BAH v. APPLE INC. et al
Plaintiff: OUSMANE BAH
Defendant: PARAMUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, JOHN WOODRUFF, APPLE INC., LIEUTENANT ROBERT OLIVE, DETECTIVE PAUL SIEMON, STEVEN YHAP and SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv15018
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, CARRIE H. COHEN and KATIE L. VIGGIANI, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jc, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Katie L. Viggiani to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11814782.) (FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Carrie H. Cohen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11814768.) (FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to KATIE L. VIGGIANI, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/2020. (ld, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CARRIE H. COHEN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/2020. (ld, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., JOHN WOODRUFF, STEVEN YHAP. (METZGER, DAVID)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #15 Application for Extension of Time to Answer, etc. submitted by APPLE INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/12/2021. (jc, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The #16 Application for Extension of Time to Answer, etc. submitted by SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., STEVEN YHAP, and JOHN WOODRUFF has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/12/2021. (jc, )
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by APPLE INC.. (FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., JOHN WOODRUFF, STEVEN YHAP. (METZGER, DAVID)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID METZGER on behalf of SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., JOHN WOODRUFF, STEVEN YHAP (METZGER, DAVID)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by APPLE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Fioccola, #2 Certification of Katie L. Viggiani, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by APPLE INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of David J. Fioccola, #2 Certification of Carrie H. Cohen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA on behalf of APPLE INC. (FIOCCOLA, DAVID)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. JOHN WOODRUFF waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. STEVEN YHAP waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC. waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. APPLE INC. waiver sent on 10/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. ROBERT OLIVE served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. PAUL SIEMON served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OUSMANE BAH. PARAMUS POLICE DEPARTMENT served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (TARIQ, SUBHAN)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to APPLE INC., ROBERT OLIVE, PARAMUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., PAUL SIEMON, JOHN WOODRUFF, STEVEN YHAP. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE INC., ROBERT OLIVE, PARAMUS POLICE DEPARTMENT, SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC., PAUL SIEMON, JOHN WOODRUFF, STEVEN YHAP ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11564217) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OUSMANE BAH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Proposed Summons - Apple, #4 Summons Proposed Summons - Security Industry Specialists, #5 Summons Proposed Summons - Steven Yhap, #6 Summons Proposed Summons - John Woodruff, #7 Summons Proposed Summons - Paul Siemon, #8 Summons Proposed Summons - Robert Olive, #9 Summons Proposed Summons - Paramus Police Department)(TARIQ, SUBHAN)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAH v. APPLE INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMUS POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WOODRUFF
Represented By: DAVID METZGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: DAVID JOHN FIOCCOLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEUTENANT ROBERT OLIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DETECTIVE PAUL SIEMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN YHAP
Represented By: DAVID METZGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITY INDUSTRY SPECIALISTS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID METZGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OUSMANE BAH
Represented By: SUBHAN TARIQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?