Jones v. City Of New York et al
Plaintiff: Henry Jones
Defendant: City Of New York, Saul Quiles Morales, Ruben Serrano and Daniel Ryan
Case Number: 1:2018cv04064
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Presiding Judge: George B. Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER adopting 137 Report and Recommendations re: 117 Motion to Dismiss, 92 Motion for Summary Judgment: Having reviewed the Report for clear error and finding none, this Court ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Parker's Re port and Recommendation in full. Defendant City's motion for summary judgment, (ECF No. 92), is DENIED without prejudice. Individual Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(5), (ECF No. 117), is DENIED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions accordingly. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/10/2020) (jwh)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/5/2020) (mro)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: The Court hereby orders a telephonic case management conference for Wednesday, January 13, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's AT&T conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269; access code 4858267. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/4/2020) (mro)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: The Court hereby orders a telephonic case management conference and oral argument, regarding Plaintiff's 4(m) extension motion and the Individual Defendants Officers Serrano and Ryan's motion to dismiss, for this Friday, October 16, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parkers AT&T conference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269; access code 4858267. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/14/2020) (ama)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for permission for alternative service on Defendants Ryan and Serrano is granted. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(e)(1) and New York Civil Practice Law and Rules Section 308, the Court may allow al ternate service, including by mail, when other types of service are impracticable. Ransome v. Epstein, No. 17-CV-616 (JGK), 2018 WL 637421, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 30, 2018). Given the Covid-19 national emergency and Plaintiff's represen tation that other forms of service are impracticable, Plaintiff may serve the Defendants by alternate service and will file proof of such service by no later than May 4, 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/30/2020) (mro)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/5/2020) (rjm)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/2/2020) (kv)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 UNSEALING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Bronx County Grand Jury testimony of Christopher Rice, and Police Officers Saul Quiles-Morales, Sherrod Stuart, and Ruben Serrano in the matter of People v. Christopher Rice, Case No. 2016BX001519 b e made available to James E. Johnson, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, or to his authorized representatives for inspection, photocopying, and use in the above-referenced federal action on or before March 13, 2020, and that the file sha ll thereafter be sealed. It is further ORDERED that the Bronx County District Attorney's Office and/or the Office of the Corporation Counsel may redact as necessary to protect confidential information prior to disclosure. It is further ORDER ED that on or before March 27, 2020, the redacted minutes shall be produced to plaintiff's counsel in the above referenced action. It is further ORDERED that the parties use the Grand Jury testimony solely for purposes of the pending federal l awsuit in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Henry Jones v. City of New York, et al., 18 CV 4064 (GBD) (KHP). It is further; ORDERED that counsel for the parties to the federal action shall not use the Grand Ju ry testimony for any purpose other than for the preparation or presentation of plaintiffs case in this action, including at trial in front of a jury, and the parties shall not publically file the Grand Jury testimony or otherwise make the Grand J ury testimony known except as stated herein; and it is further ORDERED that the provision of this Order shall survive the termination of the above referenced federal civil proceeding. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/26/2020) (ks) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO UNSEAL GRAND JURY MINUTES: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the grand jury minutes for Sherrod Stuart will be unsealed by the clerk for the Bronx Supreme Court and/or the District Attorneys Office for Bronx County, and made available for copying and review by counsel for Henry Jones. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/13/2020) (ks)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION ON MOTION TO AMEND: For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motion to amend is granted. Consistent with the Court's direction at the February 5, 2020 conference, the parties shall meet and confer as to the final version of the Amended Pleading and Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint on ECF by no later than February 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/6/2020) ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020.) (ks) (Main Document 71 replaced on 2/6/2020) (ca).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 56 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference scheduled for January 7, 2020 is adjourned to March 3, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. So Ordered. (Initial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/20) (yv)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: The following order is entered: Discovery. The fact discovery deadline is extended to January 17, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Status Letter. The City is directed to file a status letter by December 20, 2019 to update the Co urt as to whether the City will accept service of Plaintiff's forthcoming deposition subpoena. The letter will also state the date for the pending deposition and address whether Corporation Counsel will be representing the witness at the depo sition. Motion to Amend. By December 16, 2019, Plaintiff will provide a copy of the proposed amended complaint to the City. Plaintiff will also provide a redline of the proposed amended complaint to the operative complaint. By January 8, 2020, Pla intiff will file a letter updating the Court as to whether the City has consented to Plaintiff's proposed amendment or, alternatively, Plaintiff will file a moving brief. The City's opposition, if any, is due by January 17, 2020. Plainti ff's reply, if any, is due by January 24, 2020. Status Conference. A status conference in this case is hereby scheduled for February 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are directed to be prepared to discuss Plaintiff's motion to amend if filed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/6/2019) ( Fact Discovery due by 1/17/2020., Responses due by 1/17/2020, Replies due by 1/24/2020., Status Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (ks)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: granting 50 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Conference is adjourned from December 2, 2019 to January 7, 2020 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/03/2019) (ama)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Compel. The Court is in receipt of the City's motion to compel Plaintiff to be deposed on November 22, 2019. (Doc. No. 46.) The City's motion is denied. The deadline for discovery is extended to December 6, 2019. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide the City with a date certain for Plaintiff's deposition by November 27, 2019. The parties are directed to file a joint letter by December 6, 2019 to inform the Court as to the status of the case and if the parties intend to file dispositive motions. Plaintiff is warned that failure to participate in discovery may result in sanctions or the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/20/2019) (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. City Of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Jones
Represented By: Leo Glickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saul Quiles Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?