FYT SUPPLIES, INC. et al v. NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: QING ZHANG and FYT SUPPLIES, INC.
Defendant: NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY and DANIEL SANTOS
Case Number: 2:2020cv06844
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: James B Clark
Referring Judge: Kevin McNulty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASSELL, MICHAEL)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FYT SUPPLIES, INC.. (CASSELL, MICHAEL)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 7/6/2020 (MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY from Superior Court of New Jersey Middlesex County, case number ESX L 2337 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10900664), filed by NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FYT SUPPLIES, INC. et al v. NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QING ZHANG
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CASSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FYT SUPPLIES, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL D. CASSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAUTILUS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: ANTHONY LOUIS MISCIOSCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL SANTOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?