Escowitz v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Plaintiff: Steven Gardener, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Greg Gerkens, Mark Fidelus, Patrick L Hicks, Charles J Giglio, Catherine Giliberti, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Marie Graves, Robert Harp, Cleveena Gilbert, William Gott, Albert Grotell, Richard Famularo, John Graves, John Hickey, Louis R Fargelli, Ramonita Gonzalez, Anthony Grego, Rafael Estrada, Thomas Irwin, William Hentnik, Kelly Guidice, Natalie Guerrido, Joanne Gardener, Marie Jean-Philippe, Rita Fargelli, Marilyn Giglio, Ronald F Harbachuk, Hugo Gomez, Luis Fernandez, Lugene Forte, Rafael Garcia, Lawrence J Giuffre, Iwona Fidelus, Karen Hogan, Luz Garcia, Karen Jennings, Francois Geerts, Annie Gibson, Angelo Gonzalez, Jennifer Freitag, Nicole Ford, Lorinda Henderson, Jillian Fisher, Carol H Gray, Joseph Guidice, Fanny Fallacaro, Miriam Franke, Joel Ezra, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Monica Gonzalez, Edward Goucher, Francine Jenkins, Kevin Gilbert, Willie Wheeler, Tynetta Jackson, Nathaniel Jenkins, Tom Fennell, Cynthia Hicks, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Sonia Hentnik, Kelly Friscia, John Goodwin, Robert Hicks, George Escowitz, Christopher Ford, John Friscia, Daniel Fox, Glenn N Gray, Sandra Estrada, Bertina Jackson, Gerald Freitag, Sheila Grimes, Orbiedella Gilchrist, James Herman, Thomas Fallacaro, Constance Hicks, Jeffrey C Haring, Susan Gonzalez, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Selena Harris, Patrice Galvin, Bruce Green, Victoria Groce, Janet Fetherston, Alan Jennings, Maria Gomez, Diana Goldberg, Patrick Hogan, Christine Gott, Barbara Hickey, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, John Franke, Kathryn Geerts, Maxine S Ezra and James Fetherston
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 1:2018cv11713
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/5/2018) (sjo)
January 9, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. (sjo)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
January 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
January 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:03-md-01570-GBD-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (pc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 26, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant Name Error; The Defendant as to whom the summons is being request must be clear on the summons PDF request. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Daniel J. Hansen dated 12/21/2018 re: Related action. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kingdom of Saudi Arabia, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/26/2018 (dnh).
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by George Escowitz, Rafael Estrada, Sandra Estrada, Joel Ezra, Maxine S Ezra, Fanny Fallacaro, Thomas Fallacaro, Richard Famularo, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Louis R Fargelli, Rita Fargelli, Nasreen Fatima, Elsa Feliciano, Tom Fennell, Luis Fernandez, James Fetherston, Janet Fetherston, Iwona Fidelus, Mark Fidelus, Jillian Fisher, Christopher Ford, Nicole Ford, Lugene Forte, Daniel Fox, John Franke, Miriam Franke, Gerald Freitag, Jennifer Freitag, John Friscia, Kelly Friscia, Andrew Frothingham, Michael Wayne Galvin, Patrice Galvin, Luz Garcia, Rafael Garcia, Joanne Gardener, Steven Gardener, Francois Geerts, Kathryn Geerts, Greg Gerkens, Annie Gibson, Charles J Giglio, Marilyn Giglio, Cleveena Gilbert, Kevin Gilbert, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Catherine Giliberti, Lawrence J Giuffre, Diana Goldberg, Hugo Gomez, Maria Gomez, Angelo Gonzalez, Monica Gonzalez, Ramonita Gonzalez, Susan Gonzalez, John Goodwin, Christine Gott, William Gott, Edward Goucher, John Graves, Marie Graves, Carol H Gray, Glenn N Gray, Bruce Green, Anthony Grego, Sheila Grimes, Victoria Groce, Albert Grotell, Natalie Guerrido, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice, Ronald F Harbachuk, Jeffrey C Haring, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Robert Harp, Selena Harris, Lorinda Henderson, Sonia Hentnik, William Hentnik, James Herman, Barbara Hickey, John Hickey, Constance Hicks, Cynthia Hicks, Patrick L Hicks, Robert Hicks, Karen Hogan, Patrick Hogan, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Tynetta Jackson, Marie Jean-Philippe, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Francine Jenkins, Nathaniel Jenkins, Alan Jennings, Karen Jennings, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Willie Wheeler.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by Monica Gonzalez, Maxine S Ezra, Annie Gibson, Daniel Fox, Fanny Fallacaro, Kathryn Geerts, Louis R Fargelli, Carol H Gray, Marie Jean-Philippe, Marilyn Giglio, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Jillian Fisher, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Robert Hicks, Luis Fernandez, Nasreen Fatima, John Graves, Victoria Groce, Bertina Jackson, Maria Gomez, Iwona Fidelus, Marie Graves, John Franke, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Cleveena Gilbert, Christine Gott, Richard Famularo, Albert Grotell, Sandra Estrada, Miriam Franke, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Willie Wheeler, Jennifer Freitag, William Gott, Thomas Irwin, William Hentnik, Andrew Frothingham, Tynetta Jackson, Michael Wayne Galvin, Thomas Fallacaro, Elsa Feliciano, Nicole Ford, Gerald Freitag, Rita Fargelli, Kelly Guidice, Tom Fennell, Selena Harris, George Escowitz, Hugo Gomez, Edward Goucher, Bruce Green, Joseph Guidice, Ramonita Gonzalez, Charles J Giglio, Francois Geerts, Kelly Friscia, Diana Goldberg, Sheila Grimes, Sonia Hentnik, Christopher Ford, Luz Garcia, Catherine Giliberti, Patrick L Hicks, Kevin Gilbert, Patrick Hogan, Mark Fidelus, Joanne Gardener, Alan Jennings, Ronald F Harbachuk, John Friscia, Greg Gerkens, Cynthia Hicks, Natalie Guerrido, Karen Hogan, John Hickey, Lawrence J Giuffre, Rafael Garcia, Lorinda Henderson, Patrice Galvin, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Susan Gonzalez, Robert Harp, Janet Fetherston, Joel Ezra, Constance Hicks, John Goodwin, Francine Jenkins, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Barbara Hickey, James Herman, James Fetherston, Rafael Estrada, Angelo Gonzalez, Nathaniel Jenkins, Glenn N Gray, Jeffrey C Haring, Anthony Grego, Steven Gardener, Lugene Forte, Karen Jennings. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 03-MD-1570. (pne)
December 17, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all filers were not selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
December 17, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no courthouse selection was made on the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
December 17, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel John Hansen to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all filers were not selected for the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer(s) - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (pne)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - FILER ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 03MD1570. Document filed by George Escowitz.(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/17/2018 (pne).
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/17/2018 (pne).
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16056378)Document filed by George Escowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/17/2018 (pne).
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Kingdom of Saudi Arabia. Document filed by George Escowitz. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hansen, Daniel) Modified on 12/17/2018 (pne).
December 14, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Bruce Green, Annie Gibson, Victoria Groce, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Constance Hicks, Glenn N Gray, Charles J Giglio, Carol H Gray, Karen Hogan, Albert Grotell, John Graves, Francois Geerts, Patrick Hogan, William Hentnik, Edward Goucher, Kathryn Geerts, Sheila Grimes, Lorinda Henderson, John Hickey, John Goodwin, Diana Goldberg, Lawrence J Giuffre, Jeffrey C Haring, Catherine Giliberti, Hugo Gomez, William Gott, Cynthia Hicks, Cleveena Gilbert, Ramonita Gonzalez, Barbara Hickey, Maria Gomez, Natalie Guerrido, Marie Graves, Robert Harp, Sonia Hentnik, Susan Gonzalez, James Herman, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Anthony Grego, Selena Harris, Patrick L Hicks, Monica Gonzalez, Ronald F Harbachuk, Christine Gott, Angelo Gonzalez, Greg Gerkens, Marilyn Giglio, Robert Hicks, Kevin Gilbert, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice added. Party added pursuant to #2 Complaint.Document filed by Bruce Green, Annie Gibson, Victoria Groce, Orbiedella Gilchrist, Constance Hicks, Glenn N Gray, Charles J Giglio, Carol H Gray, Karen Hogan, Albert Grotell, John Graves, Francois Geerts, Patrick Hogan, William Hentnik, Edward Goucher, Kathryn Geerts, Sheila Grimes, Lorinda Henderson, John Hickey, John Goodwin, Diana Goldberg, Lawrence J Giuffre, Jeffrey C Haring, Catherine Giliberti, Hugo Gomez, William Gott, Cynthia Hicks, Cleveena Gilbert, Ramonita Gonzalez, Barbara Hickey, Maria Gomez, Natalie Guerrido, Marie Graves, Robert Harp, Sonia Hentnik, Susan Gonzalez, James Herman, Elizabeth Harman-Arco, Anthony Grego, Selena Harris, Patrick L Hicks, Monica Gonzalez, Ronald F Harbachuk, Christine Gott, Angelo Gonzalez, Greg Gerkens, Marilyn Giglio, Robert Hicks, Kevin Gilbert, Joseph Guidice, Kelly Guidice. Related document: #2 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Marie Jean-Philippe, Karen Jennings, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Willie Wheeler, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Nathaniel Jenkins, Tynetta Jackson, Francine Jenkins, Alan Jennings added. Party added pursuant to #2 Complaint.Document filed by Marie Jean-Philippe, Karen Jennings, Wilfred Jean-Philippe, Thomas Irwin, Bertina Jackson, Willie Wheeler, Suilan Mo-Escowitz, Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre, Nathaniel Jenkins, Tynetta Jackson, Francine Jenkins, Alan Jennings. Related document: #2 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)
December 14, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Janet Fetherston, Michael Wayne Galvin, Tom Fennell, Gerald Freitag, Daniel Fox, Joel Ezra, Kelly Friscia, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Miriam Franke, Iwona Fidelus, Maxine S Ezra, John Franke, Steven Gardener, Jennifer Freitag, Andrew Frothingham, Lugene Forte, Nicole Ford, Rafael Estrada, John Friscia, James Fetherston, Rafael Garcia, Jillian Fisher, Luis Fernandez, Mark Fidelus, Nasreen Fatima, Fanny Fallacaro, Sandra Estrada, Rita Fargelli, Joanne Gardener, Louis R Fargelli, Elsa Feliciano, Christopher Ford, Richard Famularo, Patrice Galvin, Thomas Fallacaro, Luz Garcia added. Party added pursuant to #2 Complaint.Document filed by Janet Fetherston, Michael Wayne Galvin, Tom Fennell, Gerald Freitag, Daniel Fox, Joel Ezra, Kelly Friscia, Carmen I Fantauzzi, Miriam Franke, Iwona Fidelus, Maxine S Ezra, John Franke, Steven Gardener, Jennifer Freitag, Andrew Frothingham, Lugene Forte, Nicole Ford, Rafael Estrada, John Friscia, James Fetherston, Rafael Garcia, Jillian Fisher, Luis Fernandez, Mark Fidelus, Nasreen Fatima, Fanny Fallacaro, Sandra Estrada, Rita Fargelli, Joanne Gardener, Louis R Fargelli, Elsa Feliciano, Christopher Ford, Richard Famularo, Patrice Galvin, Thomas Fallacaro, Luz Garcia. Related document: #2 Complaint.(Hansen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escowitz v. Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Gardener
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn-Marie McComb-Giuffre
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Gerkens
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fidelus
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L Hicks
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J Giglio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Giliberti
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suilan Mo-Escowitz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Graves
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harp
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleveena Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gott
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Grotell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Famularo
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Graves
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hickey
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis R Fargelli
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramonita Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Grego
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Estrada
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Irwin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hentnik
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Guidice
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Guerrido
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Gardener
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Jean-Philippe
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Fargelli
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Giglio
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald F Harbachuk
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Gomez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Fernandez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lugene Forte
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Garcia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J Giuffre
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iwona Fidelus
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Hogan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Garcia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jennings
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francois Geerts
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Gibson
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Freitag
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ford
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorinda Henderson
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Fisher
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol H Gray
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Guidice
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny Fallacaro
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Franke
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Ezra
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Frothingham
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wayne Galvin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Goucher
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Jenkins
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gilbert
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynetta Jackson
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Jenkins
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Fennell
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hicks
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Harman-Arco
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Hentnik
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Friscia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Hicks
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Escowitz
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ford
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Friscia
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Fox
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn N Gray
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Estrada
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertina Jackson
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Freitag
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Grimes
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orbiedella Gilchrist
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Herman
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fallacaro
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Hicks
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C Haring
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Gonzalez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasreen Fatima
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Feliciano
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Harris
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Galvin
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Green
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Groce
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Fetherston
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Jennings
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gomez
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Goldberg
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hogan
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Gott
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Hickey
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen I Fantauzzi
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Jean-Philippe
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Franke
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Geerts
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine S Ezra
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fetherston
Represented By: Daniel John Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?