Brown v. State of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown, Islamic Ali and Antrell Vonicque Brown
Defendant: Elbodi, Unit Chief Brett Coney, Danyelle Dobbins, Solyot, Abelman, Cotizon Personnel, Myrick, State Department of Corrections, State of Michigan and Board of Directors
Case Number: 9:2021cv00378
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application (Dkt. No. #4 ) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed, signed, and certified IFP application; or (3) submit a completed and signed IFP application along with certified copies of his inmate account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court and the Clerk shall close the case; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/5/2021. (Copy served via regular mail, along with blank forms)(meb)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/3/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (meb)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antrel Vonique Brown.(meb)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. Old Address: Macomb Correctional Facility. New Address: Brooks Correctional Facility. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: It is hereby ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event plaintiff chooses to file an IFP application, it must be accompanied by a signed inmate authorization form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules; and it is further ORDERED that, upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 4/5/2021. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abelman, Board of Directors, Brett Coney, Cotizon Personnel, Danyelle Dobbins, Elbodi, Myrick, Solyot, State Department of Corrections, State of Michigan filed by Antrel Vonique Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Mailing envelope)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. State of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrel Vonique Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islamic Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antrell Vonicque Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elbodi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Chief Brett Coney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danyelle Dobbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solyot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotizon Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?