The People of the State of New York v. Target Corporation et al

Petitioner: The People of the State of New York
Respondent: Target Corporation, Walmart Inc. and LaRose Industries LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00040
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 36 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the Motion to Remand. (tab)
February 25, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by The People of the State of New York. (Chu, Yueh-ru)
February 22, 2019 Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #33 Letter Request: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant LaRose's request for an extension of time to respond to the petition is GRANTED; LaRose may have until 3/19/19 to file a response. No further extension requests will be entertained. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/22/2019. (ban)
February 21, 2019 Filing 33 Letter Motion from Robert Wolf for LaRose Industries LLC requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Petition submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Rosenberg, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by LaRose Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Rosenberg, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #19 Motion to Remand, Opposition filed by LaRose Industries LLC. (Rosenberg, Michael)
February 15, 2019 TEXT NOTICE RE-SETTING DEADLINES re #19 MOTION to Remand :Due to the Federal Holiday on Monday, February 18, 2019 the response and reply deadlines are RESET. Response to Motion due by 2/19/2019, Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/25/2019. The Motion Hearing remains set for 3/5/2019 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. No personal appearances are necessary. The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. (ban)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Target Corporation filed by The People of the State of New York. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/15/2019. (ban)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Walmart Inc. filed by The People of the State of New York. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/15/2019. (ban)
February 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Target Corporation by The People of the State of New York (Chu, Yueh-ru)
February 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to respondent Walmart Inc. by The People of the State of New York (Chu, Yueh-ru)
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE/RESPONSE TO THE #5 Notice of Admission Requirement sent to Cheryl Anne Falvey on behalf of Target Corporation. She advises the Court that she will not remain as counsel of record, however Kathy Chin will be counsel of record for Target Corporation. (jmb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Letter Request: The Court is in receipt of defendant Walmart's January 29, 2019 letter request. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendants request for an extension of time to respond to the motion to remand[Dkt. No. 19] is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the request for an extension of time to respond to the petition [Dkt. No. 1 & 2] is GRANTED; The extensions will pertain to all defendants; The #19 Motion to remand return date is reset for March 5, 2019 (ON SUBMIT) before Judge D'Agostino; Response to motion due 2/18/19; Reply due 2/22/19; The motion will be decided on the submission of the papers only. NO personal appearances are necessary. It is further ORDERED that the time in which Defendants have to answer the petition is extended to 2/25/19. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 1/30/19. (ban)
January 29, 2019 Filing 24 Letter Motion from Elliot Hallak for Walmart Inc. requesting a two-week extension of Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Plaintiff's Petition submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Hallak, Elliot)
January 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rosenberg on behalf of LaRose Industries LLC (Rosenberg, Michael)
January 23, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (ban)
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE: filed by Channing Wistar-Jones, Esq., regarding The People of the State of New York. Counsel is responding to the #4 Notice of Admission Requirement and confirms he represented the plaintiffs in this matter when it was in state court, however will not remain counsel of record, but notes that his colleague Yueh-ru Chu who is admitted in the NDNY will remain on record of the plaintiffs'. (jmb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Target Corporation of Statement pursuant to Individual Rule 3 of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino. (Chin, Kathy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 2/4/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/8/2019. filed by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yueh-ru Chu, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Remand, #3 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Chu, Yueh-ru)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Yueh-ru Chu on behalf of The People of the State of New York (Chu, Yueh-ru)
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 3 by LaRose Industries LLC submitted to Judge D'Agostino. (Wolf, Robert)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Inc. re #15 Stipulation Respondent Walmart's Statement Pursuant To Hon. Mae D'Agostino's Local Rules 3 (Cases Removed From State Court (Seiter, Lauren)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Respondent Walmart's Statement Pursuant To Hon. Mae D'Agostino's Local Rules 3 (Cases Removed From State Court by Walmart Inc. submitted to Judge D'Agostino. (Seiter, Lauren)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Letter Request for an extension of time to answer and for adjournment of the rule 16 conference. As to all Defendants, the new answer deadline is set for 2/11/2019. As a control date, the Initial Conference is reset for Friday, 3/29/2019 @ 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/22/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference will be adjourned as a matter of course, once a dispositive motion is pending in the case. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/16/2019. (tab)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LaRose Industries LLC. (Wolf, Robert)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Wolf on behalf of LaRose Industries LLC (Wolf, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Elliot Hallak for Walmart Inc. requesting extension of time and adjournment submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Hallak, Elliot)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren H. Seiter on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Seiter, Lauren)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Hallak, Elliot)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot A. Hallak on behalf of Walmart Inc. (Hallak, Elliot)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NONE for Target Corporation.. (Chin, Kathy)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/7/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Target Corporation; Attorney Cheryl Falvey, Esq., Email address is cfalvey@crowell.com. Phone number is 202-624-2675. Admissions due by 1/25/2019. (Copy mailed to atty Falvey by regular mail) (jmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party The People of the State of New York; Attorney Channing Wistar-Jones, Esq., Email address is channing.jones@ag.ny.gov. Phone number is 212-416-8082. Admissions due by 1/25/2019. (Copy sent to atty Wistar-Jones by regular mail) (jmb)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party LaRose Industries LLC; Attorney Michael M. Rosenberg, Esq., Email address is mrosenberg@mosessinger.com. Phone number is (212) 554-7825. Admissions due by 1/25/2019. (Copy mailed to atty Rosenberg by regular mail) (jmb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT PETITION: relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Corporation, Walmart Inc. and LaRose Industries LLC. (jmb)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 907519-18 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4614426) filed by Target Corporation, Walmart Inc. and LaRose Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of Notice of Removal, #2 Petition with various attachments, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of New York v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Target Corporation
Represented By: Kathy H. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Elliot A. Hallak
Represented By: Lauren H. Seiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LaRose Industries LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Wolf
Represented By: Michael Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The People of the State of New York
Represented By: Yueh-ru Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?