Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. and ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA L.P., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P., HANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, Accord Healthcare, Inc., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv10049
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #20 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
December 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348908. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #15 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Related Document Number: #18 . (Brandofino, Keith) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Brandofino, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or in the alternative, Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Brandofino, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Intas Pharmaceuticals Ltd. for Accord Healthcare, Inc.. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc..(Brandofino, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Christina Elyse Fahmy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348908. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of C. Fahmy in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit PA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Peter Michael Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Accord Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of P. Boyle in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit District of Columbia Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit of Service)(Brandofino, Keith)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Colette T. Connor in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case .. Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative. MOTION to Transfer Case . . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative., MOTION to Transfer Case . Document filed by Astrazeneca L.P., Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,, Astrazeneca UK Limited, Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jay Frackman on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Frackman, Andrew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Williamson, Brett)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Suzanne Wall on behalf of Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wall, Carolyn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #5 Motion for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) (mml)
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSOCIATED: Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/08/2019) (NAP)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Barton Gray on behalf of Albertsons Companies, Inc., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Gray, Joshua)
October 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
October 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
October 31, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-07233-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
October 31, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 19-cv-7233. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Eliot Perwin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Albertsons Companies, Inc.; Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P; Astrazeneca L.P.; Astrazeneca UK Limited; Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
October 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Eliot Perwin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Amended. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 2)(Perwin, Scott)
October 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17860862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (aea)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott E. Perwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17860862. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attachment 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order attachment 2)(Perwin, Scott) Modified on 10/30/2019 (aea).
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-07233-CM, 1:19-cv-08296-CM, 1:19-cv-08712-CM, 1:19-cv-09036-CM, 1:19-cv-09999. Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., H-E-B, L.P., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Perwin, Scott)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA L.P., ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P., ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED, Accord Healthcare, Inc., HANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17860544)Document filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., The Kroger Co., H-E-B, L.P., Walgreen Co..(Perwin, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walgreen Co. et al v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H-E-B, L.P.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Joshua Barton Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Joshua Barton Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Joshua Barton Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Scott Eliot Perwin
Represented By: Joshua Barton Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASTRAZENECA UK LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Michael Brandofino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Jay Frackman
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: Carolyn Suzanne Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals L.P.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?