OSWALD et al v. IRELAND-IMHOF et al
Plaintiff: TROY OSWALD, DAVID RIOS and MICHAEL MCDUFFIE
Defendant: DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, PASSAIC COUNTY DEMOCRATIC COMMITTEE, JOHN DOES 1-10, ANDREW J. BRUCK and MATTHEW J. PLATKIN
Amicus Curiae: Yohane Perdomo and Kaholin Pena
Case Number: 2:2022cv02195
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER The Court having conducted a telephone status conference with all counsel, and all counsel agreeing that the proceedings before the District Court should be stayed pending appeal, defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended without date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/24/2022. (Wettre, Leda)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 5/24/2022. (LM, )
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER The time of tomorrow's telephonic status is hereby changed to 1:30 p.m. All other instructions remain the same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/23/22. (Wettre, Leda)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER - Per counsel's request, the telephone conference set for May 12, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre is adjourned to May 24, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/12/2022. (rn)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Letter from Matthew C. Moench, Esq., re 23 Order,. (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference set for May 12, 2022 will now proceed at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/11/22. (LM, )
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is set for May 12, 2022 at 3:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/6/2022. (rn)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Letter from Dominic L. Giova, Deputy Attorney General. (GIOVA, DOMINIC)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 USCA Case Number 22-1742 for #18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by DAVID RIOS, MICHAEL MCDUFFIE, TROY OSWALD. USCA Case Manager Caitlyn (CJG) (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3cjg)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #16 Opinion, #17 Order by MICHAEL MCDUFFIE, TROY OSWALD, DAVID RIOS. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANJDC-13355064. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 4/21/2022. (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2022 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by DAVID RIOS, MICHAEL MCDUFFIE, TROY OSWALD. (Court Reporter, Charles McGuire (215-840-7030)) (aa, )
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/21/22. (aa, )
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/21/22. (aa, )
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from Passaic County Counsel re #13 Letter. (PARK, LESLIE)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Albert C. Buglione, Esq.. (BUGLIONE, ALBERT)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Matthew C. Moench, Esq. re #5 Order on Motion for TRO,,,. (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DOMINIC LARUE GIOVA on behalf of MATTHEW J. PLATKIN (GIOVA, DOMINIC)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATTHEW J. PLATKIN, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, PASSAIC COUNTY DEMOCRATIC COMMITTEE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) Modified on 4/20/2022 (lag, ).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 5/16/2022 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF Reply Brief in Support of TRO/OTSC (COLLINS, MICHAEL)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Dominic L. Giova, DAG, on behalf of Matthew J. Platkin, Acting Attorney General of New Jersey, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief. (GIOVA, DOMINIC)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by Yohane Perdomo, Kaholin Pena. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BUGLIONE, ALBERT)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Passaic County Clerk's ANSWER to Complaint filed as an Order to Show Cause by DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certification Certification of County Clerk, #9 Exhibit A)(PARK, LESLIE)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion in Opposition to Order to Show Cause ANSWER to Complaint by PASSAIC COUNTY DEMOCRATIC COMMITTEE.(CERONE, MICHAEL)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER granting #2 Motion for TRO. Defendant Danielle Ireland-Imhof is hereby temporarily restrained and enjoined from printing any and all Primary Election ballots involving the Republican Primary in Passaic County involving the office of the sheriff until 4/21/2022 at 4:00 PM. Defendants shall, on or before 4/18/2022 at 4:00 PM, file a written response with the Clerk of the District Court. Plaintiff shall, on or before 4/19/2022 at 4:00 PM file a written response thereof. The Parties shall appear and show cause before the United States District Court of the District of New Jersey via zoom on 4/21/2022 at 2:00 PM why a preliminary injunction, as requested in Petitioners' Verified Complaint should not be granted. etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 4/18/2022. (wh) Modified on 4/18/2022 (wh).
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 4/21/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge M. C. Arleo. (wh)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Order Granting a Temporary Restraining Order Until April 21, 2022, and setting a briefing schedule and hearing date by All Plaintiffs re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Order by Consent Granting Temporary Restraining Order un Wednesday, April 20, 2022 and Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule by All Plaintiffs re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW J. BRUCK, DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF, JOHN DOES 1-10, PASSAIC COUNTY DEMOCRATIC COMMITTEE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13337509), filed by TROY OSWALD, MICHAEL MCDUFFIE, DAVID RIOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Verified Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(MOENCH, MATTHEW)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OSWALD et al v. IRELAND-IMHOF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY OSWALD
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RIOS
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCDUFFIE
Represented By: MATTHEW CHRISTOPHER MOENCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIELLE IRELAND-IMHOF
Represented By: LESLIE SUZANNE PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSAIC COUNTY DEMOCRATIC COMMITTEE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CERONE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW J. BRUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW J. PLATKIN
Represented By: DOMINIC LARUE GIOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yohane Perdomo
Represented By: ALBERT C. BUGLIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kaholin Pena
Represented By: ALBERT C. BUGLIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?