to the Motion to Dismiss Record to Complete an Exhibit Submitted with the SPG Defendants' Reply by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 30, 2018 Filing 494 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Motion to Dismiss Record to Complete an Exhibit Submitted with the SPG Defendants' Reply by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 493 MOTION to Dismiss and Statement That No Brief Is Necessary Under L.Civ.R. 7.1(D)(4) by ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC.. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
November 30, 2018 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of ALDEN LEEDS INC., CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 491 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC..(LINDEMUTH, STEPHANIE)
November 30, 2018 Filing 490 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. re #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Defendant Honeywell International Inc. Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 489 RESPONSE in Support filed by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION re #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MONDORA, CHARLES)
November 30, 2018 Filing 488 BRIEF in Support filed by ASHLAND LLC, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., TIFFANY AND COMPANY re #479 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of THOMAS C. MCCGOWAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/28/2018. (ld, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 486 MOTION to Seal Document #485 Exhibit (to Document),,,,,,,,, by ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 485 Exhibit to #484 Brief in Support of Motion,,,,,,, Blum Supplemental Certification in Support by ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(BLUM, JOSEPH)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
November 30, 2018 Filing 484 BRIEF in Support filed by ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION re #475 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 483 Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Chargeurs, Inc., Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Chargeurs Wool, Inc., Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by the Curtiss-Wright Corporation, Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Palin Enterprises, LLC, Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Spectraserv, Inc., Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's ANSWER to Counterclaim by the Rexam Beverage Can Company by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 482 BRIEF in Opposition filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re #479 MOTION to Dismiss , #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #475 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 481 BRIEF in Opposition filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re #479 MOTION to Dismiss , #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #475 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 480 BRIEF in Opposition filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re #479 MOTION to Dismiss , #477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #475 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 479 MOTION to Dismiss by GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., TIFFANY AND COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Certification Local Rule 11.2)(HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
November 30, 2018 Filing 478 Letter from Cooper Industries, LLC joining in Motion to Dismiss. (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
November 30, 2018 Filing 477 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant Honeywell International Inc's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Occidental Chemical Corporation's Complaint, #2 Declaration of John M. Fietkiewicz in Support of Honeywell International Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #3 Certification Local Rule 11.2, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 476 Exhibit to #475 Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, Blum Certification in Support by ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants joining Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 2008 Administrative Settlement Agreement and Order on Consent for Removal Action, #3 Exhibit Trial Court Opinion issued in Diamond Shamrock Chems. Co. v. Aetna Cas. & Surety Co., (N.J. Super. Ct. Law Div. Apr. 12, 1989), #4 Exhibit 2011 Administrative Agreement and Order on Consent for Combined Sewer Overflow/Storm Water Outfall Investigation, #5 Exhibit 2016 Administrative Settlement Agreement and Order on Consent for Remedial Design for Operable Unit Two of the Diamond Alkali Superfund Site, #6 Exhibit 2012 Unilateral Administrative Order that EPA issued to Occidental for Removal Response Activities, #7 Exhibit 2012 Administrative Settlement Agreement and Order on Consent for the Cooperating Parties Group for Removal Response Activities, #8 Exhibit Order Confirming Amended Chapter 11 Plan of Liquidation from the bankruptcy proceedings, In re Maxus Energy Corporation, #9 Exhibit Mutual Contribution Release Agreement, #10 Exhibit Complaint Case No. 16-11501, #11 Exhibit Opinion Hobart Corp. v. The Dayton Power & Light Co., Case No. 3:13-cv-115-WHR)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 30, 2018 Filing 475 MOTION to Dismiss by ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Certification Local Rule 11.2, #3 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion to Dismiss)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to INGREDION INCORPORATED only. INGREDION INCORPORATED terminated. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/29/2018. (sm)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 473 TEXT ORDER: The Small Parties Group's request, (ECF No. 460), to file a reply brief in further support of a protective order, (ECF No. 371), is hereby granted. The reply brief shall be filed on or before 12/7/18.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/29/18. (nm, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 472 Letter from Joseph B. Fiorenzo. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
November 29, 2018 Filing 471 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH B. FIORENZO on behalf of ALDEN LEEDS INC. (FIORENZO, JOSEPH)
November 28, 2018 Filing 470 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 469 TEXT ORDER re #465 Letter requesting leave to file an over length reply brief. Request granted for 20 pages in length. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/28/18. (aa, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 TEXT ORDER re #463 Letter requesting leave to file an over length reply brief. Granting request for 20 pages. So Ordered by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/28/18. (aa, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 467 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Martha S. Thomsen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HARPER, RICHARD)
November 28, 2018 Filing 466 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joshua B. Frank to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HARPER, RICHARD)
November 28, 2018 Filing 465 Letter from Small Parties Group requesting page extension for MTD replay. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 27, 2018 Filing 464 Letter from Joe Yeager Regarding the Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas C. McGowan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joe Patrick Yeager in support of Thomas C. McGowan's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Thomas C. McGowan in support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas C. McGowan)(YEAGER, JOE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 463 Letter from W. Hatfield to Hon. Dickson requesting leave for Gibbons Defendants to file a reply brief up to 25 pages in length. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
November 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW038007 for MARK K. DAUSCH, ESQ. (ld, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 462 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark K. Dausch to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #447 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John D. Edgcomb by MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/20/2018. (JB, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 460 Letter from Small Parties Group requesting leave to file reply in support of protective order. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 19, 2018 Filing 459 NOTICE of Change of Address by ANDREW E. ANSELMI (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
November 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: for the admission of Jay N. Varon $ 150, receipt number NEW037977 (JB, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 458 Letter from Seton Company, Inc. re #457 Letter. (KLEIN, WENDY)
November 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BONNI F. KAUFMAN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 457 Letter from Seton Company, Inc. re #395 Order. (KLEIN, WENDY)
November 16, 2018 Filing 456 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hace Vice Attorney Earl W. Phillips, Jr. to Receive Electronic Notification for by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
November 16, 2018 Filing 455 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hace Vice Attorney James P. Ray to Receive Electronic Notification for by EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, GOODRICH CORPORATION, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
November 16, 2018 Filing 454 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hace Vice Attorney Brian C. Freeman to Receive Electronic Notification for by EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, GOODRICH CORPORATION, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
November 16, 2018 Filing 453 Letter from Campbell Foundry. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 452 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Bonni F. Kaufman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SKEELE, KATHERINE)
November 15, 2018 Filing 451 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christian Habersaat to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9175079.) (GRIPPO, JONATHAN)
November 15, 2018 Filing 450 Letter re #395 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EPA Communication)(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
November 14, 2018 Filing 449 BRIEF in Opposition filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION re #370 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037930 for BONNI F. KAUFMAN, ESQ. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037942 for BRIAN FREEMAN, ESQ. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037941 for JAMES P. RAY, ESQ. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID G. MANDELBAUM, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #447 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John D. Edgcomb. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 448 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David G. Mandelbaum to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9166874.) (WILDE, CANDEE)
November 13, 2018 Filing 447 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice John D. Edgcomb by MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification)(MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
November 13, 2018 Filing 446 NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY JEANNE CASTAFERO on behalf of GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC. (CASTAFERO, KELLY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 445 Letter from Pearce Law on behalf of Melon Leasing joining Gibbons PC Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. (PEARCE, RANDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 444 Westrock-Southern Container, LLC's, improperly named as Schiffenhaus Packaging Corp., ANSWER to Complaint , with Affirmative Defenses, by SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MONTAG, BRIAN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 443 Letter from Seton Company, Inc. joining in Motions to Dismiss. (KLEIN, WENDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 442 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SETON COMPANY INC.. (KLEIN, WENDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 441 Letter from Westrock-Southern Container, LLC, improperly named as Schiffenhaus Packaging Corp., joining Defendants' Motions to Dismiss submitted by Small Parties Group and Ashland LLC et al.. (MONTAG, BRIAN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 440 Letter from Houghton International Inc. joining in Motions to Dismiss. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 439 Letter from Small Parties Group regarding Joining Defendants' to Honeywell Motion to Dismiss. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 9, 2018 Filing 438 Letter from Small Parties Group regarding Joining Defendants' to Gibbons Motion to Dismiss. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
November 9, 2018 Filing 437 Letter from Patrick J. McStravick. (MCSTRAVICK, PATRICK)
November 9, 2018 Filing 436 Letter re #434 Letter. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 435 Letter from Craig S Provorny re #434 Letter. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 434 Letter. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 433 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY.(CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 432 Letter from 3M Company Joining Motions to Dismiss. (MURPHY, KAREN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 431 ANSWER to Complaint by 3M COMPANY.(MURPHY, KAREN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 430 Letter from Jillian K. Mooney on behalf of Rexam Beverage Can Company joining the Motions to Dismiss submitted by the SPG and Ashland LLC, Givaudan Fragrances Corporation, Harris Corporation, Hoffman-LaRoche Inc., Innospec Active Chemicals LLC, ISP Chemicals LLC, Mallinkrodt LLC, MI Holdings, Inc., and Tiffany and Company. (MOONEY, JILLIAN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 429 ANSWER to Complaint by ZENECA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(YEAGER, JOE)
November 9, 2018 Filing 428 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY.(MOONEY, JILLIAN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 427 ANSWER to Complaint , with Affirmative Defenses, by SETON COMPANY INC..(KLEIN, WENDY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 426 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against COVANTA ESSEX CO., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, BASF CORPORATION, HEXION INC., PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., ASHLAND LLC, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, COATS & CLARK INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, SETON COMPANY INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, AVENTISUB LLC, GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., CBS CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, ZENECA INC., NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., RTC PROPERTIES INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., GOODRICH CORPORATION, FORT JAMES LLC, THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, ALDEN LEEDS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, NOVELIS CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., TEVAL CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PHARMACIA LLC, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, CRODA INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., ARKEMA INC., FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, BEROL CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., CONOPCO INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, INGREDION INCORPORATED, HARRIS CORPORATION, ATLAS REFINERY INC., STWB INC., PMC GLOBAL INC., 3M COMPANY, TEXTRON INC., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C..(BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 425 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against COVANTA ESSEX CO., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, BASF CORPORATION, HEXION INC., PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., ASHLAND LLC, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, COATS & CLARK INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, SETON COMPANY INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, AVENTISUB LLC, GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., CBS CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, ZENECA INC., NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., RTC PROPERTIES INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., GOODRICH CORPORATION, FORT JAMES LLC, THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, ALDEN LEEDS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, NOVELIS CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., TEVAL CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PHARMACIA LLC, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, CRODA INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., ARKEMA INC., FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, BEROL CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., CONOPCO INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, INGREDION INCORPORATED, HARRIS CORPORATION, ATLAS REFINERY INC., STWB INC., PMC GLOBAL INC., 3M COMPANY, TEXTRON INC., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION.(BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against COVANTA ESSEX CO., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BASF CORPORATION, FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, HEXION INC., PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, QUALA SYSTEMS INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., ASHLAND LLC, NOVELIS CORPORATION, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., COATS & CLARK INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., BASF CATALYSTS LLC, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, SETON COMPANY INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, AVENTISUB LLC, THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., PHARMACIA LLC, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., CBS CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., CRODA INC., CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, ZENECA INC., SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, ARKEMA INC., THE NEWARK GROUP INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., RTC PROPERTIES INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., GOODRICH CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., FORT JAMES LLC, LEGACY VULCAN LLC, BEROL CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., TIFFANY AND COMPANY, CONOPCO INC., SEQUA CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, INGREDION INCORPORATED, HARRIS CORPORATION, ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, ATLAS REFINERY INC., STWB INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., PMC GLOBAL INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, 3M COMPANY, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by SPECTRASERV INC..(BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 423 Letter from William T. Walsh, Jr. to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo, U.S.D.J. re: joining motions to dismiss. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 422 ANSWER to Complaint by PMC GLOBAL INC..(PROVORNY, CRAIG)
November 9, 2018 Filing 421 ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defenses by FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED.(MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
November 9, 2018 Filing 420 Letter from Charles M. Denton regarding Jonider to Motions to Dismiss of Honeywell International, Inc., Small Parties Group Defendants and Ashland LLC, Givaudan Fragrances Corporation, Harris Corporation, Hoffman-La Roche Inc., Innospec Active Chemicals LLC, ISP Chemical LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, MI Holdings, Inc., and Tiffany and Company. (MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
November 8, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #416 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. McAleese, III. Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 419 Letter from GR Group joining motions to dismiss. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 418 AMENDED ANSWER to Individual Answer of GR GROUP MEMBERS to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,, by ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, HEXION INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC.. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 417 GR GROUP UNIFORM ANSWER to Complaint by ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, HEXION INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC..(HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
November 8, 2018 Filing 416 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John J. McAleese, III by HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Amanda G. Dumville, #2 Certification of John J. McAleese, III, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
November 8, 2018 Filing 415 ANSWER to Complaint by MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC..(PEARCE, RANDY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 414 Letter from Cooper Industries, LLC joining in Motion to Dismiss. (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
November 8, 2018 Filing 413 Letter from Cooper Industries, LLC joining in the Motion to Dismiss. (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
November 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID G. RIES, ESQ. and JOSEPH R. BRENDEL, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID M. MEEZAN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 412 Letter from Pearce Law on behalf of Melon Leasing joining Small Parties Group Motion to Dismiss. (PEARCE, RANDY)
November 7, 2018 Filing 411 ANSWER to Complaint by HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC..(DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 410 Letter from Robert G. Devine, Esq. joining in Small Group Parties' Motion to Dismiss. (DEVINE, ROBERT)
November 7, 2018 Filing 409 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David M. Meezan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9154359.) (BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER ADMITTING MARK K. DAUSCH, ESQ. PRO HAV VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER ADMITTING DAVID G. MANDELBAUM, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER ADMITTING JAY N. VARON, ESQ. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting #323 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to DAVID M. MEEZAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/5/2018. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 404 Letter from Diana L. Buongiorno, Esq. on behalf of the CSG Group, joining the Motion to Dismiss. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
November 6, 2018 Filing 403 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZENECA INC. identifying Zeneca Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (YEAGER, JOE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by JOE PATRICK YEAGER on behalf of ZENECA INC. (YEAGER, JOE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 401 First MOTION for Joinder with Motion to Dismiss filed by Small Parties Group by PMC GLOBAL INC.. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
November 6, 2018 Filing 400 Letter from Stephanie Lindemuth to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson dated November 6th, 2018 withdrawing Motion re #392 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David H. Quigley). (LINDEMUTH, STEPHANIE)
November 6, 2018 Filing 399 Letter from certain members of GR Group joining Honeywell motion to dismiss. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
November 5, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number NEW037877 for JOSHUA B. FRANK, ESQ., and MARTHA S. THOMSEN, ESQ. (ld, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 398 Letter from Steven M. Richman. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
November 5, 2018 Filing 397 ANSWER to Counterclaim by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
November 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #392 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David H. Quigley). Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 2, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEREMY C. KARPATKIN, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 396 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by AVENTISUB LLC.(WALSH, WILLIAM)
November 1, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICES TO RECEIVE PHV NEF at #393 and #394 submitted by JOHN FIETKIEWICZ on 10/31/2018 and 11/01/2018 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dam, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 394 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy Karpatkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 395 PRE-26(f)CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER; that the parties must exchange initial disclosures under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by December 19, 2018;etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/31/2018. (ld, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 393 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy C. Karpatkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
October 31, 2018 Filing 392 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (David H. Quigley) by R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Stephanie Lindemuth, #2 Certification of David H. Quigley, #3 Proposed Order)(LINDEMUTH, STEPHANIE)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER REGARDING PLEADINGS; that Defendants who have served Plaintiff with their answers shall file them on ECF on or by November 9, 2018; That Crossclaims between and among Defendants shall be stayed until further order of the Court; That Plaintiff shall file its "Answer to Certain Defendants' Counterclaims" on ECF by November 30, 2018;etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/31/2018. (ld, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 390 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC.. (LINDEMUTH, STEPHANIE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 389 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE LYNN LINDEMUTH on behalf of R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC. (LINDEMUTH, STEPHANIE)
October 31, 2018 Filing 388 Letter from John M. Fietkiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service - by e-mail, #2 Certificate of Service - by US Mail)(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 387 Transcript of Hearing held on October 17, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Transcriber: KLJ Transcription Service, LLC (201-703-1670). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (jml, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 386 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew L. Kolesar to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KAZAN, BARRY)
October 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037801 for JEREMY C. KARPATKIN, ESQ. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 CORRECTED ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIEL RIESEL AND DAN CHOROST; that DANIEL RIESEL, ESQ. is hereby granted admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/29/2018. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER denying #322 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; as an attorney admitted to the bar of the State of New Jersey, Mr. Chorost should apply for plenary admission to this Court pursuant to Local Civil Rule 101.1 (b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/29/2018. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting #379 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for BONNI F. KAUFMAN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/29/2018. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Filing 382 APPLICATION/PETITION for to Join Motion to Dismiss for by CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
October 29, 2018 Filing 381 RESPONSE to Motion filed by CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY re #370 MOTION for Protective Order (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
October 29, 2018 Filing 380 RESPONSE in Support filed by CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C., SPECTRASERV INC. re #370 MOTION for Protective Order (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
October 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #379 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bonni F. Kaufman. Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, THOMAS D. LUPO, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 379 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bonni F. Kaufman by QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katherine A. Skeele, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SKEELE, KATHERINE)
October 26, 2018 Filing 378 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Stephen Dillard, Esq. and Edward Lewis, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RICH, MICHAEL)
October 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALANA E. FORTNA, ESQ. and MARK D. SHEPARD, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN PHILLIP FRANEY on behalf of PHARMACIA LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FRANEY, BRYAN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 376 Letter from SPG to Hon. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 26, 2018 Filing 375 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Pre-26(f) Conference Scheduling Order with Parties' Disputed Provisions, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order Regarding Pleadings with Disputed Provisions)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 374 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark D. Shepard to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9126815.) (FELEZZOLA, MARC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 373 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Alana E. Fortna to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9126793.) (FELEZZOLA, MARC)
October 26, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037731 for ANDREW L. KOLESAR, ESQ. (ld, )
October 26, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre no longer assigned to the case. (ak, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Jose L. Linares, Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/25/18. (ak, )
October 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #370 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 25, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JANE C. LUXTON, ESQ. and MEGAN P. CALDWELL, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 371 MOTION for Protective Order Brief in Support by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 24, 2018 Filing 370 MOTION for Protective Order by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Brief, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Brief)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 24, 2018 Filing 369 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Megan Caldwell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (STANLEY, DWAYNE)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal [ECF No. 327] as to Reckitt Benckiser LLC.. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/24/2018. (ld, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 367 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jane C. Luxton to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9120074.) (NEEDLEMAN, JOANN)
October 24, 2018 Filing 366 Letter from J. Klock to the Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J., regarding application to join Honeywell International, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (KLOCK, JOHN)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #353 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JANE C. LUXTON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/23/2018. (ld, )
October 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Stephen Dillard, Esq. and Edward Lewis, Esq., receipt number TRE096481 (mps)
October 23, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $300 received as to Charles E. Merrill, Esq. and Megan P. Caldwell, Esq., receipt number TRE096480 (mps)
October 23, 2018 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANN NEEDLEMAN on behalf of CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC. (NEEDLEMAN, JOANN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 363 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M. RICHMAN on behalf of REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 362 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David Ries to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 361 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Joseph Brendel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 360 Chargeurs Wool (USA) Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC..(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 359 Chargeurs Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION by CHARGEURS INC..(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 357 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREW N. SAWULA, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 22, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #352 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #353 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 355 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. re #327 Order. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #338 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRIAN C. FREEMAN, ESQ. AND JAMES P. RAY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/19/2018. (ld, )
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #352 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to EARL W. PHILLIPS, JR., ESQ., and JAMES P. RAY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/19/2018. (ld, ) (Main Document 356 replaced on 10/22/2018) (ld).
October 19, 2018 Filing 354 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew N. Sawula to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9108302.) (RIAZ, AHMED)
October 19, 2018 Filing 353 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Joann Needleman, Esq., #3 Declaration of Jane Luxton)(NEEDLEMAN, JOANN)
October 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037731 for ANDREW L. KOLESAR, ESQ. (ld, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 352 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew P. Mazzola, #2 Declaration of Earl W. Phillips, Jr., #3 Declaration of James P. Ray, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
October 18, 2018 Filing 351 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (MCSTRAVICK, PATRICK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCSTRAVICK on behalf of GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC. (MCSTRAVICK, PATRICK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 349 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON on behalf of NOVARTIS CORPORATION (GANNON, KATHLEEN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON on behalf of BASF CATALYSTS LLC (GANNON, KATHLEEN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON on behalf of BASF CORPORATION (GANNON, KATHLEEN)
October 18, 2018 Filing 346 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark D. Kindt and Barry J. Porter to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KALLER, EMILY)
October 18, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN M. SIROS, ESQ. and ANNE S. KENNEY, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037719 for WILLIAM G. BALLAINE, ESQ. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 345 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anne S. Kenney to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9102273.) (JONES, GEORGE)
October 17, 2018 Filing 344 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven M. Siros to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9102230.) (JONES, GEORGE)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 The Parties are advised that an in-person status conference is scheduled for January 28, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. The Court will confirm at a later date which parties or group representatives are required to attend.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/18. (nm, )
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission of CHRISTIAN W. HABERSAAT, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/2018. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT APPLICATION FOR THE ADMISSIONS PRO HAC VICE OF STEVEN M. SIROS, ESQ., AND ANNE S. KENNEY, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/2018. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER Permitting MARK D. SHEPARD, ESQ. and ALANA E. FORTNA, ESQ. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/2018. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER Permitting Joshua B. Frank, Esq. and Martha S. Thomsen, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/17/2018. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037716 for JOSEPH R. BRENDEL, ESQ. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037715 for DAVID G. RIES, ESQ. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Initial Pretrial Conference/Status Conference held on 10/17/2018. (CD #ECR.) (nm, )
October 17, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, LARRY D. SILVER, ESQ., DAVID E. ROMINE, ESQ. and ERIN M. CARTER, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #332 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Frank and Martha S. Thomsen (Unopposed), #338 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #329 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 338 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, GOODRICH CORPORATION, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew P. Mazzola, #2 Declaration of Brian C. Freeman, #3 Declaration of James P. Ray, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
October 16, 2018 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW DAVID ORSINI on behalf of SPECTRASERV INC. (ORSINI, MATTHEW)
October 16, 2018 Filing 336 Letter from Brian S. Montag to Hon. Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. re #315 Letter. (MONTAG, BRIAN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 335 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Erin M. Carter to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9098956.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 334 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David E. Romine to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9098939.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 333 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Larry D. Silver to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9098885.) (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 16, 2018 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Frank and Martha S. Thomsen (Unopposed) by CONOPCO INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, HEXCEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard B. Harper, #2 Declaration of Joshua B. Frank, #3 Declaration of Martha S. Thomsen, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Pro Hac Vice Cover Letter)(HARPER, RICHARD)
October 16, 2018 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Jay N. Varon, #2 Certification of Emily A. Kaller, #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(KALLER, EMILY)
October 16, 2018 Filing 330 Letter from George C. Jones to the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J., requesting entry of an order for the pro hac vice admission of counsel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Jones, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Siros, #3 Declaration of Anne S. Kenney, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(JONES, GEORGE)
October 16, 2018 Filing 329 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CBS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(FELEZZOLA, MARC)
October 16, 2018 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC SCOTT GAFFREY on behalf of ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (GAFFREY, MARC)
October 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #322 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #323 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF RECKITT BENCKISER LLC PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/16/2018. (ld, ).
October 16, 2018 Filing 326 Exhibit to #322 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by COATS & CLARK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Corrected Text of Proposed Order)(GRACER, JEFFREY)
October 16, 2018 Filing 323 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by THE NEWARK GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory J. Bevelock, #2 Declaration of David M. Meezan, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
October 16, 2018 Filing 322 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by COATS & CLARK INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GRACER, JEFFREY)
October 16, 2018 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS on behalf of 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (LOUCKS, ERIN)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #266 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles E. Merrill, Esq. and Megan P. Caldwell, Esq.; both Charles E. Merrill and Megan P. Caldwell shall make a payment of $300.00, (150.00 each), for admission, payable to the Clerk, United States District Court; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (sms)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David R. Erickson, Esq., Thomas J. Grever, Esq., Christopher M. McDonald, Esq. and Mitchell F. Engel, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (ld, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #111 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ANDREW SAWULA, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (ld, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER admitting ANDREW L. KOLESAR, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (ld, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #176 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph Brendel, Esq. and David Ries, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (ld, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #243 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Dillard,Esq. and Edward Lewis, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/18. (cm, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER Granting #155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy C. Karpatkin by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/15/2018. (JB, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 315 Letter from Small Parties Group. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 314 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON GABALA on behalf of FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC. (GABALA, ALLISON)
October 15, 2018 Filing 312 Letter from Matthew B. Corwin Requesting Pro Hac Vice Attorney T. Lupo to Receive Electronic Notification. (CORWIN, MATTHEW)
October 15, 2018 Filing 311 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to MARK D. KINDT, and BARRY J. PORTER: $ 300, receipt number NEW037674 (dam, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by GAIL HOWIE CONENELLO on behalf of SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CONENELLO, GAIL)
October 12, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN S. MONTAG on behalf of SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MONTAG, BRIAN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 308 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC identifying WestRock Company as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MONTAG, BRIAN)
October 12, 2018 Filing 307 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER on behalf of NOVARTIS CORPORATION (SCHNEIDER, DAVID)
October 12, 2018 Filing 306 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER on behalf of BASF CATALYSTS LLC (SCHNEIDER, DAVID)
October 12, 2018 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER on behalf of BASF CORPORATION (SCHNEIDER, DAVID)
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to THOMAS D. LUPO, ESQ., receipt number TRE096143 (mps)
October 11, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Ryan Russell Kemper, Esq., receipt number TRE096127 (mps)
October 10, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTOR J ZARRILLI on behalf of AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION (ZARRILLI, VICTOR)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties correspondence dated October 4 and October 9, 2018 (ECF Nos. 295, 301) regarding the initial conference set for 10/17/18. The Parties are advised that their obligations to prepare a joint discovery plan and to exchange Rule 26 initial disclosures are hereby suspended at this juncture. However, the conference will proceed as scheduled in order to discuss process, procedure, and any pending applications.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/10/18. (nm, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 302 NOTICE by EDEN WOOD CORPORATION re #293 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Request for Ryan Kemper to Receive Electronic Notification (ZUCKER, RICHARD)
October 9, 2018 Filing 301 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. re #295 Letter, #288 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 8, 2018 Filing 300 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVENTISUB LLC. (WALSH, WILLIAM)
October 8, 2018 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of AVENTISUB LLC (WALSH, WILLIAM)
October 5, 2018 Filing 298 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 297 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC identifying Staley Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HOLSINGER, JOHN)
October 5, 2018 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN RALPH HOLSINGER on behalf of TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC (HOLSINGER, JOHN)
October 4, 2018 Filing 295 Letter from Certain Defendants re #288 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER permitting Mark D. Kindt, Esq., and Barry J. Porter, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/3/2018. (ld, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Russell Kemper, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/3/2018. (ld, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER ADMITTING THOMAS D. LUPO, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/3/2018. (ld, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 291 MOTION for Leave to File for a Protective Order by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
October 3, 2018 Filing 290 Letter from GR Group reply to Oxy's opposition. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
October 3, 2018 Filing 289 Letter from Craig S Provorny re #12 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Deadlines for Third-Party Complaints)(PROVORNY, CRAIG)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/17/2018 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/3/18. (nm, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 287 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 286 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 285 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 284 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of NOVARTIS CORPORATION, ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 28, 2018 Filing 282 Letter from Craig S Provorny. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
September 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHARLES M. DENTON, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
September 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KATHY D. PATRIC, ESQ., ANTHONY N. KAIM, ESQ. and JORGE M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 281 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jorge M. Gutierrez, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 280 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anthony N. Kaim to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 279 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kathy D. Patrick to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 278 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY identifying Ball Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MOONEY, JILLIAN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by JILLIAN KAY MOONEY on behalf of REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY (MOONEY, JILLIAN)
September 26, 2018 Filing 276 Proposed Pretrial Order to Extend Time to Respond to Crossclaims by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FORT JAMES LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV INC., STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #271 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #274 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of David G. Mandelbaum. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 25, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #268 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Kolesar. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037499 for ANTHONY N. KAIM, ESQ. (ld, )
September 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037498 for JORGE M. GUTIERREZ, ESQ. (ld, )
September 24, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW037497 for KATHY D. PATRICK, ESQ. (ld, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 275 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles M. Denton to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
September 24, 2018 Filing 274 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Admission of David G. Mandelbaum by BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Affidavit of Candee Wilde, #3 Affidavit of David G. Mandelbaum, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WILDE, CANDEE)
September 24, 2018 Filing 271 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Lee Henig-Elona, #2 Certification of Mark K. Dausch, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER permitting David E. Romine, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/21/2018. (ld, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER permitting Larry D. Silver, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/21/2018. (ld, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting Pro Hac Vice Admission as to Erin M. Carter, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/21/2018. (ld, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 269 Letter from Craig S Provorny. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
September 20, 2018 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Kolesar by STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Barry M. Kazan, #2 Certification of Andrew L. Kolesar, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(KAZAN, BARRY)
September 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #266 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Dwayne F. Stanley in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Admissions of Charles E. Merrill and Megan P. Caldwell, #2 Certification Certification of Charles E. Merrill in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Certification Certification of Megan P. Caldwell in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Merrill and Megan P. Caldwell)(STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Ballaine, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/17/2018. (ld, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CHARLES M. DENTON, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/17/2018. (ld, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 263 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDEE WILDE on behalf of BENJAMIN MOORE & CO. (WILDE, CANDEE)
September 14, 2018 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN FRANCIS DOHERTY on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY (ld, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 262 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covanta Essex Company (KELLY, BARBARA) Modified on 9/17/2018 (JB, ).
September 14, 2018 Filing 261 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRI E. CHEWNING on behalf of OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHEWNING, KERRI)
September 14, 2018 Filing 260 Letter from Defendant, Legacy Vulcan, providing courtesy copy of Notice of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen Dillard and Edward Lewis. re #243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen C. Dillard and Edward C. Lewis. (RICH, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2018 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. ARONSON on behalf of BENJAMIN MOORE & CO. (ARONSON, ERIC)
September 14, 2018 Filing 258 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY identifying Public Service Enterprise Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GARDNER, KEVIN)
September 14, 2018 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN RICHARD GARDNER on behalf of PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY (GARDNER, KEVIN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 256 ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION.(DEVINE, ROBERT)
September 13, 2018 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SONJA A. INGLIN, ESQ., JOHN F. CERMAK, JR., ESQ. and HANNAH BLOINK, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
September 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen C. Dillard and Edward C. Lewis. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 255 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CANNING GUMM LLC identifying W. Canning USA, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
September 13, 2018 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER LYN DEMIRJIAN on behalf of PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC (DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
September 13, 2018 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER LYN DEMIRJIAN on behalf of CANNING GUMM LLC (DEMIRJIAN, HEATHER)
September 13, 2018 Filing 252 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (MACK, KENNETH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH HOWARD MACK on behalf of ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION (MACK, KENNETH)
September 13, 2018 Filing 250 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hannah Bloink to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9021519.) (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
September 13, 2018 Filing 249 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John F. Cermak, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9021506.) (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
September 13, 2018 Filing 248 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sonja Inglin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9021450.) (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
September 13, 2018 Filing 247 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3M COMPANY identifying 3M Company as Corporate Parent.. (MURPHY, KAREN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by YELENA SHVARTS FERREIRA on behalf of 3M COMPANY (FERREIRA, YELENA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 245 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUALITY CARRIERS INC. identifying Quality Distribution, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (SKEELE, KATHERINE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 244 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QUALA SYSTEMS INC. identifying Chemical Leaman Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SKEELE, KATHERINE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen C. Dillard and Edward C. Lewis by LEGACY VULCAN LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Rich in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Declaration of Stephen C. Dillard, #3 Declaration of Edward C. Lewis, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RICH, MICHAEL)
September 12, 2018 Filing 242 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P. identifying Energy Transfer Partners, L.P. as Corporate Parent.. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 241 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC. (KLEIN, WENDY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by WENDY F. KLEIN on behalf of PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC (KLEIN, WENDY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by WENDY F. KLEIN on behalf of CANNING GUMM LLC (KLEIN, WENDY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. KOHANE on behalf of PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC (KOHANE, DAVID)
September 12, 2018 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID M. KOHANE on behalf of CANNING GUMM LLC (KOHANE, DAVID)
September 12, 2018 Filing 236 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUNOCO (R&M) LLC identifying Sunoco, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 235 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVARTIS CORPORATION identifying Novartis AG as Corporate Parent.. (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by KAREN E. MURPHY on behalf of 3M COMPANY (MURPHY, KAREN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC. (BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF CATALYSTS LLC identifying BASF Catalysts Holding, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 231 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF CORPORATION identifying BASF Americas Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 230 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRODA INC. identifying Croda Investments, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SCHMIDT, MARGARET)
September 12, 2018 Filing 229 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC. (KELLY, BARBARA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by MARGARET ANNE SCHMIDT on behalf of CRODA INC. (SCHMIDT, MARGARET)
September 12, 2018 Filing 227 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C.. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 226 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY identifying Not Applicable as Corporate Parent.. (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 225 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 224 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPECTRASERV INC.. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT MICHAEL PRESS on behalf of CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY (PRESS, SCOTT)
September 12, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON on behalf of CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY (CORRISTON, TIMOTHY)
September 12, 2018 Filing 221 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC. identifying HII Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH PATRICK MCMANUS on behalf of NOVARTIS CORPORATION (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH PATRICK MCMANUS on behalf of BASF CATALYSTS LLC (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 218 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH PATRICK MCMANUS on behalf of BASF CORPORATION (MCMANUS, KEITH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 217 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC. identifying Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MUSCATO, ANDREW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MUSCATO on behalf of 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC. (MUSCATO, ANDREW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 215 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDEN WOOD CORPORATION identifying Neu Holdings U.S. Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (ZUCKER, RICHARD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ on behalf of AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 213 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC. identifying Akzo Nobel Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GOTTLIEB, IRA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by IRA M. GOTTLIEB on behalf of AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC. (GOTTLIEB, IRA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 211 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION identifying National Amusements, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FELEZZOLA, MARC)
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy C. Karpatkin, #167 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #176 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Brendel and David Ries. Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC J. FELEZZOLA on behalf of CBS CORPORATION (FELEZZOLA, MARC)
September 12, 2018 Filing 209 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC identifying Innospec Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 208 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARRIS CORPORATION. (PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 207 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC. identifying Roche Holding Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (KLOCK, JOHN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 206 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIFFANY AND COMPANY identifying Tiffany & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (KLOCK, JOHN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 205 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MI HOLDINGS INC. identifying Avon Products, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KLOCK, JOHN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 204 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (DONOVAN, MARTHA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 203 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT LLC identifying Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 202 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ISP CHEMICALS LLC identifying ISP Chemco LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA N. DONOVAN on behalf of SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION (DONOVAN, MARTHA)
September 12, 2018 Filing 200 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION identifying Givaudan Flavors and Fragrances Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 199 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASHLAND LLC identifying Ashland Chemco Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 198 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE OKONITE COMPANY INC.. (MONTANO, JAMES)
September 12, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. MONTANO on behalf of THE OKONITE COMPANY INC. (MONTANO, JAMES)
September 12, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by SUSANNE Y. PETICOLAS on behalf of HARRIS CORPORATION, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC (PETICOLAS, SUSANNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN H. KLOCK on behalf of HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., MI HOLDINGS INC., TIFFANY AND COMPANY (KLOCK, JOHN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM S. HATFIELD on behalf of ASHLAND LLC, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by CAMILLE V. OTERO-PHILLIPS on behalf of ASHLAND LLC, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC (OTERO-PHILLIPS, CAMILLE)
September 12, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The ANSWER to Complaint by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. [D.E. 172] filed by DWAYNE STANLEY on 9/12/2018 was submitted in error. Please disregard. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (byl)
September 12, 2018 Filing 192 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY identifying United Technologies Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 191 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC. identifying LZAM FCC, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 190 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC. identifying Goodrich Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 189 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOODRICH CORPORATION identifying United Technologies Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 188 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC identifying Emerald Performance Materials, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 187 Letter from STEVEN RICHMAN re #176 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Brendel and David Ries. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 186 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY identifying The Sherwin-Williams Company as Corporate Parent.. (BENNETT, HERBERT)
September 12, 2018 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC. (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of GOODRICH CORPORATION (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA on behalf of EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC (MAZZOLA, MATTHEW)
September 12, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by HERBERT B. BENNETT on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY (sms)
September 12, 2018 Filing 179 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC.. (ALBIN, GERI)
September 12, 2018 Filing 178 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION identifying Unicharm Corporation; Sumitomo Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (ARONDS, JOSEPH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH MARTIN ARONDS on behalf of THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION (ARONDS, JOSEPH)
September 12, 2018 Filing 176 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Brendel and David Ries by CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
September 12, 2018 Filing 175 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC.. (LAMBERT, REYNOLD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by REYNOLD LAMBERT on behalf of FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC. (LAMBERT, REYNOLD)
September 12, 2018 Filing 173 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. identifying Enpro Holdings Inc as Corporate Parent.. (STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 172 ANSWER to Complaint by ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC..(STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by DWAYNE FRANKLIN STANLEY on behalf of ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. (STANLEY, DWAYNE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 170 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PMC GLOBAL INC.. (SCHROECK, MONICA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHERINE ANNE SKEELE on behalf of QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC. (SKEELE, KATHERINE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE on behalf of HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certification of Mitchell F. Engel in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Certification of Christopher M. McDonald in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Certification of David R. Erickson in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #5 Certification of Thomas J.Grever in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #6 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 11, 2018 Filing 166 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEQUA CORPORATION identifying Blue Jay Acquisition Corporation and The Carlyle Group as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of SEQUA CORPORATION (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY PAUL GENGEL on behalf of SEQUA CORPORATION (GENGEL, GARY)
September 11, 2018 Filing 163 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPG INDUSTRIES INC.. (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of PPG INDUSTRIES INC. (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 161 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC. identifying Chargeurs SA as Corporate Parent.. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY PAUL GENGEL on behalf of PPG INDUSTRIES INC. (GENGEL, GARY)
September 11, 2018 Filing 159 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BROWN, KEGAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY PAUL GENGEL on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (GENGEL, GARY)
September 11, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH H. BLUM on behalf of 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (BLUM, JOSEPH)
September 11, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jeremy C. Karpatkin by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification John M. Fietkiewicz, #2 Certification Jeremy C. Karpatkin, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 154 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY identifying DowDuPont Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNA HOLDINGS LLC identifying Celanese Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
September 11, 2018 Filing 152 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY identifying DowDuPont Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY identifying BP America, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 150 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARKEMA INC. identifying Arkema, S.A., a French public company, as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOHNSON & JOHNSON identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA H. KELLY on behalf of NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC (KELLY, BARBARA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA H. KELLY on behalf of COVANTA ESSEX CO. (KELLY, BARBARA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION identifying chemtrade logistics income fund as Corporate Parent.. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 145 Letter from Amanda G. Dumville Correcting Notices of Appearance. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 144 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONOPCO INC.. (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 143 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEXCEL CORPORATION. (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 142 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DII INDUSTRIES LLC. (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 141 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEGACY VULCAN LLC. (RICH, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC.. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. RICH on behalf of LEGACY VULCAN LLC (RICH, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEXION INC.. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 136 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP.. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 135 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEVAL CORPORATION. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. HARPER on behalf of CONOPCO INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, HEXCEL CORPORATION (HARPER, RICHARD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 133 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 132 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MCKESSON CORPORATION. (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 131 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC. (BIEHL, FREDERICK)
September 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #111 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/15/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 128 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TEXTRON INC.. (BUERMANN, GEORGE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE HOLLON BUERMANN on behalf of TEXTRON INC. (BUERMANN, GEORGE)
September 11, 2018 Filing 126 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.. (FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES O'TOOLE, JR on behalf of CNA HOLDINGS LLC (O'TOOLE, JAMES)
September 11, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON on behalf of CNA HOLDINGS LLC (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
September 11, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PAUL MCTHOMAS on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
September 11, 2018 Filing 122 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION identifying RSR Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (NEEDLEMAN, JOANN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANN NEEDLEMAN on behalf of REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION (NEEDLEMAN, JOANN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA H. KELLY on behalf of COVANTA ESSEX CO. (KELLY, BARBARA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by BARBARA H. KELLY on behalf of NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC (KELLY, BARBARA)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF APOLAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/10/2018. (ld, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Of MARATHON OIL CORPORATION PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/10/2018. (ld, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 118 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION identifying General Dynamics Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (JONES, GEORGE)
September 10, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE C. JONES on behalf of BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION (JONES, GEORGE)
September 10, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS R. CURTIN on behalf of BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION (CURTIN, THOMAS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL FIETKIEWICZ on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. (FIETKIEWICZ, JOHN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 114 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEWELL BRANDS INC.. (RIAZ, AHMED)
September 10, 2018 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEROL CORPORATION. (RIAZ, AHMED)
September 10, 2018 Filing 112 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STWB INC. identifying Bayer Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DUFFY, TIMOTHY)
September 10, 2018 Filing 111 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BEROL CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RIAZ, AHMED)
September 10, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by AHMED MUHAMMED TAN RIAZ on behalf of BEROL CORPORATION, NEWELL BRANDS INC. (RIAZ, AHMED)
September 10, 2018 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHARMACIA LLC identifying Pfizer, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GULLACE, JOHN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION. (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES STEWART on behalf of NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC.. (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES STEWART on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC. (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION. (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES STEWART on behalf of NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION (STEWART, JAMES)
September 10, 2018 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC.. (KAZAN, BARRY)
September 10, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by BARRY M. KAZAN on behalf of STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. (KAZAN, BARRY)
September 10, 2018 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SINGER, LORI)
September 10, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by LORI G. SINGER on behalf of BENJAMIN MOORE & CO. (SINGER, LORI)
September 10, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. HAWORTH on behalf of ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY (HAWORTH, DAVID)
September 10, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by GLENN ANTHONY HARRIS on behalf of ARKEMA INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY (HARRIS, GLENN)
September 10, 2018 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. GULLACE on behalf of PHARMACIA LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GULLACE, JOHN)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #83 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID W. FIELD on behalf of RTC PROPERTIES INC. (FIELD, DAVID)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER permitting Jorge M. Gutierrez, JR., Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/7/2018. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER permitting Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/7/2018. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER permitting Anthony N. Kaim, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/7/2018. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 7, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas D. Lupo. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COATS & CLARK INC.. (GRACER, JEFFREY)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY BRUCE GRACER on behalf of COATS & CLARK INC. (GRACER, JEFFREY)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #83 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEWARK GROUP INC. identifying Caraustar Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
September 7, 2018 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY J. BEVELOCK on behalf of THE NEWARK GROUP INC. (BEVELOCK, GREGORY)
September 7, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI S. MINUSKIN on behalf of STWB INC. (MINUSKIN, HEIDI)
September 7, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of STWB INC. (DUFFY, TIMOTHY)
September 7, 2018 Filing 83 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EDEN WOOD CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ryan Russell Kemper, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ZUCKER, RICHARD)
September 7, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EDEN WOOD CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ryan Russell Kemper, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ZUCKER, RICHARD)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER - Defendant Melon Leasing Corporation, Inc.'s motion for an extension of time to answer, (ECF No. 21), is denied as moot. By Order dated July 25, 2018, (ECF No. 12), Chief Judge Linares had already extended Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint beyond the date that Melon Leasing Corporation, Inc. requested in its motion.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/7/18. (nm, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. ZUCKER on behalf of EDEN WOOD CORPORATION (ZUCKER, RICHARD)
September 6, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NOVELIS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Emily A. Kaller, #2 Certification of Mark D. Kindt, #3 Certification of Barry J. Porter, #4 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(KALLER, EMILY)
September 6, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by EMILY A. KALLER on behalf of NOVELIS CORPORATION (KALLER, EMILY)
September 6, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas D. Lupo by INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas D. Lupo in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A to Lupo Certification, #3 Certification of Matthew B. Corwin in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CORWIN, MATTHEW)
September 6, 2018 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO. identifying Sakata INX Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (CORWIN, MATTHEW)
September 6, 2018 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RTC PROPERTIES INC. identifying Neu Brothers Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (FIELD, DAVID)
September 5, 2018 Filing 74 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. re Pro Hac Vice admissions. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #2 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #4 Certification of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #5 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #7 Certification of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Jr., Esq., #8 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Jr., Esq., #9 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Jr., Esq., #10 Certification of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #11 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #12 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #13 Certification of David E. Romine, Esq., #14 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Romine, Esq., #15 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #16 Certification of Erin Carter, Esq., #17 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Carter, Esq., #18 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erin Carter, Esq.)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADMITTING PRO HAC VICE JOHN F. CERMAK, JR., ESQ., SONJA A. INGLIN, ESQ., AND HANNAH D. BLOINK, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/5/2018. (ld, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 72 Exhibit to #71 Notice of Appearance (Corrected) by INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO.. (CORWIN, MATTHEW)
September 5, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW BLAKE CORWIN on behalf of INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO. (CORWIN, MATTHEW)
August 31, 2018 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert re Occidential Disclosure Statement)(MONDORA, CHARLES)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLEADING; that each of the Gordon & Rees Group members will, by September 12, 2018 serve on Plaintiff's counsel an individual Answer that responds to the party-specific allegations pertaining to each of them in Parts V and VI of the Complaint and that otherwise incorporates by reference the Joint Answer, defined below; etc.; that Counsel for the Gordon & Rees Group shall file all of the individual Answers and the Joint Answers with the Clerk of the Court on November 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/29/2018. (ld, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN ANDREW SOLTESZ, III on behalf of PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C. (SOLTESZ, JOHN)
August 29, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Charles M. Denton: $ 150, receipt number CAM009908 (tf, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC identifying Eaton Corporation plc as Corporate Parent.. (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
August 27, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY S. SOOS on behalf of ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC. (SOOS, JEFFREY)
August 27, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by GERI L. ALBIN on behalf of ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC. (ALBIN, GERI)
August 27, 2018 Filing 64 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulation)(HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 27, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO on behalf of SPECTRASERV INC. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
August 27, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO on behalf of PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
August 27, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO on behalf of CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE on behalf of RECKITT BENCKISER (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE on behalf of SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P. (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE on behalf of SUNOCO (R&M) LLC (DUMVILLE, AMANDA)
August 24, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P. (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
August 24, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of SUNOCO (R&M) LLC (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
August 24, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL on behalf of RECKITT BENCKISER (KURZWEIL, LANNY)
August 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles M. Denton. Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN T. SINGER on behalf of DARLING INGREDIENTS INC. (SINGER, STEVEN)
August 23, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Charles M. Denton by FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
August 23, 2018 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED identifying ColourOZ Investment 2 LLC as Corporate Parent.. (MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
August 23, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by REGINA SARA ELIZABETH MURPHY on behalf of FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED (MURPHY, REGINA SARA)
August 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/17/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY J. REITANO on behalf of PMC GLOBAL INC. (REITANO, ANTHONY)
August 22, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG S. PROVORNY on behalf of PMC GLOBAL INC. (PROVORNY, CRAIG)
August 21, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl of William Ballaine, #2 Declaration Decl. of Charles Mondora, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MONDORA, CHARLES)
August 21, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of HEXION INC. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 16, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 16, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Chief Judge Jose L. Linares. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK CONRAD BIEHL, III on behalf of MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC (BIEHL, FREDERICK)
August 13, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of TEVAL CORPORATION (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 13, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by LEE HENIG-ELONA on behalf of KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP. (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 13, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP. of FORMATION OF LIAISON GROUP (HENIG-ELONA, LEE)
August 10, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certification)(ANSELMI, ANDREW)
August 9, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. MCCLAMMER on behalf of LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCCLAMMER, JAMES)
August 9, 2018 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC. identifying Getty Properties Corp. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MOSHANG, NICOLE)
August 9, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE R. MOSHANG on behalf of LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MOSHANG, NICOLE)
August 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please disregard the answer due date found in the summons returned executed entries. Please follow the schedule set in the Pre-Answer Scheduling Order #12 filed on 7/25/2018. (jr)
August 8, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. SETON COMPANY INC. served on 7/31/2018, answer due 8/21/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD. served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018; ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC. served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018; WIGGINS PLASTICS INC. served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018; PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C. served on 7/26/2018, answer due 8/16/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. 3M COMPANY served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018; CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC. served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. TEVAL CORPORATION served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP. served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018; MCKESSON CORPORATION served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018; TIFFANY AND COMPANY served on 7/17/2018, answer due 8/7/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. PPG INDUSTRIES INC. served on 7/16/2018, answer due 8/6/2018; SUNOCO (R&M) LLC served on 7/16/2018, answer due 8/6/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; ASHLAND LLC served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; BENJAMIN MOORE & CO. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; HEXION INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; ISP CHEMICALS LLC served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018; THE NEWARK GROUP INC. served on 7/13/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. ALDEN LEEDS INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; ATLAS REFINERY INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; JOHNSON & JOHNSON served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; MI HOLDINGS INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; SPECTRASERV INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018; STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. served on 7/12/2018, answer due 8/2/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; AVENTISUB LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; BASF CATALYSTS LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; BASF CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; BEROL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CANNING GUMM LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CBS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CHARGEURS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CNA HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; COATS & CLARK INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; COVANTA ESSEX CO. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CRODA INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; DARLING INGREDIENTS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; DII INDUSTRIES LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; EDEN WOOD CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; FORT JAMES LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/15/2018; FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; HARRIS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; HEXCEL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; INGREDION INCORPORATED served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; LEGACY VULCAN LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; MALLINCKRODT LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; MARATHON OIL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NEWELL BRANDS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NOVARTIS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NOVELIS CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; PHARMACIA LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; PMC GLOBAL INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; QUALA SYSTEMS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; QUALITY CARRIERS INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; RECKITT BENCKISER served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; RTC PROPERTIES INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; SEQUA CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; STALEY HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; STWB INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; TEXTRON INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; THE OKONITE COMPANY INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018; ZENECA INC. served on 7/11/2018, answer due 8/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION served on 7/10/2018, answer due 7/31/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 8, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. APOLAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; ARKEMA INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; CONOPCO INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; GOODRICH CORPORATION served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC. served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018; THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , move or otherwise reply to the Complaint by MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC.. (PEARCE, RANDY)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC.. (PEARCE, RANDY)
August 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by RANDY T. PEARCE on behalf of MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC. (PEARCE, RANDY)
August 1, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by MAURA W. SOMMER on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC (SOMMER, MAURA)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW E. ANSELMI on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
July 30, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (GRIPPO, JONATHAN)
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN A. GRIPPO on behalf of BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION (GRIPPO, JONATHAN)
July 27, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by INGREDION INCORPORATED has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/9/2018. (ld, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MARCO FILIPE FERREIRA on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (FERREIRA, MARCO)
July 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES WILLIAM MONDORA on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (MONDORA, CHARLES)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRE-ANSWER SCHEDULING ORDER; that the Clerk of the Court shall update the docket to reflect that the deadline to answer or otherwise move is now November 30, 2018; that Defendants shall serve their answer or dispositive Motion on Plaintiff by September 12, 2018;etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/25/2018. (ld, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M. RICHMAN on behalf of CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from David R. Erickson, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
July 24, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INGREDION INCORPORATED. (DRUCK, JOSHUA)
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ingredion Incorporated. Attorney JOSHUA A. DRUCK for INGREDION INCORPORATED added. (DRUCK, JOSHUA)
July 24, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FORT JAMES LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/15/2018. (ld, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORT JAMES LLC identifying Georgia-Pacific LLC as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, RUSSELL)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RUSSELL T. BROWN,CHRISTOPHER L. WEISS for FORT JAMES LLC added. (BROWN, RUSSELL)
July 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES JENNINGS DENNEN on behalf of OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (DENNEN, CHARLES)
July 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., 3M COMPANY, A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, APOLAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ATLAS REFINERY INC., AVENTISUB LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, FORT JAMES LLC, FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INGREDION INCORPORATED, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MARATHON OIL CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL INC., PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., RECKITT BENCKISER, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, SEQUA CORPORATION, SETON COMPANY INC., SPECTRASERV INC., STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., ZENECA INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, )
June 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (jr)
June 30, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Pretrial Order REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND NOTICE TO PRESERVE DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
June 30, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION identifying OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
June 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC., 3M COMPANY, A.E. STALEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION, APOLAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., ARKEMA INC., ASHLAND LLC, ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ATLAS REFINERY INC., AVENTISUB LLC, BASF CATALYSTS LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., BEROL CORPORATION, BORDEN & REMINGTON CORPORATION, CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY, CANNING GUMM LLC, CBS CORPORATION, CHARGEURS INC., CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC., CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, COATS & CLARK INC., CONOPCO INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC, COVANTA ESSEX CO., CRODA INC., CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION, DARLING INGREDIENTS INC., DII INDUSTRIES LLC, E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & COMPANY, EDEN WOOD CORPORATION, ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC., EMERALD KALAMA CHEMICAL LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES INC., ESSEX CHEMICAL CORPORATION, EVERETT SMITH GROUP LTD., FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED, FORT JAMES LLC, FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION, FOUNDRY STREET DEVELOPMENT LLC, FRANKLIN-BURLINGTON PLASTICS INC., GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, HARRIS CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, HEXION INC., HOFFMAN-LA ROCHE INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., HOUGHTON INTERNATIONAL INC., INGREDION INCORPORATED, INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC, INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO., ISP CHEMICALS LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC., KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORP., LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC., LEGACY VULCAN LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MARATHON OIL CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC., MELTSER-TONNELE AVENUE LLC, MI HOLDINGS INC., NAPPWOOD LAND CORPORATION, NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC, NEWELL BRANDS INC., NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVARTIS CORPORATION, NOVELIS CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY, PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC, PALIN ENTERPRISES L.L.C., PFISTER URBAN RENEWAL CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL INC., PPG INDUSTRIES INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES INC., QUALA SYSTEMS INC., QUALITY CARRIERS INC., R. T. VANDERBILT HOLDING COMPANY, INC., RECKITT BENCKISER, REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, ROSELLE MAUSOLEUM MAINTENANCE FUND INC., ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, RTC PROPERTIES INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SCHIFFENHAUS PACKAGING LLC, SEQUA CORPORATION, SETON COMPANY INC., SPECTRASERV INC., STALEY HOLDINGS LLC, STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SUNOCO (R&M) LLC, SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P., TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC, TEVAL CORPORATION, TEXTRON INC., THE HARTZ MOUNTAIN CORPORATION, THE NEWARK GROUP INC., THE OKONITE COMPANY INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, TIFFANY AND COMPANY, UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, WIGGINS PLASTICS INC., ZENECA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8854643), filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. 21ST CENTURY FOX AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEEMILT'S PETROLEUM INC.
Represented By: JAMES M. MCCLAMMER
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: NICOLE R. MOSHANG
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: GEORGE HOLLON BUERMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INKS & COATINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE
Represented By: VICTOR J ZARRILLI
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM S. HATFIELD
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: SUSANNE Y. PETICOLAS
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARGEURS INC.
Represented By: STEVEN M. RICHMAN
Represented By: JOANN NEEDLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CATALYSTS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: KEITH PATRICK MCMANUS
Represented By: KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAN CHEMICAL CO., INC.
Represented By: GERI L. ALBIN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. SOOS
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS REFINERY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETON COMPANY INC.
Represented By: WENDY F. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION
Represented By: DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKZO NOBEL COATINGS, INC.
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: IRA M. GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATE & LYLE INGREDIENTS AMERICAS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: JOHN RALPH HOLSINGER
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL FOUNDRY COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. CORRISTON
Represented By: DAVID H. ALTMAN
Represented By: SCOTT MICHAEL PRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL FIETKIEWICZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYCE ASSOCIATES, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: MARC SCOTT GAFFREY
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORT JAMES LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER L. WEISS
Represented By: RUSSELL T. BROWN
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC.
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OKONITE COMPANY INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: JAMES S. MONTANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RTC PROPERTIES INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: DAVID W. FIELD
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: ANDREA LYNNE HUDSON CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: JAMES O'TOOLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLINT GROUP INCORPORATED
Represented By: REGINA SARA ELIZABETH MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ENERGY & GAS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIGGINS PLASTICS INC.
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: DAVID A. HAWORTH
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: GLENN ANTHONY HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVERE SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: STEVEN M. RICHMAN
Represented By: JOANN NEEDLEMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL THOMAS PAPA, III
Represented By: SHANNON MARY MCDONALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZENECA INC.
Represented By: JOE PATRICK YEAGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEWARK GROUP INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: GREGORY J. BEVELOCK
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANNING GUMM LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: HEATHER LYN DEMIRJIAN
Represented By: WENDY F. KLEIN
Represented By: DAVID M. KOHANE
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO (R&M) LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Represented By: AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DII INDUSTRIES LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: RICHARD B. HARPER
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELON LEASING CORPORATION INC.
Represented By: RANDY T. PEARCE
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: MARCO FILIPE FERREIRA
Represented By: CHARLES WILLIAM MONDORA
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: MARC J. FELEZZOLA
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVAL CORPORATION
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECTRASERV INC.
Represented By: DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO
Represented By: MATTHEW DAVID ORSINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMTRADE CHEMICALS CORPORATION
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: KAREN E. MURPHY
Represented By: YELENA SHVARTS FERREIRA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALAMA SPECIALTY CHEMICALS INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARGEURS WOOL (USA) INC.
Represented By: STEVEN M. RICHMAN
Represented By: JOANN NEEDLEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEXION INC.
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGACY VULCAN LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL L. RICH
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARFIELD MOLDING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCSTRAVICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUNDRY STREET CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABST BREWING COMPANY LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: HEATHER LYN DEMIRJIAN
Represented By: WENDY F. KLEIN
Represented By: DAVID M. KOHANE
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: MATTHEW P. MAZZOLA
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEROL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: AHMED MUHAMMED TAN RIAZ
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL-STANDARD LLC
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: BARBARA H. KELLY
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARLING INGREDIENTS INC.
Represented By: STEVEN T. SINGER
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNOSPEC ACTIVE CHEMICALS LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM S. HATFIELD
Represented By: SUSANNE Y. PETICOLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INX INTERNATIONAL INK CO.
Represented By: MATTHEW BLAKE CORWIN
Represented By: LEE HENIG-ELONA
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO PARTNERS MARKETING & TERMINALS L.P.
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: LANNY STEVEN KURZWEIL
Represented By: AMANDA GRAHAM DUMVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH H. BLUM
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Represented By: JAMES STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ] </