Vazquez v. Astrue et al
Plaintiff: Jose P. Vazquez
Defendant: James Rescue Mission Personnel, Parole NYS, David Stukowy and Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 5:2018cv01492
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender Not here. Re: #3 Pro Se Handbook and Notice Issued, Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12, sent to Jose Vazquez Address sent to #89001686-74A0117, Jamesville Correctional Facility, 6660 East Seneca Turnpike, Jamesville, NY 13078 (khr)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Here - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward - re: #4 Order Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement, blank IFP form and Inmate Authorization - sent to Jose P. Vazquez Address sent to Jamesville Correctional Facility, 6660 East Seneca Turnpike, Jamesville, NY 13078. (hmr)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jose P. Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jdp, )
December 28, 2018 Notice re: Compliance with General Order #12: Pursuant to General Order #12, counsel is required to file the Notice of Related Case form as a separate document. Refer to the Court's website: www.nynd.uscourts.gov for further instructions. Counsel may access the fillable form using the following link: www.nynd.uscourts.gov/content/general-order-12 {A copy of this notice has been mailed to the pro se plaintiff at Jamesville Correctional Facility. The mailing also included a copy of General Order #12 that is referenced above so that plaintiff may complete the Notice of Related Cases form contained within should he feel that his cases are related}. (rep)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form; that upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review and that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP Application and Inmate Authorization Form. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 12/27/2018. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank IFP Application and Inmate Authorization form upon pro se plaintiff at Jamesville Correctional Facility, 6660 East Seneca Turnpike, Jamesville, NY 13078.)(hmr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Jose P. Vazquez via regular mail, along with extra, signed copy and pro se packet for plaintiff to keep for his records. (hmr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jose P. Vazquez. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (hmr)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael J. Astrue, James Rescue Mission Personnel, Parole NYS, David Stukowy filed by Jose P. Vazquez.(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez v. Astrue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rescue Mission Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parole NYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stukowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose P. Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?