Chhab v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ahmed Chhab, Mr. Levon Samoniantz, DaJuan White, Marci Boyce, George Jeansonne, John Lucero, Erik Anderson, Timothy Romero, Garcia Gerard, Amy Smith, Michael Kilpatrick, Jeffrey Kennedy, Donna Nicholson, Lyacine Jesse Bakkar, Maglio Kimberly, John Yanek, Rebecca Ledwell, Mark Hunter Davis, Crystal Beng, Paul Parrott, Thomas Warren, Joanna Tuchinski, Peter Gorica, Neda Ebrahimi, Sean Woolf, Tasiya Oliver, Daniel Burns, Laura Yount, Amy Mitchell, Virginia Alleyne, Haley Duke, Cecili Simmons, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion, Merrily Guglielmo, David Casey, Melanie Coit, Kevin Kearney, Stephen Tandy, Nicholas Ballabon, Jamaal Holmes, Melanie Waszewski, Rafael Velez, Francoise Tomaszewski, Patricia Maccarone, Kristin Cannon, Michael Dmytrtk, Britt Wicklund, Ryan Fender, Scott Mealus, Christopher Dilg, Jennifer Waite, Brendan Clark, James Imbriano, Megan Shagam, Alan Neiderman, Paul Taylor, Meghan Card, Rebeckah Graham, Daniel Burnett, Thomas Paul, John Stark, Neil Mausteller, Robin Jankins, Lawrence Yee, Sandra Defino, Christopher Peddicord, Andrew Hartsman, Juan Ventura, John Ethridge, Krista Perry, Sam Coffland, Elizabeth Stroup, Bobbie Martino, Kyree Miller, Chantel Ferrere, Daniel Elkins, Faouzi Gharbi, Andrew Mcmanaman, Luis Zapata, Lori Cameron, Charles Martin, Roger Marais, Dan Antonelli, Baldo Caro, Steven Trundell, Nicole Thompson, Christen Mcauliffe, Paul Hayward, Charles Johnson, Jennifer Laguaradia, Michael Raiborn, Melanie Sessa, John Veet, Matthew Bell, Elisabeth Spitz, David Helfrich, Christina Carter, Chau Nguyen, Peter Hatton, Keith Stone, Christine Hall, Victoria Krajewski, Lucy Landeg, Steve Gonzalez, William Potts, Sara Flanagan, Maria Naclerio, Lori Elliott, Tamas Bakoczy, Susan Garesche, Carmen Ventula, Christopher McCoy, Anjan Sarma, Eva Rego, Tara Nickerson-Lopes, Roberts Lopes, Courtney Straga, John Maleitzke, Lane Bowen, Ken Handler, Stacey Blaisdell, Robert Roberts, Timothy Arpin, Dan Gobush, David Showley, David Mena, Jose Avila, Rocco Notaro, Jeff Horwath, Patrick Rankin, Elizabeth Pine, Manuel Herezi, Charity Ohlund, Kimberly Kratky, Teri Bonilla, David Pierce-Feith, Larry Rorabaugh, Richard Yuruckso, Charles Henry, Lynnetara Sweeney, Kai Wharton, Ryan Dominguez, Carla Zickmund, Toni Johnson, Joseph Bridge, Kane Ramsey, Anthony Feliz, Sara Flanigan, Josh Fallon, John Cohan, Scott Bottcher, John Erlauer, Louis Arturi, Adam Smith, Mark Stavole, Cynthia Bell, William Lazzeri, Jennifer Longwell, Joseph Sheridan, Michael Zeni, Falon Morales, Russell Beverstein, Bonilla Luis, Philip Ryu Baker, Jane Simon, Miguel Flores, Ryan Harp, James Cressman, Jessica Scotten, Susan Spinell, Amy Russell, Jeffrey Allen, Mariah Charisell, Bruce Thompson, Mallory Rossi, Tara Tyler, Kathleen Wazny, Ashley Finch, Dinesh Marappuli, Mojan Kianchehr, Todd Wheatman, Kristen Dillon, Diego Canelo, Jolene Monteilh, Michael Ramos, Raul Dimitru, Musa Yasin, Megan Foreshay, Kelly Smith, Courtney Cook, Jared Blum, Dede Gashaj, Garrett Mark, Monica Barbie, Peter Donahue, John Riccardella, Hanna Diro, Stacy Garb, John Powell, Summer Harrington, Thomas McCure, Dan Rossi, Stephen Hunt, Lisa White, Kimberly Gattshall, John Hogue, Stephanie Markham, Andrew Robinson, Lisa Helm, River Day, Neil Youngblood, Mark McCready, Lisa Fernandez, Ronald Doyle, Kolette Kidman, Stephanie Wamsley, Michael Gay, Carol Salinas, Eric Janzen, Jason Degraff, Kanita Lorsomran, Allison Labovitz, Celia Hough, Terrance Wilson, Matthew Harrington, James Milbune, Kristin Matousek, Thomas Ford, Donna Jo Thorndale, Raju Maity, Shashin Thakkar, Jennifer Howe, Justin Alvarez, Campbell Yvette, Debra Berry, Bianca Dever, Neal Baylin, Angela Swan, Joseph Walker, Lance Vernon, Catherine Flaherty, Dana Giles, Mindy Lee Parody, Ariella Beyer, Angel Pacheco, Daniel Fosha, Angela Beaty, Christopher Cass, Naomi Easterling, Dylan Forsyth, Ashley Pamplin, Kristy Tessmar, Mark Curtis Stein, Allison Brown, John Beidler, James Bautch, Ann Donelson, Ashley Kalkanian, Mary Lee Holland, Tim Manley, John Dove, Christina Matthews, Robert Serra, James Baker, Ralph Masci, Jose G. Ortiz, Samantha Bailey, Kateri Jones, James Connelly, Sara Romig, Chris Thompson, Kristin Russell, Cheri Castaldo, Leobardo Martinez, Angela Pugh, Patricia Thompson, Timothy Bahr, Steven Oliver, Jennifer Kremer, Edward Franklin, Mark McGuire, Shelly Beatrice, Alex Renteria, Thomas Yob, Monsur Rahman, Larel Anderson, John Poulos, Matthew Loch, Robert Ballard, Matthew Cornett, Laren McLaughlin, Sean Dyer, Michael Garrison, Marcel Templet, Thomas McDonald, Charles Hodgins, Teri Kirkland, Jose Santiago, Erica Steiger, Sherean Southerland, Anthony Sinesi, Michael Barker, Hannah Mathews, Michele Ardito, Ronald Draine, Adam Whitield, Albert Aron Van Sciver, Beth Verstraete, Sarah Prestidge, Sandra Abrams, Linnett Rieger, Chrissy Von Philp, Jason Williams, Thomas Salvatore, Mahlait Muluager, Maria Gonzalez, Francine Castro, Billie Joe Leach, Kenneth Glass, Lindsey Glosniak, Yukchon Wai, Jason Culpepper, Nicole Paul, Kevin Montgomery, Elizabeth Driscoll, Timothy Roy, Dale-Lillian Danek, Megan Young, Derrick Dedgepeth, Katie Carelle, Lisa McGuire, David Moore, Daniel Marcinkowski, Vlad Loboaba, Melanie Seelinger, Satish Bajaj, Anne Launte, Tracy Killiebrew, Anri Beleshi, Angela Towne-Varela, Erin Kenny, Derrick Tims, Lila Maycock, Robert McDonald, Bonnie Butler, Katarzyna Piesiewicz, Rebecca Gerace, Jermine Pelkey, Sandra Schretther, Charles Bowling, Michael Cappiello, Jessica Hobson, Jessica Kenny, Javler Vazquez, Margaret Mathews, Luis Alanis, Elliot Hardy, G. David Trosko, Jean Grundy, Jan Vitko, Sarah Jacobson, Jan Andrew Spurrier, Stacy Grab, Maisha Kiala, Brandon Lester, Robert Arief, Brenna Freifeld, Jason Bellin, Margaret Manaco, Alex Gonzalez, David Tubman, Dawn Marie Blackford, Eric Johnson, Leo F. Tierney, Michele Peters, Vanessa Bacher, Jonathan Way, Anthony Salamone, Michael Boggs, Kathy de Sousa, Janis Giacalone, Maria Paradiso, Josephine Ogbenna, Joshua Caghey, John Holliman, Kevin Coles, Devero Roberto, Anton Christie, Kristi Disckinson, Kevin Elston, Vincent Whaley, Sarah Webster Pritt, Wendy Rood, Elyse Hanselman, Brian Hardin, Theresa Hart, Paul Gilmour, Leslie Haberacker, Jeah Korwitts, Daniel Parham, Varian Huddleston, Krystle Millikan, Patricia Lange, Mary Phalen, Heidi Orndoff, Darral Van Goethem, Nicole M Egan, Mark Nicholas Vitale, Marla Ciampa, Duy H. Nguyen, LaTesha D. Hudson, Alisa Phipon, John Wallace, Heather Paterno, Andrew Wayeneth, Alan Lopez, Guy Williams, Sean Bailoy, Jessica Water, Jonathan Fiely, Eric Kearney, David Albright, Robert McNeily, Brian Wallace, Tammy Myers, David Levy, Annie LaRue, Frank Vlasak, Amie Nappi, Cesar Arteaga, Francis Elliott, Quintin Hilliard, Brett Thomas Beecher, Robert Pintar, Cherri Frankhouser, Richard Velez, Paige White, Nicole Bello, Kurt M Fichte, Michael Schuerget, Jonathan Mackay, Matthew Walters, Rachel Perry, Brea Beaucage, Luis Santamaria, Lawrence Jr. Gill, Michelle Desourdy Coley, Jevene Uland, Lindsay Fisher, Yamill Rivera, Chrisopher Easton, Cristina Lavora, Daniel Horan, Joseph Garcia, Gayle Lauer, Holly Williams, Tony Sereno, Katie Kloos, Jessie Hurt, John Rieth, Tomas Forti, Jamil Teacher, Daniel Pena, Craig Maggio, Patrick Solano, Brinnan Chartier, Valerie Blooker, Danielle Schult, James Fenton, Lorissa Henry, Jason Dyals, Amanda Rosenbaum, Terence Fernandez, Bobak Ghadery, Eric Spoon, Joshua Froehlich, Shannon Hennen, Mark Connolly, Lena Romeo, Allen Floyd, Robert Terenzio, Mara MacNish, Anthony J Herrero, Jennifer Maier, Naima Hyppolite, Robert Greeley, Emmy Scelsi, Public Def. Cedric Edwards, Chelstan Char, Robert Blaylock, Joseph W Uptergrove, Gregor Hoesser, Julie Humar, Paulyn Taganas Walcott, Jeffrey Young, Michael D Yanke, Carroll Walsh, Booker Marshall, Giscard Walters, Caryn Brzozowski, Jeff Sydow, Donna E Jacobs, Keith Richards, David Margulies, Cedric Edwards, Pik Ki Wong, Brandon Schearing, Lisa Dechiara, Brook Lemma, Kelly Purvis, Crystal Shelton, Frank Jakab, Kelly McHale, Jennifer Rotert, Maria Russo, Liza Briggs, William Moran, Karyn Hillenbrand, Farhad Barak, Julie Shoup, Jocelyn Houska, Michael Serrano, Lee Martin, Timothy Pavlov, Christopher Aglio, Kristopher Klain, Debra Speer, James Powell, Mario Garcia, Issac Grier, Michael Chuba, Myron Taylor, Thomas Burke, Mohammad Alam, Nekesha Jones-Poitier, Joel Bolt, Mark Turner, Joanna Fanizza, Heather Cocco and Sherrah Hill
Defendant: Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. doing business as The Capital Grille and Rare Hospitality International, Inc.
Petitioner: Nora Poupard
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Stephanie Henderson
Case Number: 1:2011cv08345
Filed: November 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Fairness Hearing held on 12/15/2016. (ade)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, THAT: This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the parties' Settlement Agreement and Release (the "Settlement Agreement") dated February 5, 2016. This Court approves the settlement and all terms set forth in the Settlement Agreement and finds that the settlement is, in all respects, fair, reasonable, adequate, and not a product of collusion. The Court finds reasonable the service awards for the Named Plaintiffs in the amounts of $10,000 to Ahmed Chhab, $10,000 to Kathryn Shrader, $10,000 to Lance Feldhun, $8,000 to Michael Rella, $5,000 to Vincent Anthony Boreland, and $7,000 to Adrianne Benzion inrecognition of the services they rendered on behalf of the Class. The amounts shall be paid from the settlement fund. The Court grants Class Counsel's request for $25,000 to Ahmed Chhab as a settlement payment for retaliation claims alleged against Defendants as described in the Settlement Agreement. The Court grants Class Counsel's request for $687,869.36 and reimbursement of $61,791.43 in costs and expenses reasonably expended litigating and resolving the lawsuit. The fee award is justified by the work that Class Counsel did negotiating the settlement and conducting the litigation, the ultimate recovery, and the risk that Class Counsel undertook in bringing the claims.If no party seeks reconsideration or rehearing of this Order, the "Effective Date" of the settlement will be 30 days after the Order is entered.The Court will retain jurisdiction over the interpretation and implementation of the Settlement Agreement. The parties shall abide by all terms of the Settlement Agreement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/15/2016) (ama)
November 30, 2016 Filing 221 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 11/30/2016 re: Final Approval of Settlement. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
November 30, 2016 Filing 220 AFFIRMATION of D. Maimon Kirschenbaum in Support re: #217 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
November 30, 2016 Filing 219 AFFIRMATION of Joseph A. Fitapelli in Support re: #217 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
November 30, 2016 Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #217 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval. . Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
November 30, 2016 Filing 217 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #215 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Fairness Hearing is adjourned until December 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. Notice of the adjourned date shall be provided to any class member who has filed a claim form. SO ORDERED. Fairness Hearing set for 12/15/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/06/2016) (ama)
October 4, 2016 Filing 215 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated October 4, 2016. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL AS CLASS COUNSEL, AND APPROVAL OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED NOTICES OFSETTLEMENT AND CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT PROCEDURE granting #207 Motion for Settlement. The above-entitled matter came before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Provisional Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiffs' Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of Plaintiffs' Proposed Notices of Settlement ("Motion for Preliminary Approval"). Defendants agreed, for settlement purposes only, not to oppose the motion. And as set forth herein. The Court will hold a final fairness hearing on October 20, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 21A. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/19/2016) (ama)
May 20, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 10/20/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (ama)
May 13, 2016 Filing 213 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Frank J. Mazzaferro dated 5/13/2016 re: Motion for Preliminary Approval. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
May 3, 2016 Filing 212 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Frank Joseph Mazzaferro on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, United States 10005, 2123000375. (Mazzaferro, Frank)
April 12, 2016 Filing 211 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Scott Schaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 2123000375. (Schaffer, Brian)
April 12, 2016 Filing 210 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brian Scott Schaffer on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, 28 Liberty Street, New York, NY, 10005, 2123000375. (Schaffer, Brian)
February 5, 2016 Filing 209 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Fitapelli in Support re: #207 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 5, 2016 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #207 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. . Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 5, 2016 Filing 207 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 28, 2016 Filing 206 THIRD LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 1/28/2016 re: Settlement. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Filing 205 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #204 Letter, filed by Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Ahmed Chhab, Vincent Anthony Boreland. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/14/2016) (mro)
January 14, 2016 Filing 204 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 1/14/2016 re: Settlement. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #202 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 11/30/2015. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. Application granted. No further extensions. (Motions due by 1/14/2016). (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/30/2015) (rjm)
November 30, 2015 Filing 202 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 11/30/2015. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 5, 2015 Filing 201 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #200 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 9/30/2015 re: Status Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 10/5/2015) (rjm)
September 30, 2015 Filing 200 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 9/30/2015 re: Status Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
April 28, 2015 Filing 199 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #198 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 4/27/2015 re: Stay. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/28/2015) (rjm)
April 28, 2015 Case Stayed. (rjm)
April 27, 2015 Filing 198 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated 4/27/2015 re: Stay. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
April 15, 2015 Filing 197 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #196 NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF APPEARANCE BY ERIC J. GITIG filed by Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Ahmed Chhab, Vincent Anthony Boreland. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Attorney Eric Joshua Gitig terminated. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/15/2015) (rjm)
April 14, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE of of Termination of Appearance. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Gitig, Eric)
March 16, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE of Termination of Appearance. Document filed by Ahmed Chhab. (Kadushin, Matthew)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER. This case is brought under the Fair Labor Standards Act ("FLSA") and state law and alleges that the Defendants Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. d/b/a The Capital Grille, and Rare Hospitality International, Inc. ("Capital Grille") failed to pay minimum wages and overtime compensation to its servers and bartenders. You are receiving this Court Order because you have filed a Consent to Become a Party Under the FLSA (i.e., the "Plaintiff Consent Form") and have therefore elected to opt into this litigation. By opting in to this litigation, you agreed to designate the named plaintiff to make decisions on your behalf concerning all matters pertaining to this lawsuit, and as further set forth. If you wish to continue as a plaintiff in this lawsuit, you must contact the plaintiffs' counsel by March 2, 2015 to schedule your deposition, and as further specified herein. You should contact one of the plaintiffs' counsel as further listed in this Order by March 2, 2015, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/24/2015) (rjm)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #192 Letter re: Proposed Scheduling Order, filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Discovery due by 4/10/2015, Motions due by 5/1/2015, Responses due by 5/29/2015, Replies due by 6/12/2015.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/23/2015) (kko)
February 17, 2015 Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Craig R. Benson dated 02/17/2015 re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Benson, Craig)
February 13, 2015 Filing 191 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Craig R. Benson dated February 13, 2015 re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Benson, Craig)
January 29, 2015 Filing 190 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Craig R. Benson dated 01/29/2015 re: to request that this Court issue an Order to opt-in Plaintiffs who have, to date, failed to respond to notices of deposition or communicate with Plaintiffs counsel regarding same. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benson, Craig)
January 2, 2015 Filing 189 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Louis Pechman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Pechman Law Group PLLC, 488 Madison Avenue, New York, New York, 10022, 212-583-9500. (Pechman, Louis)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #187 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph Fitapelli dated 12/17/14 re: Status Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Kathryn Shrader. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed schedule is acceptable. No pre-motion conference is necessary for the class certification motion. So ordered. (Motions due by 4/2/2015. Responses due by 5/1/2015. Replies due by 6/1/2015.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/17/2014) (rjm)
December 17, 2014 Filing 187 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph Fitapelli dated 12/17/14 re: Status Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Kathryn Shrader.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
August 25, 2014 Filing 186 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Sherrah Hill.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
April 14, 2014 Filing 185 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Heather Cocco.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
April 14, 2014 Filing 184 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Joanna Fanizza.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
April 11, 2014 Filing 183 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Mark Turner.(Gitig, Eric)
April 8, 2014 Filing 182 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #181 Letter, filed by Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Ahmed Chhab, Vincent Anthony Boreland. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/7/2014) (mro)
April 3, 2014 Filing 181 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Brian S. Schaffer dated April 3, 2014 re: Withdrawing Attorney. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Schaffer, Brian)
March 17, 2014 Filing 180 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Joel Bolt.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
February 21, 2014 Filing 179 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #178 Letter filed by Adrianne Benzion, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Ahmed Chhab, Vincent Anthony Boreland. ENDORSEMENT: Given the length of the proposed schedule, the parties should proceed on the assumption that no extensions will be granted. Further, the parties should provide the Court with an update on their progress every sixty (60) days. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/20/2014) (lmb)
February 18, 2014 Filing 178 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Joseph A. Fitapelli dated February 18, 2014 re: Discovery Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 6, 2014 Filing 177 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nekesha Jones-Poitier.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
February 3, 2014 Filing 176 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mohammad Alam.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 21, 2014 Filing 175 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rafael Velez, Melanie Waszewski, Myron Taylor, Thomas Burke.(Kimble, Andrew)
January 16, 2014 Filing 174 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Michael Chuba.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 15, 2014 Filing 173 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Issac Grier.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 9, 2014 Filing 172 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mario Garcia.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 9, 2014 Filing 171 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald dated 1/9/2014 re: Status Update. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 8, 2014 Filing 170 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by James Powell.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 7, 2014 Filing 169 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Debra Speer.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 7, 2014 Filing 168 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kristopher Klain.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 6, 2014 Filing 167 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Lee Martin, Timothy Pavlov, Christopher Aglio.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 2, 2014 Filing 166 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Michael Serrano.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 2, 2014 Filing 165 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Stephanie Henderson.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 30, 2013 Filing 164 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Karyn Hillenbrand, Farhad Barak, Julie Shoup, Jocelyn Houska.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 27, 2013 Filing 163 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by William Moran.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 27, 2013 Filing 162 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Liza Briggs.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 26, 2013 Filing 161 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Frank Jakab, Kelly McHale, Jennifer Rotert, Maria Russo.(Gitig, Eric)
December 23, 2013 Filing 160 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Lisa Dechiara, Brook Lemma, Kelly Purvis, Crystal Shelton.(Gitig, Eric)
December 20, 2013 Filing 159 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by David Margulies, Cedric Edwards, Pik Ki Wong, Brandon Schearing.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 19, 2013 Filing 158 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Caryn Brzozowski, Jeff Sydow, Donna E Jacobs, Keith Richards.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 18, 2013 Filing 157 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Carroll Walsh, Booker Marshall, Giscard Walters.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 18, 2013 Filing 156 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 8/21/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 18, 2013 Filing 155 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 8/21/2013 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 17, 2013 Filing 154 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Julie Humar, Paulyn Taganas Walcott, Jeffrey Young, Michael D Yanke.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 16, 2013 Filing 153 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Brinnan Chartier, Valerie Blooker, Danielle Schult, James Fenton, Lorissa Henry, Jason Dyals, Amanda Rosenbaum, Terence Fernandez, Bobak Ghadery, Eric Spoon, Joshua Froehlich, Shannon Hennen, Mark Connolly, Lena Romeo, Allen Floyd, Robert Terenzio, Mara MacNish, Anthony J Herrero, Jennifer Maier, Naima Hyppolite, Robert Greeley, Emmy Scelsi, Cedric Edwards, Chelstan Char, Robert Blaylock, Joseph W Uptergrove, Gregor Hoesser.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 13, 2013 Filing 152 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Holly Williams, Tony Sereno, Katie Kloos, Jessie Hurt, John Rieth, Tomas Forti, Jamil Teacher, Daniel Pena, Craig Maggio, Patrick Solano.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 12, 2013 Filing 151 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Chrisopher Easton, Katie Carelle, Cristina Lavora, Daniel Horan, Joseph Garcia, Gayle Lauer.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 11, 2013 Filing 150 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kurt M Fichte, Michael Schuerget, Jonathan Mackay, Matthew Walters, Rachel Perry, Brea Beaucage, Luis Santamaria, Lawrence Jr. Gill, Michelle Desourdy Coley, Jevene Uland, Lindsay Fisher, Yamill Rivera.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 10, 2013 Filing 149 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicole Bello.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 9, 2013 Filing 148 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Brian Wallace, Tammy Myers, David Levy, Annie LaRue, Frank Vlasak, Amie Nappi, Cesar Arteaga, Francis Elliott, Quintin Hilliard, Brett Thomas Beecher, Robert Pintar, Cherri Frankhouser, Richard Velez, Paige White.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 6, 2013 Filing 147 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jonathan Fiely, Eric Kearney, David Albright, Robert McNeily.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 5, 2013 Filing 146 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by John Wallace, Heather Paterno, Thomas Ford, Andrew Wayeneth, Alan Lopez, Guy Williams, Sean Bailoy, Jessica Water.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 5, 2013 Filing 145 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Alisa Phipon.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 4, 2013 Filing 144 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Darral Van Goethem, Nicole M Egan, Mark Nicholas Vitale, Marla Ciampa, Duy H. Nguyen, LaTesha D. Hudson.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 3, 2013 Filing 143 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Eric Johnson, Leo F. Tierney, Michele Peters, Vanessa Bacher, Jonathan Way, Anthony Salamone, Michael Boggs, Kathy de Sousa, Janis Giacalone, Maria Paradiso, Josephine Ogbenna, Joshua Caghey, John Holliman, Ann Donelson, Kevin Coles, Devero Roberto, Anton Christie, Kristi Disckinson, Kevin Elston, Vincent Whaley, Sarah Webster Pritt, Wendy Rood, Elyse Hanselman, Brian Hardin, Theresa Hart, Paul Gilmour, Leslie Haberacker, Jeah Korwitts, Daniel Parham, Varian Huddleston, Krystle Millikan, Patricia Lange, Mary Phalen, Heidi Orndoff.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 2, 2013 Filing 142 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Dawn Marie Blackford.(Schaffer, Brian)
November 27, 2013 Filing 141 STIPULATION: The Notice Period for individuals listed in the Notice List shall end on December 16, 2013. Defendants are to provide counsel for Plaintiffs a Supplemental Notice List consisting of the 65 individuals who were omitted from the Notice list, along with their work locations, dates of employment and last known addresses by November 29, 2013 (the "Supplemental Notice List"). Individuals on the Supplemental Notice List shall have sixty (60) days from service of the Notice to file 11 consent to become a party plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/26/2013) (ft)
November 27, 2013 Filing 140 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Robert Arief, Brenna Freifeld, Jason Bellin, Margaret Manaco, Alex Gonzalez, David Tubman.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 26, 2013 Filing 139 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jean Grundy, Jan Vitko, Sarah Jacobson, Jan Andrew Spurrier, Stacy Grab, Maisha Kiala, Brandon Lester.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 25, 2013 Filing 138 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Timothy Roy, Dale-Lillian Danek, Megan Young, Derrick Dedgepeth, Katie Carelle, Lisa McGuire, David Moore, Daniel Marcinkowski, Vlad Loboaba, Nora Poupard, Melanie Seelinger, Satish Bajaj, Anne Launte, Tracy Killiebrew, Anri Beleshi, Angela Towne-Varela, Erin Kenny, Derrick Tims, Lila Maycock, Robert McDonald, Bonnie Butler, Katarzyna Piesiewicz, Rebecca Gerace, Jermine Pelkey, Sandra Schretther, Charles Bowling, Michael Cappiello, Jessica Hobson, Jessica Kenny, Javler Vazquez, Margaret Mathews, Luis Alanis, Elliot Hardy, Michael Garrison, G. David Trosko.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 22, 2013 Filing 137 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Elizabeth Driscoll.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 22, 2013 Filing 136 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jason Williams, Thomas Salvatore, Mahlait Muluager, Maria Gonzalez, Francine Castro, Billie Joe Leach, Kenneth Glass, Lindsey Glosniak, Yukchon Wai, Jason Culpepper, Nicole Paul, Kevin Montgomery.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 21, 2013 Filing 135 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Anthony Sinesi, Michael Barker, Hannah Mathews, Michele Ardito, Ronald Draine, Adam Whitield, Albert Aron Van Sciver, Beth Verstraete, Sarah Prestidge, Sandra Abrams, Linnett Rieger, Chrissy Von Philp.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 20, 2013 Filing 134 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Thomas McDonald, Charles Hodgins, Teri Kirkland, Jose Santiago, Erica Steiger, Sherean Southerland.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 19, 2013 Filing 133 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Marcel Templet.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 19, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE of withdrawal of Plaintiff consent form. Document filed by Melanie Sessa. (Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 18, 2013 Filing 131 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jennifer Kremer, Edward Franklin, Mark McGuire, Shelly Beatrice, Alex Renteria, Thomas Yob, Monsur Rahman, Larel Anderson, John Poulos, Matthew Loch, Robert Ballard, Matthew Cornett, Laren McLaughlin, Sean Dyer, Michael Garrison.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 15, 2013 Filing 130 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kateri Jones, James Connelly, Sara Romig, Chris Thompson, Kristin Russell, Cheri Castaldo, Leobardo Martinez, Angela Pugh, Patricia Thompson, Timothy Bahr, Steven Oliver.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 14, 2013 Filing 129 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ralph Masci, Jose G. Ortiz, Samantha Bailey.(Schaffer, Brian)
November 13, 2013 Filing 128 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by James Baker.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 12, 2013 Filing 127 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kristy Tessmar, Mark Curtis Stein, Allison Brown, John Beidler, James Bautch, Ann Donelson, Ashley Kalkanian, Mary Lee Holland, Tim Manley, John Dove, Christina Matthews, Robert Serra.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 11, 2013 Filing 126 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ashley Pamplin.(Mazzaferro, Frank) Modified on 11/19/2013 (db).
November 8, 2013 Filing 125 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Lance Vernon, Catherine Flaherty, Dana Giles, Mindy Lee Parody, Ariella Beyer, Angel Pacheco, Daniel Fosha, Angela Beaty, Christopher Cass, Naomi Easterling, Dylan Forsyth, Musa Yasin.(Schaffer, Brian)
November 7, 2013 Filing 122 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Shashin Thakkar, Jennifer Howe, Justin Alvarez, Campbell Yvette, Debra Berry, Bianca Dever, Neal Baylin, Angela Swan, Joseph Walker.(Schaffer, Brian)
November 6, 2013 Filing 121 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by James Milbune, Kristin Matousek, Thomas Ford, Donna Jo Thorndale, Raju Maity.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 5, 2013 Filing 120 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Matthew Harrington.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 5, 2013 Filing 119 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Stephanie Wamsley, Michael Gay, Carol Salinas, Eric Janzen, Jason Degraff, Kanita Lorsomran, Allison Labovitz, Celia Hough, Terrance Wilson.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 4, 2013 Filing 118 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Thomas McCure, Dan Rossi, Stephen Hunt, Lisa White, Kimberly Gattshall, John Hogue, Stephanie Markham, Andrew Robinson, Lisa Helm, River Day, Neil Youngblood, Mark McCready, Lisa Fernandez, Ronald Doyle, Kolette Kidman.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 1, 2013 Filing 117 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Summer Harrington.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
November 1, 2013 Filing 116 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Musa Yasin, Megan Foreshay, Kelly Smith, Courtney Cook, Jared Blum, Dede Gashaj, Garrett Mark, Monica Barbie, Peter Donahue, John Riccardella, Hanna Diro, Stacy Garb, John Powell.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 31, 2013 Filing 115 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by James Cressman, Jessica Scotten, Susan Spinell, Amy Russell, Jeffrey Allen, Mariah Charisell, Bruce Thompson, Mallory Rossi, Tara Tyler, Kathleen Wazny, Ashley Finch, Dinesh Marappuli, Mojan Kianchehr, Todd Wheatman, Kristen Dillon, Diego Canelo, Jolene Monteilh, Michael Ramos, Raul Dimitru.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 30, 2013 Filing 114 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jane Simon, Miguel Flores, Ryan Harp.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 29, 2013 Filing 113 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mark Stavole, Cynthia Bell, William Lazzeri, Jennifer Longwell, Joseph Sheridan, Michael Zeni, Falon Morales, Russell Beverstein, Bonilla Luis, Philip Ryu Baker.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 28, 2013 Filing 112 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Peter Hatton, Keith Stone, Christine Hall, Victoria Krajewski, Lucy Landeg, Steve Gonzalez, William Potts, Sara Flanagan, Maria Naclerio, Lori Elliott, Tamas Bakoczy, Susan Garesche, Carmen Ventula, Christopher McCoy, Anjan Sarma, Eva Rego, Tara Nickerson-Lopes, Roberts Lopes, Courtney Straga, John Maleitzke, Lane Bowen, Ken Handler, Stacey Blaisdell, Robert Roberts, Timothy Arpin, Dan Gobush, David Showley, David Mena, Jose Avila, Rocco Notaro, Jeff Horwath, Patrick Rankin, Elizabeth Pine, Manuel Herezi, Charity Ohlund, Kimberly Kratky, Teri Bonilla, David Pierce-Feith, Larry Rorabaugh, Richard Yuruckso, Charles Henry, Lynnetara Sweeney, Kai Wharton, Ryan Dominguez, Carla Zickmund, Toni Johnson, Joseph Bridge, Kane Ramsey, Anthony Feliz, Sara Flanigan, Josh Fallon, John Cohan, Scott Bottcher, John Erlauer, Louis Arturi, Adam Smith.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 27, 2013 Filing 111 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Chau Nguyen.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 25, 2013 Filing 110 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by John Ethridge, Krista Perry, Sam Coffland, Elizabeth Stroup, Bobbie Martino, Kyree Miller, Chantel Ferrere, Daniel Elkins, Faouzi Gharbi, Andrew Mcmanaman, Luis Zapata, Lori Cameron, Charles Martin, Roger Marais, Dan Antonelli, Baldo Caro, Steven Trundell, Nicole Thompson, Christen Mcauliffe, Paul Hayward, Charles Johnson, Jennifer Laguaradia, Michael Raiborn, Melanie Sessa, John Veet, Matthew Bell, Elisabeth Spitz, David Helfrich, Christina Carter.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 24, 2013 Filing 109 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Juan Ventura.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 24, 2013 Filing 108 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Neil Mausteller, Robin Jankins, Lawrence Yee, Sandra Defino, Christopher Peddicord, Andrew Hartsman.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 23, 2013 Filing 107 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Megan Shagam, Alan Neiderman, Paul Taylor, Meghan Card, Rebeckah Graham, Daniel Burnett, Thomas Paul, John Stark.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 22, 2013 Filing 106 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Christopher Dilg, Jennifer Waite, Brendan Clark, James Imbriano.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 21, 2013 Filing 105 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Ryan Fender, Scott Mealus.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 15, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 103 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ka)
October 15, 2013 Filing 104 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Britt Wicklund.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 3, 2013 Filing 124 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #101 Order on Motion to Certify Class. (sj)
October 3, 2013 Filing 123 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #101 Order on Motion to Certify Class. (sj)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 CORRECTING MEMORANDUM: re: #101 Order on Motion to Certify Class In the Memorandum & Order in this case, issued on September 19, 2013, the date on Page 43, Line 2, should read November 17, 2008, not November 18, 2007.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/26/2013) (ama)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #71 Motion to Certify Class. The motion (dkt. no. 71) is granted in part and denied in part. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/19/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft)
August 21, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Oral Argument held on 8/21/2013 re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA. filed by Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Ahmed Chhab, Vincent Anthony Boreland. (sc)
August 20, 2013 Filing 100 REPLY re: #99 Notice (Other). Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Benson, Craig)
August 14, 2013 Filing 99 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #72 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Mazzaferro, Frank)
August 8, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of of Supplemental Authority in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Collective Action Certification. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Benson, Craig)
July 17, 2013 Filing 97 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kristin Cannon.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
July 17, 2013 Filing 96 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Patricia Maccarone.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Craig R. Benson dated 6/28/2013 re: TCG respectfully requests that, if the Court is inclined to entertain Plaintiffs' latest supplemental briefing, TCG be permitted to file its own Notice of Supplemental Authority, summarizing all of the new case authority issued since TCG filed its opposition papers that established that this case is wholly unsuitable for collective action certification. ENDORSEMENT: The defendant is granted leave to submit a five page supplemental memorandum. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi R. Buchwald on 7/09/2013) (ama) Modified on 7/17/2013 (ama).
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Oral argument on the pending motion for conditional class certification shall be held on August 21, 2013, at 10:30 A.M. at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. Oral Argument set for 8/21/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 21A at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/9/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft)
June 28, 2013 Filing 93 REPLY re: #92 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Benson, Craig)
June 18, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of supplemental authority in further support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Collective Action Certification re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
May 14, 2013 Filing 91 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from N. Marley Mercado dated 5/13/2013 re: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, I respectfully request leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in the above referenced action. The reason for my request is that I am leaving the law firm of Berke-Weiss & Pechman LLP, effective May 15, 2013. The plaintiffs will continue to be represented by counsel from Fitapelli & Schaffer, LLP, Joseph & Kirschenbaum LLP, and Berke-Weiss & Pechman LLP. ENDORSEMENT: The application of N. Marley Mercado to withdraw as counsel is granted. Attorney Nahir Marely Mercado terminated. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/14/2013) (ft)
March 22, 2013 Filing 90 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Shanthi V. Gaur dated 3/18/2013 re: Shanthi V. Gaur respectfully request leave to withdraw as counsel for the defendants in this action. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/21/2013) (sac)
March 22, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew James Gagnon on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Gagnon, Matthew)
March 22, 2013 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #90 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sac)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Nick D. Campanario dated 2/28/2013 re: I write to respectfully request leave to withdraw from the action on the grounds that I will be ending my association with Seyfarth Shaw LLP effective March 1, 2013. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/6/2013) (rdz)
March 1, 2013 Filing 87 REPLY re: #86 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendant's Reply to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Benson, Craig)
February 12, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Collective Action Certification re: #72 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Rebecca Ledwell, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 11, 2013 Filing 85 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Francoise Tomaszewski.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
January 10, 2013 Filing 84 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Joseph A. Fitapelli in Support re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 10, 2013 Filing 83 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 10, 2013 Filing 82 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rafael Velez.(Mazzaferro, Frank)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #77 Application for the Court to Request Counsel. The motion of Nick D. Campanario to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case is granted. Applicant have requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Darden Restaurants, Inc. GMRI Inc., Capital Grille Holdings, Inc, d/b/a/ The Capital Grille, and RARE Hospitality International Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governingdisciplineof attorneys.(Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/20/2012) (ago)
December 17, 2012 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Benson, Craig)
December 17, 2012 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Craig R. Benson in Opposition re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33(A), #34 Exhibit 33(B), #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74)(Benson, Craig)
December 17, 2012 Filing 78 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #80) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Benson, Craig) Modified on 12/18/2012 (ldi).
December 7, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION for Nick D. Campanario to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8043050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing for Nick D. Campanario, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 2 - Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Companario, Nick) Modified on 12/7/2012 (bcu). Modified on 12/7/2012 (bcu).
December 7, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Nick D. Campanario to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8043050. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
December 4, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Maatman, Gerald)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from George B. Pauta and Joseph Fitapelli dated 11/16/12 re: Counsel writes to request that defendants' opposition to plaintiffs motion for conditional certification be due by 12/17/12 and plaintiffs' reply by 1/10/13. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA :( Responses due by 12/17/2012, Replies due by 1/10/2013.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 11/20/2012) (mro)
October 26, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Joseph Mazzaferro on behalf of Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader (Mazzaferro, Frank)
October 25, 2012 Filing 73 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Fitapelli in Support re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Errata RR, #45 Errata SS, #46 Exhibit TT)(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 25, 2012 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA.. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 25, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to the FLSA. Document filed by Adrianne Benzion, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Kathryn Shrader. Responses due by 11/26/2012 Return Date set for 12/6/2012 at 05:00 PM.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 25, 2012 Filing 70 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Melanie Waszewski.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
October 10, 2012 Filing 69 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jamaal Holmes.(Schaffer, Brian)
September 17, 2012 Filing 68 TOLLING AGREEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel that: 1. The statute of limitations period for alleged violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. (FLSA"), was previously tolled for all putative opt-in plaintiffs between June 14, 2012 and August 14, 2012; 2. The statute of limitations period for alleged violations of the Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201 et seq. ("FLSA"), is further tolled for all putative opt-in plaintiffs between August 15, 2012 and September 13, 2012; 3. In the event Defendants request additional time to produce documents or witnesses, the statute of limitations for FLSA claims for all putative opt-in plaintiffs shall be tolled an additional day for each day requested beyond September 28, 2012; and 4. Plaintiffs will file a 216(b) motion for conditional certification no earlier than September 28, 2012. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 9/14/2012) (ft) Modified on 9/20/2012 (ft).
August 21, 2012 Filing 67 MEMO ENDORSED ON NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE: granting #51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Attorney Gary David Shapiro terminated. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/21/2012) (ja)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 FRE 502(D) AND (E) CLAWBACK STIPULATION AND QRDER: Accordingly, the parties hereby STIPULATE, and the Court hereby ORDERS pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 502(d) and (e), regarding the production of documents in the manner that is set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/13/2012) (pl)
August 7, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Telephone Conference held on 8/7/2012. (lmb)
August 7, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Elyse Moss on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Moss, Sarah)
August 7, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Elyse Schwartzreich on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Schwartzreich, Lauren)
August 6, 2012 Filing 63 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Nicholas Ballabon.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING: CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/11/2012) (lmb)
June 26, 2012 Filing 61 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Stephen Tandy.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
June 26, 2012 Payment of Fee Received: Money Order received on 06/20/2012 in the amount of $35.00. (rdz)
June 15, 2012 Filing 60 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Kevin Kearney.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #57 Motion for Shanthi V. Gaur to Appear Pro Hac Vice for all purposes as counsel for Darden Restaurants, Inc.. GMRI, Inc., Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. d/b/a The Capital Grille, and Rare Hospitality International, Inc. in the above-entitled action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/5/2012) (pl)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #56 Motion for John A. Ybarra to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/5/2012) (pl)
June 5, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 05/25/2012, Receipt Number 1039352. (jd)
June 5, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 05/25/2012, Receipt Number 1039351. (jd)
May 25, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION for Shanthi V. Gaur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.(pgu)
May 25, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION for John A. Ybarra to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc.(pgu)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Craig R. Benson dated 5/17/2012 re: counsel for Defendants writes that the parties have conferred and agreed that Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification will be filed on or after August 14, 2012. Defendants will have 30 days to respond to the motion and Plaintiffs will have 10 days to submit a reply. Defendants further agree to toll the statute of limitations for a total of 60 days during the period between June 14th and August 14th. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., ( Motions due by 8/14/2012.) (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/21/2012) (pl)
April 30, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Telephone Conference held on 4/30/2012. (jfe)
April 30, 2012 Filing 54 ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc..(Benson, Craig)
April 10, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2012. (rjm)
April 10, 2012 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Billy Pauta on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Pauta, George)
April 6, 2012 Filing 52 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Melanie Coit.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
April 5, 2012 Filing 51 MOTION for Gary D. Shapiro to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc..(Benson, Craig)
March 22, 2012 Filing 50 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by David Casey.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
March 12, 2012 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by DaJuan White, Jeffrey Kennedy, Crystal Beng, Virginia Alleyne, Maglio Kimberly, Ahmed Chhab, Neda Ebrahimi, John Lucero, Rebecca Ledwell, Amy Mitchell, George Jeansonne, Peter Gorica, Kathryn Shrader, Lance Feldhun, Levon Samoniantz, Timothy Romero, Sean Woolf, Joanna Tuchinski, Cecili Simmons, Paul Parrott, Adrianne Benzion, Amy Smith, John Yanek, Merrily Guglielmo, Laura Yount, Michael Rella, Thomas Warren, Tasiya Oliver, Marci Boyce, Donna Nicholson, Mark Hunter Davis, Erik Anderson, Daniel Burns, Michael Kilpatrick, Lyacine Jesse Bakkar, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Garcia Gerard, Haley Duke. (Fitapelli, Joseph)
March 9, 2012 Filing 48 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Merrily Guglielmo.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
March 5, 2012 Filing 46 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Cecili Simmons.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
March 5, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew David Kadushin on behalf of Ahmed Chhab (Kadushin, Matthew)
March 5, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum on behalf of Ahmed Chhab (Kirschenbaum, Daniel)
March 1, 2012 Filing 47 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc..Document filed by Ahmed Chhab, Lance Feldhun, Michael Rella, Vincent Anthony Boreland, Kathryn Shrader, Adrianne Benzion. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Ahmed Chhab.(mro)
March 1, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nahir Marely Mercado on behalf of Virginia Alleyne, Erik Anderson, Lyacine Jesse Bakkar, Crystal Beng, Marci Boyce, Daniel Burns, Ahmed Chhab, Mark Hunter Davis, Haley Duke, Neda Ebrahimi, Garcia Gerard, Peter Gorica, George Jeansonne, Jeffrey Kennedy, Michael Kilpatrick, Maglio Kimberly, Rebecca Ledwell, John Lucero, Amy Mitchell, Donna Nicholson, Tasiya Oliver, Paul Parrott, Timothy Romero, Levon Samoniantz, Amy Smith, Joanna Tuchinski, Thomas Warren, DaJuan White, Sean Woolf, John Yanek, Laura Yount (Mercado, Nahir)
March 1, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Louis Pechman on behalf of Virginia Alleyne, Erik Anderson, Lyacine Jesse Bakkar, Crystal Beng, Marci Boyce, Daniel Burns, Ahmed Chhab, Mark Hunter Davis, Haley Duke, Neda Ebrahimi, Garcia Gerard, Peter Gorica, George Jeansonne, Jeffrey Kennedy, Michael Kilpatrick, Maglio Kimberly, Rebecca Ledwell, John Lucero, Amy Mitchell, Donna Nicholson, Tasiya Oliver, Paul Parrott, Timothy Romero, Levon Samoniantz, Amy Smith, Joanna Tuchinski, Thomas Warren, DaJuan White, Sean Woolf, John Yanek, Laura Yount (Pechman, Louis)
March 1, 2012 Filing 41 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Haley Duke.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
March 1, 2012 Filing 40 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Virginia Alleyne.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 22, 2012 Filing 39 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Amy Mitchell.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 13, 2012 Filing 38 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Laura Yount.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 7, 2012 Filing 37 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Daniel Burns.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 7, 2012 Filing 36 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Tasiya Oliver.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 2, 2012 Filing 35 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Sean Woolf.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 2, 2012 Filing 34 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Neda Ebrahimi.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SECOND STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. answer due 3/1/2012; Darden Restaurants, Inc. answer due 3/1/2012; GMRI, Inc. answer due 3/1/2012; Rare Hospitality International, Inc. answer due 3/1/2012. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/1/2012) (cd)
February 1, 2012 Filing 32 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Peter Gorica.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 26, 2012 Filing 31 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Joanna Tuchinski.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 20, 2012 Filing 30 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Thomas Warren.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 19, 2012 Filing 29 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Paul Parrott.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 19, 2012 Filing 28 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Crystal Beng.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 18, 2012 Filing 27 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Mark Hunter Davis.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 17, 2012 Filing 26 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Rebecca Ledwell.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 17, 2012 Filing 25 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by John Yanek.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 12, 2012 Filing 24 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Maglio Kimberly.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 11, 2012 Filing 23 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Lyacine Jesse Bakkar.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 9, 2012 Filing 22 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Donna Nicholson.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 6, 2012 Filing 21 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Jeffrey Kennedy.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 6, 2012 Filing 20 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Michael Kilpatrick.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 6, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph A. Fitapelli to RE-FILE Document #19 Consent to Sue. Use the event type Consent to become Party Plaintiff found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
January 5, 2012 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE FLSA. Document filed by Michael Kilpatrick.(Fitapelli, Joseph) Modified on 1/6/2012 (ka).
January 3, 2012 Filing 18 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Amy Smith.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
January 3, 2012 Filing 17 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Garcia Gerard.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 30, 2011 Filing 16 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Timothy Romero.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 22, 2011 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc..(Benson, Craig)
December 22, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary David Shapiro on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Shapiro, Gary)
December 22, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Robert Benson on behalf of Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Benson, Craig)
December 22, 2011 Filing 12 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Erik Anderson.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. answer due 1/31/2012; Darden Restaurants, Inc. answer due 1/31/2012; GMRI, Inc. answer due 1/31/2012; Rare Hospitality International, Inc. answer due 1/31/2012. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/20/2011) (djc)
December 19, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by John Lucero.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 Filing 9 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by George Jeansonne.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 Filing 8 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Marci Boyce.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 12, 2011 Filing 7 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by DaJuan White.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
December 9, 2011 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Rare Hospitality International, Inc. served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Service was accepted by Jill Dickstein. Document filed by Ahmed Chhab; Levon Samoniantz. (Schaffer, Brian)
December 9, 2011 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. GMRI, Inc. served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Service was accepted by Jill Dickstein. Document filed by Ahmed Chhab; Levon Samoniantz. (Schaffer, Brian)
December 9, 2011 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Darden Restaurants, Inc. served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Service was accepted by Jill Dickstein. Document filed by Ahmed Chhab; Levon Samoniantz. (Schaffer, Brian)
December 9, 2011 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. served on 11/28/2011, answer due 12/19/2011. Service was accepted by Jill Dickstein. Document filed by Ahmed Chhab; Levon Samoniantz. (Schaffer, Brian)
December 8, 2011 Filing 2 CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Levon Samoniantz.(Fitapelli, Joseph)
November 17, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 22274)Document filed by Ahmed Chhab.(ama)
November 17, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. (ama)
November 17, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
November 17, 2011 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chhab v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Chhab
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Levon Samoniantz
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DaJuan White
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marci Boyce
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jeansonne
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lucero
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Anderson
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Romero
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garcia Gerard
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Smith
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kilpatrick
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Kennedy
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Nicholson
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyacine Jesse Bakkar
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maglio Kimberly
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Yanek
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Ledwell
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hunter Davis
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Beng
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Parrott
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Warren
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Tuchinski
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Gorica
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neda Ebrahimi
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Woolf
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasiya Oliver
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Burns
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Yount
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Mitchell
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Alleyne
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haley Duke
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecili Simmons
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Feldhun
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rella
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Anthony Boreland
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Shrader
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne Benzion
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Louis Pechman
Represented By: Nahir Marely Mercado
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Represented By: Daniel Maimon Kirschenbaum
Represented By: Eric Joshua Gitig
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Matthew David Kadushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrily Guglielmo
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Casey
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Coit
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kearney
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Tandy
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ballabon
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal Holmes
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Waszewski
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Represented By: Andrew Paul Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Velez
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Andrew Paul Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francoise Tomaszewski
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Maccarone
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Cannon
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dmytrtk
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Wicklund
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Fender
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mealus
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dilg
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Waite
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Clark
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Imbriano
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Shagam
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Neiderman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Taylor
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Card
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebeckah Graham
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Burnett
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Paul
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stark
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Mausteller
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Jankins
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Yee
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Defino
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Peddicord
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hartsman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ventura
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ethridge
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krista Perry
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Coffland
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stroup
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Martino
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyree Miller
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel Ferrere
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Elkins
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faouzi Gharbi
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Mcmanaman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Zapata
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Cameron
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Martin
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Marais
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Antonelli
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baldo Caro
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trundell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Thompson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Mcauliffe
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hayward
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Laguaradia
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Raiborn
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Sessa
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Veet
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Spitz
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Helfrich
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Carter
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chau Nguyen
Represented By: Joseph A. Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Hatton
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Stone
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Hall
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Krajewski
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Landeg
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Gonzalez
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Potts
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Flanagan
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Naclerio
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Elliott
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamas Bakoczy
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Garesche
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Ventula
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McCoy
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjan Sarma
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Rego
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Nickerson-Lopes
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberts Lopes
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Straga
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Maleitzke
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Bowen
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Handler
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Blaisdell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Roberts
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Arpin
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Gobush
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Showley
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mena
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Avila
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocco Notaro
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Horwath
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Rankin
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Pine
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Herezi
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Ohlund
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kratky
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri Bonilla
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pierce-Feith
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Rorabaugh
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Yuruckso
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Henry
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnetara Sweeney
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kai Wharton
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Dominguez
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Zickmund
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Johnson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bridge
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kane Ramsey
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Feliz
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Flanigan
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Fallon
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cohan
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bottcher
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Erlauer
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Arturi
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Smith
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stavole
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Bell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lazzeri
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Longwell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sheridan
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zeni
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falon Morales
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Beverstein
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonilla Luis
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Ryu Baker
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Simon
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Flores
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Harp
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cressman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Scotten
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Spinell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Russell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Allen
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Charisell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Thompson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Rossi
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Tyler
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wazny
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Finch
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinesh Marappuli
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mojan Kianchehr
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Wheatman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Dillon
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diego Canelo
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolene Monteilh
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ramos
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Dimitru
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Musa Yasin
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Represented By: Brian Scott Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Foreshay
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Smith
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Cook
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Blum
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dede Gashaj
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett Mark
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Barbie
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Donahue
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Riccardella
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Diro
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Garb
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Powell
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Harrington
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas McCure
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Rossi
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hunt
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa White
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gattshall
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hogue
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Markham
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Robinson
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Helm
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Day
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Youngblood
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark McCready
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Fernandez
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Doyle
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolette Kidman
Represented By: Frank Joseph Mazzaferro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [