HAMMELL et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ARTHUR HAMMELL and LINDA HAMMELL
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ARVINMERITOR, INC., BORG WARNER MORSE TEC, CALIFORNIA SPEED AND SPORT SHOP, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CLARK RELIANCE CORP., CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP., FMC CORPORATION, GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENLYTE GROUP, INC., GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE, INC., MAREMONT CORPORATION, NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF DELAWARE, INC., PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC., PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., SQUARE-D CO., TODD SHIPYARDS CORP., UNION CARBIDE CORP., WARREN PUMPS, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75 and TRANE US, INC.
Cross_claimant: GENLYTE GROUP, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP., GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC., CRANE CO., FMC CORPORATION, ARVINMERITOR, INC. and FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Cross_defendant: GENLYTE GROUP, INC., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ARVINMERITOR, INC., BORG WARNER MORSE TEC, CALIFORNIA SPEED AND SPORT SHOP, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CARRIER CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CLARK RELIANCE CORP., CRANE CO., EATON CORPORATION, FMC CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP., GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, JOHN CRANE, INC., JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75, MAREMONT CORPORATION, NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF DELAWARE, INC., PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC., PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC., ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC., SQUARE-D CO., STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC., TODD SHIPYARDS CORP., TRANE US, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORP. and WARREN PUMPS
Case Number: 3:2014cv00013
Filed: January 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Mary L. Cooper
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 08/31/2020. (jdb)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/26/2016. (km)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 6/26/2015. (eaj)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 8/29/2014. (gxh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAMMELL et al v. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR HAMMELL
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA HAMMELL
Represented By: ROBERT E. LYTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARVINMERITOR, INC.
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG WARNER MORSE TEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA SPEED AND SPORT SHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORP.
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: ROBYN M. GNUDI
Represented By: MICHAEL DORON GOLDKLANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENLYTE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC.
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF DELAWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SQUARE-D CO.
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD SHIPYARDS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORP.
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE US, INC.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: GENLYTE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC.
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: ARVINMERITOR, INC.
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: ROBYN M. GNUDI
Represented By: MICHAEL DORON GOLDKLANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GENLYTE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Represented By: SANDRA K. STEINMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ARVINMERITOR, INC.
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Represented By: DONNA DUBETH GARDINER
Represented By: JOSEPH P. LASALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: BORG WARNER MORSE TEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CALIFORNIA SPEED AND SPORT SHOP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORP.
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Represented By: STEVEN ALLEN WEINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Represented By: MICHAEL V. GILBERTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID JARDIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER J. KEALE
Represented By: MICHAEL A. TANENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC.
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Represented By: IAN STERN MILLICAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Represented By: ETHAN D. STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Represented By: DAWN DEZII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 51-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Represented By: MICHAEL JOSEPH BLOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAFNER
Represented By: ELIZABETH A. WEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PEP BOYS-MANNY MOE & JACK OF DELAWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PNEUMO-ABEX, LLC.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PROGRESS LIGHTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SQUARE-D CO.
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Represented By: ANGELA COLL CALIENDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Represented By: RICHARD PATRICK O'LEARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: TODD SHIPYARDS CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: TRANE US, INC.
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Represented By: LISA PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORP.
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: WARREN PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?