Kissinger et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Kissinger and Kathleen Kissinger
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc. and Target Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Terence P. O'Connor
Case Number: 1:2020cv01148
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Terrence P. O'Connor has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Matthew McNamara, Esq. for Plaintiff; Joseph Rivera, Esq. for Defendants and. Dated: November 19, 2020(McNamara, Matthew)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 4/1/2021. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/22/2020. (mab)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 10 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2020. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Motions to be filed by 12/1/2021. Status Report due by 1/22/2021. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 4/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/22/2020. (mab)
October 21, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/21/2020. Appearances: Matthew McNamara, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Joseph Rivera, Esq. for Defendant. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions in this matter and as to how they intend to proceed. Both counsel confirm that Target Corporation was dismissed by stipulation in the state court and no longer a party to this action. Mandatory Disclosures have been exchanged. Mandatory Mediation Program discussed. Deadlines set. A Scheduling Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:31AM-9:43AM). (mab)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kathleen Kissinger, Stephen Kissinger. (McNamara, Matthew)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunbeam Products, Inc.. (Minkin, Gregg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Henchy on behalf of Kathleen Kissinger, Stephen Kissinger (Henchy, Brian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 DEFENDANT SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.S ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND by Sunbeam Products, Inc..(Minkin, Gregg)
September 24, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Sunbeam Products, Inc. answer due 9/28/2020. (pjh, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/14/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Kissinger and Stephen Kissinger in Saratoga County Supreme Court. (pjh, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga County Supreme Court, case number EF20201750 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5249632) filed by Sunbeam Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Discontinuance without Prejudice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kissinger et al v. Sunbeam Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg D. Minkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kissinger
Represented By: Matthew H. McNamara
Represented By: Brian P. Henchy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Kissinger
Represented By: Matthew H. McNamara
Represented By: Brian P. Henchy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Terence P. O'Connor
Represented By: Terence P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?