COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX
3Rd Party Defendant: PETER MOCCO, ABC COMPANY, 1-10 and JOHN DOES, 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00889
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Leda D Wettre
Referring Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/11/2019 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 3/18/2019. (kd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 Third-Party ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by PETER MOCCO. (NANCE, JOHN)
February 20, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #12 Order submitted by PETER MOCCO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/15/2019. (JB, )
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER Granting #11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Peter Mocco., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/20/2019. (JB, )
February 16, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order,, submitted by PETER MOCCO has been DENIED. (YOUR APPLICATION IS OUT OF TIME) You must file a motion to request extension of time. (JB, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Peter Mocco.. (MCINERNEY, MARJORIE)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #9 Letter: Oral argument is scheduled for 2/11/19 at 3:00 p.m. before then Hon. Susan D. Wigenton, Courtroom 5C, in Newark. So Ordered by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 2/4/19. (cds)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from David P. Lonski. (LONSKI, DAVID)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Letter. (PETERSON, GREGORY)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING AND REASSIGNING CASE. Case Number 3:19-cv-889. Case reallocated to Newark and reassigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp, Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/31/2019. (jjc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from DAVID P. LONSKI. (LONSKI, DAVID)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from John K, Fiorilla. (PETERSON, GREGORY)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from David P. Lonski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Color photos, #2 Exhibit Color photos)(LONSKI, DAVID)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from John K, Fiorilla. (PETERSON, GREGORY)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Plaintiff Requesting Expedited Return Date of the Order to Show Cause. (PFEIL, DARREN)
January 22, 2019 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Consolidated Rail Corporation from Middlesex County Superior Court, Chancery Part, case number MID-C-201-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9323080). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal)(FIORILLA, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PETER MOCCO
Represented By: JOHN BOATNER NANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ABC COMPANY, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX
Represented By: DAVID P. LONSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Represented By: GREGORY EDWIN PETERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?