Jordan-Rowell v. IRS
Plaintiff: Janessa Jordan-Rowell
Defendant: IRS and United States Of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv02155
Filed: March 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Filing 21 LETTER from J. Jordan-Rowell, dated 5/9/23 re: (THE MANUAL FOR PRO SE LITIGANTS HAS BEEN DISCONTINUED) - Plaintiff requests that the Court send her forms etc. for "Representing Yourself at Trial." Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc)
May 9, 2023 Request for Copies of forms/procedures Received: Re #21 Letter,. Request for forms/procedures for Representing Yourself at Trial from J. Jordan-Rowell received on 5/9/23. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 20 PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 5/9/23 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Janessa Jordan-Rowell. New Address: P.O. Box 814, New York, NY, 10150. (sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 19 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Janessa Jordan-Rowell consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 18 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Summons, served. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell. (sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Janessa Jordan-Rowell in Support of re: #16 MOTION to Compel IRS to to release tax refunds for years 2020 and 2021. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell. (sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION, Re: to Compel IRS to to release tax refunds for years 2020 and 2021. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc)
May 9, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. IRS served on 5/9/2023, answer due 7/10/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell. (sc)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Janessa Jordan-Rowell P.O. Box 814 New York, NY 10150 on 05/03/2023 Re: #12 Order of Service Add and Terminate Parties. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (ta)
May 4, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America. (ta)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail an information package to Plaintiff. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the IRS. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to add the United States of America as a defendant. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. The Court further directs the Clerk of Court to: (1) issue a summons for the United States of America; (2) complete a USM-285 form for the United States of America; (3) mark the box on the USM-285 form labeled "Check for service on U.S.A."; and (4) deliver all documents necessary to effect service on the United States of America to the U.S. Marshals Service. United States Of America added. IRS (Internal Revenue Service) terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/4/2023) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
May 4, 2023 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 05/03/2023 Re: Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. #12 Order of Service Add and Terminate Parties. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) United States of America. (ta)
April 28, 2023 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba)
April 28, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
April 28, 2023 Mailed a copy of #10 Order Granting IFP Application to Janessa Jordan-Rowell at P.O. Box 814, New York, NY 10150. (kh)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/27/2023) (vn)
April 19, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc)
April 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Pantoja on behalf of IRS..(Pantoja, Joseph)
April 13, 2023 Mailed a copy of #6 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Janessa Jordan-Rowell at P.O. Box 814, New York, NY 10150. (kh)
April 12, 2023 Filing 7 LETTER from J. Jordan-Rowell, dated 4/7/23 re: The documents attached to this letter concern my estimated tax payments for the tax 6:115 under Janessa Jordan Rowell for the year 2022 etc. I do not owe any money to federal or state for any tax bills; and please tell them to release my tax refund money etc. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc) Modified on 4/14/2023 (sc). Modified on 4/28/2023 (nb).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR AMENDED IFP APPLICATION: Accordingly, within 30 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402 in fees or complete, sign, and submit the attached amended IFP application. If Plaintiff submits the amended IFP application, it should be labeled with docket number 1:23-CV-2155 (LTS), and address the deficiencies and issues described above by providing facts to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the fees to bring this action. If the Court grants the amended IFP application, Plaintiff will be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees. See 1915(a)(1). The Court warns Plaintiff that the Court must dismiss this action if it determines that her allegation of poverty is untrue. 1915(e)(2)(A). No summons shall issue at this time. If Plaintiff complies with this order, this action shall be processed in accordance with the procedures of the Clerk's Office. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that appellant demonstrates good faith when seeking review of a nonfrivolous issue). Filing Fee due by 5/11/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 5/11/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/11/2023) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (nb)
March 29, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT, Re: amending #1 Complaint against IRS with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell. Related document: #1 Complaint.(sc)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, and W-2 forms etc. IRS served on 3/15/2023, answer due 4/5/2023. Service was made by Mail to I.R.S.. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell. (sc)
March 20, 2023 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. Document filed by Janessa Jordan-Rowell.(sc)
March 16, 2023 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application to Janessa Jordan-Rowell at P.O. Box 814, New York, NY 10150. (kh)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 4/14/2023. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 4/14/2023. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/15/2023) (sha)
March 15, 2023 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac)
March 14, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan-Rowell v. IRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janessa Jordan-Rowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRS
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Pantoja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?