Kearns v. Wallin et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Kearns
Defendant: Theodore O. Wallin and Syracuse University
Case Number: 5:2023cv01500
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Miroslav Lovric
3 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by Syracuse University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Township of Medford Block, Lot, and Ownership Information, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - 2023 Final/2024 Preliminary Tax Bill, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Bills for water and sewer services, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Voter Information, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E - Wallin DMV Record, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. F - Wallin SU Contact Information)(Larkin, Matthew)
January 26, 2024 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT regarding diversity and response to letter motion regarding stay by Theodore O. Wallin. (Wright, James)
January 24, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James P. Wright, Jr on behalf of Theodore O. Wallin (Wright, James)
January 23, 2024 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #20 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the deadlines for Defendants to respond to the complaint are STAYED without date. The Rule 16 Initial Conference continues to be STAYED. Text Order 17 remains in effect. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/23/2024. (jdc )
January 23, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Letter Motion from Matthew J. Larkin, Esq. for Syracuse University requesting To strike the January 31, 2024, Answer deadline as SUs motion to temporarily stay all proceedings is pending before this Court. submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric, #16 Letter Motion from Matthew J. Larkin, Esq. for Syracuse University requesting An Order temporarily staying all proceedings submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric filed by Timothy Kearns. (Karic, Amina)
January 23, 2024 Filing 20 Letter Motion from Matthew J. Larkin, Esq. for Syracuse University requesting To strike the January 31, 2024, Answer deadline as SUs motion to temporarily stay all proceedings is pending before this Court. submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Larkin, Matthew)
January 19, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Syracuse University on January 10, 2024, filed by Timothy Kearns. (Karic, Amina)
January 19, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Theodore O. Wallin on January 10, 2024, filed by Timothy Kearns. (Karic, Amina)
January 19, 2024 ***Reset answer due date for Syracuse University - answer due 1/31/2024; and Theodore O. Wallin - answer due 1/31/2024. (kck)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: No later than 1/26/24: (1) Plaintiff shall file affidavits of service on the docket demonstrating that service of summons and complaint has been properly completed on Defendants pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 4 [a review of the docket indicates that no such affidavits of service have been filed.]; (2) Plaintiff and Defendants shall file detailed status reports addressing whether complete diversity jurisdiction exists in this case [the Notice of Removal does not appear to adequately allege complete diversity jurisdiction because although it alleges that Plaintiff is a resident of the state of New Jersey and that Defendant Theodore O. Wallin is a resident of the state of New York, it fails to allege their state of citizenship or domicile. An allegation of "an individual party's residence is insufficient to establish their domicile or citizenship." See, IndyMac Venture, LLC v. Mulligan, 15-CV-7057, 2019 WL 4648419, at *3 (E.D.N.Y. Aug. 30, 2019) (citing White v. Abney, 17-CV-4286, 2019 WL 1298452, at *3 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 21, 2019)); see also Caren v. Collines, 689 F. App'x 75, 75 (2d Cir. 2017) ("Although the individual plaintiff and individual defendants are alleged to be residents of certain States, such an allegation is insufficient to plead citizenship"). Notably, "one may have more than one residence in different parts of this country or world, but a person may have only one domicile." See, Reich v. Lopez, 858 F.3d 55, 63 (2d Cir. 2017). "Where there is evidence indicating that a party has more than one residence, or the residence is unclear, the Court should look to the party's intent." Chen v. Sun, 13-CV-0280, 2016 WL 270869, at *2 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 21, 2016) (citing Nat'l Artists Mgmt. Co. v. Weaving, 769 F. Supp. 1224, 1227 (S.D.N.Y. 1991)). In determining a party's intent, courts consider many factors including: current residence; voting registration; driver's license and automobile registration; location of brokerage and bank accounts; membership in fraternal organizations, churches, and other associations; places of employment or business; payment of taxes; whether a person owns or rents his place of residence; the nature of the residence (i.e., how permanent the living arrangement appears); and the location of a person's physician, lawyer, accountant, dentist, stockbroker, etc. Kennedy v. Trs. of Testamentary Tr. of Will of Kennedy, 633 F. Supp. 2d 77, 81 (S.D.N.Y. 2009).]; and (3) Plaintiff and Defendant Theodore O. Wallin shall file a Response to Letter Motion #16 , not exceeding 5 pages. An on the record Hearing is scheduled for 2/6/2024 at 12:00 p.m., via Teams teleconference. The Courtroom Deputy will provide all counsel of record a Teams link to join the Hearing. The Rule 16 Initial Conference continues to be STAYED. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/16/2024. (jdc)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 Letter Motion from Matthew J. Larkin, Esq. for Syracuse University requesting An Order temporarily staying all proceedings submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Liquidation Order, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Liquidation, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Insurance Policy, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Company Profile, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Email)(Larkin, Matthew)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/3/2024. (kck) Modified on 1/3/2024 - to add document number to entry (kck).
January 3, 2024 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY regarding 15 Order Reassigning Case to correctly assign docket entry number that was missed during filing. (kck)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 1/2/2024 and the 12/26/2023 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/28/2023. (kmc)
December 21, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER re: #12 defendant Syracuse University's Letter Motion. Defendant is granted leave to file a letter motion to stay proceedings, not exceeding 5 pages, by 1/12/2024. Plaintiff shall respond by letter brief, not exceeding 5 pages, by 1/26/24. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/21/2023. (kmc)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Matthew J. Larkin, Esq. for Syracuse University requesting The Court set a briefing schedule and page limits to Syracuse University's letter Motion to Stay submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Larkin, Matthew)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Counsel are directed to file a status report by 12/18/2023, consistent with the accompanying TEXT Minute Entry. Syracuse University's answer deadline remains stayed. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/8/2023.(kmc)
December 8, 2023 TEXT Minute Entry for a telephonic conference held on 12/8/2023 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter re #9 defendant's letter motion: The court discussed with the parties whether the Liquidation and Injunction Order from the Chancery Court of Delaware with respect to defendant Syracuse University's insurer warrants a stay of proceedings in this action. The parties should confer with each other and file a status report by 12/18/2023, reporting on a proposed letter briefing schedule (and page limits) if the issues have not been resolved through a meet and confer among counsel. Syracuse University's answer deadline remains stayed pending resolution of the impact of the Liquidation and Injunction Order on this action. Appearances: Amina Karic, Esq. for plaintiff; Matthew Larkin, Esq. for defendant. (Digitally Recorded. Time: 10:00 AM - 10:10 AM.) (kmc)
December 7, 2023 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: A telephonic conference is set for 12/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 315-691-0477 and enter ID code 473 813 471# to connect to the conference. (kmc)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Granting #9 Letter Request. The answer deadline for Syracuse University is STAYED. The court will be scheduling a telephone conference with the parties in due course. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/6/2023. (kmc)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Matthew Larkin for Syracuse University requesting Stay of proceedings and correction of Answer deadline submitted to Judge Baxter . (Larkin, Matthew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby RECUSES himself from this action. Having reviewed this matter more closely, it has come to my attention that I may have a conflict of interest, and therefore I recuse myself from this case. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk enter this Text Order of Recusal for the undersigned; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another United States District Judge. (U.S. District Judge Glenn T. Suddaby recused. Case reassigned to District Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter remains the assigned magistrate judge in this action). SO ORDERED by U.S. District Judge Glenn T Suddaby on 12/4/2023. (sal )
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Kearns of Jury Demand (Karic, Amina)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timothy Kearns. (Karic, Amina)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Syracuse University re #4 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, (Larkin, Matthew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 1/2/2024 at 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: filed by Syracuse University. No Parent Corporation exists. (jmb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT: relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff in NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga. (jmb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court - County of Onondaga, case number 13021/2023 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6528173) filed by Syracuse University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmb)
November 29, 2023 ***Answer deadline set for Syracuse University and Theodore O. Wallin to 12/6/2023. (jmb)
November 29, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY: regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in either Pleading (Complaint or Notice of Removal), pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 12/5/2023. (jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearns v. Wallin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Kearns
Represented By: Amina Karic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore O. Wallin
Represented By: James P. Wright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse University
Represented By: Matthew J. Larkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?