Teagle et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz and Melissa Soto-Germosen
Defendant: Kurt Nason, Kevin Cascone, Pawel Maslinski, Lisette Camilo, James King, Martha H Hirst, James Patrick O'Neill, Jozef Ban, Michael Deddo, Edna Wells Handy, Phillip Lam, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Ernest Morales, III, William Joseph Bratton, Maria Gilbert, Raymond Walter Kelly, Roxanne Ludemann, The City of New York, Jessica Corey, Kevin Murtha, Stacey Cumberbatch, Dorothy Aiello, Tracie Keesee, Dermot Francis Shea, Michelle Bray, Tanya Meisenholder, Miguel Garcia, Howard Zweben, Bill de Blasio and Jerry O'Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2019cv07211
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 4/6/2020. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/16/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 4/9/2020. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/20/2020. (Quinlan, Krista)
February 19, 2020 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or To Otherwise Respond To The Complaint by The City of New York. (Anci, Joseph)
February 6, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Kurt Nason served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Jerry O'Sullivan served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Sanders, Eric) (Main Document 31 replaced on 2/10/2020) (Layne, Monique).
February 6, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Phillip Lam served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 6, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Michelle Bray served on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Elizabeth Ortiz. Howard Zweben served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Dermot Francis Shea served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Elizabeth Ortiz. James Patrick O'Neill served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Ernest Morales, III served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Tanya Meisenholder served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Pawel Maslinski served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Roxanne Ludemann served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. James King served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Raymond Walter Kelly served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Tracie Keesee served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Martha H Hirst served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Elizabeth Ortiz. Edna Wells Handy served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Miguel Garcia served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Michael Deddo served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Bill de Blasio served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Stacey Cumberbatch served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Jessica Corey served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. The City of New York served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Lisette Camilo served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. William Joseph Bratton served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Michael Rubens Bloomberg served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
February 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. Jozef Ban served on 2/1/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sanders, Eric)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet by Viviana Ayende, Theresa M Mahon, Elizabeth Ortiz, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Simone Teagle (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Michael Rubens Bloomberg, #2 Proposed Summons Bill de Blasio, #3 Proposed Summons Martha H. Hirst, #4 Proposed Summons Edna Wells Handy, #5 Proposed Summons Stacey Cumberbatch, #6 Proposed Summons Lisette Camilo, #7 Proposed Summons Raymond Walter Kelly, #8 Proposed Summons William Joseph Bratton, #9 Proposed Summons James Patrick O'Neill, #10 Proposed Summons Dermot Francis Shea, #11 Proposed Summons Tracie Keesee, #12 Proposed Summons Tanya Meisenholder, #13 Proposed Summons Jerry O'Sullivan, #14 Proposed Summons Jozef Ban, #15 Proposed Summons Roxanne Ludemann, #16 Proposed Summons Kurt Nason, #17 Proposed Summons Melissa Gilbert, #18 Proposed Summons Michael Deddo, #19 Proposed Summons Phillip Lam, #20 Proposed Summons Dorothy Aiello, #21 Proposed Summons Ernest Morales, III, #22 Proposed Summons Michelle Bray, #23 Proposed Summons Jessica Corey, #24 Proposed Summons James King, #25 Proposed Summons Kevin Murtha, #26 Proposed Summons Miguel Garcia, #27 Proposed Summons Howard Zweben, #28 Proposed Summons Pawel Maslinski, #29 Proposed Summons Kevin Cascone) (Sanders, Eric)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Viviana Ayende, Theresa M Mahon, Elizabeth Ortiz, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Simone Teagle (Sanders, Eric)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12187222 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Theresa M Mahon, Simone Teagle, Melissa Soto-Germosen, Viviana Ayende, Elizabeth Ortiz. (Sanders, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teagle et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Nason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cascone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawel Maslinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisette Camilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha H Hirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Patrick O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jozef Ban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Deddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Wells Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rubens Bloomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Morales, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph Bratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Walter Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxanne Ludemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Joseph Anci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Murtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Cumberbatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Aiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracie Keesee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dermot Francis Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Meisenholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Zweben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill de Blasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M Mahon
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Teagle
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viviana Ayende
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Ortiz
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Soto-Germosen
Represented By: Eric Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?