Hendrix v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Troy Hendrix
Defendant: John or Jane Does 11-15, Dr. John Morley, Joseph Bellnier, Paul Chappius, Anthony J. Annucci, Patrick Reardon, James O'Gorman, John or Jane Does 1-5, Dr. Carl Koenigsmann, John or Jane Does 6-10, John Colvin and Justin Thomas
Case Number: 9:2020cv00743
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STATUS REPORT by Anthony J. Annucci, Joseph Bellnier, Paul Chappius, John Colvin, Carl Koenigsmann, John Morley, James O'Gorman, Patrick Reardon, Justin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Appearance)(Buckley, Denise)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Justin Thomas served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Patrick Reardon served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. James O'Gorman served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. John Morley served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Carl Koenigsmann served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. John Colvin served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Paul Chappius served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Joseph Bellnier served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy Hendrix. Anthony J. Annucci served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Arden, James)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed defendants' #22 letter motion requesting extension of time to respond to the complaint to 9/29/2020, which is granted. The Court notes in Dkt. 22 defendant indicates appearance for all defendants except one. However, reviewing the docket there are two defendants who appear to be unrepresented at this time: Reardon and Thomas. Defendant is directed to file a status report by 8/10/2020 re: representation of defendants Reardon and Thomas. Plaintiff is directed to file affidavits of service by 8/10/2020. The R. 16 conference set for 10/20/2020 and the associated deadlines remain as scheduled. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/27/2020. (nas )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter Motion from AAG Denise P. Buckley for Anthony J. Annucci, Joseph Bellnier, Paul Chappius, John Colvin, Carl Koenigsmann, John Morley, James O'Gorman requesting an extension to September 29, 2020 to respond to the Complaint whether by Answer or pre-Answer dispositive motion submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Buckley, Denise)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/13/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (nas )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Justin Thomas. (nas, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Patrick Reardon. (nas, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to James O'Gorman. (nas, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to John Morley. (nas )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Carl Koenigsmann. (nas)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to John Colvin. (nas, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Paul Chappius. (nas )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Joseph Bellnier. (nas )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Annucci. (nas )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Troy Hendrix is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint, (Arden, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John and Jane Does 1-15 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (nas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony J. Annucci, Joseph Bellnier, Paul Chappius, John Colvin, John or Jane Does 1-5, John or Jane Does 11-15, John or Jane Does 6-10, Carl Koenigsmann, John Morley, James O'Gorman, Patrick Reardon, Justin Thomas (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5162047) filed by Troy Hendrix. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrix v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 11-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Morley
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bellnier
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Chappius
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Reardon
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Gorman
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carl Koenigsmann
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Colvin
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Thomas
Represented By: Denise P. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Hendrix
Represented By: Cassandra Liu
Represented By: Mariah M Vitali
Represented By: James D. Arden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?