Brantley v. Tampa Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Janae M. Brantley
Defendant: Channel 12 News, Tampa Police Department, New York Times, Legal Aid Society (BRONX), State of FL and NY, LGBT Law Firm, Human Rights Division, FBI, Aim and DePaola Law Firm, NYPD, Anit Violence, Black Metropolitan Law Firm, EEOC (TAMPA), NAACP, Florida State Hospital, FBI Tampa, Montefiore Clinic, Rikers Island Jail, FBI New York, State of Florida, Hills & Rose Law Firm, United States Government, Hillsborough County Jail and State of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv10362
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from J. Brantley, dated 12/26/19 re: PROOF FOR CASE 19cv10362. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from J. Brantley, dated 12/23/19 re: (UPDATED SINCE 12/23/19) - Plaintiff submits letter with attached copies of Order of Protection from New York State Supreme court, letter from NYC Human Resources Administration, and medical correspondences from St. Barnabas Hospital(Bronx, New York). Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER from J. Brantley dated 12/18/19 re: FOR CASE TO ADD PROOF/ MORE PROOF FOR CASE 19cv10362. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from J. Brantley, dated 12/16/19 re: UPDATED VERSION 12/16/19 6:00 PM. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER from J. Brantley, dated 12/12/19 re: Plaintiff submits letter with attached copy of Court Notice for litigant's appearance in Criminal Court from the New York City Criminal Justice Agency, dated 12/5/19; and Plaintiff informs the USDC-SDNY that the plaintiff is bringing more paperwork for 19cv10362. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER from J. Brantley, dated 12/11/19 re: MORE PAPERWORK FOR CASE 19CV10362. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(sc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aim and DePaola Law Firm, Anit Violence, Channel 12 News, EEOC (TAMPA), FBI New York, FBI Tampa, Florida State Hospital, Hills & Rose Law Firm, Hillsborough County Jail, Human Rights Division, LGBT Law Firm, Legal Aid Society (BRONX), Montefiore Clinic, NAACP, NYPD, New York Times, Rikers Island Jail, State of Florida, State of New York, Tampa Police Department, United States Government amending #2 Complaint.Document filed by Janae M. Brantley. Related document: #2 Complaint,.(sc)
December 5, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Janae M. Brantley 14-16 Mt. Hope. Ave. Bronx, NY 10453. (vba)
December 3, 2019 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #8 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (sac)
December 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to hold this matter open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. Plaintiff's complaint, filed IFP under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed for failure to state a claim for relief. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court grants Plaintiff 60 days' leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 19-CV-10362 (CM). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. If Plaintiff fails to submit an amended complaint within the time allowed and does not show good cause to excuse such failure, the Court will enter a civil judgment consistent with this order and direct the Clerk of Court to terminate this matter. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/3/2019) (sac) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/4/2019) (sac).
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from J. Brantley, re: Plaintiff submits this letter with attached copy of letter to William Barr, Attorney General of the United States concerning hate crimes being perpetrated against him etc. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
November 19, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Granting IFP Application to Janae M. Brantley 14-16 Mt. Hope. Ave. Bronx, NY 10453. (vba)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/19/2019) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from J. Brantley, re: Plaintiff writes that the five officers who took her to jail took her ID; and that it was not in her property at pickup etc. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc) Modified on 11/26/2019 (sc).
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Janae Brantley, dated 11/12/19 re: BUILDING SECURITY. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(sc)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Janae M. Brantley consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(rdz)
November 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Aim and DePaola Law Firm, Anit Violence, Black Metropolitan Law Firm, Channel 12 News, EEOC (TAMPA), FBI, Human Rights Division, LGBT Law Firm, Legal Aid Society (BRONX), NAACP, NYPD, New York Times, State of FL and NY. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(rdz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Janae M. Brantley.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley v. Tampa Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channel 12 News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tampa Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Times
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Aid Society (BRONX)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of FL and NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGBT Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Rights Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aim and DePaola Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anit Violence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Metropolitan Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEOC (TAMPA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAACP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Tampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montefiore Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rikers Island Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills & Rose Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janae M. Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?