Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Hammam Yahya and Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, U.S. Department of State, Christopher Wray, William P Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigations and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00733
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by All Plaintiffs (Vrapi, Olsi)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Hammam Yahya, Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Walters on behalf of All Defendants (Walters, Tiffany)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico, Hammam Yahya. (Attachments: #1 Supplement TRO info sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Vrapi, Olsi)
August 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to William P Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Department of State (The Executive Office and Office of the General Counsel), United States of America, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)
August 12, 2019 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (ln)
August 12, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6598015 re #1 Complaint, filed by Hammam Yahya, Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Vrapi, Olsi)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico, Hammam Yahya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Vrapi, Olsi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany L Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hammam Yahya
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Regents of the University of New Mexico
Represented By: Olsi Vrapi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?