7-ELEVEN, INC. v. SODHI
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Defendant: KARAMJEET SODHI, MANJINDER SINGH, KARAMJIT SINGH and DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Counter_claimant: KARAMJEET SODHI, MANJINDER SINGH and KARAMJIT SINGH
Counter_defendant: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03715
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/18/2018. (mmh)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION re 582 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed; correcting phrase at page ten (10), sentence directly preceding footnote five (5). Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/31/2017. (gxh)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/30/2017. (km)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 548 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/31/2016. (mmh)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 523 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/9/2016. (mmh)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/30/2015. (mmh)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 268 Motion to Compel; denying 7-Eleven's 277 Cross-Motion for Protective Order. Ordered that by 4/1/2015, 7-Eleven shall produce the requested metadata for the documents identified in Plaintiff's moving papers. ORDERED that this Order is entered without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to request additional metadata. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/18/2015. (TH, ) Modified on 3/18/2015 (TH).
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying 104 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/15/14. (js)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 89 Motion for Reconsideration; the Sodhi Action is hereby consolidated with the Younes and Naik Actions for discovery and case management purposes only in front of the Honorable Joel Schneider. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/14/14. (js)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM ORDER, ORDERED that 7-Eleven's request to consolidate the Sodhi Action with the Consolidated Action is DENIED. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/13/2014. (dmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 7-ELEVEN, INC. v. SODHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Represented By: JAMES JOHN FERRELLI
Represented By: STEPHEN SUSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARAMJEET SODHI
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANJINDER SINGH
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KARAMJIT SINGH
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: KARAMJEET SODHI
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MANJINDER SINGH
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: KARAMJIT SINGH
Represented By: GERALD ALLEN MARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN SUSSMAN
Represented By: STEPHEN SUSSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?