MARSH v. CAMPOS et al
Plaintiff: FRANK MARSH
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON, IHOUMA NWACHUKWA, NICOLAUS KUEHN, GARY LANIGAN, DAVID HOFFMAN, UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE RUTGERS, UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY (UMDNJ), ANTONIO CAMPOS, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, DEPTCOR, TIMOTHY MAINES and JAYSON VREELAND
Case Number: 3:2019cv15320
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. Motion set for 10/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by IHOUMA NWACHUKWA. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(RAYMOND-FLOOD, MARGARET)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal, (corrected) with redacted Exhibit A by IHOUMA NWACHUKWA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(RAYMOND-FLOOD, MARGARET)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM SUBMISSION: All Discovery is to be conducted by 11/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2019. Plaintiff's Pretrial Memorandum due 1/29/2020. Each Defendant's Pretrial Memorandum due 2/5/2020.The Pretrial Memoranda are not to be filed on CM/ECF by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/16/2019. (km)
July 12, 2019 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (jdb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IHOUMA NWACHUKWA from Superior Court of Mercer County, case number MER-L-698-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9810931), filed by IHOUMA NWACHUKWA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(RAYMOND-FLOOD, MARGARET)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSH v. CAMPOS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHOUMA NWACHUKWA
Represented By: MARGARET M. RAYMOND-FLOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLAUS KUEHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY LANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE RUTGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL OF MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY (UMDNJ)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CAMPOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPTCOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY MAINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAYSON VREELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?