Lawrence v. Granite Services International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Lawrence
Defendant: Granite Services International, Inc. and Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00636
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Matthew Lawrence. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order/Judgment) (Frisch, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to file the Joint Civil Case Management Plan and Exchange Mandatory Disclosures and GRANTING #11 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file the Motion to Remand by 7/16/2021. A Joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/6/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 conference is RESET for 8/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/9/2021. (kmc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand (Unopposed) filed by Matthew Lawrence. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Frisch, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Joint Civil Case Management Plan and Exchange Mandatory Disclosures UNOPPOSED filed by Matthew Lawrence. Response to Motion due by 7/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Frisch, Andrew)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file the Motion to Remand by 7/9/2021. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/30/2021. (kmc)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand (Unopposed) filed by Matthew Lawrence. Response to Motion due by 7/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (Frisch, Andrew)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: A Joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/7/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 conference is RESET for 7/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/22/2021.(kmc)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks recused. Case reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter for all further proceedings. The Hon. Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. remains the District Judge assigned to the case. The newly assigned Magistrate Judge will issue a directive with respect to the scheduling of the Rule 16 Conference and related deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/15/2021. (sg)
June 8, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Co., Corporate Parent FieldCore Service, Inc. for Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc... (Li, Zheyao)
June 8, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc..(Li, Zheyao)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/6/2021 AT 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/29/2021. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
June 2, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC answer due 6/8/2021; Granite Services International, Inc. answer due 6/8/2021. (jel, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. (jel, )
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Onondaga Supreme Court, case number 002416//2021 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5541197) filed by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - State Court Summons and Class Action Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Granite Services International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lawrence
Represented By: Andrew R. Frisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Services International, Inc.
Represented By: Zheyao Li
Represented By: Brett C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Zheyao Li
Represented By: Brett C. Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?