Washington v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Washington
Defendant: Mr. Mills, Ms. Whitaker, Mr. Daughtery, W. Carter, Ms. Collins, Mr. Coles, Mr. Brown, Justin Thomas, Mr. Dunn, Mr. Mayo, Sgt. Kirkpat, Ms. Wells, Banks, John/Jane Doe and Mr. Donahue
Case Number: 9:2018cv01121
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. ORDERED that the Clerk shall amend the docket to add Banks as a defendant. ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted: (1) claims for money damages pursuant to Section 1983 against defendants in their official capacity; and (2) RLUIPA claims for monetary damages against defendants in their official and individual capacities. ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED without prejudice: (1) claims against Carter and Whitaker; (2) Eighth Amendment deliberate medical indifference claims against John/Jane Doe; (3) Eighth Amendment claim against Daughtery; (4) Fourteenth Amendment claims related to Plaintiff's personal property; and (5) claims for injunctive relief. ORDERED that the following claims survive the Court's sua sponte review under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) and require a response: (1) Eighth Amendment conditions-of- confinement claims against Wells, Mills, Kirkpat, Mayo, Coles, Dunn, Brown, and Banks; and (2) First Amendment claims against Thomas, Collins, and Donahue. ORDERED that the Clerk terminate Carter, Whitaker, Daughtery, and John/Jane Doe as defendants in this action. ORDERED the Clerk shall issue a summonses and forward them, along with copies of the Complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon the defendants. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summonses and Complaint to the Office of the Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/15/18. (Attachments: #1 case law cited, #2 case law cited, #3 case law cited, #4 case law cited, #5 case law cited, #6 case law cited, #7 case law cited, #8 case law cited) {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
November 16, 2018 Notification to Superintendent of Filing - Provided Superintendent at Auburn Correctional Facility with notice of instant action and a copy of Plaintiff's #7 Inmate Authorization Form. USDC/NYND Finance Dept notified. (rar, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerome Washington Effective Date 11/13/2018 Old Address: Marcy Correctional Facility New Address: Auburn Correctional Facility (rar, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/2/18. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Jerome Washington. (nas, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Washington.(nas, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Submission by Jerome Washington. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: By Order of this Court dated September 19, 2018, this case was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements. Dkt. No. 4 (the "September Order"). Plaintiff was afforded thirty (30) days in which to either (1) pay the full filing fee of $400.00, or (2) submit a completed and signed application to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility, along with a signed Inmate Authorization Form consenting to the payment of the $350.00 filing fee amount over time. Id. Plaintiff was advised that upon his compliance with the September Order, the Clerk would reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. Id. The Court is in receipt of additional submissions received for filing after the September Order was issued, including a second application to proceed IFP, and a supplemental pleading. See Dkt. Nos. 5, 6, 7. None of these submissions cure the deficiencies identified in the September Order. As a result, plaintiff is advised that this action remains closed and the Court will not review plaintiff's complaint and supplemental pleading in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and/or 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) unless and until he complies with the September Order. Plaintiff is advised that his deadline to comply with the September Order is reset until thirty (30) days from the filing date of this Text Order. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Text Order on plaintiff, along with a blank IFP Application, and a copy of the September Order. The Clerk is further directed to attach plaintiff's supplemental pleading (Dkt. No. 5), with exhibits (Dkt. No. 5-1), to the complaint. Authorized by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/21/18. (served as directed)(alh, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Jerome Washington. (alh, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Washington. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Envelope)(alh, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 Complaint filed by Jerome Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (alh, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/19/18. (served on plaintiff with form by regular mail)(alh, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Jerome Washington. (alh, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jerome Washington.(alh, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mr. Brown, W. Carter, Mr. Coles, Ms. Collins, Mr. Daughtery, Mr. Dunn, Sgt. Kirkpat, Mr. Mayo, Mr. Mills, Justin Thomas, Ms. Wells, Ms. Whitaker filed by Jerome Washington. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #2 Supplemental Submission, #3 Exhibit(s)) (alh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Daughtery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Kirkpat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?