UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. UNION COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: UNION COUNTY, UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity and UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Case Number: 2:2023cv02531
Filed: May 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Ambro (CA3)
Referring Judge: Michael A Hammer
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
3 Judge: Susan D Wigenton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2023 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #3 Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Decree and Order. Signed by Circuit Judge Thomas L. Ambro (CA3), Judge Susan Wigenton, U.S.D.J. and Judge Brian Martinotti, U.S.D.J. on 6/12/2023. (sm)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. Signed by Circuit Judge Thomas L. Ambro (CA3); Judge Susan Wigenton, U.S.D.J and Judge Brian Martinotti, U.S.D.J on 6/12/2023. (sm)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 5/31/2023 at 02:30 PM is CANCELLED. So Ordered by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 05/30/2023. (lr, )
May 25, 2023 Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer no longer assigned to case. (mfr)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DESIGNATION ON APPLICATION TO CONVENE A THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 2284. Case Panel assigned to Circuit Judge Thomas L. Ambro (CA3), District Judge Susan D. Wigenton, and District Judge Brian R. Martinotti for all further proceedings. Circuit Judge Thomas L. Ambro (CA3) shall preside. Signed by Chief U.S. Circuit Judge Michael A. Chagares, on 5/25/2023. (mfr)
May 25, 2023 Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Judge Brian R. Martinotti added. (mfr)
May 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE H. BERGEN on behalf of UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity (BERGEN, BRUCE)
May 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE H. BERGEN on behalf of UNION COUNTY (BERGEN, BRUCE)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE N. COHEN on behalf of UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS (COHEN, GEORGE)
May 15, 2023 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/31/2023 02:30 PM in Newark - Courtroom 1 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. (lr, )
May 11, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS waiver sent on 5/9/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLENKY, SUSAN)
May 11, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNION COUNTY waiver sent on 5/9/2023, answer due 7/10/2023; UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity waiver sent on 5/9/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLENKY, SUSAN)
May 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE GEAR on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (GEAR, BRUCE)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNION COUNTY, UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
May 10, 2023 Set Deadlines as to #3 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Decree . Motion set for 6/5/2023 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
May 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE CHRISTINE RUPP on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (RUPP, MICHELLE)
May 9, 2023 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and Decree by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree and Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MILLENKY, SUSAN)
May 9, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION/PETITION for DESIGNATION OF A DISTRICT COURT OF THREE JUDGES for by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (MILLENKY, SUSAN)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNION COUNTY, UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS, UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLENKY, SUSAN)
May 9, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. UNION COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN A RUSS, IV
Represented By: MICHAEL E. CAMPION
Represented By: SUSAN R. MILLENKY
Represented By: MICHELLE CHRISTINE RUPP
Represented By: BRUCE GEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION COUNTY
Represented By: BRUCE H. BERGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION COUNTY CLERK JOANNE RAJOPPI, in her official capacity
Represented By: BRUCE H. BERGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION COUNTY BOARD OF ELECTIONS
Represented By: GEORGE N. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?