Orpilla et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Michael Orpilla, Miguel Quinones, Peter Panariello, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Scott Probeck, Louis Padula, Michael Pirone, Harold Pietzak, Jennifer Owens, Quindalina Prioleau, Vincent Palazzola, George Papazahariou, Richard Pignatelli, Joseph Parisi, Nancy Palermo, Paul Paronich, Laurence Perkins, Antoinette Pulito, Darleen Pletka, Ruben Peralta, Joseph Palladino, Eric Panni, John Pellegriti, Karen Pisano, Karen Paholek, Ralph Perfetto, Shirley Pelage, Hector Perez, Aniello Pellone, Vincent Perrone, Joseph Pasquale, Dorothy Palmieri, Connie Pfander, John Passeggiata, Samuel Ravelo, Geraldo Perez, Mark Peters, Fernando Quinones, Anthony Palladino, Joseph Pentangelo, Jaime Palermo, Cole Pletka, Frank Quinn, Ivano Pulito, Lori Pryzyblowski, Svetlana Polonsky, Peter Raftopoulos, Jose Perez, James Ortiz, Michael Raimo, Hommy Quinones, Peter Pace, Dennis Porter, John Perez, Matthew Puma, Kevin Prentice, Ying Ping Li, Claire Pedone, James Pesonen, Glen Ramroop, Charles Pearce, Cosmo Palmieri, Joseph Pedone, Robert Polidore, Edwin Ortiz, Daniel Questel, Kevin Quirk, Vincent Ranieri, John Powers, Dennis Postel, Wayne Porter, John Philbin, Anthony Phillips, Janice Pristina, Thomas Ouellette, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Julio Ortiz, Vincent Raschella, Julio Ramos, Eliot Parisi, Ronald Peterson, Emilio Pulito, Danielle Raia, Alyssa Pirone, Patrick Pisani, James Raymond, Christine Puma, Kathleen Owens, Greg Pacifico, Kenneth Quick, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Jozef Ralbovski, Alice Papilsky, John Podlucky, Paul Polemeni, Gerald Orrico, Genee Parker, Vito Plaia, Thomas Osgoop, Carlos Pineiro and Matthew Ouellette
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11289
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO WITHDRAW BENJAMIN D. MARGO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: It is ORDERED that Benjamin D. Margo be withdrawn as counsel for the Kingdom of Saudi Arabia in the above-referenced action. (Attorney Benjamin David Margo.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (jwh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 LETTERS ROGATORY (Doc. #4702) ISSUED July 25, 2019, as to Cathy Hawara Assistant Commissioner, Appeal Canada Rvenue Agency, Connaught Building, 555 MacKenzie Avenue, 7the Floor, Ottawa, Ontario in Canada. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Mamdouh Mahmud Salim for October 8, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/15/2019 (dt). Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order & Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Wadith elHage for October 7, 2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(dt) Modified on 7/16/2019 (dt). Picked up on July 16, 2019, by Jerry Goldman's Office
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number (4561) CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(lb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (6 in 1:18-cv-11834-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom., (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy B. Fleming, #2 Exhibit Havlish Public Comments on USVSST Fund interpretations 6.29.16)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia waiver sent on 1/17/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Document filed by Vincent Raschella; Cole Pletka; Charles Pearce; Dorothy Palmieri; Lori Pryzyblowski; Claire Pedone; Thomas Osgoop; Alice Papilsky; John Podlucky; Peter Raftopoulos; Kenneth Quick; Ronald Peterson; Anthony Palladino; Michael Raimo; Ralph Perfetto; Jaime Palermo; Eliot Parisi; Jozef Ralbovski; Matthew Puma; Vincent Ranieri; Darleen Pletka; Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez; Paul Polemeni; Cosmo Palmieri; Patrick Pisani; Shirley Pelage; James Pesonen; Kevin Prentice ; Kathleen Owens; Dennis Porter; Antoinette Pulito; Peter Pace; Geraldo Perez; John Perez; Svetlana Polonsky; Christine Puma; John Philbin; Ruben Peralta; Alyssa Pirone; Genee Parker; John Passeggiata; Robert Polidore; Joseph Pentangelo; Greg Pacifico; Vincent Palazzola; Connie Pfander; John Pellegriti; Harold Pietzak; Hector Perez; Joseph Palladino; Aniello Pellone; John Powers; Kevin Quirk; Karen Pisano; Daniel Questel; Mark Peters; Michael Orpilla; Nancy Palermo; Danielle Raia; Fernando Quinones; Vito Plaia; George Papazahariou; Joseph Parisi; Quindalina Prioleau; Joseph Pasquale; Michael Pirone; Hommy Quinones ; Janice Pristina; Dennis Postel; Scott Probeck; Karen Paholek; Joseph Pedone; Richard Pignatelli; Miguel Quinones; Emilio Pulito; Alkiavadis Panopoulos; Samuel Ravelo; Jose Perez; Paul Paronich; Carlos Pineiro; Julio Ramos; Peter Panariello; Margie Ramos-Ciancio; Eric Panni; Louis Padula; Laurence Perkins; Julio Ortiz; Ying Ping Li; Gerald Orrico; Glen Ramroop; Jennifer Owens ; Anthony Phillips; Ivano Pulito; Matthew Ouellette; Edwin Ortiz; Wayne Porter; Frank Quinn; Vincent Perrone; James Ortiz. (Kreindler, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Plaintiffs' Executive Committees dated 1/4/2019 re: Briefing Schedule on Havlish-Hoglan Motion for Common Benefit Fund. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Havlish-Hoglan Letter to Judge Netburn, #2 Exhibit B - PECs Letter to Judge Netburn)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Haefele, Robert)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying (479) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09848-GBD-SN; denying (833) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-09849-GBD-SN; denying (4287) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN; denying (500) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01076-GBD-SN; denying (465) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01922-GBD-SN; denying (675) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-01923-GBD-SN; denying (586) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-06105-GBD-SN; denying (641) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-05970-GBD-SN; denying (595) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07065-GBD-SN; denying (405) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07216-GBD-SN; denying (527) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07280-GBD-SN; denying (367) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07281-GBD-FM; denying (623) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:04-cv-07279-GBD-SN; denying (130) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:09-cv-07055-GBD-SN; denying (285) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:11-cv-07550-GBD-SN; denying (1003) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06977-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07209-GBD-SN; denying (25) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07214-GBD-SN; denying (48) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07230-GBD-SN; denying (408) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:02-cv-07300-GBD-SN; denying (133) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:15-cv-09903-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07456-GBD-SN; denying (111) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-07853-GBD-SN; denying (75) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08070-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-08884-GBD-SN; denying (104) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09663-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:16-cv-09937-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00117-GBD-SN; denying (82) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00348-GBD-SN; denying (103) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-00450-GBD-SN; denying (114) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02003-GBD-SN; denying (72) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02129-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-02651-GBD-SN; denying (63) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03810-GBD-SN; denying (79) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03887-GBD-SN; denying (97) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-03908-GBD-SN; denying (69) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-04201-GBD-SN; denying (66) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05174-GBD-SN; denying (67) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-05471-GBD-SN; denying (65) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06123-GBD-SN; denying (47) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-06519-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07317-GBD-SN; denying (59) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-07914-GBD-SN; denying (49) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:17-cv-08617-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00538-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-00947-GBD-SN; denying (52) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03162-GBD-SN; denying (32) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-03353-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05306-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05320-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05321-GBD-SN; denying (38) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05331-GBD-SN; denying (39) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05339-GBD-SN; denying (44) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05373-GBD-SN; denying (40) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-05383-GBD-SN; denying (22) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-06922-GBD-SN; denying (18) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07030-GBD-SN; denying (24) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07306-GBD-SN; denying (19) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-07509-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-08297-GBD-SN; denying (11) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-10779-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11033-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11051-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11140-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11144-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11157-GBD-SN; denying (12) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11191-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11212-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11250-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11251-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11253-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11257-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11259-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11274-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11289-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11293-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11305-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11308-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11311-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11314-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11340-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11345-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11375-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11382-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11392-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11416-GBD-SN; denying (9) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11417-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11426-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11429-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11464-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11483-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11485-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11486-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11488-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11489-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11493-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11500-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11504-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11509-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11515-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11516-GBD-SN; denying (7) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11519-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11525-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11527-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11573-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11575-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11578-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11582-GBD-SN; denying (8) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11583-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11584-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11619-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11624-GBD-SN; denying (5) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11664-GBD-SN; denying (10) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11685-GBD-SN; denying (6) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:18-cv-11695-GBD-SN; denying (402) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05071-GBD-SN; denying (485) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-05738-GBD-SN; denying (1040) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-06978-GBD-SN; denying (398) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-07036-GBD-SN; denying (404) Letter Motion for Discovery in case 1:03-cv-08591-GBD-SN. Application DENIED. A request to defer the Court's written decision is not the proper way to bring additional relevant information to the Court's attention. Saudi Arabia's request to file a redacted version of its December 18, 2018 letter is GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn) (Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al. (ras)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (14 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Havlish Plaintiffs. Return Date set for 1/3/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Report and Recommendation, #3 Exhibit List of Judgments, #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics 2018, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (12 in 1:18-cv-11874-GBD-SN) MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. . Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Compensation through Creation of Common Benefit Fund and Authorizing Certain Disbursements Therefrom. Document filed by Fiona Havlish. Return Date set for 1/2/2019 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prior Order, #2 Exhibit Mag. J. Report and Recommendation 7/12/16, #3 Exhibit List of Iran Judgments (not exhaustive), #4 Exhibit Court Transcript 4/15/10, #5 Exhibit Court Transcript 7/13/11, #6 Exhibit USVSST Claims Statistics, #7 Exhibit USVSST Congressional Report 1/9/17, #8 Exhibit Kephart excerpt, #9 Exhibit Shenon excerpt, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Fleming, Timothy)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Discovery as filed under seal Docket No. 4280 on December 13, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Andrew J Maloney, III dated 12-18-2018. Document filed by Plaintiffs Executive Committees.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN et al.(Maloney, Andrew)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
December 6, 2018 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
December 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
December 6, 2018 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
December 6, 2018 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
December 6, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03md1570. (pc)
December 6, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
December 6, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
December 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Noah H. Kushlefsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Thomas Ouellette. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03-mdl-1570 (GBD)(SN). Document filed by Hommy Quinones, Michael Orpilla, Gerald Orrico, Edwin Ortiz, James Ortiz, Julio Ortiz, Thomas Osgoop, Thomas Ouellette, Kathleen Owens, Jennifer Owens, Peter Pace, Greg Pacifico, Louis Padula, Karen Paholek, Vincent Palazzola, Jaime Palermo, Nancy Palermo, Anthony Palladino, Joseph Palladino, Cosmo Palmieri, Dorothy Palmieri, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, George Papazahariou, Alice Papilsky, Eliot Parisi, Joseph Parisi, Genee Parker, Paul Paronich, Joseph Pasquale, John Passeggiata, Charles Pearce, Claire Pedone, Joseph Pedone, Shirley Pelage, John Pellegriti, Aniello Pellone, Joseph Pentangelo, Ruben Peralta, Geraldo Perez, Hector Perez, John Perez, Jose Perez, Ralph Perfetto, Laurence Perkins, Vincent Perrone, James Pesonen, Mark Peters, Ronald Peterson, Connie Pfander, John Philbin, Anthony Phillips, Harold Pietzak, Richard Pignatelli, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Carlos Pineiro, Ying Ping Li, Alyssa Pirone, Michael Pirone, Patrick Pisani, Karen Pisano, Vito Plaia, Cole Pletka, Darleen Pletka, John Podlucky, Paul Polemeni, Robert Polidore, Svetlana Polonsky, Dennis Porter, Wayne Porter, Dennis Postel, John Powers, Kevin Prentice, Quindalina Prioleau, Janice Pristina, Scott Probeck, Lori Pryzyblowski, Antoinette Pulito, Emilio Pulito, Ivano Pulito, Christine Puma, Matthew Puma, Daniel Questel, Kenneth Quick, Frank Quinn, Fernando Quinones, Miguel Quinones, Kevin Quirk, Peter Raftopoulos, Danielle Raia, Michael Raimo, Jozef Ralbovski, Julio Ramos, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Glen Ramroop, Vincent Ranieri, Vincent Raschella, Samuel Ravelo, James Raymond.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushlefsky, Noah) Modified on 12/6/2018 (pc).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah H. Kushlefsky on behalf of Hommy Quinones, Michael Orpilla, Gerald Orrico, Edwin Ortiz, James Ortiz, Julio Ortiz, Thomas Osgoop, Thomas Ouellette, Kathleen Owens, Jennifer Owens, Peter Pace, Greg Pacifico, Louis Padula, Karen Paholek, Vincent Palazzola, Jaime Palermo, Nancy Palermo, Anthony Palladino, Joseph Palladino, Cosmo Palmieri, Dorothy Palmieri, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, George Papazahariou, Alice Papilsky, Eliot Parisi, Joseph Parisi, Genee Parker, Paul Paronich, Joseph Pasquale, John Passeggiata, Charles Pearce, Claire Pedone, Joseph Pedone, Shirley Pelage, John Pellegriti, Aniello Pellone, Joseph Pentangelo, Ruben Peralta, Geraldo Perez, Hector Perez, John Perez, Jose Perez, Ralph Perfetto, Laurence Perkins, Vincent Perrone, James Pesonen, Mark Peters, Ronald Peterson, Connie Pfander, John Philbin, Anthony Phillips, Harold Pietzak, Richard Pignatelli, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Carlos Pineiro, Ying Ping Li, Alyssa Pirone, Michael Pirone, Patrick Pisani, Karen Pisano, Vito Plaia, Cole Pletka, Darleen Pletka, John Podlucky, Paul Polemeni, Robert Polidore, Svetlana Polonsky, Dennis Porter, Wayne Porter, Dennis Postel, John Powers, Kevin Prentice, Quindalina Prioleau, Janice Pristina, Scott Probeck, Lori Pryzyblowski, Antoinette Pulito, Emilio Pulito, Ivano Pulito, Christine Puma, Matthew Puma, Daniel Questel, Kenneth Quick, Frank Quinn, Fernando Quinones, Miguel Quinones, Kevin Quirk, Peter Raftopoulos, Danielle Raia, Michael Raimo, Jozef Ralbovski, Julio Ramos, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Glen Ramroop, Vincent Ranieri, Vincent Raschella, Samuel Ravelo, James Raymond. (Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Vincent Raschella, Cole Pletka, Charles Pearce, Dorothy Palmieri, Lori Pryzyblowski, Claire Pedone, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, John Podlucky, Peter Raftopoulos, Kenneth Quick, Ronald Peterson, Anthony Palladino, Michael Raimo, Ralph Perfetto, Jaime Palermo, Eliot Parisi, Jozef Ralbovski, Matthew Puma, Vincent Ranieri, Darleen Pletka, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Paul Polemeni, Cosmo Palmieri, Patrick Pisani, Shirley Pelage, James Pesonen, Kevin Prentice, Kathleen Owens, Dennis Porter, Antoinette Pulito, Peter Pace, Geraldo Perez, John Perez, Svetlana Polonsky, Christine Puma, John Philbin, Ruben Peralta, Alyssa Pirone, Genee Parker, John Passeggiata, Robert Polidore, Joseph Pentangelo, Greg Pacifico, Vincent Palazzola, Connie Pfander, John Pellegriti, Harold Pietzak, Hector Perez, Joseph Palladino, Aniello Pellone, John Powers, Kevin Quirk, Karen Pisano, Daniel Questel, Mark Peters, Michael Orpilla, Nancy Palermo, Danielle Raia, Fernando Quinones, Vito Plaia, George Papazahariou, Joseph Parisi, Quindalina Prioleau, Joseph Pasquale, Michael Pirone, Hommy Quinones, Janice Pristina, Dennis Postel, Scott Probeck, Karen Paholek, Joseph Pedone, Richard Pignatelli, Miguel Quinones, Emilio Pulito, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Samuel Ravelo, Jose Perez, Paul Paronich, Carlos Pineiro, Julio Ramos, Peter Panariello, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Eric Panni, Louis Padula, Laurence Perkins, Julio Ortiz, Ying Ping Li, Gerald Orrico, James Raymond, Glen Ramroop, Jennifer Owens, Anthony Phillips, Ivano Pulito, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, Wayne Porter, Frank Quinn, Vincent Perrone, James Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Cole Pletka, Charles Pearce, Dorothy Palmieri, Claire Pedone, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, John Podlucky, Ronald Peterson, Anthony Palladino, Ralph Perfetto, Jaime Palermo, Eliot Parisi, Darleen Pletka, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Paul Polemeni, Cosmo Palmieri, Patrick Pisani, Shirley Pelage, James Pesonen, Kathleen Owens, Dennis Porter, Peter Pace, Geraldo Perez, John Perez, Svetlana Polonsky, John Philbin, Ruben Peralta, Alyssa Pirone, Genee Parker, John Passeggiata, Robert Polidore, Joseph Pentangelo, Greg Pacifico, Vincent Palazzola, Connie Pfander, John Pellegriti, Harold Pietzak, Hector Perez, Joseph Palladino, Aniello Pellone, Karen Pisano, Mark Peters, Michael Orpilla, Nancy Palermo, Vito Plaia, George Papazahariou, Joseph Parisi, Joseph Pasquale, Michael Pirone, Karen Paholek, Joseph Pedone, Richard Pignatelli, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Jose Perez, Paul Paronich, Carlos Pineiro, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Louis Padula, Laurence Perkins, Julio Ortiz, Ying Ping Li, Gerald Orrico, Jennifer Owens, Anthony Phillips, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, Vincent Perrone, James Ortiz, Glen Ramroop, Kevin Prentice, Samuel Ravelo, Antoinette Pulito, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Quindalina Prioleau, Julio Ramos, James Raymond, Michael Raimo, Wayne Porter, Danielle Raia, Dennis Postel, Vincent Raschella, Miguel Quinones, Christine Puma, Ivano Pulito, Emilio Pulito, Peter Raftopoulos, Matthew Puma, Scott Probeck, Fernando Quinones, Daniel Questel, Jozef Ralbovski, Hommy Quinones, Vincent Ranieri, Frank Quinn, Kevin Quirk, Kenneth Quick, Janice Pristina, John Powers, Lori Pryzyblowski added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Cole Pletka, Charles Pearce, Dorothy Palmieri, Claire Pedone, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, John Podlucky, Ronald Peterson, Anthony Palladino, Ralph Perfetto, Jaime Palermo, Eliot Parisi, Darleen Pletka, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Paul Polemeni, Cosmo Palmieri, Patrick Pisani, Shirley Pelage, James Pesonen, Kathleen Owens, Dennis Porter, Peter Pace, Geraldo Perez, John Perez, Svetlana Polonsky, John Philbin, Ruben Peralta, Alyssa Pirone, Genee Parker, John Passeggiata, Robert Polidore, Joseph Pentangelo, Greg Pacifico, Vincent Palazzola, Connie Pfander, John Pellegriti, Harold Pietzak, Hector Perez, Joseph Palladino, Aniello Pellone, Karen Pisano, Mark Peters, Michael Orpilla, Nancy Palermo, Vito Plaia, George Papazahariou, Joseph Parisi, Joseph Pasquale, Michael Pirone, Karen Paholek, Joseph Pedone, Richard Pignatelli, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Jose Perez, Paul Paronich, Carlos Pineiro, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Louis Padula, Laurence Perkins, Julio Ortiz, Ying Ping Li, Gerald Orrico, Jennifer Owens, Anthony Phillips, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, Vincent Perrone, James Ortiz, Glen Ramroop, Kevin Prentice, Samuel Ravelo, Antoinette Pulito, Margie Ramos-Ciancio, Quindalina Prioleau, Julio Ramos, James Raymond, Michael Raimo, Wayne Porter, Danielle Raia, Dennis Postel, Vincent Raschella, Miguel Quinones, Christine Puma, Ivano Pulito, Emilio Pulito, Peter Raftopoulos, Matthew Puma, Scott Probeck, Fernando Quinones, Daniel Questel, Jozef Ralbovski, Hommy Quinones, Vincent Ranieri, Frank Quinn, Kevin Quirk, Kenneth Quick, Janice Pristina, John Powers, Lori Pryzyblowski. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Dorothy Palmieri, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, Anthony Palladino, Jaime Palermo, Eliot Parisi, Cosmo Palmieri, Kathleen Owens, Peter Pace, Genee Parker, Greg Pacifico, Vincent Palazzola, Joseph Palladino, Michael Orpilla, Nancy Palermo, George Papazahariou, Joseph Parisi, Karen Paholek, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Louis Padula, Julio Ortiz, Gerald Orrico, Jennifer Owens, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, James Ortiz, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Charles Pearce, Alyssa Pirone, Aniello Pellone, Richard Pignatelli, Claire Pedone, Harold Pietzak, Michael Pirone, John Philbin, Paul Paronich, Connie Pfander, Joseph Pasquale, Ying Ping Li, Svetlana Polonsky, James Pesonen, Geraldo Perez, Ruben Peralta, Darleen Pletka, Joseph Pentangelo, Ronald Peterson, Hector Perez, Shirley Pelage, Laurence Perkins, John Perez, Patrick Pisani, Anthony Phillips, Dennis Porter, Paul Polemeni, Vincent Perrone, John Podlucky, Carlos Pineiro, Robert Polidore, Ralph Perfetto, Cole Pletka, Mark Peters, Jose Perez, John Passeggiata, Joseph Pedone, John Pellegriti, Karen Pisano, Vito Plaia added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Dorothy Palmieri, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, Anthony Palladino, Jaime Palermo, Eliot Parisi, Cosmo Palmieri, Kathleen Owens, Peter Pace, Genee Parker, Greg Pacifico, Vincent Palazzola, Joseph Palladino, Michael Orpilla, Nancy Palermo, George Papazahariou, Joseph Parisi, Karen Paholek, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Peter Panariello, Eric Panni, Louis Padula, Julio Ortiz, Gerald Orrico, Jennifer Owens, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, James Ortiz, Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez, Charles Pearce, Alyssa Pirone, Aniello Pellone, Richard Pignatelli, Claire Pedone, Harold Pietzak, Michael Pirone, John Philbin, Paul Paronich, Connie Pfander, Joseph Pasquale, Ying Ping Li, Svetlana Polonsky, James Pesonen, Geraldo Perez, Ruben Peralta, Darleen Pletka, Joseph Pentangelo, Ronald Peterson, Hector Perez, Shirley Pelage, Laurence Perkins, John Perez, Patrick Pisani, Anthony Phillips, Dennis Porter, Paul Polemeni, Vincent Perrone, John Podlucky, Carlos Pineiro, Robert Polidore, Ralph Perfetto, Cole Pletka, Mark Peters, Jose Perez, John Passeggiata, Joseph Pedone, John Pellegriti, Karen Pisano, Vito Plaia. Related document: #1 Complaint,,.(Kushlefsky, Noah)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16003480)Document filed by Peter Pace, Dorothy Palmieri, Thomas Osgoop, Alice Papilsky, Nancy Palermo, Michael Orpilla, Peter Panariello, Anthony Palladino, Eric Panni, Jaime Palermo, Louis Padula, Genee Parker, Eliot Parisi, George Papazahariou, Julio Ortiz, Joseph Parisi, Gerald Orrico, Jennifer Owens, Greg Pacifico, Cosmo Palmieri, Karen Paholek, Vincent Palazzola, Thomas Ouellette, Edwin Ortiz, Alkiavadis Panopoulos, Joseph Palladino, Kathleen Owens, James Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Kushlefsky, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orpilla et al v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Orpilla
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Quinones
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Panariello
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Ramos-Ciancio
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Probeck
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Padula
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pirone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Pietzak
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Owens
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quindalina Prioleau
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Palazzola
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Papazahariou
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Pignatelli
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Parisi
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Palermo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Paronich
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Perkins
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Pulito
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darleen Pletka
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Peralta
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Palladino
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Panni
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pellegriti
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Pisano
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Paholek
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Perfetto
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Pelage
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Perez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aniello Pellone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Perrone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pasquale
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Palmieri
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Pfander
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Passeggiata
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Ravelo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldo Perez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Peters
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Quinones
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Palladino
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pentangelo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Palermo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cole Pletka
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Quinn
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivano Pulito
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Pryzyblowski
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Svetlana Polonsky
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Raftopoulos
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Perez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ortiz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Raimo
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hommy Quinones
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Pace
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Porter
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Perez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Puma
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Prentice
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ying Ping Li
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Pedone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pesonen
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Ramroop
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Pearce
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cosmo Palmieri
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pedone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Polidore
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ortiz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Questel
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Quirk
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Ranieri
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Powers
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Postel
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Porter
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Philbin
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Phillips
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Pristina
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ouellette
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabina Pillot-Rodriguez
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Ortiz
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Raschella
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Ramos
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliot Parisi
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Peterson
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Pulito
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Raia
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Pirone
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Pisani
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Raymond
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Puma
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Owens
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Pacifico
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Quick
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alkiavadis Panopoulos
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jozef Ralbovski
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Papilsky
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Podlucky
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Polemeni
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Orrico
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genee Parker
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Plaia
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Osgoop
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Pineiro
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ouellette
Represented By: Noah H. Kushlefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?