Deluca et al v. GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP et al
Plaintiff: Drew R. Naylor and Barbara Deluca
Defendant: GPB Holdings II, LP, Axiom Capital Management, Inc., Mark Martino, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, David Gentile, Jeffrey Schneider, Ascendant Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Lash, Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC and GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv10498
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiffs Barbara Deluca and Drew R. Naylor, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively, the "Plaintiffs") and defendants Ascendant Capital LLC and Jeffrey Schneider (collectively. the "Schneider Defendants"), as follows: 1) The time for the Schneider Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including January 31, 2020. So Ordered. Ascendant Capital, LLC answer due 1/31/2020; Jeffrey Schneider answer due 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/6/2020) (js)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for plaintiffs BARBARA DELUCA and, DREW R. NAYLOR, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively, the "Plaintiffs"), and defendant AXIOM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC. ("Axiom"), as follows: 1. The time for Axiom to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended through and including January 31, 2020; 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed to be an original and all of which taken together shall constitute one and the same stipulation. A faxed or e-mailed copy of this stipulation as executed shall have the same force and effect as the original. SO ORDERED. Axiom Capital Management, Inc. answer due 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/6/2020) (jca)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the plaintiffs Barbara Deluca and Drew R. Naylor, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively, the "plaintiffs") and defendants GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Holdings II, LP, and GPB Capital Holdings, LLC (collectively, the "GPB Defendants"), as follows: 1. The time for the GPB Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including January 31, 2020. 2. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed to be an original and all of which taken together shall constitute one and the same Stipulation. A faxed or e-mailed copy of this Stipulation as executed shall have the same force and effect as the original. SO ORDERED. GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP answer due 1/31/2020; GPB Capital Holdings, LLC answer due 1/31/2020; GPB Holdings II, LP answer due 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/6/2020) (jca)
December 31, 2019 Filing 49 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ascendant Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Schneider. (Schreiber, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 48 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Axiom Capital Management, Inc.. (Levine, Jessica)
December 26, 2019 Filing 47 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP. (Meyer, Nicole)
December 19, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Pratsinakis on behalf of Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Pratsinakis, Catherine)
December 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica L. Titler-Lingle on behalf of Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Titler-Lingle, Jessica)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 MOTION for Catherine Pratsinakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) (jca)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 MOTION for Jessica L. Titler-Lingle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) (jca)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF LAINA M. HERBERT granting #28 MOTION for Laina M. Herbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/18/2019) (jca)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for plaintiffs BARBARA DELUCA and, DREW R. NAYLOR, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively, the "Plaintiffs"), and defendant AXIOM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC. ("Axiom"), as follows: 1. The time for Axiom to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended through and including December 31, 2019. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Axiom Capital Management, Inc. answer due 12/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/17/2019) (jca)
December 16, 2019 Filing 40 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Axiom Capital Management, Inc.. (Levine, Jessica)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned, theattorneys of record for the plaintiffs Barbara Deluca and Drew R. Naylor, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively, the "plaintiffs") and defendants GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Holdings II, LP, and GPB Capital Holdings, LLC (collectively, the "GPB Defendants"), as follows: 1. The time for the GPB Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including December 31, 2019. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP answer due 12/31/2019; GPB Capital Holdings, LLC answer due 12/31/2019; GPB Holdings II, LP answer due 12/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) (jca)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Tab K. Rosenfeld dated 12/11/2019 re: Accordingly, we would respectfully request that the Court enter an Order permitting the filing of the proposed redacted complaint. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) (jca)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned, the attorneys of record for plaintiffs BARBARA DELUCA and DREW R. NAYLOR, on behalf of themselves and other similarly situated limited partners (collectively the "Plaintiffs"), and counsel for defendants ASCENDANT ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES, LLC (inaccurately named ASCENDANCY ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES, LLC on caption) and MARK MARTINO (collectively the "AAS Defendants"), as follows: 1. The time for the AAS Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through and including December 31, 2019. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC answer due 12/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/2019) (jca)
December 12, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC, Mark Martino. (Smith, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole E Meyer on behalf of GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP. (Meyer, Nicole)
December 12, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Michael Kaplan on behalf of GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP. (Kaplan, Steven)
December 12, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tab Keith Rosenfeld on behalf of GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP. (Rosenfeld, Tab)
December 12, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Schreiber on behalf of Ascendant Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Schneider. (Schreiber, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ascendant Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Schneider. (Jancasz, Richard)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ascendant Capital, LLC.(Jancasz, Richard)
December 11, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Joseph Jancasz on behalf of Ascendant Capital, LLC, Jeffrey Schneider. (Jancasz, Richard)
December 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #28 MOTION for Laina M. Herbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18259758.(Herbert, Laina)
December 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. #28 MOTION for Laina M. Herbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid;.. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
December 10, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Laina M. Herbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Laina M. Herbert With Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Herbert, Laina)
December 10, 2019 Filing 27 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP. (Rosenfeld, Tab)
December 9, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Jeffrey Lash served on 12/7/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Service was accepted by Jeffrey Lash. Document filed by Drew R. Naylor; Barbara Deluca. (Glauber, Ira)
December 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Berger on behalf of Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Berger, Daniel)
December 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Catherine Pratsinakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18220879. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Jessica L. Titler-Lingle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18220999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Jessica L. Titler-Lingle to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18220999. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Glauber, Ira)
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Catherine Pratsinakis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18220879. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Glauber, Ira)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Axiom Capital Management, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019; GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; GPB Capital Holdings, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; GPB Holdings II, LP served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; David Gentile served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019; Mark Martino served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Jeffrey Schneider served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. Service was accepted by Valentino Sole, Kristen Hayes, Colleen Banahan. Document filed by Drew R. Naylor; Barbara Deluca. (Glauber, Ira)
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Ascendant Capital, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. Service was accepted by Jeff Schneider. Document filed by Drew R. Naylor; Barbara Deluca. (Glauber, Ira)
November 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Similar Actions in Other Courts. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira)
November 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/25/2019. Responses due by 12/5/2019, Replies due by 12/9/2019. (jca)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Complaint. Motion granted to the extent hereafter set forth and otherwise denied. This purported class action is brought by limited partners of GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP ("Automotive"), and GPB Holdings II, LP ("Holdings II") (together, the "Partnerships"), and as well as others. The crux of the claim appears to be that class members were fraudulently induced to invest more than $1.27 billion. Prior to the commencement of this action, plaintiffs sought access to books and records of Automotive and Holdings II under Delaware law and the partnership agreements. As a condition of granting access, the Partnerships insisted that plaintiffs execute confidentiality agreements that: [P]rohibit[] the public filing of documents or disclosure of information designated by the parties as "Confidential," and require[] Plaintiffs to ensure that any complaint and attachments or exhibits to the complaint "filed in the Subsequent Litigation that constitute or contain Confidential Material shall be filed in accordance with [Delaware] Court of Chancery Rule 5.1 or any other similar applicable rule governing confidentiality" and "take all steps reasonably necessary to ensure the continued confidentiality of the Confidential Material, including but not limited to entering into a protective order with all parties in any Subsequent Litigation sufficient to protect the Confidential Material from disclosure." The Partnerships thereupon designated all documents to which they gave plaintiffs access as Confidential. In these circumstances, plaintiffs, upon filing this action, sought an order providing for the filing of the complaint and certain other materials, which apparently are based to some degree upon documents that the Partnerships designated as Confidential, under seal and the public filing of a redacted version. In my absence, the Part I judge (Furman, J) granted the requested order on a temporary basis. He required that plaintiffs file the unredacted copies publicly on November 15, 2019 unless they renewed their motion to seal before me before then. Plaintiffs now have renewed their motion. The renewed motion makes abundantly clear that they have made this motion to comply with their contractual obligation quoted above. They "do not concede that the materials upon which the Complaint relies constitute 'confidential' information under law, reserve[] their rights to challenge such wholesale designations, and plan to do so at the appropriate juncture." I put to one side, for the moment, the questions whether the Partnerships' wholesale designation of eve1ything to which they granted plaintiffs access was appropriate and, if not, whether their action in doing so should have consequences quite inconsistent with what they sought to achieve. For the present, it suffices to do the following: 1. Judge Furman's order shall remain in effect until 5 P.M. on December 13, 2019 unless the Court otherwise orders. 2. Defendants on or before November 25, 2019 shall file such motion, if any, as they think advisable, seeking to establish good cause or other justification for: (a) Each and every redaction from each and every filing to date, bearing in mind that the Court, as an initial matter and subject to persuasion to the contrary, is skeptical of any suggestion that the Confidentiality Agreements extracted by the Partnerships from plaintiffs constitute good cause, at least in and of themselves, and (b) The wholesale designation as Confidential of everything to which the Partnerships granted access. 3. Plaintiffs shall file their response, if any, to any such motion no later than December 5, 2019. Any reply shall be filed no later than December 9, 2019. 4. Plaintiffs and defendants each shall file no more than one memorandum of law at each stage of the briefing. Principal memoranda shall not exceed 15 double-spaced pages. Any reply memorandum shall not exceed 7 double-spaced pages. 5. The parties would be well advised to resolve this dispute to the greatest extent possible by agreement and with a view of the common law and First Amendment rights to public access to court records. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/18/2019) (jca) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC, Ascendant Capital, LLC, Axiom Capital Management, Inc., GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP, David Gentile, Jeffrey Lash, Mark Martino, Jeffrey Schneider. (dnh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Order)(Glauber, Ira)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB AUTOMOTIVE PORTFOLIO, LP, GPB HOLDINGS II, LP, GPB CAPITAL HOLDINGS, LLC, ASCENDANCY ALTERNATIVE STRATEGIES, LLC, ASCENDANT CAPITAL, LLC, AXIOM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC., DAVID GENTILE, MARK MARTINO, JEFFREY LASH, and JEFFREY SCHNEIDER, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira)
November 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ira N. Glauber to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct official A.O. Summons form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal Document Unredacted Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Order)(Glauber, Ira)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Schneider, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Lash, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Martino, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Gentile, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Axiom Capital Management, Inc., re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ascendant Capital, LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Holdings II, LP, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by Barbara Deluca, Drew R. Naylor. (Glauber, Ira) Modified on 11/14/2019 (dnh).
November 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) (pne).
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC, Ascendant Capital, LLC, Axiom Capital Management, Inc., GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP, GPB Capital Holdings, LLC, GPB Holdings II, LP, David Gentile, Jeffrey Lash, Mark Martino, Jeffrey Schneider. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401248249)Document filed by Drew R. Naylor, Barbara Deluca.(jgo) (pne).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL: COMPLAINT/OTHER DOCUMENTS:EXHIBITS (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/8/2019) (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deluca et al v. GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew R. Naylor
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Berger
Represented By: Laina Herbert
Represented By: Catherine Pratsinakis
Represented By: Jessica L. Titler-Lingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Deluca
Represented By: Ira N. Glauber
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Berger
Represented By: Laina Herbert
Represented By: Catherine Pratsinakis
Represented By: Jessica L. Titler-Lingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Holdings II, LP
Represented By: Nicole E Meyer
Represented By: Tab Keith Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven Michael Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiom Capital Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicole E Meyer
Represented By: Tab Keith Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven Michael Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Schneider
Represented By: Jeffrey Schreiber
Represented By: Richard Joseph Jancasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendant Capital, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Schreiber
Represented By: Richard Joseph Jancasz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendancy Alternative Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPB Automotive Portfolio, LP
Represented By: Nicole E Meyer
Represented By: Tab Keith Rosenfeld
Represented By: Steven Michael Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?