OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, ASHLAND LLC, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., TFCF AMERICA, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVAL CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, NEU HOLDINGS U.S. CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., STWB INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL, INC., PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SEQUA CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV, INC. and KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2023cv01699
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Madeline Cox Arleo
Referring Judge: Leda D Wettre
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9613 CERCLA
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 64 Exhibit to #60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, [60-1] revised with wet signature by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (TALBERT, JEFFREY)
May 19, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Status Conference held on 5/19/2023. (LM, )
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that Defendants shall file a motion to stay this matter on or before 7/5/2023. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the motion to stay on or before 8/7/2023. Defendants shall file their reply in further support of the motion to stay on or before 8/28/2023. Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 45 days after the motion to stay is adjudicated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/19/2023. (wh)
May 19, 2023 Filing 62 RESPONSE re #56 Letter. (BOHN, KIRSTIN)
May 19, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Evans, Esq.. Motion set for 6/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
May 19, 2023 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #60 -1 Declaration of Gregory Evans, attached to the #60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Evans, submitted by J. TALBERT on 5/18/2023 does not contain a proper signature. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE OF THE DECLARATION WITH A PROPER WET SIGNATURE (NOT AN S/ SIGNATURE), using the event "Exhibit (to Document)" and link it back to the #60 Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court.(wh)
May 18, 2023 Filing 61 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ASHLAND LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, TFCF AMERICA, INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. . (TALBERT, JEFFREY)
May 18, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory Evans, Esq. by PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Evans, Esq. in Support of Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration of Compliance with Local Rule 101.1(c) of Jeffrey D. Talbert, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Gregory Evans, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service)(TALBERT, JEFFREY)
May 18, 2023 Filing 59 Letter from the Small Parties Group to Magistrate Judge Wettre re OxyChem Scheduling Letter. (TALBERT, JEFFREY)
May 18, 2023 Filing 58 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Safety-Kleen Envirosystems Company.. (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
May 18, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PAUL MCTHOMAS on behalf of SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
May 18, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #58 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/13/2023. (wh)
May 17, 2023 Filing 56 Letter from Kathy D. Patrick, Esq. and John J. McDermott, Esq. to Magistrate Judge Wettre re Status Update re 43 Order,,. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 17, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by KIRSTIN BOHN on behalf of PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION (BOHN, KIRSTIN)
May 17, 2023 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by ZACHARY BERLINER on behalf of NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION (BERLINER, ZACHARY)
May 17, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK S. HEINZELMANN on behalf of NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION (HEINZELMANN, MARK)
May 17, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DAVID LICHTENSTEIN on behalf of NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION (LICHTENSTEIN, MICHAEL)
May 16, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES O'TOOLE, JR on behalf of CNA HOLDINGS LLC (O'TOOLE, JAMES)
May 16, 2023 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON on behalf of CNA HOLDINGS LLC (DALTON, CHRISTOPHER)
May 15, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN PHILLIP FRANEY on behalf of PHARMACIA LLC (FRANEY, BRYAN)
May 12, 2023 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER on behalf of BASF CORPORATION (SCHNEIDER, DAVID)
May 12, 2023 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON on behalf of BASF CORPORATION (GANNON, KATHLEEN)
May 11, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK THOMAS on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (THOMAS, PATRICK)
May 11, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by REYNOLD LAMBERT on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (LAMBERT, REYNOLD)
May 11, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by NORMAN W. SPINDEL on behalf of PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (SPINDEL, NORMAN)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER - A telephone conference is set for May 19, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Dial-in information for the conference is (888) 684-8852, access code 8948139. The parties shall submit concise status letters to the Court no later than May 17, 2023. Counsel shall email an appearance sheet listing all of the attorneys who will be participating to LDW_orders@njd.uscourts.gov at least 15 minutes prior to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/10/2023. (rn)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of NICK BEACHY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of JORGE M. GUTIERREZ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of DAVID E. ROMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of ANTHONY N. KAIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of ANN T. LEBECK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of LARRY D. SILVER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh) Modified on 5/4/2023 (wh).
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Letter/Application, for the Pro Hac Vice admission of KATHY D. PATRICK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/4/2023. (wh)
May 4, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN ELIZABETH KROHN on behalf of OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION (KROHN, LAUREN)
May 4, 2023 Filing 34 Letter from John J. McDermott, Esq. re Pro Hac Vice admissions. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #2 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathy D. Patrick, Esq., #4 Certification of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #5 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Silver, Esq., #7 Certification of Ann T. Lebeck, Esq., #8 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ann T. Lebeck, Esq., #9 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ann T. Lebeck, Esq., #10 Certification of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #11 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #12 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony N. Kaim, Esq., #13 Certification of David E. Romine, Esq., #14 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Romine, Esq., #15 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David E. Romine, Esq., #16 Certification of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Esq., #17 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Esq., #18 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jorge M. Gutierrez, Esq., #19 Certification of Nick Beachy, Esq., #20 Certification of John J. McDermott, Esq. in Support of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nick Beachy, Esq., #21 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nick Beachy, Esq.)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN)
May 4, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by CANDEE WILDE on behalf of ALDEN LEEDS INC. (WILDE, CANDEE)
May 1, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSE GORDON RICHHEIMER on behalf of SPECTRASERV, INC. (RICHHEIMER, JESSE)
May 1, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO on behalf of SPECTRASERV, INC. (BUONGIORNO, DIANA)
April 28, 2023 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MUSCATO on behalf of TFCF AMERICA, INC. (MUSCATO, ANDREW)
April 27, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY on behalf of STWB INC. (DUFFY, TIMOTHY)
April 27, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH C. AMOROSO on behalf of STWB INC. (AMOROSO, JOSEPH)
April 27, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by HEIDI S. MINUSKIN on behalf of STWB INC. (MINUSKIN, HEIDI)
April 27, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Debra Carfora. Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
April 26, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY GENE WATKINS on behalf of PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY (WATKINS, CASEY)
April 26, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. HAWORTH on behalf of PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY (HAWORTH, DAVID)
April 26, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Debra Carfora by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Debra Carfora in Support of Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Declaration Declaration of Compliance with Local Rule 101.1(c), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification)(MCGAHREN, JOHN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. HARPER on behalf of CONOPCO, INC., HEXCEL CORPORATION (HARPER, RICHARD)
April 25, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM CHARLES ARNOLD on behalf of ISP CHEMICALS LLC (ARNOLD, ADAM)
April 25, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM S. HATFIELD on behalf of GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION (HATFIELD, WILLIAM)
April 25, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by JUDY LU on behalf of NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC. (LU, JUDY)
April 25, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by CAMILLE V. OTERO on behalf of ASHLAND LLC (OTERO, CAMILLE)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning deadline for filing Responses to Complaint. Defendants (see attached for signatories) shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint by 6/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/25/2023. (wh)
April 25, 2023 Filing 17 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JOHN F. GULLACE for PHARMACIA LLC added. (GULLACE, JOHN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MCGAHREN on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY (MCGAHREN, JOHN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHARMACIA LLC identifying Pfizer, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GULLACE, JOHN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN F. GULLACE on behalf of PHARMACIA LLC (GULLACE, JOHN)
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY ALAN COYLE on behalf of PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. (COYLE, CASEY)
April 25, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/9/2023. (wh)
April 25, 2023 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #17 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PHARMACIA LLC has been RENDERED MOOT by the #18 Stipulation and Order. (wh)
April 24, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,, and Proposed Order Concerning Deadline for Filing Responses to Complaint (Joint) by ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., ASHLAND LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NEU HOLDINGS U.S. CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL, INC., PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SEQUA CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV, INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, TFCF AMERICA, INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. (TALBERT, JEFFREY)
April 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY PAUL GENGEL on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (GENGEL, GARY)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY PAUL GENGEL on behalf of SEQUA CORPORATION (GENGEL, GARY)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of SEQUA CORPORATION (BROWN, KEGAN)
April 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KEGAN ANDREW BROWN on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (BROWN, KEGAN)
April 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY D TALBERT on behalf of ASHLAND LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SEQUA CORPORATION, STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, TFCF AMERICA, INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Group of Defendants)(TALBERT, JEFFREY)
April 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PAUL MCTHOMAS on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (MCTHOMAS, MICHAEL)
April 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW E. ANSELMI on behalf of COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ANSELMI, ANDREW)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., ASHLAND LLC, BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, NEU HOLDINGS U.S. CORPORATION, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION, PHARMACIA LLC, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL, INC., PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, SEQUA CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV, INC., STWB INC., SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, TEVAL CORPORATION, TFCF AMERICA, INC., THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (wh)
March 27, 2023 Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (ps)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION identifying OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORPORATION as Corporate Parent.. (MCDERMOTT, JOHN) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/27/2023) (wh, ).
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION, THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION, PHARMACIA LLC, ASHLAND LLC, CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC., TFCF AMERICA, INC., ALDEN LEEDS INC., ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC., BASF CORPORATION, BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION, BENJAMIN MOORE & CO., CNA HOLDINGS LLC, CONOPCO, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC, ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC., TEVAL CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HEXCEL CORPORATION, ISP CHEMICALS LLC, KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION, LEGACY VULCAN, LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY, NEU HOLDINGS U.S. CORPORATION, NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC., STWB INC., PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY, PMC GLOBAL, INC., PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION, PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC., SEQUA CORPORATION, SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION, SPECTRASERV, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14196930), filed by OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCDERMOTT, JOHN) Modified on 3/27/2023 (wh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION v. GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN J. MCDERMOTT, III
Represented By: LAUREN ELIZABETH KROHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIVAUDAN FRAGRANCES CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: WILLIAM S. HATFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: JOHN MCGAHREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOKIA OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID LICHTENSTEIN
Represented By: MARK S. HEINZELMANN
Represented By: ZACHARY BERLINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHARMACIA LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: JOHN F. GULLACE
Represented By: BRYAN PHILLIP FRANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLAND LLC
Represented By: CAMILLE V. OTERO
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAN EARTH OF NORTH JERSEY, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFCF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: ANDREW MUSCATO
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDEN LEEDS INC.
Represented By: CANDEE WILDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE CHEMICAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: DAVID PAUL SCHNEIDER
Represented By: KATHLEEN CLAIRE GANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN MOORE & CO.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. DALTON
Represented By: JAMES O'TOOLE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONOPCO, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: RICHARD B. HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: ANDREW E. ANSELMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENPRO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: GARY PAUL GENGEL
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: KEGAN ANDREW BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEXCEL CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: RICHARD B. HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISP CHEMICALS LLC
Represented By: ADAM CHARLES ARNOLD
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEGACY VULCAN, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: MICHAEL PAUL MCTHOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFETY-KLEEN ENVIROSYSTEMS COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL PAUL MCTHOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEU HOLDINGS U.S. CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVEON HILTON DAVIS INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: JUDY LU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STWB INC.
Represented By: HEIDI S. MINUSKIN
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: JOSEPH C. AMOROSO
Represented By: TIMOTHY IGNATIUS DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITT-CONSOL CHEMICAL COMPANY
Represented By: DAVID A. HAWORTH
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: CASEY GENE WATKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC GLOBAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CASEY ALAN COYLE
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PASSAIC VALLEY SEWERAGE COMMISSION
Represented By: KIRSTIN BOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: NORMAN W. SPINDEL
Represented By: REYNOLD LAMBERT
Represented By: PATRICK THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEQUA CORPORATION
Represented By: GARY PAUL GENGEL
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Represented By: KEGAN ANDREW BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN CHEMICAL CORPORATION
Represented By: JEFFREY D TALBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECTRASERV, INC.
Represented By: DIANA LYNN BUONGIORNO
Represented By: JESSE GORDON RICHHEIMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEARNY SMELTING & REFINING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?