Reichberg et al v. Silbert's Community Resort, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leizor Reichberg, Moshe Rottenberg, Nusie Rubin, Levi Rottenberg, Malki Denciger, Samuel Bauer, David Vogel, Yonasan Bauer, M.R., S.R., E.R., H.R., T.R., A.R., R.R., R.R. #2, T.R. #2, C.R., H.R. #2, S.R. #2, Y.R., E.R. #2, E.B., H.B., M.B., R.B., S.A., C.P., M.S., S.E., A.Y., S.V., M.C., A.D., Y.D. and H.D.
Defendant: Silbert's Community Resort, Inc., Oleg Gorelik and Gabriel Salem
Case Number: 5:2023cv01220
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT: as to Oleg Gorelik approving the #9 Request for Entry of Default. (jmb)
November 5, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Oleg Gorelik re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #8 Affidavit of Service, Set/Reset Answer Deadline by T.R. #2, A.D., S.V., E.R., H.D., Levi Rottenberg, M.R., Leizor Reichberg, C.P., T.R., A.R., M.S., A.Y., Y.D., S.E., M.B., R.R. #2, C.R., Samuel Bauer, S.A., David Vogel, H.R., M.C., R.R., S.R. #2, Moshe Rottenberg, Malki Denciger, R.B., Y.R., H.B., Yonasan Bauer, H.R. #2, E.B., E.R. #2, S.R., Nusie Rubin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support, #2 Declaration Ex A, #3 Declaration Ex B, #4 Declaration Ex C) (Gross, Jonathan)
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Oleg Gorelik on October 11, 2023, filed by A.D., A.R., A.Y., Samuel Bauer, Yonasan Bauer, C.P., C.R., Malki Denciger, E.B., E.R., E.R. #2, H.B., H.D., H.R., H.R. #2, M.B., M.C., M.R., M.S., R.B., R.R., R.R. #2, Leizor Reichberg, Levi Rottenberg, Moshe Rottenberg, Nusie Rubin, S.A., S.E., S.R., S.R. #2, S.V., T.R., T.R. #2, David Vogel, Y.D., Y.R.. (Gross, Jonathan)
October 27, 2023 ***Answer deadline set for Oleg Gorelik to 11/1/2023. (jmb)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Salem by A.D., A.R., A.Y., Samuel Bauer, Yonasan Bauer, C.P., C.R., Malki Denciger, E.B., E.R., E.R. #2, H.B., H.D., H.R., H.R. #2, M.B., M.C., M.R., M.S., R.B., R.R., R.R. #2, Leizor Reichberg, Levi Rottenberg, Moshe Rottenberg, Nusie Rubin, S.A., S.E., S.R., S.R. #2, S.V., T.R., T.R. #2, David Vogel, Y.D., Y.R. (Gross, Jonathan)
October 4, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Silbert's Community Resort, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Gabriel Salem, #2 Summons issued as to Oleg Gorelik - Brooklyn, #3 Summons issued as to Oleg Gorelik - Staten Island) (jmb)
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): T.R. #2, A.D., S.V., E.R., H.D., Levi Rottenberg, M.R., Leizor Reichberg, C.P., T.R., A.R., M.S., A.Y., Y.D., S.E., M.B., R.R. #2, C.R., Samuel Bauer, S.A., David Vogel, H.R., M.C., R.R., S.R. #2, Moshe Rottenberg, Malki Denciger, R.B., Y.R., H.B., Yonasan Bauer, H.R. #2, E.B., E.R. #2, S.R., Nusie Rubin is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Oleg Gorelik re: #1 Complaint,,. (Gross, Jonathan)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): T.R. #2, A.D., S.V., E.R., H.D., Levi Rottenberg, M.R., Leizor Reichberg, C.P., T.R., A.R., M.S., A.Y., Y.D., S.E., M.B., R.R. #2, C.R., Samuel Bauer, S.A., David Vogel, H.R., M.C., R.R., S.R. #2, Moshe Rottenberg, Malki Denciger, R.B., Y.R., H.B., Yonasan Bauer, H.R. #2, E.B., E.R. #2, S.R., Nusie Rubin is requesting summons(es) be issued as to All Defendants re: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Gross, Jonathan)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan S. Gross on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gross, Jonathan)
October 2, 2023 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/2/2024 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
October 2, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 10/5/2023. (jmb)
October 2, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Eden P. Quainton's bar account is showing as Fees Due for the 2023 Biennial Fee Payment. Counsel is directed to pay the fee by selecting the "Biennial Fee Payment" event under the Civil menu, under Other Filings, then after getting a receipt number the Attorney is directed to continue with the event and answer a couple questions and complete the event so that her account can be updated. Counsel is directed to pay the 2023 biennial fee ASAP as it is overdue. (jmb)
October 2, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in the Pleading, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 10/5/2023. (jmb)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silbert's Community Resort, Inc., Oleg Gorelik and Gabriel Salem, (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6462957) filed by Leizor Reichberg, Moshe Rottenberg, Nusie Rubin, Levi Rottenberg, Malki Denciger, Samuel Bauer, David Vogel, Yonasan Bauer, T.R. #2, A.D., S.V., E.R., H.D., M.R., C.P., T.R., A.R., M.S., A.Y., Y.D., S.E., M.B., R.R. #2, C.R., S.A., H.R., M.C., R.R., S.R. #2, R.B., Y.R., H.B., H.R. #2, E.B., E.R. #2, S.R. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with counties noted as Kings for plaintiffs and Sullivan for defendants) (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reichberg et al v. Silbert's Community Resort, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leizor Reichberg
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Rottenberg
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nusie Rubin
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Rottenberg
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malki Denciger
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Bauer
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vogel
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yonasan Bauer
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.R. #2
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.R. #2
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.R. #2
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.R. #2
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.R.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R. #2
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.B.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.B.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.B.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.A.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.P.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.Y.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.V.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.D.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.D.
Represented By: Eden P. Quainton
Represented By: Jonathan S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silbert's Community Resort, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oleg Gorelik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?