Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor et al v. Basset
Plaintiff: Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor, Home for the Age of the Little Sisters of the Poor of the City of NY Inc., Niagara Lutheran Development, Inc., Kennedy Pavilion RH LLC, Dewitt Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., KFG Operating Two LLC, Fairview Nursing Care Center, Inc., Oxford Nursing Home Inc., 150 Riverside OP LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, River Manor Corp., Boro Park Operating Co, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center LLC, FSNR SNF, LLC, KFG Operating I LLC, Cobble Hill Health Center, Inc., Sheepshead Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Elmhurst Care Center Inc., Autumn View Health Care Facility, LLC, SV Operating Three LLC, Staten Island Care Center LLC, Jopal Bronx, LLC, Park Ave Operating Company, LLC, Paljr, LLC, Throgs Neck Operating Co., LLC, Alliance Health Operations, LLC, DOJ Operations Associates LLC, Regeis Care Center, LLC, Bellhaven Management LLC, S&J Operational LLC, Holliswood Operating Co. LLC, Bezalel Nursing Home Company, Delaware Operations Associates LLC, Northern Riverview Health Care Center, LLC, West Lawrence Care Center, LLC, Park Terrace Care Center, LLC, Morningside Acquisition I LLC, Nassau Operating Co. LLC, Laconia Nursing Inc., KPRH IV Operations, LLC, Highland Care Center, Dumont Operating LLC, Niskayuna Operating Co. LLC, Woodcrest Rehabilitation and Residential Health Care Center LLC, The Nursing Care Center at Medford, Inc., SGRNC LLC, Hampton NH LLC, Dunkirk Operating, LLC, Dry Harbor HRF Inc, Northern Manhattan Nursing Home Inc, S&L Birchwood LLC, MLAP Acquisition I, LLC, Smithtown Health Care Management, LLC, Catskill Crossings, LLC, Shore View Acquisition I, LLC, Grandell Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Meadowbrook Care Center Inc., Optima Care Smithtown LLC, CLR Schenectady LLC, Manhattanville SBV LLC, Bay Park Center for Nursing & Rehabilitation LLC, Ocean Gardens Nursing Facility Inc., St. Johnsville Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., Forest View Nursing Home, Inc., Gold Crest Care Center, Salem Acquisition I LLC, Ralex Services, Prospect Park Operating LLC, Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management LLC, Seneca Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Queens Nassau Nursing Home Inc., Waterfront Operations Associates LLC, New Franklin Rehabilitation & Health Care Facility LLC, Waterview Acquisition I LLC, Maplewood Nursing Home, Inc., Fulton Operations Associates LLC, Schnur Operations Associates LLC, Concord Nursing Home Inc., Cortlandt Operations LLC, Paragon Management SNF, LLC, Rockaway Operations Associates LLC, King Street Home, Inc., Massapequa Center LLC, Park Gardens Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, LLC, Long Island Care Center Inc., Oceanview Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Rome Center LLC, Nyack Operating LLC, Harris Hill Nursing Facility, LLC, Terrace Acquisition II, LLC, CNH Operating LLC, Oakwood Operating Co. LLC, Ontario Operations Associates LLC, Conesus Lake Nursing Home, LLC, Port Chester Operating LLC, Optima Care White Plains LLC, Bronx Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare LLC, Union Plaza Nursing Home Inc., Oasis Rehabilitation and Nursing LLC, Optima Care Little Neck LLC, Wellsville Manor LLC, Abraham Opersations Associates LLC, Ten Broeck Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, 4800 Bear Road Operating Company, LLC, Pine Haven Operating LLC, Essex Operations Associates LLC, Guilderland Operator, LLC, Norwegian Christian Home and Health Center, Amerifalls, LLC, Townhouse Operating Co. LLC, Barnwell Operations Associates, LLC, Leonard Russ & Linda Meyer Russ, Partners, Atlanticare Management LLC, Berkshire Nursing Home LLC, Prospect Acquisition I LLC, Bethany Operating Co. LLC, Grand Manor Health Related Facility, Inc., St. Marks Brooklyn Associates LLC, The Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare at Dutchess, LLC, Sutton Park Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Park Manor Acquistion II, LLC, Fieldston Operating LLC, Pavillion Operations LLC, Susquehanna Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC, 225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC, Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Suffolk Center Receiver, LLC, 1818 Como Park Boulevard Operating Company LLC, New York Rehabilitation Care MGMT, LLC, Bridgewater Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC, Hudson Wide Healthcare, Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, HRNC, LLC, Sky View Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center LLC, Westgate Operations Associates LLC, L&A Operational LLC, Rockaway Care Center, LLC, Northern Metropolitan Residential Health Care, CPRNC, LLC, Highland Nursing Home, Inc., Oak Hill Operating Co LLC, Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Allegany LLC, CLR Carthage LLC, Williamsburg Services, LLC, Otsego SNF Operations Associates LLC, Golden Gate Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC, 185 Old Military Road Operating Company, LLC, Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center LLC, JSSG Healthcare, LLC, 2600 Niagara Falls Boulevard Operating Company, LLC, Chittenango Center, LLC, CCRNC, LLC, CGSR, Inc., The Brightonian, Inc., CSRNC, LLC, Sunnyside Care Center LLC, Cosden LLC, Windsor Park Nursing Home LLC, Oceanside Care Center Inc., ORNC LLC, Washington Operations Associates LLC, Haven Manor Health Care Center LLC, Sunset Nursing and Rehabilitation, Inc., New Vanderbilt Rehabilitation and Care Center Inc., Kingsway Arms Nursing Center Inc., Utica Operations Associates LLC, Excel at Woodbury for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC., ECRNC, LLC, University Nursing Home, LLC, Newark Manor Nursing Home, Inc., Avon Nursing Home, LLC, Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport LLC, Surge Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC, Hillside Manor Rehabilitation and Extended Care Center LLC, Carillon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Valley View Manor, LLC, Maximus 909 Operations, LLC, IR Operations Associates LLC, 2850 Grand Island Boulevard Operating Company, LLC, Hollis Park Manor Nursing Home Inc., Troy Diamond Operating LLC, Colonial Park Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, CLR Glens Falls LLC, New Glen Oaks Nursing Home, Inc., CLR Troy LLC, Bronx Harbor Health Care Complex, Inc., 5775 Maelou Drive Operating Company, LLC, 4459 Bailey Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Montgomery Operating Co. LLC, CLR New Paltz LLC, Woodside Manor Nursing Home, Inc., Wesley Gardens Corporation, Park Nursing Home, LLC, Northgate Health Care Facility, LLC, East Haven Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Williamsbridge Manor Nursing Home, LLC, Hornell Gardens, LLC, Sunharbor Acquistion I, LLC, Waterview Nursing Care Center Inc., CLR Minoa LLC, Latta Road Nursing Home West, LLC, Foltscare LLC, CLR Granville LLC, East Northport Residential Health Care Facility, Inc., Rosoe Regional Healthcare, LLC, East Side Nursing Home Inc., Rego Park NH LTD, 170 West Avenue Operating Company, LLC, Pontiac Nursing Home, Forest Hills Care Center LLC, 37 North Chemung Street Operating Company, LLC, Morris Park Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC, Elcor Operating Company, LLC, Ozone Acquisition LLC, New Carlton Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC, Hilaire Farm Skilled Living & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Meadow Park Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC, ILF Operating LLC, Cedar Manor Acquisition I LLC, Betsy Ross Rehabilitation Center, Inc., RSRNC, LLC, Hudson View Nursing Home S Corp, 112 Ski Bowl Road Operating Company, LLC, Latta Road Nursing Home East, LLC, Yonkers Gardens, Penfield Place, LLC, Utica Crossings, LLC, Saints Joachim and Anne Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, The Hurlbut, LLC, Treetops Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC, New York State Health Care Facilities Association, Inc., Greater New York Health Care Facilities Association, Southern New York Association, Inc., Concourse Rehabilitation & Nursing Center Inc., Cardiff Bay Center LLC, Wartburg Receiver LLC, Sea Crest Acquisition I, LLC, Wedgewood Care Center Inc., Steuben Operations Associates LLC and Garden Gate Health Care Facility, LLC
Defendant: Mary T. Bassett, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01384
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion from Shannan C. Krasnokutski for Mary Bassett requesting extension of time to answer : Mary T. Bassett, MD answer deadline is reset and is now due 3/28/2022. Based on the extended answer deadline, the Initial Conference is reset for 4/25/2022 @ 10:00 AM in Albany. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/18/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/14/2022. (tab)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Shannan C. Krasnokutski for Mary Bassett requesting extension of time to answer submitted to Judge Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service via ECF)(Krasnokutski, Shannan)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and GO 25 served on Mary T. Bassett, M.D., M.P.H., in her official capacity as Commissioner of Health of the State of New York c/o NYS Attorney General on 1/6/2022, filed by Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor et al. (Murray, Cornelius) Modified on 1/6/2022 (egr).
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and GO 25 served on Mary T. Bassett, M.D., M.P.H., in her official capacity as Commissioner of Health of the State of New York c/o NYSDOH Bureau of Litigation on 1/5/2022, filed by Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor et al. (Murray, Cornelius) Modified on 1/6/2022 (egr).
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mary T. Bassett, MD. (egr)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/5/2022 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/29/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
December 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary T. Bassett (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5756702) filed by 112 Ski Bowl Road Operating Company, LLC, 150 Riverside OP LLC, 170 West Avenue Operating Company, LLC, 1818 Como Park Boulevard Operating Company LLC, 185 Old Military Road Operating Company, LLC, 225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC, 2600 Niagara Falls Boulevard Operating Company, LLC, 2850 Grand Island Boulevard Operating Company, LLC, 37 North Chemung Street Operating Company, LLC, 4459 Bailey Avenue Operating Company, LLC, 4800 Bear Road Operating Company, LLC, 5775 Maelou Drive Operating Company, LLC, Abraham Opersations Associates LLC, Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Allegany LLC, Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport LLC, Alliance Health Operations, LLC, Amerifalls, LLC, Atlanticare Management LLC, Autumn View Health Care Facility, LLC, Avon Nursing Home, LLC, Barnwell Operations Associates, LLC, Bay Park Center for Nursing & Rehabilitation LLC, Bellhaven Management LLC, Berkshire Nursing Home LLC, Bethany Operating Co. LLC, Betsy Ross Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Bezalel Nursing Home Company, Boro Park Operating Co, LLC, Bridgewater Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC, Bronx Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare LLC, Bronx Harbor Health Care Complex, Inc., CCRNC, LLC, CGSR, Inc., CLR Carthage LLC, CLR Glens Falls LLC, CLR Granville LLC, CLR Minoa LLC, CLR New Paltz LLC, CLR Schenectady LLC, CLR Troy LLC, CNH Operating LLC, CPRNC, LLC, CSRNC, LLC, Cardiff Bay Center LLC, Carillon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Catskill Crossings, LLC, Cedar Manor Acquisition I LLC, Chittenango Center, LLC, Cobble Hill Health Center, Inc., Colonial Park Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Concord Nursing Home Inc., Concourse Rehabilitation & Nursing Center Inc., Conesus Lake Nursing Home, LLC, Cortlandt Operations LLC, Cosden LLC, DOJ Operations Associates LLC, Delaware Operations Associates LLC, Dewitt Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center LLC, Dry Harbor HRF Inc, Dumont Operating LLC, Dunkirk Operating, LLC, ECRNC, LLC, East Haven Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC, East Northport Residential Health Care Facility, Inc., East Side Nursing Home Inc., Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center, LLC, Elcor Operating Company, LLC, Elmhurst Care Center Inc., Essex Operations Associates LLC, Excel at Woodbury for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC., FSNR SNF, LLC, Fairview Nursing Care Center, Inc., Fieldston Operating LLC, Foltscare LLC, Forest Hills Care Center LLC, Forest View Nursing Home, Inc., Fulton Operations Associates LLC, Gold Crest Care Center, Golden Gate Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC, Grand Manor Health Related Facility, Inc., Grandell Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., Greater New York Health Care Facilities Association, Guilderland Operator, LLC, HRNC, LLC, Hampton NH LLC, Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Harris Hill Nursing Facility, LLC, Haven Manor Health Care Center LLC, Highland Care Center, Highland Nursing Home, Inc., Hilaire Farm Skilled Living & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Hillside Manor Rehabilitation and Extended Care Center LLC, Hollis Park Manor Nursing Home Inc., Holliswood Operating Co. LLC, Home for the Age of the Little Sisters of the Poor of the City of NY Inc., Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor, Hornell Gardens, LLC, Hudson View Nursing Home S Corp, Hudson Wide Healthcare, ILF Operating LLC, IR Operations Associates LLC, JSSG Healthcare, LLC, Jopal Bronx, LLC, KFG Operating I LLC, KFG Operating Two LLC, KPRH IV Operations, LLC, Kennedy Pavilion RH LLC, King Street Home, Inc., Kingsway Arms Nursing Center Inc., L&A Operational LLC, Laconia Nursing Inc., Latta Road Nursing Home East, LLC, Latta Road Nursing Home West, LLC, Leonard Russ & Linda Meyer Russ, Partners, Long Island Care Center Inc., MLAP Acquisition I, LLC, Manhattanville SBV LLC, Maplewood Nursing Home, Inc., Massapequa Center LLC, Maximus 909 Operations, LLC, Meadow Park Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC, Meadowbrook Care Center Inc., Montgomery Operating Co. LLC, Morningside Acquisition I LLC, Morris Park Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC, Nassau Operating Co. LLC, New Carlton Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC, New Franklin Rehabilitation & Health Care Facility LLC, New Glen Oaks Nursing Home, Inc., New Vanderbilt Rehabilitation and Care Center Inc., New York Rehabilitation Care MGMT, LLC, New York State Health Care Facilities Association, Inc., Newark Manor Nursing Home, Inc., Niagara Lutheran Development, Inc., Niskayuna Operating Co. LLC, Northern Manhattan Nursing Home Inc, Northern Metropolitan Residential Health Care, Northern Riverview Health Care Center, LLC, Northgate Health Care Facility, LLC, Norwegian Christian Home and Health Center, Nyack Operating LLC, ORNC LLC, Oak Hill Operating Co LLC, Oakwood Operating Co. LLC, Oasis Rehabilitation and Nursing LLC, Ocean Gardens Nursing Facility Inc., Oceanside Care Center Inc., Oceanview Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC, Ontario Operations Associates LLC, Optima Care Little Neck LLC, Optima Care Smithtown LLC, Optima Care White Plains LLC, Otsego SNF Operations Associates LLC, Oxford Nursing Home Inc., Ozone Acquisition LLC, Paljr, LLC, Paragon Management SNF, LLC, Park Ave Operating Company, LLC, Park Gardens Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, LLC, Park Manor Acquistion II, LLC, Park Nursing Home, LLC, Park Terrace Care Center, LLC, Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center, Pavillion Operations LLC, Penfield Place, LLC, Pine Haven Operating LLC, Pontiac Nursing Home, Port Chester Operating LLC, Prospect Acquisition I LLC, Prospect Park Operating LLC, Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management LLC, Queens Nassau Nursing Home Inc., RSRNC, LLC, Ralex Services, Regeis Care Center, LLC, Rego Park NH LTD, River Manor Corp., Rockaway Care Center, LLC, Rockaway Operations Associates LLC, Rome Center LLC, Rosoe Regional Healthcare, LLC, S&J Operational LLC, S&L Birchwood LLC, SGRNC LLC, SV Operating Three LLC, Saints Joachim and Anne Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, Salem Acquisition I LLC, Schnur Operations Associates LLC, Sea Crest Acquisition I, LLC, Seneca Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Sheepshead Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC, Shore View Acquisition I, LLC, Shorefront Operating, LLC, Sky View Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center LLC, Smithtown Health Care Management, LLC, Southern New York Association, Inc., St. Johnsville Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc., St. Marks Brooklyn Associates LLC, Staten Island Care Center LLC, Steuben Operations Associates LLC, Suffolk Center Receiver, LLC, Sunharbor Acquistion I, LLC, Sunnyside Care Center LLC, Sunset Nursing and Rehabilitation, Inc., Surge Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC, Susquehanna Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC, Sutton Park Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC, Ten Broeck Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, Terrace Acquisition II, LLC, The Brightonian, Inc., The Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare at Dutchess, LLC, The Hurlbut, LLC, The Nursing Care Center at Medford, Inc., Throgs Neck Operating Co., LLC, Townhouse Operating Co. LLC, Treetops Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC, Troy Diamond Operating LLC, Union Plaza Nursing Home Inc., University Nursing Home, LLC, Utica Crossings, LLC, Utica Operations Associates LLC, Valley View Manor, LLC, Warburt Receiver LLC, Wartburg Receiver LLC, Washington Operations Associates LLC, Waterfront Operations Associates LLC, Waterview Acquisition I LLC, Waterview Nursing Care Center Inc., Wedgewood Care Center Inc., Wellsville Manor LLC, Wesley Gardens Corporation, West Lawrence Care Center, LLC, Westgate Operations Associates LLC, Williamsbridge Manor Nursing Home, LLC, Williamsburg Services, LLC, Willoughby Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center LLC, Windsor Park Nursing Home LLC, Woodcrest Rehabilitation and Residential Health Care Center LLC, Woodside Manor Nursing Home, Inc., Yonkers Gardens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(egr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor et al v. Basset
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home for the Aged of the Little Sisters of the Poor
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home for the Age of the Little Sisters of the Poor of the City of NY Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niagara Lutheran Development, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kennedy Pavilion RH LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewitt Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KFG Operating Two LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairview Nursing Care Center, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oxford Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 150 Riverside OP LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shorefront Operating, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Manor Corp.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boro Park Operating Co, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willoughby Rehabilitation & Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FSNR SNF, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KFG Operating I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobble Hill Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheepshead Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmhurst Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn View Health Care Facility, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SV Operating Three LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staten Island Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jopal Bronx, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Ave Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paljr, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Throgs Neck Operating Co., LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance Health Operations, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOJ Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regeis Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bellhaven Management LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&J Operational LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holliswood Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bezalel Nursing Home Company
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaware Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Riverview Health Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Lawrence Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Terrace Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morningside Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nassau Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laconia Nursing Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KPRH IV Operations, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highland Care Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dumont Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niskayuna Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodcrest Rehabilitation and Residential Health Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nursing Care Center at Medford, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SGRNC LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampton NH LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunkirk Operating, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dry Harbor HRF Inc
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Manhattan Nursing Home Inc
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&L Birchwood LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MLAP Acquisition I, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smithtown Health Care Management, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catskill Crossings, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shore View Acquisition I, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grandell Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parkview Care and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meadowbrook Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Care Smithtown LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Schenectady LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manhattanville SBV LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Park Center for Nursing & Rehabilitation LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocean Gardens Nursing Facility Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Johnsville Rehabilitation and Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest View Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Crest Care Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralex Services
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect Park Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queens Boulevard Extended Care Facility Management LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queens Nassau Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterfront Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Franklin Rehabilitation & Health Care Facility LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterview Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maplewood Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schnur Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concord Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cortlandt Operations LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Management SNF, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockaway Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King Street Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massapequa Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Gardens Rehabilitation & Nursing Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Long Island Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceanview Nursing and Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rome Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nyack Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris Hill Nursing Facility, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrace Acquisition II, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CNH Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakwood Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ontario Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conesus Lake Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Chester Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Care White Plains LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronx Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Plaza Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oasis Rehabilitation and Nursing LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Care Little Neck LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellsville Manor LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Opersations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ten Broeck Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4800 Bear Road Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pine Haven Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essex Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guilderland Operator, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwegian Christian Home and Health Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amerifalls, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Townhouse Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnwell Operations Associates, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Russ & Linda Meyer Russ, Partners
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlanticare Management LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Nursing Home LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prospect Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Manor Health Related Facility, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Marks Brooklyn Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Center for Rehabilitation and Healthcare at Dutchess, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sutton Park Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Manor Acquistion II, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fieldston Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pavillion Operations LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susquehanna Nursing & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 225 Bennett Road Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlem Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffolk Center Receiver, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1818 Como Park Boulevard Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Rehabilitation Care MGMT, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgewater Center for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Wide Healthcare
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastchester Rehabilitation & Health Care Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky View Rehabilitation and Healthcare Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westgate Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L&A Operational LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockaway Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Metropolitan Residential Health Care
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highland Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Hill Operating Co LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Allegany LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Carthage LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williamsburg Services, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otsego SNF Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 185 Old Military Road Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ditmas Park Rehabilitation & Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JSSG Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2600 Niagara Falls Boulevard Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chittenango Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGSR, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Brightonian, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnyside Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosden LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windsor Park Nursing Home LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oceanside Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORNC LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haven Manor Health Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Nursing and Rehabilitation, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Vanderbilt Rehabilitation and Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingsway Arms Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excel at Woodbury for Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newark Manor Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avon Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolut Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation at Gasport LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surge Rehabilitation and Nursing, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillside Manor Rehabilitation and Extended Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carillon Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley View Manor, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximus 909 Operations, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IR Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2850 Grand Island Boulevard Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Park Manor Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Diamond Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonial Park Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Glens Falls LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Glen Oaks Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Troy LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bronx Harbor Health Care Complex, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5775 Maelou Drive Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 4459 Bailey Avenue Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montgomery Operating Co. LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR New Paltz LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodside Manor Nursing Home, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Gardens Corporation
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northgate Health Care Facility, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Haven Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Williamsbridge Manor Nursing Home, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hornell Gardens, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunharbor Acquistion I, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waterview Nursing Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Minoa LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latta Road Nursing Home West, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foltscare LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLR Granville LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Northport Residential Health Care Facility, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosoe Regional Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Side Nursing Home Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rego Park NH LTD
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 170 West Avenue Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pontiac Nursing Home
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Hills Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 37 North Chemung Street Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Park Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elcor Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozone Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Carlton Rehabilitation & Nursing Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilaire Farm Skilled Living & Rehabilitation Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meadow Park Rehabilitation and Health Care Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILF Operating LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Manor Acquisition I LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Ross Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSRNC, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson View Nursing Home S Corp
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 112 Ski Bowl Road Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latta Road Nursing Home East, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonkers Gardens
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penfield Place, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica Crossings, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saints Joachim and Anne Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hurlbut, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treetops Rehabilitation & Care Center, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York State Health Care Facilities Association, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greater New York Health Care Facilities Association
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern New York Association, Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concourse Rehabilitation & Nursing Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardiff Bay Center LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wartburg Receiver LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Crest Acquisition I, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wedgewood Care Center Inc.
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steuben Operations Associates LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Gate Health Care Facility, LLC
Represented By: Cornelius D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary T. Bassett, M.D.
Represented By: Shannan Collier Krasnokutski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?