Brown v. State of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown, Antrell Vonique Brown and Islamic Ali
Defendant: Deputy Wardens, Business Office, Classification Directors, Mail Room Campbell, DCS, Mental Health Records, State Department of Corrections, State of Michigan, Brett Coney, RUMS, Danyelle Dobbins, Wardens, Librarians, Sulyot, Heidi E. Washington, Assistant Deputy Wardens and Curizon
Case Number: 9:2021cv00072
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), the Clerk of the Court transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court advise the Clerk of the Eastern District of Michigan of the entry of this Decision and Order and provide all information necessary for the Clerk of that District to electronically access the documents filed in this action. The Court hereby waives the fourteen-day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/9/2021. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 Submission in support of #1 Complaint by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 envelope)(nas, )
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 2/16/2021. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Antrel Vonique Brown. (nas, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application. ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff chooses to file an IFP application, it must be accompanied by a signed inmate authorization form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/22/2021. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against Assistant Deputy Wardens, Business Office, Classification Directors, Brett Coney, DCS, Deputy Wardens, Danyelle Dobbins, Librarians, Mail Room Campbell, Mental Health Records, RUMS, State Department of Corrections, State of Michigan, Sulyot, Wardens, Curizon, and Heidi E. Washington. Filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Copy of Michigan State Court Complaint - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Copy of Michigan State Court Complaint - Part 2, #3 Exhibit - Copy of USDC Eastern District of Michigan's Order and Judgment, #4 Mailing Envelope)(rep, ) Modified on 3/9/2021 (nas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. State of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrell Vonique Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islamic Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Wardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Room Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mental Health Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Coney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danyelle Dobbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Librarians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sulyot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Deputy Wardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?