Vazquez v. Standford et al

Plaintiff: Jose Vazquez
Defendant: Samuel D. Roberts, Tina Standford, David Stukowy and Michael Astrue
Case Number: 1:2018cv01071
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: David N Hurd
1 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2018 9 Featured Case REPORT-RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: It is RECOMMENDED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 28 U.S.C. 1915(A) the #1 Complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim as noted further within the Order. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report-Recommendationand Order, by certified mail, return receipt requested, upon Plaintiff. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), the parties have fourteen (14) days within which to file written objections to the foregoing report. Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court. FAILURE TO OBJECT TO THIS REPORT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS WILL PRECLUDE APPELLATE REVIEW. (Objections to R&R due by 10/26/2018, Case Review Deadline 10/30/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on October 9, 2018. {Copy served via regular and certified mail on the pro se plaintiff at 122 Dickerson Street, Syracuse, NY 13204, parcel no. 7014 1200 0001 3023 4679}. (rep)
October 9, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: Granting the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. After reviewing the submission, the Court finds that Plaintiff meets the requirement for economic need and thus may properly proceed with this matter in forma pauperis. By separate opinion, and in accordance with the authority granted by 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court will review the sufficiency of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on October 9, 2018. {Copy served via regular mail on the pro se plaintiff at 122 Dickerson Street, Syracuse, NY 13204}.(rep)
October 9, 2018 Pursuant to the #7 Notice of Change of Address, the clerk has updated the plaintiff's address from Greene Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 975, Coxsackie, NY 12051 to 122 Dickerson Street, Syracuse, NY 13204. (rep)
September 19, 2018 7 NOTICE: Filed by Jose Vazquez, pro se, dated September 14, 2018, advising that he will be released from custody on October 4, 2018 and that his mailing address will be 122 Dickerson Street, Syracuse, NY 13204. {Mailing envelope attached}. (rep)
September 19, 2018 6 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE returned signed by the pro se plaintiff. (rep)
September 10, 2018 5 PRO SE NOTICE issued and mailed to the pro se plaintiff via regular U.S. Postal Mail. {The clerk is mailing out an extra set of the Local Rules, Pro Se Handbook, and Lawyer Referral Services List to the plaintiff on 9/11/2018 as it is unclear is the plaintiff already has these documents}. (rep)
September 7, 2018 4 LETTER MOTION: Filed by Jose Vazquez, pro se, dated August 29, 2018, regarding property. (rep)
September 7, 2018 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Jose Vazquez. (rep)
September 7, 2018 2 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jose Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Additional In Forma Pauperis Application, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (rep)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Michael Astrue, Samuel D. Roberts, Tina Standford, and David Stukowy. Filed by Jose Vazquez, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence dated May 21, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Petition to Enforce Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Petition to Enforce Decision, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez v. Standford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Standford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stukowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?