UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. LEVOFF

Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION and UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: GENE DANIEL LEVOFF
Case Number: 2:2019cv05536
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Mark Falk
Referring Judge: William J Martini
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by GENE DANIEL LEVOFF.(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 9, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Gene Daniel Levoff. Attorney JOHN D. TORTORELLA for GENE DANIEL LEVOFF added. (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Against Gene Daniel Levoff served on Kevin Marino on February 18, 2019, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION., SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. GENE DANIEL LEVOFF served on 2/18/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (MAHER, DANIEL)
February 13, 2019 Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (eu, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN HARRY MARINO on behalf of GENE DANIEL LEVOFF (MARINO, KEVIN)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GENE DANIEL LEVOFF. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (byl)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GENE DANIEL LEVOFF with JURY DEMAND, filed by UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAHER, DANIEL) Modified on 2/14/2019 (dam, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. LEVOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: DANIEL JOSEPH MAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENE DANIEL LEVOFF
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?