LAWHQ, LLC et al v. CENTINARO
Plaintiff: LAWHQ LLC and THOMAS ALVORD
Defendant: CHARLES CENTINARO
Case Number: 3:2020cv00782
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT J. MCGUIRE on behalf of CHARLES CENTINARO (MCGUIRE, ROBERT)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THOMAS ALVORD, LAWHQ LLC. CHARLES CENTINARO served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (DONAHER, ROBERT)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHARLES CENTINARO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
January 23, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
January 23, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARLES CENTINARO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10304006), filed by THOMAS ALVORD, LAWHQ LLC.(DONAHER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAWHQ, LLC et al v. CENTINARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWHQ LLC
Represented By: ROBERT J. DONAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS ALVORD
Represented By: ROBERT J. DONAHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES CENTINARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?