John Doe v. Syracuse University
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Syracuse University
Case Number: 5:2023cv01466
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
2 Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMAND. This matter is remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Onondaga. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/2/2024. (nmk)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of the #20 Stipulation of Remand which has been submitted to Chief Judge Sannes, the 1/8/2024 Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines are adjourned without new date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/27/2023. (sg)
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Remand (Joint) by John Doe submitted to Judge Hon. Brenda K. Sannes, Chief Judge. (Clark, Melissa)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE by John Doe Demand for Jury Trial (Clark, Melissa)
December 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew F. Bruno on behalf of Syracuse University (Bruno, Matthew)
December 14, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew L. Morrison on behalf of Syracuse University (Morrison, Andrew)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Bruno Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/13/2023. (sg )
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Morrison. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/13/2023. (sg)
December 13, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Syracuse University regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in the Notice of removal or Answer, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 12/18/2023. (mmg).
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Syracuse University.(Hartunian, Richard)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Francis Bruno Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6543128. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Hartunian in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Hartunian, Richard)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew L. Morrison Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6543041. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration of Richard S. Hartunian in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Hartunian, Richard)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is ORDERED that if Defendant maintains that there is complete diversity between the parties, it shall submit a memorandum not to exceed five pages by 12/28/2023, showing cause why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant maintains that there is complete diversity between the parties, it shall submit supporting evidence regarding Plaintiff's citizenship or domicile along with its memorandum. It is further ORDERED that if Defendant maintains there is complete diversity between the parties, Plaintiff may respond to Defendant's submission, with a memorandum not to exceed five pages, on or before 1/11/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 12/11/2023. (nmk)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 Letter from Lynn A. Ellenberger advising of incoming Pro Hac Vice Admissions for Plaintiffs counsel. (mmg).
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from the above-entitled action, which was assigned to him on November 22, 2023. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk enter this Text Order of Recusal for the undersigned; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another United States District Judge. (Senior U.S. District Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks remains the assigned magistrate judge in this action). IT IS SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on December 6, 2023. (rep)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Ryan Clark on behalf of John Doe (Clark, Melissa)
November 22, 2023 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Syracuse University. (mmg).
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party John Doe; Attorney Lynn Ellenberger, Email address is lynn@feganscott.com. Phone number is (312)-264-0100. Admissions due by 12/6/2023. Notice sent VIA Email along with GO 25.(mmg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party John Doe; Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan, Email address is beth@feganscott.com. Phone number is (312)-264-01011. Admissions due by 12/6/2023. Notice sent VIA EMAIL along with copy of GO 25.(mmg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party John Doe; Attorney Jonathan Lindenfeld, Email address is jonathan@feganscott.com. Phone number is (332)-264-0100. Admissions due by 12/6/2023. Notice Sent VIA EMAIL alongside GO 25.(mmg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 1/8/2024 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/2/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Onondaga. (mmg).
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Onondaga, case number 013037/2023 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6523175) filed by Syracuse University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mmg).
November 22, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for Syracuse University answer due 12/12/2023. (mmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe v. Syracuse University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Melissa Ryan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse University
Represented By: Richard S. Hartunian
Represented By: Andrew L. Morrison
Represented By: Matthew F. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?