A.M. et al v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: A.M. as mng R.S., A.M. and R.S.
Defendant: The City of New York and New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2021cv05191
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 1/25/2022 @ 2:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 2:15 PM. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 21-5191. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/13/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
October 13, 2021 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 12/13/2021. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/13/2021. (Caggiano, Diana)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Krebs, Howard)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard S. Krebs on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Krebs, Howard)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.M.. New York City Department of Education served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A.M.. The City of New York served on 9/21/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Hartley, Erika)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education, The City of New York Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by R.S., A.M.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 17, 2021 FILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number ANYEDC-14849717 (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 17, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. et al v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M. as mng R.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.S.
Represented By: Erika Louise Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Represented By: Howard S. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Howard S. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?