NADERI v. CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NADER NADERI
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Cross Claimant: CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv18958
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Andre M Espinosa
Referring Judge: Julien Xavier Neals
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Scheduling Initial R16 Conference in Pro Se case, JDP due by January 5, 2022 and Initial scheduling Order to be filed on or before January 28, 2022 by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/14/2021. (spc)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.. (GANNON, RYAN)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. by CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC..(GANNON, RYAN)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (adc, )
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (adc, )
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC., UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number NEW045516) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NADER NADERI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachments, #3 Consent NEF form, #4 Certificate of Service)(adc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NADERI v. CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NADER NADERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CONCENTRA HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: RYAN THOMAS GANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?