Bass v. Syracuse University
Plaintiff: James Bass
Defendant: Syracuse University
Case Number: 5:2019cv00566
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Syracuse University.(Cook, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Cook on behalf of Syracuse University (Cook, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/20/19. (lmw)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another U.S. District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/20/19. (lmw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). (Sent to the Register of Copyrights on 5/14/2019.) (jdp, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:30 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Syracuse University. (jdp, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Syracuse University (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4739816) filed by James Bass. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bass v. Syracuse University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse University
Represented By: John D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bass
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?