Moore et al v. Keller et al
Plaintiff: Michael Moore, Lise Y. Moore, Sabria Moore and Jalia Graham
Defendant: Michael Keller, Paul Daugherty, Michael Jorgensen, Joseph Nappo, Stephen Mauser and Julie Sunser
Case Number: 5:2016cv01230
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM - DECISION and ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion for Summary Judgment: ORDERED that Defendants' 72 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Plaintiffs' state law con stitutional claims, state law negligence claims, due process claims, and any claims brought by Michael Moore have been abandoned and are DISMISSED; Michael Moore is DISMISSED as a named plaintiff; Plaintiffs' state law assault and bat tery claims, state law false arrest claims, and state law malicious prosecution claims are barred by the applicable statute of limitations and are DISMISSED; Plaintiffs' § 1983 malicious prosecution claims are DISMISSED; and A jury trial on plaintiffs Lise Moore, Sabria Moore, and Jalia Graham's § 1983 claims for false arrest and excessive force is scheduled for December 14, 2020 in Utica, New York. IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/29/2020. (ptm, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: Approving the # 63 Stipulation of Dismissal, it is Ordered that all plaintiff's claims against defendant Stephen Mauser only, in this action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and without costs to any party as against the other. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 2/26/2020. (jmb)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECISION & ORDER: The Court finds that original jurisdiction exists over the federal claim and supplemental jurisdiction is proper over the state law claims. Accordingly, plaintiffs' # 10 Motion to Remand to State Court is DENIED and all claims will remain in Federal Court. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/31/2017. (jmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moore
Represented By: Sidney P. Cominsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lise Y. Moore
Represented By: Sidney P. Cominsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabria Moore
Represented By: Sidney P. Cominsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalia Graham
Represented By: Sidney P. Cominsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keller
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Daugherty
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jorgensen
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Nappo
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mauser
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Sunser
Represented By: Aimee M. Paquette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?