Jackson v. Intuit, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Defendant: Intuit, Inc., Stephanie Houng, Brad Smith, Stephen A. Fuchs and Susan K. Goodarzi
Case Number: 5:2019cv01278
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER RE: Dkt. No. #11 . Plaintiff has filed what this court has interpreted as a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The rule provides that plaintiff may voluntarily withdraw his action without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party has filed either an answer or a summary judgment motion. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i)). Plaintiff indicates that he is withdrawing the above action so that he can pursue other remedies. According to Rule 41, the voluntary dismissal is without prejudice. Based on the voluntary dismissal by plaintiff, the Clerk is directed to close this action. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/19/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER denying and dismissing #10 Plaintiff's appeal from Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter's Decision and Order of 11/06/2019, for each of the following two reasons: (1) it is procedurally improper in that it is unsupported by an affidavit and memorandum of law, in violation of Local Rule 7.1(a); and (2) it is unsupported by a showing of cause in that it fails to point to an intervening change in controlling law, new evidence, or a demonstrated need to correct a clear error of law or to prevent manifest injustice. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 11/19/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal )
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se requesting that the case be dismissed submitted to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pjh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jeffrey S. Jackson regarding the #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (pjh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (pjh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED, that Plaintiff's motions to proceed IFP ( Docket #2 in both 19-cv-1278 and 19-cv-1331) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiffs letter-motions #3 and #4 , updating the docket are GRANTED, to the extent that the addresses of Intuit, Inc. are amended as plaintiff requests and that the Clerk is directed to amend the Docket Sheet in both #1278 and #1331 to remove 42 U.S.C. 1983 as a basis for jurisdiction in this action and replace it with the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (Title VII), and it is ORDERED, that the Clerk is directed to provide plaintiff with the AO Form 239 (IFP - Long Form) and plaintiff shall file a properly completed form AO 239 by FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 15, 2019 to proceed IFP, with a full disclosure of his assets, income, and expenses, including any money he has in savings or checking accounts, as indicated in the form provided. It is further ORDERED, that by FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 15, 2019, plaintiff shall clarify his claims as discussed herein so that the court may determine whether consolidation, or some other means of disposition, is appropriate, and it is ORDERED, that the plaintiff shall file the required documents with both CV numbers (19-CV-1278 and 19-CV-1331) in the caption of the document as listed herein. That defendants time to answer or otherwise move in #1278 is STAYED, and it is ORDERED, that when plaintiff files the required documents, the cases be returned to me for initial review. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/6/19. {Clerk served copy upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail}(pjh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Waiver of Service as to Intuit, Inc. filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Waiver of Service as to Susan K. Goodarzi, #2 Proposed Waiver of Service as to Stephanie Houng, #3 Proposed Waiver of Service as to Brad Smith)(pjh)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Devjani Mishra on behalf of Susan K. Goodarzi, Stephanie Houng, Intuit, Inc., Brad Smith (Mishra, Devjani)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se requesting Intuit Inc. be added to the docket as a Defendant submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. {Clerk notes this party is already listed as a defendant in this case with a different address} (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at the time the complaint was filed. (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se requesting Intuit Inc. be added to the docket as a Defendant submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. {Clerk notes this party is already listed as a defendant in this case with a different address} (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Susan K. Goodarzi, #2 Proposed Summons as to Intuit, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Stephen A. Fuchs, #4 Proposed Summons as to Stephanie Hoang, #5 Proposed Summons as to Brad Smith) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephen A. Fuchs, Susan Goodarzi, Stephanie Houng, Intuit, Inc. and Brad Smith filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Intuit, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Represented By: Devjani Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Houng
Represented By: Devjani Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Smith
Represented By: Devjani Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen A. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan K. Goodarzi
Represented By: Devjani Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?