D.M. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Plaintiff: D.M.
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00170
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed docket. The 5/7/2020 telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned at this time without new date. Defendant counsel to file status report on the Bankruptcy by 5/26/2020. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/9/2020. (sg )
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF ENTRY OF CONSENT ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 362 GRANTING THE BSAS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent Order)(Beckwith, Mathew)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER: dated 3/2/2020 by Gerard J. Sweeney, Esq., on behalf of plaintiff D.M. in response to the #6 Notice of Admission Requirement, advising the Court that he will remain as co-counsel of record for plaintiff with Michael G. Dowd, Esq. (jmb)
March 4, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Documents #12 Notice of Appearance; #13 Rule 9027 Statement; and #14 Demand for Jury Trial filed in error with wrong case number. Correct documents replaced on the docket. (lmw)
March 4, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: The Clerk modified the docket text wording for docket entries #13 Demand for Jury Trial and #14 Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement as the attached pdf images were reversed for the entries. Docket text wording now matches the attachments. (jmb)
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America NOTICE OF (I) COMMENCEMENT OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING AND FILING OF MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE BSA, (II) MEETING TO CONSIDER THE FORMATION OF AN OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF CREDITORS AND (III) FILING OF MOTION BY THE BSA DEBTORS TO FIX VENUE FOR CLAIMS RELATED TO THE BANKRUPTCY UNDER 28 U.S.C. 157(b)(5) AND 1334(b) (Beckwith, Mathew)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement filed by D.M. (Sweeney, Gerard) Modified on 3/4/2020 to correct docket text wording. (jmb) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/4/2020 with correct document) (lmw).
March 3, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by D.M. (Sweeney, Gerard) Modified on 3/4/2020 to correct docket text wording. (jmb) (Main Document 13 replaced on 3/4/2020 with correct document) (lmw).
March 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard Sweeney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sweeney, Gerard) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/4/2020 with correct doucment) (lmw).
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew William Beckwith on behalf of Boy Scouts of America, Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America (Beckwith, Mathew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER directing Defendants to promptly redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), pursuant to General Order #22, and to email those redacted documents directly to the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy at shelly_muller@nynd.uscourts.gov. Moreover, the Clerk of the Court is directed to replace Plaintiff's name on the docket sheet with Plaintiff's initials, and to restrict public access to the Notice of Removal and documents attached thereto (Dkt. No. #1 ), and Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. No. #2 ), so that those documents may be viewed only by case participants, until such time as those documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies. Once the above-described documents have been replaced on the docket with redacted copies, the Clerk may unrestrict access to those documents. Finally, Defendant is directed to redact Plaintiff's name, and replace that name with Plaintiff's initials, in all documents hereafter filed by Defendants in this Court through CM/ECF. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/21/2020. (sal)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/30/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party for Defendants'; Attorney Mathew W. Beckwith, Esq., Email address is mbeckwith@melicklaw.com. Phone number is 212-541-7236. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. {Copy of Letter sent to attorney by regular mail} (jmb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Michael J. Mazurczak, Esq., Email address is maz@melicklaw.com. Phone number is 212-541-7236. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. {Copy of Letter sent to attorney by regular mail} (jmb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Gerard J. Sweeney, Esq., Phone number is 718-459-9000. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. {Copy of Letter sent to attorney by regular mail} (jmb)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Michael G. Dowd, Esq., Phone number is 212-751-1640. Admissions due by 3/5/2020. {Copy of Letter sent to attorney by regular mail} (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE: filed by Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America regarding service of the #1 Notice of Removal upon Michael G. Dowd, Esq., Gerard J. Sweeney, Esq., and Michael J. Mazurazak, Esq., by first class mail on 2/19/2020. (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER: to State Court Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT: relating to the #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (jmb)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Albany, case number 906642-19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5033301) filed by defendants' Boy Scouts of America and Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appearance by Gerard J. Sweeney, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Service and Extension of Time, #4 Exhibit D - Verified Answer by Defendants, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Change of Address by Michael G. Dowd, Esq., #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.M. v. Boy Scouts of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.M.
Represented By: Gerard Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Phyliss A. Hafner
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Rivers Council of the Boy Scouts of America
Represented By: Phyliss A. Hafner
Represented By: Mathew William Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?