Goldman v. Breitbart News Network LLC et al. Featured Case

Plaintiff Justin Goldman sued Defendants Breitbart News Network, LLC, Heavy, Inc., Time, Inc., Yahoo, Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, and New England Sports Network, Inc. for copyright infringement for embedding a Tweet that contained Plaintiff's copyrighted photo of Tom Brady.

Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Defendant: Breitbart News Network LLC, Heavy, Inc., Time Inc., Yahoo, Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC and New England Sports Network, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv03144
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Katherine B. Forrest
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2018 170 Featured Case ORDER: On February 15, 2018, the Court granted partial summary judgment to the plaintiff. The Court assumes that discovery on the remaining issues will now proceed according to the schedule previously laid out in ECF No. 109. Additionally, the Court sets a telephonic status conference for Friday, April 13, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. The parties shall call Chambers (212-805-0276) from one line at that time. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/16/2018) (mml)
February 15, 2018 169 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Yahoo, Inc. For the reasons stated above, defendants' motion for partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Court GRANTS partial Summary Judgment to the plaintiff. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 119. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/15/2018) (mml)
February 13, 2018 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 1/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 13, 2018 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 1/16/2018 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 31, 2018 166 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Meredith Corporation for Time Inc.. Document filed by Time Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
January 22, 2018 165 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Penchina on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc.. New Address: Ballard Spahr LLP, 1675 Broadway, 19th Floor, New York, NY, US 10019-5820, 212-850-6109. (Penchina, Robert)
January 17, 2018 164 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to ken@norwickschad.com (Copy) cooper@norwickschad.comfrom Justin Goldman dated 1/13/2018 re: I state the following under penalty of perjury: When I posted my Tom Brady photo to Snapchat, I did so through Snapchat's "My Story" option. It was and is my understanding that "My Story" postings can only be seen by the specific people I have authorized in advance to see those postings. I can't say now how many people were authorized by me to see my 'My Story" postings at that time, but I can say that that number does not exceed 90, and could well have been fewer. I had no intention of making the Photo available to anyone else beyond those authorized to see my "My Story" postings and I do not believe I did so. When I posted the Photo to Snapchat, I had a choice to post it either to "My Story," which is limited to those I authorize to see it, or to "Our Story," which would be accessible to the public at large, without restriction. I deliberately chose the "My Story" option, because I did not want the general public to have access to it. If I did, I would have posted it to a different platform, such as Twitter, or Facebook or lnstagram, where it could have been seen without restriction. I did not want that and did not do that. And I did not authorize any of the people who did have access to my "My Story" posting to share it elsewhere. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered. Post to docket. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/16/2018) (js)
January 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Oral Argument held on 1/16/2018 re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. filed by Yahoo, Inc. (jp)
January 16, 2018 163 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keara A. Bergin on behalf of New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Bergin, Keara)
January 12, 2018 162 Featured Case ORDER: As previously scheduled, Oral Argument in this matter shall be held on Tuesday, January 16, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. However, while the Court had originally informed the parties that each side with have ninety minutes allocated, the Court must reduce that time to sixty minutes per side. ( Oral Argument set for 1/16/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 1/12/2018) (js)
December 20, 2017 161 Featured Case ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' supplemental briefing, the Court believes that oral argument will be useful to resolution of this motion. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, January 16, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. The Court will allot ninety minutes to each side. SO ORDERED., ( Oral Argument set for 1/16/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/20/2017) (ama)
December 18, 2017 160 RESPONSE to Motion re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. . Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
December 18, 2017 159 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. in Response to Court's Order of 12/1/17. Document filed by Time Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
December 1, 2017 158 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' submissions. Based on the current record, it does not appear that there are triable issues of fact on the question of copyright liability (or non-liability) with regard to "embedding." The trial date is therefore adjourned as a "trial," but the parties should hold the first day of the allotted time (Tuesday, January 16, 2018) for oral argument. The Court will decide at a later date whether oral argument is necessary. With that said, the Court is not convinced in need resolve that question in order to resolve the claims herein. Given the submissions, it is clear that the defendants are several layers down from the plaintiff: an initial known friend posted the content at issue, another known person re-posted it on a site (Reddit). From there, it was picked up and tweeted by "John/Jane Doe." When John/Jane Doe used Twitter to post the work, he/she did so pursuant to Twitter's terms of service. Defendants submitted the Twitter terms of service as part of their statement of undisputed facts. (ECF No. 120.) Plaintiff did not dispute the terms of service. Those terms provide that the user-that is, the individual who posts the tweet with content-conveys to Twitter a non-exclusive license to use, display, and broadcast the work, and to sublicense others to do the same. Based on these terms of service, it appears to the Court that the defendants' position is derivative of Twitter's; that is, if Twitter's connection to the content was pursuant to an actual or implied license, then so is the defendants'. Thus the Court would like additional briefing, as further set forth herein. Each side should submit their views on the above simultaneously not later than December 18, 2017, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 12/1/2017) (ap)
November 30, 2017 157 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kenneth P. Norwick dated November 29, 2017 re: recent decision. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 decision)(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 29, 2017 156 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
November 29, 2017 155 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. [Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
November 17, 2017 154 Featured Case ORDER: granting 153 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. So Ordered. Replies due by 11/29/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 11/17/2017) (ap)
November 16, 2017 153 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Leave to File 15-page Reply addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Eric J. Feder dated 11/16/2017. Document filed by Time Inc..(Feder, Eric)
November 6, 2017 152 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
November 6, 2017 151 DECLARATION of Ryan LaCorte in Opposition re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
November 6, 2017 150 AFFIRMATION of Kenneth P. Norwick in Opposition re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 6, 2017 149 DECLARATION of Justin Goldman in Opposition re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Norwick, Kenneth)
November 6, 2017 148 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. . Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 23, 2017 147 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 145 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered: The Court accepts the filing. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/20/2017) (mro)
October 20, 2017 146 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 143 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Ordered. The Court accepts the filing. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/20/2017) (ras)
October 19, 2017 145 CONSENT MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by American Society of Media Photographers, Digital Media Licensing Association, Getty Images (US) Inc., National Press Photographers Association, North American Nature Photography Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Doroshow, Kenneth)
October 19, 2017 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Lewinn Doroshow on behalf of Getty Images (US) Inc., American Society of Media Photographers, Digital Media Licensing Association, National Press Photographers Association, North American Nature Photography Association. (Doroshow, Kenneth)
October 19, 2017 143 CONSENT MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #1 - Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoltz, Mitchell)
October 19, 2017 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell L. Stoltz on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge. (Stoltz, Mitchell)
October 13, 2017 141 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i): It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the attorneys for plaintiff and for defendant Herald Mediqa, Inc., that this action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice as against the defendant only, with each party to bear its own costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/13/2017) (js)
October 12, 2017 140 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Herald Media, Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 12, 2017 139 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kenneth P. Norwick dated October 12, 2017 re: dismissal. Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 6, 2017 138 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the attorneys for Plaintiff and for defendant Vox Media, Inc., that this action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice as against that defendant only, with each party to bear its own costs. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/6/2017) (js)
October 6, 2017 137 DECLARATION of Justin Edmond in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Edmond Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Edmond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Edmond Declaration)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
October 6, 2017 136 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Vox Media, Inc. and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
October 5, 2017 135 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 137 Declaration) - DECLARATION of Justin Edmond in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Edmond Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Edmond Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Edmond Declaration)(Lipchitz, Joseph) Modified on 10/6/2017 (db).
October 5, 2017 134 DECLARATION of Brian Wallace in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - September 28, 2017 screen capture of Yahoo Sports Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 - July 8, 2016 screen capture of source code)(Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 133 DECLARATION of Simon Assaad in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Heavy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Printout of Article as of 10.5.17, # 2 Exhibit B - Printout of source code for Article captured on Archive.org on 7.8.16, # 3 Exhibit C - Printout of Sneaker Reporter Tweet on 10.5.17, # 4 Exhibit D - Printout of Article captured on Archive.org on 7.8.16)(Lebowitz, Marc)
October 5, 2017 132 DECLARATION of Anthony Vitale in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Vitale Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Vitale Declaration)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
October 5, 2017 131 DECLARATION of Anthony Bonfiglio in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Stanley, Lawrence)
October 5, 2017 130 DECLARATION of Aaron Nobel in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Heavy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Printout of Article from 10.5.17, # 2 Exhibit B - Printout of Article on Archive.org captured on 7.8.16, # 3 Exhibit C - Printout of email string between Nobel and Plaintiff's counsel on 7.15.16)(Lebowitz, Marc)
October 5, 2017 129 DECLARATION of Kaitlyn K. Johnston in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stanley, Lawrence)
October 5, 2017 128 DECLARATION of Michael R. Hall in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit July 2, 2016 NESN Article, # 2 Exhibit NESN Article Source Code)(Kramarsky, Stephen)
October 5, 2017 127 DECLARATION of Jason Lisk in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Penchina, Robert)
October 5, 2017 126 DECLARATION of Mark Hiland in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Penchina, Robert)
October 5, 2017 125 DECLARATION of Brad Weiss in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Time Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
October 5, 2017 124 DECLARATION of Matthew Blake in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Time Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" of Matthew Blake's Declaration, # 2 Exhibit "B" of Matthew Blake's Declaration)(Koonce, Lacy)
October 5, 2017 123 DECLARATION of Frank Schwab in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Yahoo Sports Article as of October 3, 2017)(Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 122 DECLARATION of Lacy H. Koonce, III in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Time Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "1" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 2 Exhibit "2" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit "3" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit "4" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit "5" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 6 Exhibit "6" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 7 Exhibit "7" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 8 Exhibit "8" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 9 Exhibit "9" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 10 Exhibit "10" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 11 Exhibit "11" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration)(Koonce, Lacy)
October 5, 2017 121 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. [Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 120 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 119 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment -- Defendants' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. Responses due by 11/6/2017(Lane, Thomas)
October 5, 2017 118 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Penchina on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc.. New Address: Ballard Spahr LLP, 919 Third Avenue, 37th Floor, New York, NY, United States 10022, (212) 850-6109. (Penchina, Robert)
October 4, 2017 117 Featured Case ORDER. The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's letter regarding the evidentiary hearing set for October 25, 2017 and is surprised that he has asked defendant Herald to "produce one or more witnesses and documents concerning...a) the interrelationships and finances of the three entities and b) the provenance of the 'embedded' Photo." (ECF No. 116.) This is not the time to conduct additional discovery or to delve into the merits. Plaintiff bears the burden of proof on this jurisdictional question and needs to subpoena specific witnesses or offer documents in his possession. We have already had jurisdictional discovery. To be clear, defendant Herald is neither required to produce unnamed witnesses or additional documents nor obliged to do anything relating to the "provenance" of the photo at this hearing. Herald does not bear the burden of proof with regards to personal jurisdiction in this case, and the time for additional jurisdictional discovery has passed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/4/2017) (rjm).
October 3, 2017 116 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kenneth P. Norwick dated October 3, 2017 re: evidentiary hearing. Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
September 29, 2017 115 Featured Case ORDER: The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's submission in opposition to defendant Herald Media, Inc.'s Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss. In order to weigh the evidence, the Court shall hold an evidentiary hearing on this motion. See Landoil Resources Corp. v. Alexander & Alexander Servs., Inc., 918 F.2d 1039, 1043 (2d Cir. 1990). The parties may waive the hearing and allow the Court to make findings-and-weigh the evidence-based on the existing record. The parties shall inform the Court whether they intend to proceed with the evidentiary hearing not later than October 6, 2017. An evidentiary hearing is set for Wednesday, October 25, 2017 at 12:00 PM. (Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/25/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/29/2017) (ap)
September 27, 2017 114 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/7/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
September 27, 2017 113 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/7/2017 before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017.(Siwik, Christine)
September 26, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/6/2017 Replies due by 11/21/2017. (rj)
September 26, 2017 112 Featured Case ORDER granting 110 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 10/5/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/26/2017) (rj)
September 26, 2017 111 AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth P. Norwick in Opposition re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit A, # 2 exhibit B, # 3 exhibit C, # 4 exhibit D, # 5 exhibit E, # 6 exhibit F, # 7 exhibit G, # 8 exhibit H, # 9 exhibit I, # 10 exhibit J, # 11 exhibit K, # 12 exhibit L, # 13 exhibit M, # 14 exhibit N, # 15 exhibit O, # 16 exhibit P, # 17 exhibit Q, # 18 exhibit R)(Norwick, Kenneth)
September 25, 2017 110 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Eric J. Feder dated September 25, 2017. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc..(Feder, Eric)
September 12, 2017 109 Featured Case ORDER: The Court held an initial pretrial conference (IPTC) on September 7, 2017. The schedule for this matter is set forth in two parts: an overall schedule, and a schedule for the "embedding" assertion. Defendants shall answer not later than February 15, 2018; Amended pleadings may not be filed, and no party may be joined, without leave of Court more than 20 days after the filing of this Order or the filing a responsive pleading, whichever occurs first. All fact discovery must be completed not later than September 7, 2018; All expert discovery must be completed not later than October 28, 2018; The last opportunity to file a dispositive motion is November 15, 2018; Any opposition shall be filed not later than November 29, 2018; Any reply shall be filed not later than December 6, 2018. Trial shall commence on January 7, 2019. Motions for summary judgment shall be filed not later than September 28, 2017. Oppositions shall be filed not later than October 28, 2017. Replies shall be filed not later than November 16, 2018. The Court expects to inform he parties of whether it expects to be able to resolve the motion on summary judgment by December 10, 2018. If a trial is necessary for the embedding issue," per the consent of the parties, it shall be tried to the bench, commencing on January 15, 2018. A trial on the "embedding issue" is expected to last no more than four days. A joint pretrial order ("JPTO") shall be due Monday, January 8, 2018. A final pretrial conference ("FPTC") is scheduled for Thursday, January 11, 2018 at 1:00 PM. The parties are advised that settlement discussions must occur in parallel to this schedule. Schedule will not be adjourned, except in very unusual circumstances, for settlement discussions.Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC answer due 2/15/2018; Breitbart News Network LLC answer due 2/15/2018; Gannett Company, Inc. answer due 2/15/2018; Heavy, Inc. answer due 2/15/2018; New England Sports Network, Inc. answer due 2/15/2018; Time Inc. answer due 2/15/2018; Vox Media, Inc. answer due 2/15/2018; Yahoo, Inc. answer due 2/15/2018.( Expert Discovery due by 10/28/2018., Fact Discovery due by 9/7/2018., Motions due by 11/15/2018., Responses due by 11/29/2018, Replies due by 12/6/2018., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/12/2017) (js) Modified on 10/18/2017 (js).
September 8, 2017 108 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
September 8, 2017 107 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
September 8, 2017 106 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Time Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
September 8, 2017 105 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc..(Lane, Thomas)
September 8, 2017 104 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Schaffer-Goldman, Regina)
September 8, 2017 103 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Heavy, Inc..(Lebowitz, Marc)
September 8, 2017 102 ANSWER to 38 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Breitbart News Network LLC.(Mochizuki, Tenley)
September 8, 2017 101 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc..(Kramarsky, Stephen)
September 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine B. Forrest: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/7/2017. (jp)
September 7, 2017 100 Featured Case ORDER: granting 99 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. So Ordered. Just Herald Media may dial in--to 212 805 0276 5 minutes before the conference is to commence. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/7/2017) (ap)
September 6, 2017 99 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Joseph D. Lipchitz dated September 6, 2017. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc..(Lipchitz, Joseph)
September 1, 2017 98 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants may file their answer on September 8, 2018. The IPTC is still set for September 7, and all parties must otherwise comply with this Court's Order of August 21, 2017. (ECF No. 92.) Time Inc. answer due 9/8/2017; Vox Media, Inc. answer due 9/8/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/1/2017(as per Chambers)) (mro) Modified on 9/6/2017 (mro).
September 1, 2017 97 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
September 1, 2017 96 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of All Defendants Except Herald Media, Inc. addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lacy H. Koonce, III dated September 1, 2017. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
August 30, 2017 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Eliot Spitzer on behalf of Yahoo, Inc.. (Spitzer, Seth)
August 28, 2017 94 Featured Case ORDER: The Court hereby directs parties to conduct and complete jurisdictional discovery within thirty days for the purpose of establishing whether Herald has sufficient contact with the Southern District of New York, such that this Court's exercise of personal jurisdiction would not be improper. The jurisdictional discovery schedule is as follows: Plaintiff may file any supplemental materials to establish personal jurisdiction over Herald by September 27, 2017; Defendant's answer is due by October 4, 2017; Plaintiff's reply is due by October 11, 2017. Thereafter, the Court expects to be able to decide this motion on the papers, but will hold an evidentiary hearing if necessary. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/28/2017)
August 24, 2017 93 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 0rder (docket 92) served on all parties on 8/21/2017. Service was accepted by ECF. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
August 21, 2017 92 Featured Case ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/21/2017) (rjm)
August 21, 2017 91 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER denying 55 Motion to Dismiss; denying 59 Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth above, the motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 55 and 59) are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate those motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/21/2017) (rj)
August 16, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 9/18/2017. Motions due by 9/1/2017. (ap)
August 16, 2017 90 Featured Case ORDER: granting 85 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered. Let's not prepare for receipt of amicus just yet. I have serious concerns regarding whether I can decide the "embedding" and fair use issues--as they have been here briefed--or a motion to dismiss. I will decide those questions within a week I hope. If I cannot resolve the motion under 12(b)(6), then the question for you folks will be whether we should consent this now to SJ (Rule 56) or whether we proceed to discovery. Stay tuned but think about the issue. Brief due by 9/18/2017. Motion due by 9/1/2017. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/16/2017) (ap)
August 15, 2017 89 JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use. . Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Golinveaux, Jennifer)
August 15, 2017 88 DECLARATION of Lacy H. Koonce, III in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding".. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "22" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 2 Exhibit "23" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 3 Exhibit "24" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 4 Exhibit "25" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration, # 5 Exhibit "26" of Lacy H. Koonce, III's Declaration)(Koonce, Lacy)
August 15, 2017 87 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding". . Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
August 15, 2017 86 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . - Defendant Herald Media, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(2). Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
August 10, 2017 85 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lance Koonce dated 8/10/2017. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
August 10, 2017 84 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kenneth P. Norwick dated August 10, 2017 re: pending motion. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 opinion)(Norwick, Kenneth)
August 8, 2017 83 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rachel Fan Stern Strom terminated. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/8/2017) (js)
August 7, 2017 82 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Rachel Fan Stern Strom to Withdraw as Attorney for Gannett Company, Inc.. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc. (Strom, Rachel) Modified on 10/2/2017 (db).
July 31, 2017 81 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding". . Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
July 31, 2017 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use. . Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 screengrab, # 2 screengrab)(Norwick, Kenneth)
July 31, 2017 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
July 14, 2017 78 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Fairpointe Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Blackrock, Inc. for Time Inc.. Document filed by Time Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
July 14, 2017 77 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate NBCUniversal Media, LLC for Vox Media, Inc.. Document filed by Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
July 14, 2017 76 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Breitbart News Network LLC.(Mochizuki, Tenley)
July 13, 2017 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent New England Associates Limited Partnership for New England Sports Network, Inc.. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc..(Kramarsky, Stephen)
July 13, 2017 74 DECLARATION of Stephen M. Kramarsky in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use., 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding".. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NESN Article, # 2 Exhibit NESN Article (archived), # 3 Exhibit NESN Article (source code))(Kramarsky, Stephen)
July 13, 2017 73 DECLARATION of Robert Penchina in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use., 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding".. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Penchina, Robert)
July 13, 2017 72 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Heavy, Inc..(Lebowitz, Marc)
July 13, 2017 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Stanley, Lawrence)
July 13, 2017 70 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Yahoo Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Verizon Communications, Inc. for Yahoo, Inc.. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc..(Lane, Thomas)
July 13, 2017 69 DECLARATION of Marc A. Lebowitz in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use., 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding".. Document filed by Heavy, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article, # 2 Exhibit Article, # 3 Exhibit Excerpt of HTML source code, # 4 Exhibit Tweet)(Lebowitz, Marc)
July 13, 2017 68 DECLARATION of Lacy H. Koonce, III in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding"., 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use.. Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Koonce, Lacy)
July 13, 2017 67 DECLARATION of Jennifer A. Golinveaux in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding"., 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use.. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Uproxx Article as of July 12, 2017, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Internet Archive Version of Uproxx Article, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Source Code for Uproxx Article as of July 12, 2017, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Yahoo! Sports Article as of July 12, 2017, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Internet Archive Version of Yahoo! Sports Article, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Source Code for Yahoo! Sports Article)(Lane, Thomas)
July 13, 2017 66 DECLARATION of Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr. in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use., 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding".. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Stanley, Lawrence)
July 13, 2017 65 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding". . Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
July 13, 2017 64 DECLARATION of Joseph D. Lipchitz in Support re: 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding"., 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 article, # 2 article, # 3 HTML code, # 4 Twitter page)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 63 DECLARATION of Ryan J. Larsen in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use.. Document filed by Breitbart News Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mochizuki, Tenley)
July 13, 2017 62 DECLARATION of Jennifer Morse in Support re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 article, # 2 article)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 61 JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use. . Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Lane, Thomas)
July 13, 2017 60 DECLARATION of Jeff Magram in Support re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 59 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Based on Fair Use. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc..(Lane, Thomas)
July 13, 2017 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2017(Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 56 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc..(Lipchitz, Joseph)
July 13, 2017 55 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss Based on "Embedding". Document filed by Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
July 13, 2017 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lacy Herman Koonce, III on behalf of Time Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
July 13, 2017 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joel Feder on behalf of Time Inc.. (Feder, Eric)
July 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/13/2017. Responses due by 7/31/2017 Replies due by 8/15/2017. (mro)
July 7, 2017 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order. ORDER: The proposed briefing schedule is approved. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/7/2017) (mro)
July 6, 2017 51 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 35 Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,, addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lance Koonce dated July 6, 2017. Document filed by Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
July 6, 2017 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 7/6/2017) (js)
July 5, 2017 49 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for all Defendants to File Consolidated Motions to Dismiss and Leave to File Oversized Briefs addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lacy H. Koonce, III dated July 5, 2017. Document filed by Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
June 19, 2017 48 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 47 Motion for Joseph Dominic Lipchitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/19/2017) (js)
June 15, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 47 MOTION for Joseph Dominic Lipchitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13784715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
June 14, 2017 47 MOTION for Joseph Dominic Lipchitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13784715. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Joseph D. Lipchitz, # 2 Exhibit to the Affidavit of Joseph D. Lipchitz, # 3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Lipchitz, Joseph)
June 6, 2017 46 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 43 Motion for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ordered that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. so Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/6/2017) (js)
June 6, 2017 45 Featured Case ORDER: granting 42 Motion for Lawrence T. Stanley Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ordered that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/5/2017) (js) (js).
June 2, 2017 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Yahoo, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
June 2, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 43 MOTION for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13736777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 2, 2017 43 MOTION for Jennifer A. Golinveaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13736777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer A. Golinveaux, with Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Golinveaux, Jennifer)
June 2, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 42 MOTION for Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13735285. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk'. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 2, 2017 42 MOTION for Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13735285. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr. In Support of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Stanley, Lawrence)
June 2, 2017 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Regina Schaffer-Goldman on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Schaffer-Goldman, Regina)
May 26, 2017 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. New England Sports Network, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 26, 2017 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gannett Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 26, 2017 38 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 5 Amended Complaint, against Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Breitbart News Network LLC, Gannett Company, Inc., Heavy, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., New England Sports Network, Inc., Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Yahoo, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Justin Goldman. Related document: 5 Amended Complaint, filed by Justin Goldman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Norwick, Kenneth)
May 26, 2017 37 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 36 Motion for Ryan J. Larsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/26/2017) (rjm)
May 24, 2017 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 36 MOTION for Ryan J. Larsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13704521. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 24, 2017 36 MOTION for Ryan J. Larsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13704521. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Breitbart News Network LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ryan J. Larsen in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Ryan J. Larsen's Certificate of Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Larsen, Ryan)
May 23, 2017 35 Featured Case ORDER: On May 5, 2017, the Court directed each defendant to inform the Court whether it intends to file a motion to dismiss, and if so, provide a proposed schedule. Based on parties responses to the Courts May 5 Order, the Court sets the following schedule for moving or answering plaintiff's Complaint: 1. Any final Amended Complaint shall be filed not later than May 26, 2017. 2. All defendants shall file any motions to dismiss or answer plaintiff's Complaint not later than July 10, 2017. 3. Plaintiff shall file any opposition to defendants motions not later than July 28, 2017. 4. Defendants shall file any reply to plaintiffs opposition not later August12, 2017. Gannett Company, Inc. answer due 7/10/2017. New England Sports Network, Inc. answer due 7/10/2017. Yahoo, Inc. answer due 7/10/2017.( Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2017. Motions due by 7/10/2017. Responses due by 7/28/2017. Replies due by 8/12/2017.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/23/2017) (js)
May 23, 2017 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Heavy, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 23, 2017 33 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Kenneth P. Norwick dated May 23, 2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
May 22, 2017 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joel Feder on behalf of Vox Media, Inc.. (Feder, Eric)
May 22, 2017 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lacy Herman Koonce, III on behalf of Vox Media, Inc.. (Koonce, Lacy)
May 22, 2017 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Stephen M. Kramarsky dated May 22, 2017 re: in accordance with the Court's May 5, 2017 Order. Document filed by New England Sports Network, Inc..(Kramarsky, Stephen)
May 22, 2017 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Kramarsky on behalf of New England Sports Network, Inc.. (Kramarsky, Stephen)
May 22, 2017 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Marc A. Lebowitz dated May 22, 2017 re: Response to Court's May 5, 2017 order. Document filed by Heavy, Inc..(Lebowitz, Marc)
May 22, 2017 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Andrew Lachow, Time Inc. dated May 22, 2017 re: Response to Court Orders. Document filed by Time Inc..(Lachow, Andrew)
May 22, 2017 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Thomas Patrick Lane dated May 22, 2017 re: response to the Court's Orders dated May 5, 2017 and May 17, 2017. Document filed by Yahoo, Inc..(Lane, Thomas)
May 22, 2017 25 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr. dated May 22, 2017 re: in response to the Court's Order dated May 5, 2017. Document filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Goff, Bryan)
May 22, 2017 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bryan P. Goff on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Goff, Bryan)
May 22, 2017 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Tenley Mochizuki dated May 22, 2017 re: In response to the Court's Order of May 5, 2017, as clarified by the Court's Order of May 17, 2017. Document filed by Breitbart News Network LLC.(Mochizuki, Tenley)
May 22, 2017 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tenley Mochizuki on behalf of Breitbart News Network LLC. (Mochizuki, Tenley)
May 22, 2017 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Andrew Lebowitz on behalf of Heavy, Inc.. (Lebowitz, Marc)
May 22, 2017 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Fan Stern Strom on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc.. (Strom, Rachel)
May 22, 2017 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Penchina on behalf of Gannett Company, Inc.. (Penchina, Robert)
May 22, 2017 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Lance Koonce dated May 22, 2017 re: the Court's May 5, 2017 Order. Document filed by Vox Media, Inc..(Koonce, Lacy)
May 22, 2017 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Joseph D. Lipchitz dated May 22, 2017 re: Boston Herald's preliminary view in favor of filing of a motion to dismiss.. Document filed by Herald Media, Inc..(Earley, Francis)
May 22, 2017 16 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Robert Penchina dated May 22, 2017 re: Response Pursuant to the Court's May 5, 2017 Order. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
May 22, 2017 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Gannett Company, Inc.. Document filed by Gannett Company, Inc..(Strom, Rachel)
May 18, 2017 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order dated May 17, 2017 served on Breitbart News Service, LLC, Heavy, Inc., Time, Inc. Yahoo, Inc, Vox Media,Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., Boston globe Media Partners, LLC, New England Sports Network, Inc... Service was made by Email. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 18, 2017 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Vox Media, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 18, 2017 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 18, 2017 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Time Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 18, 2017 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Herald Media, Inc. waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 18, 2017 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Breitbart News Network LLC waiver sent on 5/10/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. Document filed by Justin Goldman. (Norwick, Kenneth)
May 17, 2017 8 Featured Case ORDER: The Court clarifies that the deadline for defendants to respond to the order of May 5, 2017, at ECF No. 7 is Monday, May 22, 2017. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on defendants and to file a certificate of service on the public docket. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/17/2017) (ap)
May 5, 2017 7 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has received plaintiff's amended complaint. (ECF No. 5.) Plaintiff alleges he has filed another copyright infringement action against other defendants involving the same photograph at issue here, and that such action is currently pending before the Honorable Andrew L. Carter, Jr. (Id. paragraph 2 (citing Goldman v. Adv. Publ'ns., Inc. et al., No. 16-cv-9031 (ALC)).) Plaintiff further asserts that, in the action before Judge Carter, "a specific legal issue-which may or [may] not be presented in this action-is the subject of a motion to dismiss that is currently being briefed." (Id.) In light of this allegation, it is hereby ORDERED that each defendant shall inform the Court not later than May 20, 2017 whether it intends to file a motion dismiss in this case, and, if so, a proposed schedule. Further, plaintiff's counsel shall serve a copy of this Order on each defendant. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/5/2017) (mro)
May 4, 2017 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/4/2017) (pc).
May 3, 2017 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Breitbart News Network LLC, Gannett Company, Inc., Heavy, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., New England Sports Network, Inc., Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Yahoo, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Justin Goldman. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)
May 3, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Kenneth P. Norwick Document No. 4 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The copyright registration number is not noted on the complaint. Please refile with corresponding information. (kl)
May 1, 2017 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT AO 121 FORM -REGISTRATION ERROR AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Norwick, Kenneth) Modified on 5/3/2017 (kl).
May 1, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT COPYRIGHT FORM. Notice to Attorney Kenneth P. Norwick RE-FILE Document No. 3 AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):. the Plaintiff field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; the Defendant field on the AO 121 Copyright form was not completed by the attorney; The copyright registration number is not noted on the complaint. Please refile with corresponding information. (pc)
May 1, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 1, 2017 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (pc)
May 1, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 1, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kenneth P. Norwick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Breitbart News Network LLC, Gannett Company, Inc., Heavy, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Yahoo, Inc., new england sports network inc. and Justin Goldman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pc)
April 28, 2017 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Norwick, Kenneth) Modified on 5/1/2017 (pc).
April 28, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Norwick, Kenneth)
April 28, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Breitbart News Network LLC, Gannett Company, Inc., Heavy, Inc., Herald Media, Inc., Time Inc., Vox Media, Inc., Yahoo, Inc., new england sports network inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13601064)Document filed by Justin Goldman.(Norwick, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman v. Breitbart News Network LLC et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Goldman
Represented By: Kenneth P. Norwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breitbart News Network LLC
Represented By: Ryan J. Larsen
Represented By: Tenley Mochizuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavy, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Andrew Lebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vox Media, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Joel Feder
Represented By: Lacy Herman Koonce, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Represented By: Rachel Fan Stern Strom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herald Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC
Represented By: Bryan P. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Sports Network, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Kramarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?