City of Amsterdam v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Amsterdam
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd., Anda, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Prime Therapeutics LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Kroger Co., Kinray, LLC, Stuart D. Baker, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Walgreen Co., Bellco Drug Corp., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Morris & Dickson Co., LLC, PSS World Medical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, John N. Kapoor, Express Scripts, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jonathan D. Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Rhodes Technologies, David A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Optum, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Mortimer Sackler Family, P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Noramco, Inc., SAJ Distributors, Purdue Pharma Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., American Medical Distributors, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Smith Drug Company, Henry Schein, Inc., HBC Service Company, Allergan PLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Darby Group Companies, Inc., Value Drug Company, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., OptumRx Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., SpecGx LLC, Beverly Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Sandoz, Inc., Discount Drug Mart, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Actavis, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Raymond Sackler Family, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., Publix Supermarkets, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Johnson & Johnson, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00896
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandria E. Swette, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Swette, Alexandria)
September 11, 2019 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings filed by City of Amsterdam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) 1- MDL Order Regarding Remands)(Shkolnik, Hunter)
September 9, 2019 Filing 61 COURT NOTICE of correct Briefing Schedule set for #56 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings : The Response to Motion is due by 9/11/2019 and any Reply to Response to Motion is due by 9/16/2019 and is limited to 10 pages. The Motion will be considered fully briefed on 9/17/2019 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. This Motion, Dkt. No. 56, and the pending Motion to Remand, Dkt. No. 34, will both be taken on submission of the papers with no personal appearances or oral argument scheduled, unless further directed by the Court. (tab)
September 6, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Amsterdam. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) 1- MDL Order Regarding Remands)(Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 30, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Memorandum dated 8/30/19 - with attached Certificate of Service) filed by Value Drug Company. (Lane, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Lane on behalf of Value Drug Company (Lane, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adriana Riviere-Badell, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7)(Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
August 29, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel Response to Motion due by 9/16/2019 filed by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4, #7 Exhibit(s) 5, #8 Exhibit(s) 6, #9 Exhibit(s) 7, #10 Exhibit(s) 8, #11 Exhibit(s) 9, #12 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
August 29, 2019 Filing 55 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CVS Health Corporation. (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 54 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 53 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CaremarkPCS, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 52 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caremark Rx, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark Rx, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 51 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caremark, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Caremark, L.L.C... (Naunton, Shawn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Hudson on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (Hudson, Timothy)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER granting #46 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian Boone, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2019. (tab)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEX ORDER setting briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion to Stay: Motion to be filed by 8/29/2019; Plaintiff's response to be filed by 9/11/2019, and reply to response to be filed by 9/16/2019 and is limited to 10 pages. The return date of this motion will be 9/17/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/27/2019. (tab)
August 23, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Telephone Conference held on 8/23/2019. Parties advise the Court what their positions are regarding Motion to Remand and Defendant's request to file a motion to stay. Parties request that the motion be made returnable for the same day as the Motion to Remand. The Court grants permission for defendants to file a Motion to Stay. A briefing schedule is set and will be issued as a text Order. (Court Reporter Jacqueline Stroffolino) (tab)
August 23, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian W. Park on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Park, Julian)
August 22, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian D. Boone Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4847704. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition of Brian D. Boone, #4 Certificates Of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Penaro, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION regarding Service of the Summons and Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. submitted to Judge Mae D'Agostino. (Naunton, Shawn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Riviere-Badell on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Riviere-Badell, Adriana)
August 22, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Montas on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Montas, Alana)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Caroline R. Strumph, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/21/2019. (tab)
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 LETTER BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's Letter Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Remand by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Swette, Alexandria)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kim K. Chemerinsky, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/21/2019. (tab)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Text ORDER granting #33 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Timothy E. Hudson, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/21/2019. (tab)
August 20, 2019 Filing 38 Letter Motion from Plaintiff The City of Amsterdam for City of Amsterdam requesting Denial of Defendants request of a stay of proceedings submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1- MDL Order Regarding Remands)(Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 20, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Caroline R. Strumph Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4844089. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition of Carloine R. Strumph, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Penaro, Steven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of KIm K. Chemerinsky Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4844006. filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven L. Penaro, #2 E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petetion of Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Penaro, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 Letter Motion from Plaintiff The City of Amsterdam for City of Amsterdam requesting Expedited Hearing on its Motion to Remand submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino . (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Remand to State Court Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019. filed by City of Amsterdam. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affirmation, #3 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit(s) 2017 NY Transfer Order) (Shkolnik, Hunter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy E. Hudson Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4838024. filed by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Davis, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dean Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent FPP, Inc., Corporate Parent SSM Health Care Corporation for Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC.. (Davis, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S Davis on behalf of Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC (Davis, Nicholas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 30 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 8/26/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date, to be reset at the appropriate time. The tele-conference most recently scheduled for Friday, 8/23/2019 @ 10:00 AM, will proceed as scheduled. (tab)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Letter Request from Defendant Express Scripts, Inc. requesting Conference concerning a non-dispositive motion. A Telephone Conference has been set for Friday, 8/23/2019 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Dkt. no. 28, on or before 8/20/2019. Parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 9772719# and security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/9/2019. (tab)
August 7, 2019 Filing 28 Letter Motion from Defendant Express Scripts, Inc. and Plaintiff City of Amsterdam for Express Scripts, Inc. requesting Conference concerning a non-dispositive motion under Local Rule 7.1(b)(2) submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Swette, Alexandria)
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO LETTER BRIEF filed by Prime Therapeutics LLC as to #13 Notice of Admission Requirement, . (Farrar, Jillian)
August 7, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian K. Farrar on behalf of Prime Therapeutics LLC (Farrar, Jillian)
August 6, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Menchel on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Menchel, Matthew)
August 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Swette on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Swette, Alexandria)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G Kobre on behalf of Express Scripts, Inc. (Kobre, Steven)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. Croinin, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Issued by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/6/2019. (tab)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #16 Letter Request/Motion from Shawn P. Naunton for CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference. Attorney Nauton, Esq. is also directed to file a status report in sixty days, if an answer or response to the complaint has not been filed. [Status Report due by 10/4/2019]. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/5/2019. (tab)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO #14 Notice of Admission Requirement filed by Navitus Health Solutions, LLC and Navitus Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(see)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO #9 Notice of Admission Requirement filed by Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc. (see)
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Conor B. O'Croinin Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4818804. filed by CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Attachment to Petition for Admission to Practice, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - MD, #6 Certificate of Good Standing - PA) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Naunton, Shawn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO #11 and #12 Notice of Admission Requirements filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated as to Attorneys William H. Jordan, Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, Brian D. Boone, and Caroline Rawl Strumph. (see)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Consent Letter Motion from Shawn P. Naunton for CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.X., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Walgreen Co.; Walgreen Eastern Co.; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid Atlantic Customer Support Center; Walmart Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., and Anda, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move of Otherwise Respond to Complaint and To Conduct Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference))(Naunton, Shawn)
July 25, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for CVS Health Corporation answer due 7/30/2019; Caremark Rx, L.L.C. answer due 7/30/2019; Caremark, L.L.C. answer due 7/30/2019; CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C. answer due 7/30/2019; CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. answer due 7/30/2019; Express Scripts Holding Company answer due 7/30/2019; Express Scripts, Inc. answer due 7/30/2019; Navitus Health Solutions, LLC answer due 7/30/2019; Navitus Holdings, LLC answer due 7/30/2019; Optum, Inc. answer due 7/30/2019; OptumRx Inc. answer due 7/30/2019; Prime Therapeutics LLC answer due 7/30/2019; UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer due 7/30/2019. (see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L. Penaro on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Penaro, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Navitus Holdings, LLC and Navitus Health Solutions, LLC; Attorneys Timothy E. Hudson, Janelle L. Davis, and Mackenzie Salenger, Email address is tim.hudson@tklaw.com, janelle.davis@tklaw.com, and mackenzie.salenger@tklaw.com. Phone number is (214) 969-1700. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorneys on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Prime Therapeutics LLC; Attorney Robert J. Gilbertson, Email address is BGilbertson@GreeneEspel.com. Phone number is (612) 373-8330. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorney on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Attorneys Brian D. Boone and Kimberly K. Chemerinsky, Email address is brian.boone@alston.com and kim.chemerinsky@alston.com. Phone number is (704) 444-1000 (Boone) and (213) 576-1000 (Chemerinsky). Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorneys on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party OptumRx, Inc., Optum, Inc., and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated; Attorneys William H. Jordan and Caroline R. Strumph, Email address is bill.jordan@alston.com and caroline.strumph@alston.com. Phone number is (404) 881-7000. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorneys on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc.; Attorneys Adriana Riviere-Badell and Julian W. Park, Email address is adriana.riviere-badell@kobrekim.com and julian.park@kobrekim.com. Phone number is (305) 967 6100 (Riviere-Badell) and (415) 582-4800. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorneys on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Express Scripts Holding Company and Express Scripts, Inc.; Attorney Alana F. Montas, Email address is Alana.Montas@kobrekim.com. Phone number is (212) 488-1200. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Notice emailed on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., and Caremark, L.L.C.; Attorney Eric R. Delinsky and Conor B. O'Croinin, Email address is edelinsky@zuckerman.com and cocroinin@zuckerman.com. Phone number is (202) 7781800 (Delinsky) and (410) 332-0444 (O'Croinin). Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Emailed to Attorneys on 7/25/2019}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiff; Attorneys Salvatore C. Badala, Joseph L. Ciaccio, and Shayna E. Sacks. Phone number is 212-397-1000. Admissions due by 8/8/2019. {Notices mailed to above attorneys on 7/25/2019 by regular mail}(see)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/DAgostino_03142016.pdf. (see)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/19/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Express Scripts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc. (see)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company.. (see)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Montgomery County, case number 2019-498 (Filing fee $400 receipt number SNYNDC-4808984) filed by Express Scripts, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, Navitus Health Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Navitus Holdings, LLC, Prime Therapeutics LLC, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Express Scripts Holding Company, Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., and Caremark Rx, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - MDL Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #4 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Amsterdam v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eveready Wholesale Drugs Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Steven G Kobre
Represented By: Alexandria Swette
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Therapeutics LLC
Represented By: Jillian K. Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinray, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Health Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas S Davis
Represented By: Timothy Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellco Drug Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSS World Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G Kobre
Represented By: Alexandria Swette
Represented By: Matthew I. Menchel
Represented By: Adriana Riviere-Badell
Represented By: Julian W. Park
Represented By: Alana Montas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAJ Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Distributors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navitus Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas S Davis
Represented By: Timothy Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darby Group Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Drug Company
Represented By: Thomas S. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Drug Cooperative, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Drug Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blenheim Pharmacal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Naunton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Steven L. Penaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Amsterdam
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?