TINSLEY v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: MAUREEN F. TINSLEY
Defendant: USPS, JOHN DOES 1-5 and UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES
Case Number: 3:2018cv13795
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/17/2018. (mmh)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney KRUTI D. DHARIA for UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES added. (DHARIA, KRUTI)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni for all further proceedings. Judge Freda L. Wolfson, Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/26/2018. (jjc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. (jem)
September 12, 2018 Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jem)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES, JOHN DOES 1-5 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9016414), filed by MAUREEN F. TINSLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WIGENTON, KEVIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TINSLEY v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN F. TINSLEY
Represented By: KEVIN P. WIGENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICES
Represented By: KRUTI D. DHARIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?