SALERNO, M.D. et al v. UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AMANDA MARINO, M.D., ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., DIANA LARREA, D.O., PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, NILAY R. SHAH, M.D., KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, M.D., CATALINA DELACRUZ, M.D., MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, M.D., BELA LASCHIVER, N.P, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, N.P., MARIELA PABON, R.D., KEVIN HERMAN, M.D., AIDA RAMOS, F.N.P, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ANDREA FODOR, N.P., SM MEDICAL LLC, RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, M.D., ROEL P. GALOPE, D.O., RAKESH K. SAHNI, M.D., INAS WASSEF, M.D., JOHN H. RUNDBACK, M.D., GUETTY GABAUD, N.P., SVETLANA SALERNO, M.D, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, D.O., VICTORIA A. HOWELL, N.P., SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC. and THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant: AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., AMERICHOICE, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, OPTUM, INC., JOHN DOES 1-20, OPTUM CARE, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY and RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP
Case Number: 2:2019cv18130
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN TOPELSOHN on behalf of MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, DIANA LARREA, DO, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, INAS WASSEF, MD (TOPELSOHN, LAUREN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, DIANA LARREA, DO, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, INAS WASSEF, MD identifying The Medical Society of New Jersey as Corporate Parent.. (ADLER, STEVEN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, DIANA LARREA, DO, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, INAS WASSEF, MD identifying Pediatrics and Adolescent Saint Mary Clinic LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ADLER, STEVEN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, DIANA LARREA, DO, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, INAS WASSEF, MD identifying Salerno Medical Assoc. and Senior Healthcare Outreach Program as Corporate Parent.. (ADLER, STEVEN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, DIANA LARREA, DO, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC., NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, INAS WASSEF, MD identifying SM Medical, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (ADLER, STEVEN)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that 1) Plaintiffs' claims in this case are referred to arbitration with the American Arbitration Association (AAA) for an initial determination of arbitrability; 2) Defendants are enjoined and restrained from taking any action to not renew any Providers, defined as the Plaintiffs in the original complaint, until November 4, 2019 to enable Plaintiffs the opportunity to file an arbitration or arbitrations and obtain a ruling concerning arbitrability referenced in paragraph 1 above; 3) For the Providers as defined above, Defendants shall immediately remove from any of their online and any other directories or other listings any notation that Providers are not accepting new patients or that their network participation is ending and/or not being renewed; 4) The clerk shall STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action WITHOUT PREJUDICE to reopening if and when any claims herein are found not to be arbitrable; 5) Any parties not covered by this Order may opt to file or join in a claim in arbitration as quickly as they wish; their rights are not affected or their remedies delayed by this Order. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/11/2019. (nic, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Steven L. Penaro re #23 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PENARO, STEVEN)
October 11, 2019 Filing 23 Letter from Steven I. Adler, Esq. re #3 Order to Show Cause,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(ADLER, STEVEN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Steven I. Adler, Esq. re #3 Order to Show Cause,,,. (ADLER, STEVEN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 Letter from Steven L. Penaro re #19 Letter. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 Transcript of SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on October 4, 2019, before Judge Kevin McNulty. Court Reporter: Rhea Villanti (732-895-3403). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (mfr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 Letter re #3 Order to Show Cause,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order (Redlined), #2 Exhibit Order (Clean Version))(ADLER, STEVEN)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin McNulty: Show Cause Hearing held on 10/4/2019. Hearing on Order to show cause why a temporary restraining order should not be entered preliminary enjoining defendants. Ruling placed on the record. Order to be submitted. (Court Reporter/Recorder Rhea C. Villanti.) (nic, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Steven I. Adler, Esq. re #3 Order to Show Cause,,,. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Luz Capcha with Exhibits A-C, #2 Certification of R. Yair with Exhibits A-E)(ADLER, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kevin McNulty: Telephone Conference held on 10/2/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder NONE.) (nic, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified against OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY, THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY, filed by ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, #2 Supplement Correspondce to Judge McNulty)(ADLER, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTUM, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OPTUM CARE, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICHOICE, INC. identifying UnitedHealth Group Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER admitting William H. Jordan, Esq., Brian D. Boone, Esq., and Lee A. Deneen, Esq. to appear pro hac vice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 10/1/2019. (seb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Steven L. Penaro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 Declaration of William H. Jordan, #3 Declaration of Brian D. Boone, #4 Declaration of Lee A. Deneen, #5 Text of Proposed Order /proposed Consent Order Admitting William H. Jordan, Brian D. Boone and Lee A. Denne Pro Hac Vice, #6 Certificate of Service)(PENARO, STEVEN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN L. PENARO on behalf of AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., AMERICHOICE, INC., OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY (PENARO, STEVEN)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PENARO, STEVEN)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants shall appear and show cause why the UHC Companies and Americhoice, as well as their parents, subsidiaries, affiliates, divisions, officers, directors, principals, servants, employees, attorneys, representatives, successors and assigns, and all those in active concert or participation with them, directly or indirectly, shouldn't be preliminary enjoined and restrained from: A. terminating Providers' participation in the plan; Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order to Show Cause, the summons and complaint and their moving papers upon which it is based on Defendants by hand within 2 days; The return dates of this Order to Show Cause is Friday, October 4, 2019 in Newark - Courtroom 4 before Judge Kevin McNulty; etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 9/20/2019. (sms)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., AMERICHOICE, INC., OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC., AMERICHOICE, INC., JOHN DOES 1-20, OPTUM CARE, INC., OPTUM, INC., RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP, UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN, UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC., UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW040564) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROEL P. GALOPE, DO, MARYELLEN ROBERTS, NP, SVETLANA SALERNO, MD, BELA LASCHIVER, NP, ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D., ELIZABETH D. EVANS, DO, KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, MD, PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC, KEVIN HERMAN, MD, VICTORIA A. HOWELL, NP, DIANA LARREA, DO, ANDREA FODOR, NP, RAKESH K. SAHNI, MD, JOHN H. RUNDBACK, MD, NILAY R. SHAH, MD, SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP, AMANDA MARINO, MD, INAS WASSEF, MD, SM MEDICAL LLC, GUETTY GABAUD, NP, CATALINA DELACRUZ, MD, MARIELA PABON, RD, MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, MD, AIDA RAMOS, FNP, RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, MD, SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification Of Aida Ramos, #3 Certification of Bela Laschiver, #4 Certification of Velylia McIver, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(qa, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALERNO, M.D. et al v. UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA MARINO, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER SALERNO, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA LARREA, D.O.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDIATRICS AND ADOLESCENT SAINT MARY CLINIC, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NILAY R. SHAH, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUANG-YIAO HSIEH, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATALINA DELACRUZ, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOUNIR ABDELSHAHID, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BELA LASCHIVER, N.P
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARYELLEN ROBERTS, N.P.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIELA PABON, R.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HERMAN, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDA RAMOS, F.N.P
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALERNO MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LLP
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA FODOR, N.P.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMEZ W. SAMUEL, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROEL P. GALOPE, D.O.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAKESH K. SAHNI, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INAS WASSEF, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. RUNDBACK, M.D.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUETTY GABAUD, N.P.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVETLANA SALERNO, M.D
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH D. EVANS, D.O.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTORIA A. HOWELL, N.P.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENIOR HEALTHCARE OUTREACH PROGRAM, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN I. ADLER
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE MEDICAL SOCIETY OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: STEVEN I ADLER
Represented By: LAUREN TOPELSOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICHOICE OF NEW JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICHOICE, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY PLAN
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM CARE, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVERSIDE MEDICAL GROUP
Represented By: STEVEN L. PENARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?